Lucent Technologies, et al v. Gateway Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-02060
District Judge Rudi M. Brewster, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 12:04 AM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Albanesi Schroeder LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee Skinner +1 214 220 0444 + 214 220 0445

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2007 Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Matthew C Bernstein +1 858 720 5700 +1 858 720 5799 mbernstein@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Rostocki +1 302 778 7561 brostocki@reedsmith.com
No Logo Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000
Dell Computer Corporation Dell Computer Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Dell Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003 Leslie L. Jacobs, Jr. +1 202 942 5000
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007 Ronald L. Johnston , +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 Ronald_Johnston@APorter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ali Reza Sharifahmadian +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 ali_sharifahmadian@aporter.com
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003 Robert Jones Worrall +1 202 942 6395 +1 202 942 5999
TERMINATED: 08/19/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007 Ronald L. Johnston , +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 Ronald_Johnston@APorter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Micallef +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 joseph.micallef@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Mark Freed +1 202 756 8080 +1 202 756 8087 jfreed@mwe.com
No Logo Gateway Companies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000
No Logo Gateway Country Stores LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2007 David G. Hetzel +1 617 748 6818 +1 212 649 9406 dhetzel@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D Baker +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 jonathan.baker@skadden.com
No Logo Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000
Gateway, Inc. Gateway, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2007 David G. Hetzel +1 617 748 6818 +1 212 649 9406 dhetzel@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D Baker +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 jonathan.baker@skadden.com
Alcatel-Lucent, Inc. Alcatel-Lucent, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Lucent Technologies Guardian I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn and Adema

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Donovan +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 edonovan@kirkland.com
No Logo Lucent Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Comm/scope, Inc.
Officer/Director, Agere Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lucent En Corp
Officer/Director, Octel Communications Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Scott Richard Samay +1 212 294 3521 +1 212 294 4700

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@hahnadema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Jon T Hohenthaner +1 212 351 3400 jhohenthaner@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamir Packin +1 212 351 3400 +1 212 351 3401 tpackin@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2007 Richard M Koehl +1 212 351 2636 +1 212 351 5326 rkoehl@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn and Adema

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alan Appleby +1 212 446 4762 +1 212 446 4900 rappleby@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Theresa Bernard +1 212 446 4796 +1 212 446 4900 ebernard@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Eric W Dittmann +1 212 446 4954 +1 212 446 4900 edittmann@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Donovan +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 edonovan@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERIC D. HAYES +1 312 862 2480 +1 312 862 2200 eric.hayes@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan N Malz +1 212 446 4800 jmalz@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Marina +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jmarina@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Howard D Shatz +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 hshatz@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 01/01/2007 James A. Shimota +1 312 861 2336 +1 312 861 2200 jshimota@kirkland.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Albanesi Schroeder LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee Skinner +1 214 220 0444 + 214 220 0445

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Matthew C Bernstein +1 858 720 5700 +1 858 720 5799 mbernstein@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Rostocki +1 302 778 7561 brostocki@reedsmith.com
v.
No Logo Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Plies +1 512 394 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D Baker +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 jonathan.baker@skadden.com
Dell Computer Corporation Dell Computer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dell, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT MICHAEL BORDER +1 202 942 5541 +1 202 942 5999 scott.border@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Micallef +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 joseph.micallef@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Newby +1 202 942 5893 +1 202 942 5999 jnewby@mcguirewoods.com
Alcatel-Lucent, Inc. Alcatel-Lucent, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lucent Technologies Guardian I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn and Adema

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alan Appleby +1 212 446 4762 +1 212 446 4900 rappleby@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Donovan +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 edonovan@kirkland.com
No Logo Lucent Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Comm/scope, Inc.
Officer/Director, Agere Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lucent En Corp
Officer/Director, Octel Communications Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Scott Richard Samay +1 212 294 3521 +1 212 294 4700

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@hahnadema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamir Packin +1 212 351 3400 +1 212 351 3401 tpackin@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2007 Richard M Koehl +1 212 351 2636 +1 212 351 5326 rkoehl@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn and Adema

