Aguilar et al v. Interhealth Neutraceuticals Incorporated et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01284-BTM-KSC
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 25, 2016 at 12:46 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alene Fair, Petitioner
No Logo Amber Casper Rodery, Petitioner
No Logo Ashley Clayton, Petitioner
No Logo Barbara Wolff, Petitioner
No Logo Brandon Boring, Petitioner
No Logo Brice Schemmel, Petitioner
No Logo Christopher Luft, Petitioner
No Logo Dale Pennington, Petitioner
No Logo Daniel Cobler, Jr., Petitioner
No Logo George Ward, Petitioner
No Logo Gregory Bliss, Petitioner
No Logo HARRY WILLIAMS, Petitioner
No Logo Howard Herring, Petitioner
No Logo Jacqueline Templeton, Petitioner
No Logo Jason Boyd, Petitioner
No Logo Jeffrey Dieguez, Petitioner
No Logo Jennifer Fife, Petitioner
No Logo Jimmy Foster, Petitioner
No Logo John Lockett, Petitioner
No Logo Joseph Pace, Petitioner
No Logo Kenneth Leonas, Petitioner
No Logo Latanna Thompson, Petitioner
No Logo Laurette Johnson, Petitioner
No Logo Lorraine Nelson, Petitioner
No Logo Marcia Homan, Petitioner
No Logo Mark Aguilar, Petitioner

Represented by The Wiseman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Lee Wiseman +1 916 947 3626 +1 916 441 6553 wiseman@thewisemanlawfirm.com
No Logo Mark Paul, Petitioner
No Logo Mark Sweeney, Petitioner
No Logo Michael Mohr, Petitioner
No Logo Pamela Kirkman, Petitioner
No Logo Perry Lyons, Petitioner
No Logo Randi Robinson, Petitioner
No Logo Robin Young, Petitioner
No Logo Ronald Thornton, Petitioner
No Logo Ryan Mullany, Petitioner
No Logo Sarah Young Hopes, Petitioner
No Logo Sharon Stone, Petitioner
No Logo Tiffany Jackson, Petitioner
No Logo Tonia Tibbs, Petitioner
v.
Costco Wholesale Corporation Costco Wholesale Corporation, Respondent
CVS Caremark Corporation CVS Caremark Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Garden State Nutritionals, Inc., Respondent
No Logo General Nutrition Centers, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Gnc Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Hvl Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "HVL Incorporated"
No Logo Hvl LLC, Respondent
No Logo Interhealth Neutraceuticals Incorporated, Respondent
No Logo Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Iovate Health Sciences International, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Iovate Health Sciences Research Inc., Respondent
No Logo Iovate Health Sciences, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Muscle Tech Research And Development, Inc., Respondent
Rite Aid Corporation Rite Aid Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Vitamin World, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Vitaquest International, LLC, Respondent
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Respondent
Officer/Director, Green Dot Corp
Officer/Director, Zing Enterprises, Inc.
Walgreen Company Walgreen Company, Respondent
Officially listed as "Walgreens Co."
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Timeline
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Status Conference) held on 10/9/2013, before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Elizabeth Cesena. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2014. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Order by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2013 10:00 AM is vacated and reset to 01:30 PM 10/22/2013 in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz.Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al.(no document attached) (gac) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Status Conference re Settlement held on 10/9/2013; Reports due 11/112013; Opt in deadline 11/08/2013; Status Conference continued to 11/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Order to follow.(Court Reporter/ECR Elizabeth Cesena). (Plaintiff Attorney Asim Badaruzzaman (Telephonic); David Barari (Telephonic); Wendy Behan; Timothy Blood; Clarissa Kearns; Geoffrey Culbertson (Telephonic); Tammy Bennington (Telephonic); Timothy Hamilton (Telephonic); Sean Higgins (Telephonic); David Hodes (Telephonic); Richard Hood; Margaret Lecocke (Telephonic); Joseph Lui (Telephonic); Amy Ooi (Telephonic); Thomas O'Reardon; Elaine Ryan (Telephonic); Patricia Syverson (Telephonic); Chris Van de Kieft (Telephonic)). (Defendant Attorney Matthew Bures(Telephonic); Eric Gladbach (Telephonic); Brandon Goodman(Telephonic); Dan Ottaunick (Telephonic);Lisa Ricksecker (Telephonic); Kendra Pappas(Telephonic); K.C. Swisher; William Tarantino). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al.(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
