Gray et al v. Golden Gate National Recreational Area et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00722-EDL
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 7, 2017 at 2:43 AM EST (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ann Sieck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves & all others similarly situated Christine Chuang , +1 510 665 8644 cchuang@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves & all others similarly situated Ronald Lee Elsberry +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 relsberry@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves & all others similarly situated Elizabeth Rauh Leonard +1 510 665 8644 Eleonard@dralegal.org
Space Laurence Wayne Paradis +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 larryp@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves & all others similarly situated Stuart John Seaborn +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 sseaborn@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves & all others similarly situated Sidney M. Wolinsky +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 general@dralegal.org
No Logo California Council of the Blind, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated Christine Chuang , +1 510 665 8644 cchuang@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated Ronald Lee Elsberry +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 relsberry@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated Elizabeth Rauh Leonard +1 510 665 8644 Eleonard@dralegal.org
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated Stuart John Seaborn +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 sseaborn@dralegal.org
No Logo Lori Gray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Chuang , +1 510 665 8644 cchuang@dralegal.org
Space Ronald Lee Elsberry +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 relsberry@dralegal.org
Space Elizabeth Rauh Leonard +1 510 665 8644 Eleonard@dralegal.org
Space Laurence Wayne Paradis +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 larryp@dralegal.org
Space Stuart John Seaborn +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 sseaborn@dralegal.org
Space Sidney M. Wolinsky +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 general@dralegal.org
No Logo Marc Sutton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Chuang , +1 510 665 8644 cchuang@dralegal.org
Space Ronald Lee Elsberry +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 relsberry@dralegal.org
Space Elizabeth Rauh Leonard +1 510 665 8644 Eleonard@dralegal.org
Space Stuart John Seaborn +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 sseaborn@dralegal.org
No Logo Peter Mendoza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Chuang , +1 510 665 8644 cchuang@dralegal.org
Space Ronald Lee Elsberry +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 relsberry@dralegal.org
Space Elizabeth Rauh Leonard +1 510 665 8644 Eleonard@dralegal.org
Space Laurence Wayne Paradis +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 larryp@dralegal.org
Space Stuart John Seaborn +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8716 sseaborn@dralegal.org
Space Sidney M. Wolinsky +1 510 665 8644 +1 510 665 8511 general@dralegal.org
v.
No Logo BRIAN O'NEILL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, in his official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Abraham A. Simmons +1 415 436 7264 +1 415 436 6748 abraham.simmons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, in his official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Leah Jo Bressack +1 301 344 4236 +1 301 344 4516 leah.bressack@usdoj.gov
General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, in his official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, in his official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Jennifer Beth Kaplan +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 jennifer.b.kaplan@usdoj.gov
General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, in his official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Renee Phillips +1 202 616 0679 +1 202 616 8470 heather.phillips@usdoj.gov
General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, in his official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
No Logo Frank Dean, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Acting General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreational Area Leah Jo Bressack +1 301 344 4236 +1 301 344 4516 leah.bressack@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreational Area Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreational Area Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreational Area Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreational Area Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting General Superintendent of Golden Gate National Recreational Area Joshua Ilan Wilkenfeld +1 202 305 7920 +1 202 616 8470 joshua.i.wilkenfeld@usdoj.gov
No Logo Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abraham A. Simmons +1 415 436 7264 +1 415 436 6748 abraham.simmons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leah Jo Bressack +1 301 344 4236 +1 301 344 4516 leah.bressack@usdoj.gov
Space Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
Space Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
Space Jennifer Beth Kaplan +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 jennifer.b.kaplan@usdoj.gov
Space Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Renee Phillips +1 202 616 0679 +1 202 616 8470 heather.phillips@usdoj.gov
Space Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Ilan Wilkenfeld +1 202 305 7920 +1 202 616 8470 joshua.i.wilkenfeld@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jon Jarvis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Director of the National Park Service Leah Jo Bressack +1 301 344 4236 +1 301 344 4516 leah.bressack@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Director of the National Park Service Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Director of the National Park Service Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Director of the National Park Service Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Director of the National Park Service Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Director of the National Park Service Joshua Ilan Wilkenfeld +1 202 305 7920 +1 202 616 8470 joshua.i.wilkenfeld@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mary Bomar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Director of the National Park Service, in her official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Abraham A. Simmons +1 415 436 7264 +1 415 436 6748 abraham.simmons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Director of the National Park Service, in her official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Leah Jo Bressack +1 301 344 4236 +1 301 344 4516 leah.bressack@usdoj.gov
Director of the National Park Service, in her official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
Director of the National Park Service, in her official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Jennifer Beth Kaplan +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 jennifer.b.kaplan@usdoj.gov
Director of the National Park Service, in her official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Renee Phillips +1 202 616 0679 +1 202 616 8470 heather.phillips@usdoj.gov
Director of the National Park Service, in her official capacity
TERMINATED: 11/29/2011 Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