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alan Appleby +1 212 446 4762 +1 212 446 4900 rappleby@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Theresa Bernard +1 212 446 4796 +1 212 446 4900 ebernard@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Eric W Dittmann +1 212 446 4954 +1 212 446 4900 edittmann@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Donovan +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 edonovan@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan N Malz +1 212 446 4800 jmalz@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Marina +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jmarina@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Howard D Shatz +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 hshatz@kirkland.com
No Logo Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Gateway Companies, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Gateway Country Stores LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Counter-Defendant
Gateway, Inc. Gateway, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Alcatel-Lucent, Inc. Alcatel-Lucent, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Lucent Technologies Guardian I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Jon T Hohenthaner +1 212 351 3400 jhohenthaner@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn and Adema

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alan Appleby +1 212 446 4762 +1 212 446 4900 rappleby@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Eric W Dittmann +1 212 446 4954 +1 212 446 4900 edittmann@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Donovan +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 edonovan@kirkland.com
No Logo Lucent Technologies, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officer/Director, Comm/scope, Inc.
Officer/Director, Agere Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lucent En Corp
Officer/Director, Octel Communications Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Scott Richard Samay +1 212 294 3521 +1 212 294 4700

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@hahnadema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamir Packin +1 212 351 3400 +1 212 351 3401 tpackin@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2007 Richard M Koehl +1 212 351 2636 +1 212 351 5326 rkoehl@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn and Adema

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alan Appleby +1 212 446 4762 +1 212 446 4900 rappleby@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Theresa Bernard +1 212 446 4796 +1 212 446 4900 ebernard@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Bondor +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 6460 paul.bondor@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Bridges +1 415 439 1824 +1 415 439 1500 kbridges@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Eric W Dittmann +1 212 446 4954 +1 212 446 4900 edittmann@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Donovan +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 edonovan@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERIC D. HAYES +1 312 862 2480 +1 312 862 2200 eric.hayes@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan N Malz +1 212 446 4800 jmalz@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Marina +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jmarina@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/20/2007 Howard D Shatz +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 hshatz@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 01/01/2007 James A. Shimota +1 312 861 2336 +1 312 861 2200 jshimota@kirkland.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Albanesi Schroeder LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee Skinner +1 214 220 0444 + 214 220 0445

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Matthew C Bernstein +1 858 720 5700 +1 858 720 5799 mbernstein@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Rostocki +1 302 778 7561 brostocki@reedsmith.com
No Logo Multimedia Patent Trust, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@hahnadema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alan Appleby +1 212 446 4762 +1 212 446 4900 rappleby@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Marina +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jmarina@kirkland.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Intervenor
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Albanesi Schroeder LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee Skinner +1 214 220 0444 + 214 220 0445

