Sierra Wireless, Inc. et al v. Norman IP Holdings LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00815-JM-BGS
District Judge Jeffrey T. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 11:39 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Ogden +1 650 320 7700 +1 650 329 7701 cogden@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Sierra Wireless, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Numerex Corp /pa/

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Ogden +1 650 320 7700 +1 650 329 7701 cogden@nixonpeabody.com
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D. Belanger +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 wdbelanger@mintz.com
Space Matthew D Durell +1 617 348 1615 +1 617 542 2241 mdurell@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
Space Harry P Weitzel +1 949 369 3500 +1 949 863 0151 weitzelh@pepperlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office San Diego
Filed 4/19/2010
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 145 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County San Diego
Terminated 2/15/2011
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (Ogden, Christopher)(tkl).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 OrderCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER. The court now clarifies that the stay on Defendant's [21] Motion has been lifted. (Opposition due by 3/4/2011. Reply due by 3/11/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller.) Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/2/11.(lao)(mam).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
      ORDER staying case [25]. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/2/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. re [26] Notice of Change of Address (Ogden, Christopher) (tkl).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Lee Ogden (Ogden, Christopher) qc mail sent re cert of service, notice of appearance needed for atty Robert E. Krebs (kaj).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010, Terminated: 8/2/2010 Motion to Stay
            MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING, AND RE-SCHEDULE HEARING, RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/TRANSFER, PENDING RESOLUTION OF TEXAS TRANSFER MOTION by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Ogden, Christopher). (jah).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of deadline. It is ordered that Sierra Wireless shall have until July 23, 2010 to oppose Norman's Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative Transfer The Case To The Eastern District of Texas [21]. Defendant's reply is due July 30, 2010. The hearing is scheduled for August 6, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/12/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010, Terminated: 7/12/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [21] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Texas (Unopposed) by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Ogden, Christopher)(tkl).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of Party With Financial Interest
                  NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Norman IP Holdings LLC (Durell, Matthew) (tkl).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010, Terminated: 2/15/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Texas by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix of Unpublished Decisions in Support of Motion)(Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                      ORDER extending the time by which Defendant Norman IP holdings, LLC may Answer, plead, or otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint re [19] Motion. Answer due 6/22/2010 by 2 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/22/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrl).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010, Terminated: 6/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , pleading, or other response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Matthew D. Durell appearing for Defendant Norman IP Holdings LLC (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                            PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: William D. Belanger appearing for Defendant Norman IP Holdings LLC (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Alexandra C. Fennell appearing for Defendant Norman IP Holdings LLC (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to First Amended Complaint. Norman IP Holdings LLC answer due 6/18/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/8/2010. (tkl)(jrl).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010, Terminated: 6/9/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , pleading, or other response to Plaintiffs' first amended complaint by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. Norman IP Holdings LLC served on 5/17/2010, answer due 6/7/2010. (Ogden, Christopher) (tkl).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                      ORDER relieving Dft Norman IP Holdings, LLC of its obligation to answer to pla's original complaint [11]. Norman IP Holdings LLC answer to First Amended Complaint due 6/4/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/27/2010. (tkl)(jrl).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010, Terminated: 5/27/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) . Modified on 5/24/2010 (tkl). Emailed atty re S/ on proof of service.
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [8] joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to complaint. Norman IP Holdings LLC answer due 5/21/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/18/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Amended Complaint
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Norman IP Holdings LLC, filed by Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7)(Ogden, Christopher)(tkl).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010, Terminated: 5/18/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. Sierra Wireless, Inc. served on 4/26/2010, answer due 5/17/2010; Sierra Wireless America, Inc. served on 4/26/2010, answer due 5/17/2010. (Ogden, Christopher) (tkl).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER OF TRANSFER: Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler is no longer assigned to the case and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 10cv815-JM(BGS). All conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge Adler, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Skomal. Any dates set before the district judge will remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/30/10.(kaj)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Summons Issued
                                                    Summons Issued (tkl)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Notice of Party With Financial Interest
                                                      NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (Ogden, Christopher)(tkl).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Notice of Related Case
                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. of case(s) E.D.Tex. No. 6:09-cv-270-LED; S.D.Cal. No. 3:10-cv-836-BEN-POR (Ogden, Christopher). Modified on 4/26/2010 (tkl).Low Number Order prepared on 4/21/10 in 10cv836.
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark
                                                          REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent numbers *5,592,555*, *5,502,689*, *5,530,597* (jer)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Norman IP Holdings LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 12562.), filed by Sierra Wireless, Inc. and Sierra Wireless America, Inc.(jer) (av1).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?