No Logo National Park Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abraham A. Simmons +1 415 436 7264 +1 415 436 6748 abraham.simmons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leah Jo Bressack +1 301 344 4236 +1 301 344 4516 leah.bressack@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
Space Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
Space Jennifer Beth Kaplan +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 jennifer.b.kaplan@usdoj.gov
Space Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Renee Phillips +1 202 616 0679 +1 202 616 8470 heather.phillips@usdoj.gov
Space Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Ilan Wilkenfeld +1 202 305 7920 +1 202 616 8470 joshua.i.wilkenfeld@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 1/31/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing, REFSET-EMC, STAYED
  Entries (230) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 223 Motion to Stay (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/4/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Purposes of Settlement filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/11/2014. Replies due by 3/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings for Purposes of Settlement)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER Cancelling Deadline. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on September 18, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/19/2013). Tentative settlement reached. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute Entry: Telephone Conference re: settlement held on September 12, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/12/2013). The September 18, 2013 settlement conference remains on calendar. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on August 27, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/28/2013). Further telephone conference set for September 12, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2013) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 8/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/14/2013). Further telephonic settlement conference set for 8/27/2013 at 9:00 AM. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2013) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on July 24, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/2/2013). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2013) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on July 8, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 7/9/2013). Further telephonic settlement conference set for July 24, 2013 at 12:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2013) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 214 Motion to Continue Trial and Other Pending Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Joint MOTION to Continue Pending Deadlines and Joint Status Update filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on June 24, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 6/25/2013). Further Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2013) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Update by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Kennedy, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 211 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 210 Letter requesting to advance the time of settlement conference filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, and National Park Service. Settlement Conference reset for 6/24/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/29/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
                                LREF
                                Blank 211 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 210 Letter requesting to advance the time of settlement conference filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, and National Park Service. Settlement Conference reset for 6/24/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/29/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Letter from Counsel Regarding June 24, 2013 Settlement Conference . (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on May 21, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 5/22/2013). A further settlement conference is scheduled for June 24, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2013) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Update by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/17/2013) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on May 8, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 5/9/2013). Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Further Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Further Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/18/2013.Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2013 02:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Bench Trial set for 10/28/2013 through 11/18/2013 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/23/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) Modified on 4/29/2013 (knm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ***See Attached Amended Minute Order for Correct Trial Date*** Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/17/2013 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 4/17/2013). (Recording #10:09- 10:29.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2013: # 1 Amended Minute Order) (knm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2013 (knm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2013 (knm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/9/2013) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte denying 197 Motion for Reconsideration (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/26/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Prober (Change of Lead Counsel) and Notice of Withdrawal (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/21/2013) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY (re 197 MOTION for Reconsideration re 192 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (Partial Reconsideration) ) filed byFrank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Grauman, Jesse) (Filed on 3/18/2013) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RESPONSE (re 197 MOTION for Reconsideration re 192 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (Partial Reconsideration) ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER OF FEBRUARY 20, 2013 filed byCalifornia Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/14/2013) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 195 JOINT STIPULATION RE: SETTING ADDITIONAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE SCOTT CORLEY FOR MEDIATION filed by Lori Gray, Marc Sutton, Ann Sieck, California Co uncil of the Blind, Peter Mendoza. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 195 JOINT STIPULATION RE: SETTING ADDITIONAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE SCOTT CORLEY FOR MEDIATION filed by Lori Gray, Marc Sutton, Ann Sieck, California Council of the Blind, Peter Mendoza. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re 192 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (Partial Reconsideration) filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse) (Filed on 3/8/2013) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 194 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order of February 20, 2013.