Juan G. Santos
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 08-23290
District Judge Ronald H. Sargis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Juan G. Santos, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott D. Shumaker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Shumaker +1 916 441 2199
No Logo Lawrence J. Loheit, Trustee
No Logo Richard J. Hanf, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Tomasa P. Santos, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott D. Shumaker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Shumaker +1 916 441 2199
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                      Change of Address for GMAC Mortgage, LLC (rlos) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                        Change of Address for Marc A. Caraska (rlos) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 08/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                            Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim as Transmitted to BNC for Service Proofs of Claim due by 11/28/2011. (rlos) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                              Trustee's Notice of Assets. (rlos) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                Order Approving Final Report and Discharging Trustee (jtis) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 122 Notice of Entry [DNL-4] (rlos) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                    Notice of Entry of 112 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] (rlos) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 120 Notice of Entry [DNL-6] (rlos) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Entry of 117 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-6] (rlos) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/14/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                            Copy of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (rlos) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                              Order Granting 113 Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-6] (rlos) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 113 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney(s) [DNL-6], 114 Declaration, 115 Exhibit(s) (rlos) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Exhibit(s) to 114 Declaration [DNL-6] (rlos) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 113 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney(s) [DNL-6] (rlos) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney(s) [DNL-6] Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (rlos) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Civil Minute Order Granting 90 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] (rlos) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 90 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $9062.50, Expenses: $205.80. GRANTED (jlas) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Mailing of Trustee's Final Report and Account as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Withdrawal Re: 90 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $9062.50, Expenses: $205.80. (rlos) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Trustee's Final Report and Account as transmitted to BNC for service. (Hughes, Anne) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Mailing of Notice of 106 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 104 Civil Minute Order Granting From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 97 Motion/Application To Convert Case [DNL-5] (rlos) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee (rlos) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Civil Minute Order Granting From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 97 Motion/Application To Convert Case [DNL-5] (rlos) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 97 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 [DNL-5] GRANTED (jlas) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 97 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 [DNL-5], 98 Notice of Hearing, 99 Declaration, 100 Declaration, 101 Exhibit(s) (rlos) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Exhibit(s) to 99 Declaration [DNL-5] (rlos) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Declaration of Richard J. Hanf in support of 97 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 [DNL-5] (rlos) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 97 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 [DNL-5] (rlos) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Re: 97 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 [DNL-5] to be held on 10/19/2010 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department E. (rlos) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 [DNL-5] Filed by Interested Party Richard J. Hanf (Fee Paid $0.00) (rlos) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Civil Minute Order Granting 83 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-3] (rlos) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?