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Matthew C Bernstein +1 858 720 5700 +1 858 720 5799 mbernstein@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Rostocki +1 302 778 7561 brostocki@reedsmith.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (1878) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2313 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY: Judge Bencivengo recuses from this matter. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin added to the case. Judge Bencivengo is no longer assigned to case, and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 02cv2060-B-MDD. (mdc) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2312 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MOTION TO WITHDRAW & ORDER THEREON (Re Doc. 2311 ): Attorney Alan D Albright no longer represents Microsoft Corporation. Attorney Alan D Albright was terminated. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 2/29/2012. (mdc) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2311 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Microsoft Corporation. (Albright, Alan) (lmt). (Entered: 06/10/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2310 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 2309 Joint Motion to Dismiss Action with Prejudice: All claims by Lucent against Microsoft and against Dell presented by the Complaint and remaining in this action, as well as all counterclaims thereto between Lucent, Microsoft, and Dell remaining in this action, shall be dismissed with prejudice; and Lucent, Microsoft, and Dell shall each bear their own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk shall terminate these consolidated civil actions. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 12/30/08. (asw) (av1). (Entered: 01/05/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 2309 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Gartman, John)(asw). (Entered: 12/16/2008)
            LREF
            Blank 2308 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER denying Defendant Dell's 2248 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 12/15/2008. (jah) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2307 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 2306 Joint Motion to Re-Schedule Hearing: The Court continues the hearing on Dell's 2304 Motion for Summary Judgment of Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131, from 1/12/09 to 2/9/09 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Lucent's opposition brief is due on or before 1/20/09 and Dell's reply brief isdue on or before 2/2/09. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 12/15/08. (asw)(kaj). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2306 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Motion to Continue
                Joint MOTION to Continue/Rescheduling Hearing on Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment of Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Dell Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) Modified on 12/12/2008 edit event type and clarify text. Atty notified re event selection (asw). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2305 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION 2304 for Summary Judgment of Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2304 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment of Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Dell Inc. for Summary Judgment of Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al., # 2 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef in Support of Motion of Dell Inc. for Summary Judgment of Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al., attaching exhibits A-D, # 3 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph)(asw). (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2303 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motions Hearing) held on 11/10/2008, before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melinda S. Setterman. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2009. (akr) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2302 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER Setting Amount of Attorney's Fees on Doughty Patent (U.s. Patent No. 4,582,956). Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 11/17/2008. Court awards Dft Dell atty's fees in the amount of $423,712.48, pursuant to its motion to declare Lucent's patent infringement claim on the Doughty patent as an exceptional case. (jah) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2301 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Order on Motion to SeverCourt Filing
                          ORDER denying Dell's 2258 Motion to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of US Patent No. 5,649,131 for Treatment in a Separate Case; Granting Dell's 2261 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 11/17/2008. (jah) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2300 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER. Telephonic Discovery Conference was held on 11/14/2008. denying Lucent's 2282 Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order to Preclude Dell from Proceeding w/ Subpoenas to 3rd Parties. Granting Lucent's Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Microsoft. Microsoft's objection is overruled. Documents should be produced by 11/21/2008. Lucent's request that it be given leave to do reasonable followup discovery if needed following 3rd party depositions is granted. Existing deadlines for expert report exchanges and expert discovery deadline are vacated. Parties instructed to meet and confer and provide Court w/ proposed schedule, no later than 12/15/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/14/2008. (jah). Modified on 11/17/2008 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2299 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo:A Discovery Hearing with regard to plaintiff's motion to compel documents and for a protective order was held on 11/14/2008. Order to follow.(aet) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2298 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                ORDER Granting 2291 Motion to File Under Seal: Two (2) Patent License Agreements shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/10/08. (cc: Sealed Clerk) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) Modified to indicate cc (pdc). (kaj). (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2297 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Order on Motion to SeverCourt Filing
                                  Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2008 re 2258 Corrected MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case filed by Dell, Incorporated; Submitting 2258 Motion to Sever; Order to follow. (Court Reporter Melinda Setterman.)(Plaintiff Attorney Robert A Appleby, Lucent; Jeanne M Heffernan, Lucent).(Defendant Attorney Roger A Denning, Microsoft; Lara S Garner, Microsoft; Joel M Freed, Dell; Ali Sharifahmadian, Dell). (gac) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2296 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Granting 2290 Motion to File Under Seal: Microsoft's Opposition to Lucent's Ex Parte Application to Request a Telephonic Hearing to Compel Production of Documents and the Declaration of Kimberly I. Kennedy in support thereof shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/10/08. (cc: Sealed Clerk) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) Modified to indicate cc (pdc). (kaj). (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2295 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Computer Corporation re 2292 Response in Opposition to Motion, 2293 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 2291 MOTION Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2, 2294 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, (Blackburn, James) (mdc) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2294 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                        Declaration of Ali R. Sharifahmadian re 2282 In Support of Dell Inc.'s Opposition to Lucent's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order filed by Dell Computer Corporation. (Blackburn, James) (tkl). Emailed atty. This should be efiled as a Declaration. (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2293 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 2282 MOTION for Protective Order Declaration of James S. Blackburn in Support of Dell Inc.'s Opposition to Lucent's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order filed by Dell Computer Corporation. (Blackburn, James) (cap). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2292 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 2282 MOTION for Protective Order Dell Inc.'s Opposition to Lucent's Ex Parte Application For A Protective Order filed by Dell Computer Corporation. (Blackburn, James) (See 2293 2294 2295 for supporting documents) Modified on 11/12/2008 to add links. Sent email re attachments (mjj) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2291 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 by Dell Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Blackburn, James) Modified on 11/12/2008, atty contacted via email re: proposed orders and signature (leh). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2290 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION re 2289 Objection, Microsoft's Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Kennedy in Support of Microsoft's Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2)(Kennedy, Kimberly) (jpp). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2289 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Objection
