Office Depot, Inc. v. Zuccarini

Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:06-mc-80356
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Susan Illston
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Office Depot, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Woodrow De Vries +1 714 755 8170 +1 714 755 8290 mike.devries@lw.com

Represented by Michael Blacksburg, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Blacksburg +1 415 861 9900 +1 415 861 9908 Michael@Blacksburg-Law.com
v.
No Logo John Zuccarini, Defendant

Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN P. ZUCCARINI +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 zuccarinis@aol.com
Other Parties
No Logo Ds Holdings, LLC, Miscellaneous Party

Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry M. Burgoyne, III +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 hank@kronenbergerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 jeff@krinternetlaw.com
No Logo Michael Blacksburg, Receiver

Represented by Michael Blacksburg, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Blacksburg +1 415 861 9900 +1 415 861 9908 Michael@Blacksburg-Law.com
No Logo Network Solutions, LLC, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Represented by lefflerhyland.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Brooks Hyland +1 703 293 9300 thyland@lefflerhyland.com

Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Cutbirth , +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 robert.cutbirth@tuckerellis.com
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 187 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA as to 187 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned: ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Karl Stephen Kronenberger - Notice of Change of Firm Name and Roster of Attorneys (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/10/2011) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to 138 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA: No further filings shall be accepted in this closed case... as to 138 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 217 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Status Report
STATUS REPORT re Auction, Delivery of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds by Michael Blacksburg. (Blacksburg, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
LREF
Blank 216 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/14/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office Depot, Inc. (Blacksburg, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2011) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/14/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office Depot, Inc. (Blacksburg, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2011) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 213 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/14/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office Depot, Inc. (Blacksburg, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2011) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Order
ORDER denying defendant's requeste for emergency hearing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 210 Request (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Request
REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 208 Response ( Non Motion ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Response - non motion
RESPONSE to re 204 Reply to Opposition/Response by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER granting 193 Motion to Modify 9/7/10 Order ; denying 198 Motion to Stay (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2011: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2011: # 2 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 204 Reply to Opposition/Response, 205 Declaration in Support, (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 204 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 204 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Reply to Opposition/Response
REPLY (re 193 MOTION to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 201 Notice (Other), 202 Notice (Other) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/23/2011) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by DS Holdings, LLC of Filing in Related Case in S.D. Fla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/23/2011) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by DS Holdings, LLC of Filing in Related Case in E.D. Pa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/23/2011) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 198 MOTION to Stay, 199 Opposition/Response to Motion (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
OPPOSITION (re 193 MOTION to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Motion to Stay
EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Hearing filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Joinder
Joinder UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS JOINDER WITH CREDITORS MOTION TO MODIFY 09/07/2010 ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF DOMAIN NAMES AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS by United States of America. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 193 MOTION to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 193 MOTION to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Michael W. Blacksburg in Support of 193 MOTION to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) 193 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Modify 09/07/2010 Order Authorizing Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by DS Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 USCA Memorandum
USCA Memorandum as to 138 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 10-17792 for 187 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Appeal Fee Payment Request
Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 187 Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 187 Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 187 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 186 Order on Motion for Order of Sale, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by John Zuccarini. Appeal Record due by 1/7/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
LREF
Blank 186 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 Order on Motion for Order of Sale
ORDER ORDER RE: MOTIONS (Docs. 170, 173 175, 176, 185) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2010)
LREF
Blank 185 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Opposition/Response to Motion
RESPONSE in Support filed byJohn Zuccarini. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
LREF
Blank 184 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Order
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING AND REQUESTING A RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (tf, COURT STAFF). Served via email to: "John Z" (Entered: 09/27/2010)
LREF
Blank 183 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 138 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 181 Exhibits (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Exhibits
EXHIBIT filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 176 Second MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini, 178 MOTION to Shorten Time on Second Motion for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 178 MOTION to Shorten Time on Second Motion for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 178 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Motion to Shorten Time
MOTION to Shorten Time on Second Motion for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 176 Second MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 B)(Related document(s) 176 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 176 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Second MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Motion for Order of Sale
EMERGENCY MOTION TO DISALLOW AUCTION, TO CLARIFY ORDER, AND TO DENY DISTRIBUTION OF REVENUES filed by John Zuccarini. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 173 Objection (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Objection
OBJECTIONS to re 169 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 172 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR FINDINGS OF CONTEMPT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 170 MOTION to Strike 166 MOTION to Strike (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Motion to Strike
AMENDED MOTION to Strike 166 MOTION to Strike filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 169 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AMENDED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE SALE OF DOMAIN NAMES AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2010 04:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 166 MOTION to Strike (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Motion to Strike