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SETTING ADDITIONAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MEDIATION filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/7/2013) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order of February 20, 2013 filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order of February 20, 2013, # 2 Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse) (Filed on 3/6/2013) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RONALD ELSBERRY (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/25/2013) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 183 Motion for Summary Judgment (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 1/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on December 17, 2012, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2013. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/26/2013) (Entered: 01/26/2013)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation regarding park areas visited by Plaintiffs filed by California Council of the Blind, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Lori Gray, Jon Jarvis, Peter Mendoza, National Park Service, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2013) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2012 before Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 12/18/2012) re 183 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jon Jarvis, Brian O'Neill, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service, Frank Dean, Mary Bomar, 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lori Gray, Marc Sutton, Ann Sieck, California Council of the Blind, Peter Mendoza. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2012) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY (re 183 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byMary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Faw (Supplemental), # 2 Declaration of Brian Kennedy (Supplemental), # 3 Exhibit A - Defendants' Initial Disclosures, # 4 Exhibit B - Defendants' Supplemental Disclosures, # 5 Exhibit C - Lonberg v. City of Riverside, # 6 Exhibit D - Blackseth Deposition Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit E - Gray Deposition Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit F - Margen Deposition Excerpts, # 9 Exhibit G - Sheaffer Deposition Excerpts)(Kennedy, Brian) (Filed on 11/16/2012) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to re 183 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Reply to re 171 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment -REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 183 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Supplemental DECLARATION of Peter Margen in Opposition to re 183 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to re 171 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment -SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER MARGEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Related document(s) 183 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Supplemental DECLARATION of Ronald Elsberry in Opposition to re 183 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to re 171 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment -SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RONALD ELSBERRY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY FOR THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 183 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE to (re 183 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to re 171 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment) -PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 11/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Blackseth, # 3 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapters 1.0 & 2.0 - Exhibit A to Blackseth Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 3.0 - Exhibit B to Blackseth Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.0 - Exhibit C to Blackseth Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.1 - Exhibit D to Blackseth Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.2 - Exhibit E to Blackseth Declaration - Exhibit E to Blackseth Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.3 - Exhibit F to Blackseth Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.4 - Exhibit G to Blackseth Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.5 - Exhibit H to Blackseth Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.6 - Exhibit I to Blackseth Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.7 - Exhibit J to Blackseth Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.8 - Exhibit K to Blackseth Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.9 - Exhibit L to Blackseth Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.10 - Exhibit M to Blackseth Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Blackseth Report Chapter 4.11 - Exhibit N to Blackseth Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Blackseth Report Appendix Part 1 - Exhibit O to Blackseth Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Blackseth Report Appendix Part 2 - Exhibit P to Blackseth Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Blackseth Report Appendix Part 3 - Exhibit Q to Blackseth Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Blackseth Report Appendix Part 4 - Exhibit R to Blackseth Declaration, # 21 Declaration Carter Part 1 of 5, # 22 Exhibit Carter Part 2 of 5, # 23 Exhibit Carter Part 3 of 5, # 24 Exhibit Carter Part 4 of 5, # 25 Exhibit Carter Part 5 of 5, # 26 Declaration Cash, # 27 Declaration Cody, # 28 Declaration De La O, # 29 Declaration Dean, # 30 Declaration Faw, # 31 Declaration Gee, # 32 Declaration Handwerger, # 33 Declaration Hartley Part 1 of 2, # 34 Declaration Hartley Part 2 of 2, # 35 Declaration Lucas, # 36 Declaration Mannel, # 37 Declaration Neubacher, # 38 Declaration Paciello Declaration & Report, # 39 Declaration Roth, # 40 Declaration Sheaffer, # 41 Declaration Kennedy, # 42 Exhibit Gray Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit A to Kennedy Declaration, # 43 Exhibit Mendoza Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit B to Kennedy Declaration, # 44 Exhibit Sieck Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit C to Kennedy Declaration, # 45 Exhibit Sutton Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit D to Kennedy Declaration, # 46 Exhibit Lozano Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit E to Kennedy Declaration, # 47 Exhibit Donovan Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit F to Kennedy Declaration, # 48 Exhibit York Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit G to Kennedy Declaration, # 49 Exhibit Belser Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit H to Kennedy Declaration, # 50 Exhibit Margen Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit I to Kennedy Declaration, # 51 Exhibit Roth Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit J to Kennedy Declaration, # 52 Exhibit Washington Post Article - Exhibit K to Kennedy Declaration, # 53 Exhibit Redd v. O'Neill - Exhibit L to Kennedy Declaration, # 54 Exhibit Sheaffer Deposition Excerpts - Exhibit M to Kennedy Declaration)(Kennedy, Brian) (Filed on 9/21/2012) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G Kennedy (Change of Lead Counsel) (Kennedy, Brian) (Filed on 9/21/2012) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR REMAINING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFS re 180 (AS MODIFIED): Cross Motions due by 9/21/2012. Responses to Pltf's MSJ due by 9/21/2012. Replies due to Pltf's MSJ by 10/19/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/6/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                STIPULATION and REQUEST to Extend Deadlines for Remaining Summary Judgment Briefs; [Proposed] Order filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Declaration of Jesse Z. Grauman)(Grauman, Jesse) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service of Intention to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/28/2012) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John Kenneth Theis (Theis, John) (Filed on 8/23/2012) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      [Proposed] Order Granting re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPENDIX OF PLAINTIFFS AND CLASS MEMBERS DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF re 171 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Declaration of Dmitri Belser in Support of re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Declaration of Peter Margen in Support of re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Declaration of Ronald Elsberry in Support of re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 9/11/2012. Replies due by 10/9/2012. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Park Areas Named Plaintiffs Visited or Were Specifically Deterred from Visiting filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton, Golden Gate National Recreation Area. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Defendants'ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint) filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck & Marc Sutton of NOTICE OF INTENTION TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/2/2012) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part re 162 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Ronald Elsberry in Opposition to 162 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byCalifornia Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 162 ) (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 162 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exceed the Page Limitations Under the Local Rules filed byCalifornia Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 156 Declaration in Opposition, To Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time To Answer Fourth Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/20/2012 granting re 159 Administrative Motion Removing Unredacted Exhibits from Docket. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exceed The Page Limitations Provided Under The Local Civil Rules filed by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bressack, Leah) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      [Proposed] Order Removing Incorrectly Filed Document re 159 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER REMOVING UNREDACTED EXHIBITS FROM DOCKET filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ronald Elsberry in Support of re 159 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER REMOVING UNREDACTED EXHIBITS FROM DOCKET filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 159 ) (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER REMOVING UNREDACTED EXHIBITS FROM DOCKET filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part re 154 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer to re 117 Fourth Amended Complaint. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of (re 154 MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Answer to re 117 Fourth Amended Complaint) filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Bonnie J. Prober)(Grauman, Jesse) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Ronald Elsberry in Support of re 155 Opposition/Response to Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. *** (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** (Related document(s) 155 ) (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to (re 154 MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Answer to re 117 Fourth Amended Complaint) -Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint- filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 7/10/2012) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Answer to re 117 Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Zvi Grauman (Grauman, Jesse) (Filed on 7/5/2012) . (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 140 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/3/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING SCOPE OF STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/21/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING SCOPE OF STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/21/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Bressack (Bressack, Leah) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS filed by Lori Gray, et al. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 6/19/2012) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Plaintiffs in Response to Defendants Letter Regarding Status of Stipulations Requested by the Court. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 6/15/2012) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Defendants Regarding Status of Stipulations. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 146 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-22-12, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2012. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 5/22/2012) re 140 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Jon Jarvis, Brian O'Neill, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service, Frank Dean, Mary Bomar. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2012) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to 140 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint (Reason: Instructed to do so by clerk) filed byFrank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. Responses due by 4/20/2012. Replies due by 4/27/2012. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of (re 140 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) filed byMary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to (re 140 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) -PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT- filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/20/2012) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting re 139 Joint Stipulation & Request to Exclude Specified GGNRA and Park Partner Areas, Facilities, and Programs from Class Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte 4/10/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2012 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 4/20/2012. Replies due by 4/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Dismissal Under Rule 12(b)(1), # 2 Proposed Order for Dismissal Under Rule 12(b)(6))(Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXCLUDE SPECIFIED GGNRA AND PARK PARTNER AREAS, FACILITIES, AND PROGRAMS FROM CLASS CLAIMS; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by California Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR COURT TRIAL: Discovery due by 4/30/2012. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/14/2012. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Opposition and Cross Motions due by 9/11/2012. Reply to the Motion for Summary Judgment and the Opposition to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/9/2012. Replies to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/5/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER LIFTING STAY BY JUDGE ELIZABETH D LAPORTE- 3/29/2012 (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/29/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 3/29/2012). (Recording #10:06- 10:29.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            FURTHER UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill, Lori Gray. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/19/2012) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re 133 - [as modified]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/28/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Stipulation and Request to Continue Case Management Conference, [Proposed] Order filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due 3/12/2012 & Further Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Letter Requesting Case Management Conference. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 115 Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on December 16, 2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Defendants in Support of Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/21/2011) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2011 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 12/16/2011). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2011) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number 11-80287 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 115 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal ) filed byMary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/8/2011) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 115 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL filed byCalifornia Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Lee Elsberry NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 117 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 117 Amended Complaint, ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byCalifornia Council of the Blind, Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Marc Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald Elsberry)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 116 Stipulation to Shorten Time for Motion: 115 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by Jon Jarvis, Brian O'Neill, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service, Frank Dean, Mary Bomar. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/5/2011. Replies due by 12/8/2011. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/30/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 117 Amended Complaint, filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonnie J. Prober, # 2 Proposed Order)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/30/2011) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS: SECTION 504 OF THE REHABILITATION ACT OF 1973 against Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. Filed byAnn Sieck, Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re 115 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonnie J. Prober in Support of Joint Stipulation)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011, Terminated: 12/29/2011 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/13/2011. Replies due by 12/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G Kennedy (Kennedy, Brian) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Regarding 105 Motion for Reconsideration; Requiring Amended Complaint. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-25-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, CSR, RPR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2012. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion for Reconsideration Hearing held on 10/25/2011 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 10/25/2011). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of August 30, 2011 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/11/2011) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement of Recent Decision filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/11/2011) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION/RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 30, 2011 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/3/2011) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 106 Uncontested Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011, Terminated: 9/28/2011 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Uncontested MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Bonnie J. Prober in Support of Motion to Continue Hearing, #(2) Proposed Order)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/27/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Opening Brief in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration of August 30, 2011 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re 102 Statement, re 104 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, re 101 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Laporte Requiring Supplemental Opening Brief on Motion for Reconsideration; Amending Briefing and Hearing Schedule; Finding as moot 103 Motion for Extension of Time to File (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs and for Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonnie J. Prober, # 2 Proposed Order)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/20/2011 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Recent Decision by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Ellis v. Costco Wholesale Corporation)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/20/2011) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING re 100 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011, Terminated: 9/16/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion & Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of August 30, 2011 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Lodged Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/12/2011) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: 8/30/2011 Order on Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 75 Motion for Class Certification. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-5-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/14/2011) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Brief in Opposition to re 75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Brief Regarding Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes in Support of re 75 Motion for Class Certification filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: 6/22/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING Following Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes Decision. The Supplemental briefs shall be filed by 7/6/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/22/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Staying Expert Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/11/2011. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from all parties, dated 4/8/2011. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Gordon Cooper (Cooper, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/6/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/5/2011 before Elizabeth Laporte (Date Filed: 4/5/2011) re 75 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Lori Gray, Ann Sieck, Peter Mendoza. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint letter within one week. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2011) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE rescheduling pretrial conference and trial dates. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 3/31/2011 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE rescheduling pretrial and trial dates. Pretrial Conference reset for 3/27/2012 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Bench Trial rescheduled for 4/23/2012 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/16/2011. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY Declaration of Ronald Elsberry in Support of re 86 Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of re 75 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/15/2011) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of re 75 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/15/2011) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION and REQUEST to Extend Non-Expert Discovery Deadline; [Proposed] Order filed by Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. (Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/15/2011) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Exhibits in Support of re 83 Opposition/Response to re 75 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Wilkenfeld, Joshua) (Filed on 3/1/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re 75 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF -DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION- filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua) (Filed on 3/1/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [Proposed] Order Granting re 75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ronald Elsberry in Support of re 75 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D Part 1, # 5 Exhibit D Part 2, # 6 Exhibit E Part 1, # 7 Exhibit E Part 2, # 8 Exhibit E Part 3, # 9 Exhibit E Part 4, # 10 Exhibit E Part 5, # 11 Exhibit E Part 6, # 12 Exhibit E Part 7, # 13 Exhibit E Part 8, # 14 Exhibit E Part 9, # 15 Exhibit E Part 10, # 16 Exhibit E Part 11, # 17 Exhibit E Part 12, # 18 Exhibit E Part 13, # 19 Exhibit E Part 14, # 20 Exhibit F, # 21 Exhibit G, # 22 Exhibit H Part 1, # 23 Exhibit H Part 2)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re 75 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of Plaintiffs & Class Members Declarations in Support of re 75 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Dmitri Belser in Support of re 75 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Peter Margen in Support of re 75 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Laurence W. Paradis in Support of re 75 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011, Terminated: 8/30/2011 Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support Thereof filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME re 73 Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time & [Proposed] Order filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Jon Jarvis, National Park Service. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua) (Filed on 2/1/2011) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING DUE DATE FOR Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, Setting Briefing Schedule and New Hearing Date re 70 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/10/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rauh Leonard (Leonard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/11/2011) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DUE DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND NEW HEARING DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service, Mary Bomar, Frank Dean, Jon Jarvis. (Elsberry, Ronald) (Filed on 1/7/2011) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck Regarding Transcript Reimbursement Fund (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/7/2010 before Elizabeth D. Laporte.(FTR 10:23am -10:34am) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2010) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Elsberry. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/7/2010) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Frank Dean, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Lori Gray, Jon Jarvis, Peter Mendoza, National Park Service, Ann Sieck. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua) (Filed on 11/30/2010) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Wilkenfeld (Wilkenfeld, Joshua) (Filed on 11/30/2010) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights against Mary Bomar, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service, Brian O'Neill. Filed by Lori Gray, Ann Sieck, Peter Mendoza. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 9/28/2010) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER granting re 62 Request for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/24/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Request for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; (Proposed) Order Submitted by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, National Park Service, Frank Dean, Jo Jar Vis. (Attachments: #(1) Attachment)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 9/23/2010) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Beth Kaplan (Kaplan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/8/2010) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR COURT TRIAL: Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2010 10:00 AM. Updated Case Management Conference Statement due 12/1/2010. All non-expert discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2011. All expert discovery shall be completed by 6/30/2011. Last day to hear dispostive motions 9/6/2011 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM. Bench Trial set for 1/9/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/30/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/13/2010) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Order Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/6/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Status Report, Stipulation & Request for Order Lifting Stay of Litigation & Setting Case Management Conference filed by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service & Mary Bomar. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/5/2010) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Court conducted individual conference calls with each party's counsel. Case did not settle. No further settlement discussions scheduled, unless requested by parties. (Date Filed: 8/2/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2010) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conference Call Re Status of Settlement Discussions. Conference call is scheduled for 8/2/2010 01:00 PM (Pacific time). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held 6/3/2010. Case did not settle. Conference call scheduled for 8/2/2010 01:00 PM. Further Settlement Conference scheduled 8/9/2010 09:30 AM; Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 6/4/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2010) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/2010 re 52 Joint Stipulation & Request to Continue Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference previously set for 6/1/2010 01:30 PM has been continued to 6/3/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Request to Continue Settlement Conference; [Proposed] Order by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/13/2010) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Regarding Joint Status Report & Stipulation Re: Continued Stay of Litigation. Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/17/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT and Stipulation Re: Continued Stay of Litigation, and [Proposed] Order Submitted by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck, Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service & Mary Bomar. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/15/2010) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Prober on behalf of Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Prober, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/15/2010) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 6/1/2010 01:30 PM The Court shall initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Telephonic Further Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, scheduled for 6/1/2010 01:30 PM; Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 1/28/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2010) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 1/28/2010 09:30 AM. The Court shall initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference - not held on 1/21/2010 (Defense counsel unable to participate because of unexpected emergency). Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, continued to January 28, 2010, at 9:30 a.m.; Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 1/21/2010). (Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2010) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 1/21/2010 02:30 PM. The Court shall initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Telephonic Further Settlement Conference held 10/23/2009. Case did not settle. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, scheduled for 1/21/2010 02:30 PM; Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 10/26/2009). (Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2009) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUED STAY OF LITIGATION re 41 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/31/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulation Re: Continued Stay of Litigation; [Proposed] Order by Lori Gray, Peter Mendoza, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2009) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 10/23/2009 02:30 PM. The Court shall initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Telephonic Further Settlement Conference held 7/28/2009. Case did not settle. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, scheduled for 10/23/2009 02:30 PM; Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 7/28/2009). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2009) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE - Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2009 01:30 PM has been changed to 7/28/2009 01:30 PM. The Court shall initiate the conference call. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2009) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 7/14/2009 01:30 PM. The Court shall initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held telephonically 2/3/2009. Case did not settle. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, scheduled for 7/14/2009 01:30 PM; Court to issue Scheduling Order. (Date Filed: 2/9/2009). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE - Telephonic Further Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2009 01:30 PM has been changed to 2/3/2009 01:00 PM. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 32 Status Report filed by Lori Gray, Ann Sieck, Peter Mendoza. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/6/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 32 Status Report Memorandum of Understanding filed byPeter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Wolinsky, Sidney) (Filed on 1/5/2009) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulation RE: Continued Stay of Litigation; [Proposed] Order by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Wolinsky, Sidney) (Filed on 1/5/2009) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Patrick Cartier on behalf of Defendants. (Cartier, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/5/2009) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held 8/26/2008. Case did not settle. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, scheduled February 3, 2009 at 1:30 PM (Pacific Time); Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 8/26/2008). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 2/3/2009 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/9/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION RE: ADJOURNMENT of Case Management Conference and ORDER STAYING CASE. Parties to provide a joint status report no later than 1/05/2009. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/12/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER [25] Excusing Attendance of Plaintiff Peter Mendoza from August 26, 2008 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service, Mary Bomar.. (Phillips, Heather) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Excusing Peter Mendoza from August 26 Settlement Conference by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Larry Paradis RE: Request to Excuse Peter Mendoza from the August 26 Settlement Conference. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION RE: Adjournment of Case Management Conference and Stay of Litigation; [Proposed] Order by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGolden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service, Mary Bomar. (Phillips, Heather) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/26/2008 01:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle. Further Settlement Conference scheduled for 9/11/2008 09:30 AM; Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 7/18/2008). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference to 8/26/2008 10:00 AM re [18]. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/9/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION RE: Adjournment of Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Renee Phillips (Phillips, Heather) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for SettlCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/28/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights: Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 against all defendants. Filed byPeter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER re [9] Stipulation, filed by Lori Gray, Ann Sieck, Peter Mendoza; continuing case management conference for August 5, 2008 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/24/08. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION RE: Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Date for Filing Responsive Pleading and Request for Referral to Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge; [Proposed] Order by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck Plaintiffs' Certificate of Service on Defendants RE: Standing Order and Case Schedule (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [AMENDED] ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 5/6/2008 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2008 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck.. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. Service waived by Golden Gate National Recreational Area waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; Brian O'Neill waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; National Park Service waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; Mary Bomar waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008. Waiver of Service of Summons (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent Due by: 3/31/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights: Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 against Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service, Mary Bomar. Filed byPeter Mendoza, Lori Gray, Ann Sieck. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 SCHEDULING ORDER-ADACourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under Americans with Disabilities Act. (Attachments: #(1) EDL Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2008: # (2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights: Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 - [Summonsn Issued] against Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service & Mary Bomar, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611015211]. Filed by Plaintiffs Lori Gray & Ann Sieck. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Golden Gate National Recreational Area, Brian O'Neill, National Park Service & Mary Bomar. (tn, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?