Twin Peaks Software Inc. v. Red Hat, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-00911
Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 4:16 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Twin Peaks Software, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Banys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lu Gilbert +1 650 308 8505 +1 650 353 2202 jlg@banyspc.com
Space Richard Cheng-hong Lin +1 650 308 8505 +1 650 322 9103 rcl@banyspc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bunsow De Mory LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas S Mancuso +1 650 351 7248 +1 650 351 7253 nmancuso@bdiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lanier Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Banys +1 650 322 9100 +1 650 322 9103 cdb@lanierlawfirm.com
No Logo Gluster, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Kessel +1 617 542 5070 kessel@fr.com
Space Jerry T. Yen +1 650 839 5012 yen@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by petermartinlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelley Kay Mack +1 707 268 0445 +1 707 667 0318 shelley@petermartinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Vidal +1 650 858 6500 +1 650 858 6550 KVidal@winston.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Kessel +1 617 542 5070 kessel@fr.com
Space Jerry T. Yen +1 650 839 5012 yen@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by petermartinlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelley Kay Mack +1 707 268 0445 +1 707 667 0318 shelley@petermartinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Vidal +1 650 858 6500 +1 650 858 6550 KVidal@winston.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
ORDER 65 of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Motion to Dismiss
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss of Action Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(2) filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. Responses due by 7/25/2013. Replies due by 8/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1(Proposed) Order) (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 7/11/2013) Modified on 7/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 61 Joint Motion to Extend Stay. Case is Stayed Until 8/5/2013. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Notice - other
        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF JERRY T. YEN by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 6/21/2013) Modified on 7/16/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Proposed Order
          [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND STAY re 61 by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 6/20/2013) Modified on 7/16/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 61 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Motion To Stay
            Joint MOTION to Stay Motion to Extend Stay filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2013. Replies due by 7/12/2013. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
              LREF
              Blank 60 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of John P. Wong by Twin Peaks Software Inc.. (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Notice of change of address
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer C. Lu (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Change of Address by Christopher D. Banys (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Text modified on 3/6/2013 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 57 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                    Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 56 Motion to Stay (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                      Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. Responses due by 3/5/2013. Replies due by 3/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 2/19/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 55 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                        Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. Case settled. Settlement terms placed on the record. (Court Reporter FTR: (6:52 to 6:56; 7:24 to 7:28.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2013) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                          LREF
                          Blank 54 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER 53 Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply to Plaintiff Twin Peaks Software Inc.'s Motion to Retain Confidentiality of its Source Code and Continuance of Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
                            LREF
                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER 53 Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply to Plaintiff Twin Peaks Software Inc.'s Motion to Retain Confidentiality of its Source Code and Continuance of Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                              JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFF TWIN PEAKS SOFTWARE INC.S MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY OF ITS SOURCE CODE AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE; and (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/17/2013) Modified on 1/17/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 52 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 49 Stipulation (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                  Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 49 Stipulation (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam J. Kessel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER 44 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/2/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFF TWIN PEAKS SOFTWARE INC.'S MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY OF ITS SOURCE CODE filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/23/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION Motion to Retain Confidentiality of Source Code filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 12/26/2012. Replies due by 1/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Wong, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Lu, # 3 Exhibit A to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 4 Exhibit B to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 5 Exhibit C to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 6 Exhibit D to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 7 Exhibit E to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 8 Exhibit F to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 9 Exhibit G to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 10 Exhibit H to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 11 Exhibit I to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 12 Exhibit J to Decl. of Jennifer Lu, # 13 (Proposed) Order) (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/11/2012) Modified on 12/12/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 1/10/2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: 1/10/2013 Settlement Conference reset to 2/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 11/29/2012 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: 11/29/2012 Settlement Conference reset to 1/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Jerry T. Yen for Defendants and CounterClaim-Plaintiffs Red Hat, Inc and Gluster, Inc (Yen, Jerry) (Filed on 11/8/2012) Modified on 11/8/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                  (Proposed) Case Management And Scheduling Order by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 10/11/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2012 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/21/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/29/2013 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Grewal for an Early Settlement Conference.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2012) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/29/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. All lawyers and parties with complete authority to negotiate and consummate a settlement shall be in attendance. All parties are required to lodge a settlement conference statement in compliance with Magistrate Judge Grewal's Standing Order Re: Settlements found at www.cand.uscourts.gov or from the clerk's office. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Answer to First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement re 33 by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 9/27/2012) Modified on 9/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Nicholas Stephan Mancuso on Behalf of Twin Peaks Software, Inc. (Mancuso, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/26/2012) Modified on 9/27/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Jennifer C. Lu on Behalf of Twin Peaks Software, Inc. (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/26/2012) Modified on 9/27/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Amended Joint Case Management Statement filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 9/20/2012) Modified on 9/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order selecting Private ADR by Red Hat, Inc., Twin Peaks Software Inc. filed by Red Hat, Inc., Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendants Red Hat, Inc. and Gluster, Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement re 22 against All Plaintiffs by Red Hat, Inc., Gluster, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified on 8/31/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM re 22 by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Linkage added on 8/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Application for Admission of Attorney Adam J. Kessel for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7054168.) filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order Grating to Application for Pro Hac Vice of Kessel)(Kessel, Adam) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified on 8/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Amended Rule 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 8/6/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM re 22 against Twin Peaks Software Inc. by Red Hat, Inc., Gluster, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 25 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss re 20 filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) (re 20 filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                            First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement against Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. Filed byTwin Peaks Software Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Rule 7.1 Corporate Diclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Motion and Motion Dismiss Complaint for Patent Infringement for Failure to State a claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) re 1 filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 (Proposed) Order, # 3 Declaration ECF Technical Failure)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Text modified on 7/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Third Extension of Time to Respond Complaint re 1 filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of Shelley Kay Mack by Gluster, Inc. and Red Hat, Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Text modified on 5/24/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Second Extenson of Time for Defendants to Respond To and Including May 31, 2012 re 1 filed by Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/17/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/9/12. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a Untied States District Judge by Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Gluster, Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge . (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Katherine Kelly Lutton filed buy Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by 5/4/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc.. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. Red Hat, Inc. served on 3/12/2012, answer due 4/2/2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. Gluster, Inc. served on 3/5/2012, answer due 3/26/2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE Effective March 20, 2012, Magistrate Judge Laurel Beelers courtroom and chambers will be located in the Phillip Burton Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom C, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. On or after March 20, 2012, all filings for matters pending on Judge Beelers docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers copies of documents must be made at the San Francisco Courthouse. The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged. Please note that all of Judge Beelers case files will be moved to the San Francisco Courthouse, therefore all case numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with 4 to indicate the Oakland office (Example: 4:12-cv-12345-LB). As of March 20, 2012, all of Judge Beelers case files will begin with 3 to indicate the San Francisco office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 3:12-cv-12345-LB). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 12-12345 (YY-NNNNN). For information on the San Francisco Courthouses accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on Court Information on the right hand side of our main page, then select the San Francisco link under Address and Jurisdiction. The main telephone number for the San Francisco Division is 415-522-2000. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Gluster, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Red Hat, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Gluster, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611070914). Filed by Twin Peaks Software Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Remarks: Case stayed for 120 days pursuant re 57 Order granting Motion to Stay for 120 days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for Settlement (gmS, ) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 380 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?