USA v. Huynh et al
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-02288
District Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony Nguyen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Bernard G Skomal +1 619 230 6500 +1 619 230 6505 BGSkomal@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz:Supervised Release Hearing as to Tony Nguyen held on 2/4/2014. Granting in part and denying in part 510 Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release as to Tony Nguyen (2); The defendant's term of Supervised Release is erduced to Two (2) Years. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney James Melendres, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jeremy Warren, CJA). (no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Tony Nguyen. Supervised Release Hearing re Early Termination set for 2/4/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 1/26/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release (unopposed by the government) by Tony Nguyen. (Warren, Jeremy)Attorney Jeremy D Warren added to party Tony Nguyen(pty:dft)(rlu). (Entered: 01/26/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Tony Nguyen (2), Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for a term of 51 Months. Supervised release 3 years. Assessment $100.00 payable at a rate of $25.00 per quarter through the inmate financial responsibility program. No fine.. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (mjj) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Sentence With PSR Hearing held on 2/26/2010 for Tony Nguyen (2), Count(s) 1: Custody of BOP for a term of 51 Months. Supervised release 3 years. Assessment $100.00 payable at a rate of $25.00 per quarter through the inmate financial responsibility program. No fine. Right of appeal - waived. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cessena). (Plaintiff Attorney AUSA, Edward Weiner). (Defendant Attorney Bernard Skomal). (tml) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
            SENTENCING SUMMARY CHART by Tony Nguyen (Skomal, Bernard)(asw). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Tony Nguyen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Skomal, Bernard) (tkl). (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER ACCEPTING GUILTY PLEA as to Tony Nguyen. Magistrate Judge's 346 Findings and Recommendation are adopted. Court accepts Defendant's Plea of Guilty to Count one of the Indictment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/5/10. (vet) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Excludable Minute Order as to Tony Nguyen. Excludable(s) started as to Tony Nguyen: XK - Proposed Plea Agreement and XT - Interest of Justice 12/10/09-2/26/10. Excludable(s) stopped: XE - Pretrial motions 1/8/09-12/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/10/09. (vet) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Tony Nguyen : Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/10/09. (vet) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Tony Nguyen. (vet) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CONSENT TO PLEA before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes by Tony Nguyen. (vet) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Change of Plea Hearing as to Tony Nguyen held on 12/10/2009. Plea agreement submitted by defendant. Plea Tendered by Tony Nguyen to Guilty on count 1 of the Indictment. PSR Ordered. All pending hearing dates vacated as to Tony Nguyen. Sentence With PSR set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Any objections to the courts findings are due by 12/24/2009. (Tape #NLS09-9:48 to 10:23) (Plaintiff Attorney Edward C. Weiner, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney 2 Bernard G. Skomal, CJA.). (gep) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/5/09 in case as to Tony Nguyen. (vet) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Tony Nguyen. Change of Plea Hearing set for 12/10/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. (gep) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Granting 320 Motion to Continue Motion Hearing as to Tony Nguyen (2). Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/13/09 is continued to 12/18/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/12/09.(vet) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION to Continue by Tony Nguyen. (Skomal, Bernard) (pdc). (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Tony Nguyen, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen re 297 MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions, 295 MOTION for Discovery, 296 MOTION for Attorney Voir Dire, 292 MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Weiner, Edward) (vet). (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER OF DETENTION On Defendant's Waiver of Bail Pending Trial as to Tony Nguyen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/19/09. (vet) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tony Nguyen. (vet) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes:Detention Hearing as to Tony Nguyen held on 10/8/2009. Financial affidavit submitted. Court removes the provisional status of defense counsel. USA oral motion for detention. Motion found as moot as to Defendant Tony Nguyen. Defendant stipulates to detention without prejudice. Court orders the defendant detained without prejudice during the pendency of the proceedings. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA by close of business on 10/9/2009. (Tape #NLS09-15:25-15:46.)(Plaintiff Attorney Edward Weiner AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Bernard Skomal CJA). (jmy) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                            Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Tony Nguyen. (aje) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Arraignment on Indictment as to Tony Nguyen (2) Count 1 held on 10/6/2009. Not Guilty plea entered. Attorney Bernard G Skomal(n/a) provisionally appointed for Tony Nguyen. Bond set as to Tony Nguyen (2) No Bail.Financial Affidavit due by 10/20/09. Government Oral MOtion to Detain (Flight). ( Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/13/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Detention Hearing set for 10/8/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Status Hearing re: Counsel set for 10/20/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes.) (Tape #NLS09-1:14:14-14:20). (Plaintiff Attorney Adam Braverman, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Greg Murphy, FD-S/A). (aje) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Excludable Minute Order as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien, Excludable(s) started as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien: XT4 - substitute counsel or give reasonable time to prepare 5/22/09 to 8/7/09. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/22/09. (vet) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien re 71 MOTION for Discovery, 74 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Preserve Evidence, MOTION re 77 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Attorney Voir Dire MOTION for Joinder MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Weiner, Edward) Modified on 1/23/2009 - Clarify text (vet). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to inquire as to a conflict of interest of Attorney Gary S. Harrison by USA as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proof of Service)(Weiner, Edward) (vet). (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Declare Complex Case by USA as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proof of Service)(Weiner, Edward) (vet). (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION by Yi Cheong Ho as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Declaration)(Osborne, Carl) (jpp). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Edward C Weiner appearing for USA. (Weiner, Edward) (vet). (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Motion and Order to Unseal Indictment in Connection with Execution of Arrest Warrants as to Henry Huynh, Tony Nguyen, Yi Cheong Ho, Michael Hoai Tran, Duy The Nguyen, Yang Jiang, Charles David Nguyen, Vi Kien Tang, Down George Yang, David Van Pham, Phinath Khvann, Melissa Sue Morand, Harlan Jarard Edison, Edward H. Chien. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/10/2008. (leh) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr in case as to Tony Nguyen. (vet) (leh). Modified on 12/10/2008 document unsealed on 12/10/2008 (leh). (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                INDICTMENT as to Henry Huynh (1) count(s) 1, Tony Nguyen (2) count(s) 1, Yi Cheong Ho (3) count(s) 1, Michael Hoai Tran (4) count(s) 1, Duy The Nguyen (5) count(s) 1, Yang Jiang (6) count(s) 1, Charles David Nguyen (7) count(s) 1, Vi Kien Tang (8) count(s) 1, Down George Yang (9) count(s) 1, David Van Pham (10) count(s) 1, Phinath Khvann (11) count(s) 1, 2-4, 5, 6, Melissa Sue Morand (12) count(s) 1, Harlan Jarard Edison (13) count(s) 1, 2-4, Edward H. Chien (14) count(s) 1. (vet) Modified on 12/10/2008, document unsealed on 12/10/2008 (leh). (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 383 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?