Gina Flaharty
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-49912
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Gina Flaharty, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A. Haynes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Haynes +1 916 641 2288

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Estela O. Pino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Estela O. Pino +1 916 641 2288
No Logo J. Michael Hopper, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo Susan K. Smith, Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Travel Med, Inc. [DNL-5], 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Passport Health, Inc. [DNL-5], 94 Notice of Hearing, 95 Exhibit(s), 96 Declaration (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
    Declaration of J. Michael Hopper in support of 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Travel Med, Inc. [DNL-5], 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Passport Health, Inc. [DNL-5] (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
      Exhibit(s) to 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Travel Med, Inc. [DNL-5], 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Passport Health, Inc. [DNL-5] (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
        Notice of Hearing Re: 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Travel Med, Inc. [DNL-5], 93 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Passport Health, Inc. [DNL-5] to be held on 5/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
          Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with Passport Health, Inc. [DNL-5] Filed by Trustee J. Michael Hopper (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
            Certificate/Proof of Service of 88 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-7], 89 Notice of Hearing, 90 Exhibit(s), 91 Declaration (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
              Declaration of J. Michael Hopper in support of 88 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-7] (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                Exhibit(s) to 88 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-7] (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                  Notice of Hearing Re: 88 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-7] to be held on 5/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 88 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                    Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-7] Filed by Trustee J. Michael Hopper (kvas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 86 Declaration [PA-5] (swas) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                        Declaration of Gina Flaharty [PA-5] (swas) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                          Order Granting 82 Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-6] (jlns) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                            Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 82 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto, LLP as Accountant(s) [DNL-6], 83 Declaration (kvas) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Gene Gonzales in support of 82 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto, LLP as Accountant(s) [DNL-6] (kvas) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto, LLP as Accountant(s) [DNL-6] (kvas) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 76 Motion/Application to Employ Steven A. Lewis as Special Counsel [DNL-4], 77 Notice of Hearing, 78 Declaration, 79 Declaration, 80 Exhibit(s) (swas) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    Exhibit(s) to 76 Motion/Application to Employ Steven A. Lewis as Special Counsel [DNL-4] (swas) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                      Declaration of Steven A. Lewis in support of 76 Motion/Application to Employ Steven A. Lewis as Special Counsel [DNL-4] (swas) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        Declaration of J. Michael Hopper in support of 76 Motion/Application to Employ Steven A. Lewis as Special Counsel [DNL-4] (swas) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Hearing Re: 76 Motion/Application to Employ Steven A. Lewis as Special Counsel [DNL-4] to be held on 5/6/2013 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (swas) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                            Motion/Application to Employ Steven A. Lewis as Special Counsel [DNL-4] Filed by Trustee J. Michael Hopper (swas) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 466 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?