MOTION to Strike filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 164 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 164 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Response - non motion
RESPONSE to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S JOINDER WITH CREDITOR DS HOLDINGS CONFLICT OF INTEREST RESPONSE AND MOTION TO AUTHORIZE SALE OF DOMAIN NAMES AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS by United States of America. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 161 Response ( Non Motion ), 162 Amended MOTION re 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 162 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Amended MOTION re 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Amended))(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
LREF
Blank 161 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Response - non motion
RESPONSE to re 154 Notice (Other) - DS Holdings's Response to Zuccarini's Contentions Re. Conflict of Interest by DS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 159 Reply Memorandum (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Reply Memorandum
Reply Memorandum re 149 MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 158 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Order
ORDER DIRECTING DS HOLDINGS AND UNITED STATES TO RESPOND TO ZUCCARINI'S CONTENTIONS RE: CONFLICT OF INTEREST (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
LREF
Blank 157 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 138 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 10-16383 for 138 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Clerks Notice
CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2010 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 154 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 ~Notice (other)
Supplement by John Zuccarini re 152 Opposition (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
LREF
Blank 153 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Exparte Application
Application for Contempt Charges filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
LREF
Blank 152 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
Opposition re 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 149 MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 149 MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Related document(s) 149 ) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 149 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Finding of Contempt Against Judgment Debtor John Zuccarini filed by DS Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
LREF
Blank 148 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Order on Motion to Shorten Time
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO AUTHORIZE SALE OF DOMAIN NAMES AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/04/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 146 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 8/3/2010) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 146 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Reply Memorandum
Reply Memorandum re 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 8/3/2010) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
LREF
Blank 145 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 143 MOTION to Shorten Time, 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
LREF
Blank 144 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of 143 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
LREF
Blank 143 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Motion to Shorten Time
MOTION to Shorten Time filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
LREF
Blank 142 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) 140 ) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
LREF
Blank 141 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Michael W. Blacksburg in Support of 140 MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) 140 ) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
LREF
Blank 140 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Authorize Sale of Domain Names and Distribution of Proceeds filed by DS Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 138 Amended Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Amended Notice of Appeal
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 137 Order on Motion by John Zuccarini. Appeal Record due by 8/20/2010. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 137 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO ORDER RETURN OF DOMAIN NAMES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2010: # 1 Envelope service) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 135 Reply to Opposition (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Reply to Opposition
Reply to Opposition re 100 MOTION Rule 60 (b) Relief from Judgment filed by John Zuccarini. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/15/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 123 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Reply to Opposition
Reply to Opposition re 100 MOTION Rule 60 (b) Relief from Judgment; and Request for Sanctions Against Attorney Karl Kronenberger filed byJohn Zuccarini. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 130 Memorandum in Opposition TO ZUCCARINI'S RULE 60(B) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ZUCCARINI'S MOTION TO ORDER REGISTRAR TO RETURN ALL.EU DOMAIN NAMES (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2010: # 1 Appendix) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition TO ZUCCARINI'S RULE 60(B) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ZUCCARINI'S MOTION TO ORDER REGISTRAR TO RETURN ALL.EU DOMAIN NAMES filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2010) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 129 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Order on Motion to Stay
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY THE COURT'S JUNE 15, 2010 RULING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2010: # 1 Errata) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 123 Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Appeal Fee Payment Request
Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 125 Brief, 123 Notice of Appeal, 124 MOTION to Stay re 119 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Stay re 119 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 125 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Brief
Brief re 124 MOTION to Stay re 119 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Stay re 119 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
LREF
Blank 124 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay Ruling re 119 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
LREF
Blank 123 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 119 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice by John Zuccarini. Appeal Record due by 7/22/2010. (Fee Not Paid)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
LREF
Blank 122 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Motion Hearing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 6/17/2010). (Court Reporter Yeomans.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2010) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order
ORDER granting pro hac (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Clerks Notice
certificate of service of order (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 119 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Order on Motion for TRO
ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY RELIEF AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE NETWORK SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION TO INTERVENE(Docket No. 97, 105)(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Network Solutions, LLC re 117 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046962.) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for attorney Timothy B. Hyland leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046962.) filed by Network Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Network Solutions, LLC re 113 Ex Parte Application (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 115 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Response - non motion
RESPONSE to 105 by Network Solutions, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
LREF
Blank 114 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Letter
Letter from John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Exparte Application
Ex Parte Application to Immediately Intervene and File a Complaint in Intervention filed by Network Solutions, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 111 Response ( Non Motion ) to Incorrect Statements Concerning DS Holdings' Opposition to Network Solutions' Motion to Intervene (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 111 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Response - non motion