**NOTICE of Change of Hearing Time on Motion only** (1637 in 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, (201 in 3:09-cv-01088-BTM-KSC) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of class Action Settlement : Motion Hearing is reset for 4/23/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Status Hearing re Settlement held on 1/23/2013; Further Status Hearing set for 4/23/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. All Trial and Pretrial dates are vacated.(Court Reporter Barbara Harris).(Plaintiff Attorney Ross Anderson (Telephonic); Asim Badruzzaman (Telephonic); Monica Balderarama (Telephonic); David Barari (Telephonic); Gayle Blatt; Ann Brown-Graff (Telephonic); Kevin Buchanan (Telephonic); GeoffreyCulbertson (Telephonic); Gregory Davis (Telephonic); Timothy Hamilton (Telephonic); Sean Higgins (Telephonic); Daniel Hodes (Telephonic); Richard Hood; Margaret LeCocke (Telephonic); William McDevitt (Telephonic); Glenn McGovern (Telephonic); Thomas Rockett (Telephonic); Patricia Syverson (Telephonic); Mark Zamora (Telephonic)). (Defendant Attorney Matthew Bures (Telephonic); Eric Gladbach (Telephonic); Brandon Goodman (Telephonic); Joanna Herman; Dan Ottaunick (Telephonic); Kendra Pappas (Telephonic); K.C. Swisher; William Tarantino (Telephonic); Bert Taylor (Telephonic)). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Status Hearing held on 1/7/2013 ; Further Status Hearing set for 1/23/2013 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz.(Court Reporter Barbara Harris).(Plaintiff Attorney Wendy Behan; Richard Hood; Leslie Hurst). (Defendant Attorney Joanna Herman; William Tarantino). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Status Hearing is reset for 1/7/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Status Conference held on 11/28/2012; Status Hearing set for 12/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (1433 in 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint in Maurice Harris v. Kerr Investment Holding Corp., et al. Case No. 11-00271, (1432 in 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III, and IV of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint in Noyola v. Kerr Investment Holding Corp. Case No. 3:09-2509, (112 in 3:09-cv-02509-BTM-KSC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of Plaintiff's 3rd Amended Complaint, (56 in 3:11-cv-00271-BTM-KSC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz.(Court Reporter Barbara Harris).(Plaintiff Attorney Ross Anderson(Telephonic); Shujah Awan(Telephonic); David Barari(Telephonic); Asim Badaruzzaman; Monica Balderama(Telephonic); Gayle Blatt; Elizabeth Burke(Telephonic);; Elizabeth Floriani(Telephonic);; Timothy Hamilton(Telephonic);; Sean Higgins(Telephonic);; Daniel Hodes(Telephonic); Stephen Hunt(Telephonic); Richard Hood; Leslie Hurst; Margaret Lecocke(Telephonic); Glenn McGovern(Telephonic); Amy Ooi(Telephonic); Thomas Rockett(Telephonic); Trevor Rockstad(Telephonic); Geoffrey Spreter(Telephonic); Patricia Syverson(Telephonic); Chris Van de Kieft(Telephonic); Mark Zamora(Telephonic)). (Defendant Attorney Denise Bense(Telephonic); Matthew Bures(Telephonic); Eric Gladbach(Telephonic); Joanna Herman; Robert Limbacher(Telephonic); Kendra Pappas(Telephonic); William Tarantino(Telephonic); Bert Taylor(Telephonic); Sara Triplett). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 9/19/2012.(Court Reporter Barbara Harris).(Plaintiff Attorney Asim Badaruzzaman (Telephonic); Ross Anderson (Telephonic); Anne Andrews (Telephonic); Wendy Behan; Timothy Blood; John Boundas (Telephonic); Calvin Clay (Telephonic); Sean Higgins; Richard Hood; Stephen Hunt (Telephonic); Margaret Lecocke (Telephonic); Thomas O'reardon; Roger Paradez (Telephonic); Trevor Rockstad (Telephonic); Matthew Sill (Telephonic); Patricia Syverson (Telephonic); John Thornton (Telephonic); Omar Zamora (Telephonic)). (Defendant Attorney Matthew Bures (Telephonic); Eric Gladbach (Telephonic); Robert Limbacher (Telephonic); Dan Ottaunick (Telephonic); Kendra Pappas (Telephonic); K.C. Swisher; William Tarantino; Bert Taylor (Telephonic)). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Status Hearing held on 8/22/2012. Order to follow.(Court Reporter Juliette Eichenlaub).(Plaintiff Attorney Ann Andrews; Gayle Blatt; Timothy Blood; Richard Hood; Thomas O'Reardon; Ross Anderson (Telephonic); Shujah Awan (Telephonic); Asim Badaruzzman (Telephonic); John Boundas (Telephonic); Calvin Clay (Telephonic); Gregory Davis (Telephonic); Timothy Hamilton (Telephonic); Stephen Hunt (Telephonic); Glenn McGovern (Telephonic); Roger Orlando (Telephonic); Patricia Syverson (Telephonic); Crhis Van de Kieft (Telephonic); Kirk Wood (Telephonic); Gene Williams (Telephonic); Omar Zamora (Telephonic)). (Defendant Attorney Thomas Frieder (Telephonic); Eric Gladbach (Telephonic); Brandon Goodman (Telephonic); Joanna Herman; Chris Summers; William Tarantino;MAtthew Bures (Telephonic); Evan Caplan (Telephonic); K.C. Swisher). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Change of Hearing TIME ONLY: Status Hearing reset for 8/22/2012 12:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
***NOTICE of Change of Hearing Time Only***: Status Hearing reset for 8/22/2012 04:15 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to CVS Caremark Corporation. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Rite Aid Corporation. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to General Nutrition Centers, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to GNC Corporation. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Vitaquest International, LLC. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Muscletech Research and Development, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Iovate Health Sciences International, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew)(rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Iovate Health Sciences Research, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Tibbs, Perry Lyons, George Ward, Tiffany Jackson, Ryan Mullany, Lorraine Nelson, Kenneth Leonas, Mark Aguilar, Randi Robinson, Laurette Johnson, John Lockett, Brandon Boring, Jimmy Foster, Daniel Cobler, Jr, Mark Sweeney, Joseph Pace, Dale Pennington, Mark Paul, Ronald Thornton, Christopher Luft, Brice Schemmel, Barbara Wolff, Amber Casper Rodery, Pamela Kirkman, Michael Mohr, Howard Herring, Marcia Homan, Jeffrey Dieguez, Jason Boyd, Alene Fair, Latanna Thompson, Ashley Clayton, Robin Young, Jacqueline Templeton, Harry Williams, Gregory Bliss, Jennifer Fife, Sharon Stone, Sarah Young Hopes, as to Iovate Health Sciences, Inc.. (Sill, Matthew) (rlu). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Status Hearing held on 7/17/2012; Status Hearing set for 8/22/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz.(Court Reporter Barbara Harris).(Plaintiff Attorney Shujah Awan (Telephonic); Harry Bell (Telephonic); Denise Bense (Telephonic); Gayle Blatt; Kevin Buchanan (Telephonic); Elizabeth Burke (Telephonic); Evan Caplan (Telephonic); Geoffrey Culbertson (Telephonic); Timothy Hamilton (Telephonic); Richard Hood; Stephen Hunt (Telephonic); Robert Kreisman (Telephonic); Roger Orlando; Matthew Sill (Telephonic); Gene Stonebarger (Telephonic); Patricia Syverson (Telephonic); John Thornton; Chris Van de Keft; Gene Williams (Telephonic); Kirk Wood (Telephonic); Omar Zamora (Telephonic)). (Defendant Attorney Taylor Bert (Telephonic); Thomas Frieder (Telephonic); Eric Gladbach (Telephonic); Brandon Goodman (Telephonic); Joanna Herman; Don Ottaunick (Telephonic); Chris Summers; William Tarantino;). Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (rfm) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER requiring clarification of counsel representing Muscletech Entities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/1/12.Associated Cases: 3:09-md-02087-BTM-KSC et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs) (jcj). (Entered: 06/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of California. (kaj) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:12-cv-00993. Original file received electronically (kaj) (cap). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
MDL TRANSFER ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Southern District of California re: MDL No. 2087. (Waggoner, D) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/25/2012.] (Entered: 05/25/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge, # 2 Order Re Page Limits, # 3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/25/2012.] (Entered: 04/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *CVS Caremark Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation, GNC Corporation, Garden State Nutritionals, Inc., General Nutrition Centers, Inc., HVL Incorporated, HVL LLC, Interhealth Neutraceuticals Incorporated, Iovate Health Sciences Group, Inc., Iovate Health Sciences International, Inc., Iovate Health Sciences Research, Inc., Iovate Health Sciences, Inc., Muscletech Research and Development, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Vitamin World, Inc., Vitaquest International, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Co.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Lee Wiseman* *The Wiseman Law Firm* *455 Capitol Mall, Suite 350* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/25/2012.] (Entered: 04/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
Plaintiffs' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice of Related Cases)(Wiseman, David) Modified on 4/16/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/25/2012.] (Entered: 04/13/2012)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/26/2012, Entered: None
MDL TRANSFER ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Southern District of California re: MDL No. 2087. (Waggoner, D) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/25/2012.]
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 107 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?