RESPONSE to Incorrect Statements Concerning DS Holdings' Opposition to Network Solutions' Motion to Intervene by DS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 109 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/9/2010) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 109 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 105 Ex Parte Application for Emergency Temporary Injunction Freezing Domain Names and Request for Complete Accounting of Receiver's Actions - Notice of Hearing on Ex Parte Applciation set for June 15, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/9/2010) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
LREF
Blank 108 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing (TRO) Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2010 02:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 103 Memorandum in Opposition, 105 Ex Parte Application for Emergency Temporary Injunction Freezing Domain Names and Request for Complete Accounting of Receiver's Actions (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/3/2010) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Henry M. Burgoyne, III in Support of 105 Ex Parte Application for Emergency Temporary Injunction Freezing Domain Names and Request for Complete Accounting of Receiver's Actions filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/3/2010) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 105 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Exparte Application
Ex Parte Application for Emergency Temporary Injunction Freezing Domain Names and Request for Complete Accounting of Receiver's Actions filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/3/2010) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
LREF
Blank 104 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Declaration in Opposition
DECLARATION of Henry M. Burgoyne, III in Opposition to 97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) 97 ) (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/3/2010) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition re 97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 6/3/2010) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 98 Order, 99 Notice (Other), 101 MOTION to Order Domain Name Registrar DOMAINDISCOUNT24.net, 100 MOTION Rule 60 (b) Relief from Judgment (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Order Domain Name Registrar DOMAINDISCOUNT24.net to Return all.eu domain names to the control and ownership of Defendant John Zuccarini. filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 100 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Rule 60 (b) Relief from Judgment filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
LREF
Blank 99 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
Rule 60 (b) Relief from Judgment by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
LREF
Blank 98 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Order
ORDER ADDING NEW PARTY (USA AS DEFT) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Motion for TRO
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Zuccarini. (Deft shall file a response or contact the Court immediately) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Stipulation
STIPULATION To Add Party And [proposed] Order Thereon by United States of America. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 5/28/2010) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
LREF
Blank 95 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Order on Motion to Stay
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AUCTION OF DOMAIN NAMES AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER RECEIVER TO PROVIDE MONTHLY REVENUE REPORTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 93 Memorandum in Opposition, (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 5/7/2010) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 93 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition DS Holdings, LLC's 1) Opposition to Zuccarini's Motion to Stay Auction of Domain Names to Allow Filing of Writ of Certiorari in the Supreme Court; and 2) Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Order Receiver to Provide Monthly Revenue Reports to Defendant as Required by California Rule 3.1182 filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 5/7/2010) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Order
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate 34 to Counsel (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to 34 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 88 MOTION to Stay (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 88 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay Auction of Domain Names and allow filing of Writ of Certiorari in the Supreme Court filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 77 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 34 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 34 Notice of Appeal (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 USCA Scheduling Order
USCA Order as to 77 Notice of Appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction filed by John Zuccarini, 34 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008) Modified on 9/5/2008 (rcs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Transcript DesignationCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by John Zuccarini for proceedings held on 9/7/08 before Judge Susan Illston.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 08-16473 for 77 Notice of Appeal filed by John Zuccarini. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Motion Hearing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2008 before Illston (Date Filed: 6/24/2008). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2008) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Notice of Appeal Notification
Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 77 Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 72 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by John Zuccarini. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 7/18/2008. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008) (USCA Case No. 08-16473) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 75 Notice (Other) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 ~Notice (other)
Motion for Reconsideration by John Zuccarini (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 73 Reply to Opposition (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Reply to Opposition
Reply to 70 Opposition filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
LREF
Blank 71 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Motion to Intervene
MOTION to Intervene United States' Motion To Intervene And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support And Notice filed by United States of America. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 5/16/2008) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition re 68 MOTION for Reconsideration filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Burgoyne, Henry) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 68 MOTION for Reconsideration (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION for Reconsideration filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 66 Declaration in Support (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Declaration in Support
Declaration of John Zuccarini Relating to the Addition of Six Non.com/.net Domain Names Incorrectly transferred to the Receiver filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Response
Response re 61 Declaration in Opposition byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2008) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION RE: REVENUES FROM DOMAIN NAMES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 62 Reply to Opposition (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Reply to Opposition
Reply to Opposition re 55 MOTION to Order Receiver to give priority to the IRS in the Distribution of Revenues Obtained by Domain Names filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Declaration in Opposition
DECLARATION of Michael Blacksburg , The Post-Judgment Receiver, Relating To Zuccarini's Motion For Miscellaneous Relief filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/11/2008) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Order Receiver to give priority to the IRS in the Distribution of Revenues Obtained by Domain Names filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/22/2008) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2008 11:00 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/9/2008, Entered: 2/9/2008 Certificate of Record
Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 37 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA : (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2008) (Entered: 02/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/9/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 55 MOTION to Order Receiver to give priority to the IRS in the Distribution of Revenues Obtained by Domain Names (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008) (Entered: 02/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/9/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/7/07 before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Columbini.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008) (Entered: 02/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/9/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Order Receiver to give priority to the IRS in the Distribution of Revenues Obtained by Domain Names filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008) (Entered: 02/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 53 Notice (Other), 52 Transcript Designation (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by John Zuccarini re 52 Transcript Designation (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Transcript Designation
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by John Zuccarini for proceedings held on 9/7/07. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 1/2/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
USCA ORDER: denying 40 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 49 Response ( Non Motion ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2007) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Response - non motion
RESPONSE to re 44 Memorandum in Opposition by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2007) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S REQUEST TO LIFT PRESERVATION ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
ORDER GRANTING IN PART ZUCCARINI'S MOTION FOR STAY OF ORDER PENDING APPEAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 45 Declaration in Support, 44 Memorandum in Opposition (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/26/2007) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 44 Memorandum in Opposition filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 44 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/26/2007) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Stay re 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/26/2007) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re Opposition to Motion (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 40 MOTION to Stay re 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, 41 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay re 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by John Zuccarini. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 ~Motion to Alter Judgment
MOTION to Alter Judgment REVISED REQUEST for Further Instructions and Proposed Order filed by Michael Blacksburg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Receivor concerning revised Request for Instructions)(Blacksburg, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2007) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 ~Motion to Alter Judgment
MOTION to Alter Judgment RECEIVER'S Request for Further Instructions and Proposed Order filed by Michael Blacksburg. (Blacksburg, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2007) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 34 Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2007 (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 34 Notice of Appeal, 35 MOTION to Stay re 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay re 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver by John Zuccarini. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 34611010782. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 32 MOTION to Delay Placing of Domain Names in Recivership and/or Auction until Appeal decision is reached (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Delay Placing of Domain Names in Recivership and/or Auction until Appeal decision is reached filed by John Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Motion Hearing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2007 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/11/2007). (Court Reporter Columbini.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2007) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver
ORDER granting application for appointment of receiver. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Motion Hearing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2007 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/7/2007). (Court Reporter J. Columbini.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2007) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zuccarini re 25 Memorandum in Opposition, 26 Declaration in Support, 27 Exhibits (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Exhibits
EXHIBITS re 25 Memorandum in Opposition filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Declaration in Support
Declaration of John Zuccarini in Support of 25 Memorandum in Opposition (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION filed byJohn Zuccarini. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2007 09:00 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC re 19 Memorandum in Support, 20 Declaration in Support, 21 Declaration in Support, 22 Proposed Order, 18 MOTION to Appoint Receiver NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Appointment of Receiver (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Proposed Order
Proposed Order re 18 MOTION to Appoint Receiver NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Appointment of Receiver by DS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Michael W. Blacksburg in Support of 18 MOTION to Appoint Receiver NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Appointment of Receiver filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 18 MOTION to Appoint Receiver NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Appointment of Receiver filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION to Appoint Receiver NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Appointment of Receiver filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Motion to Appoint Receiver
MOTION to Appoint Receiver NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION for Appointment of Receiver filed by DS Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying ex parte application for turnover order. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/15/07. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2007) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of 14 Ex Parte Application filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 Ex Parte Application filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Exparte Application
Ex Parte Application for Turnover Order filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DS Holdings, LLC Proof of Service of Writ of Execution and Other Documents (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Letter
Letter from John Zuccarini re Documents relevant to case. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying addition of names to writ of execution, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/15/07. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Identity and [PROPOSED] Order by DS Holdings, LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/5/2007) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Susan Illston in re 5 Ex Parte Application (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
Request for Judicial Notice re 5 Ex Parte Application filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Karl Kronenberger in Support of 5 Ex Parte Application filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 Ex Parte Application filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Exparte Application
Ex Parte Application for Turnover Order filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 1/8/2007 Exparte Application
Ex Parte Application for Preservation Order and Discovery Order filed by DS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2006) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Writ Issued
Writ Issued as to John Zuccarini in the amount of $169,153.59 (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
AFFIDAVIT of Karl Kronenberger in Support of Writ of Execution filed byDS Holdings, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Registration of Foreign Judgment
REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment in the amount of $105,600.00 entered 12/14/00.. Filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2006) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 200 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?