                                                  OBJECTION by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation re 2283 Set Deadlines/Hearings,, in Support of its Opposition to Lucent's Ex Parte Application for a Telephonic Hearing to Compel Production of Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Kennedy in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Lucent's Ex Parte Application to Request a Telephonic Hearing to Compel Production of Documents)(Kennedy, Kimberly) (pdc). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2288 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Granting Lucent's 2281 Motion to File Under Seal: Lucent's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lucent's Ex Parte Application and Affidavit of Tamir Packin shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/6/08. (cc: Sealed Clerk)(pdc) (kaj). (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2287 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 11/6/08. Counsel for Lucent Technologies Inc may bring equipment into the Federal Building and Courthouse for hearing on 11/10/08. (cc: USMS) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (mjm) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2285 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting Lucent's 2273 Motion to Seal Exhibit B to Declaration. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 11/5/2008. Exhibit B to the Hefferman Declaration to Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion to Sever is to be filed under seal. (cc: Seal Clerk) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (jah) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2284 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 2277 Joint Motion to Amend Case Managment Conference Order; granting 2278 Amended Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Conference Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/4/2008. Court modifies the deadlines in its 7/23/2008 Case Management Conference Order and its 10/21/2008 Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend CMC Order. Completion of Documentary and Written Discovery due 11/7/2008, Close of Fact Discovery by 11/12/2008, Supplemental Expert Reports due 11/18/2008, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Reports due 12/8/2008, Close of Expert Discovery by 12/22/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (jah) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2283 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: On 11/4/08, Plaintiff filed a motion to compel. Defendant Microsoft shall file an opposition on or before November 7, 2008. A discovery hearing on the motion shall be held on November 14, 2008, at 1:30 p.m., in conjunction with Plaintiff's motion for a protective order. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Plaintiff shall coordinate and initiate the conference call. (ma) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2282 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 3 Affidavit of Tamir Packin, # 4 Proof of Service). NUNC PRO TUNC 10/31/2008 (Filed Ex Parte Application per CAB Chambers) (jah). Modified on 11/4/2008 - Edited to add Nunc Pro Tunc date (jah). (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2281 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Packin, # 2 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). Modified on 11/4/2008 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2280 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Reply - Other
                                                                  REPLY re 2257 MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case, 2262 Supplemental Document, filed by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph). (jah). (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2279 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed a motion for protective order on 10/31/08 2282 . Dft Dell shall file opposition to Lucent's Motion for Protective Order by 11/7/2008. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/14/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/3/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2278 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                      Amended Joint MOTION to Amend Case Management Conference Order by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Hahn, David). Modified on 11/4/2008 - Corrected filer and text (jah). (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2277 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend the Case Management Conference Order by Microsoft Corporation, Lucent Technologies, Inc., Dell Incorporated (Hahn, David). Modified on 11/3/2008 - Wrong event. Corrected entry. Email sent to Atty (jah). (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2276 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Kennedy on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation (Kennedy, Kimberly). (jah). (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2275 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
                                                                            PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Tamir Packin appearing for Plaintiff Lucent Technologies, Inc (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2274 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 2273 MOTION Leave to File Under Seal re 2272 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 2272 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Hahn, David). (jah). (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2273 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                MOTION Leave to File Under Seal re 2272 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Heffernan)(Hahn, David). Modified on 10/28/2008 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2272 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 2257 MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Heffernan w/Exhibits A, C, D)(Hahn, David). Modified on 10/28/2008 - Edited to remove dupliacte text (jah). (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2271 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 USCA Mandate
                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA Federal Circuit affirming the decision of the USDC as to 2088 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Microsoft Corporation, 2027 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (USCA Federal Circuit Case Numbers 2007-1546, 2007-1580). (akr) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2270 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 2269 Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Procedures. Accordingly, the Court modifies the deadlines in its 7/23/2008 Order re: 2234 as follows: Close of Fact Discovery on 10/31/08, Supplemental Expert Reports on 11/7/2008, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Reports on 12/5/2008, Close of Expert Discovery on 12/22/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/21/2008. (leh) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2269 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Procedures by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Reid, Joseph) (leh). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2268 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2008. Motion 2248 for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. - Denied. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter: Gayle Wakefield.) (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, John M. Desmarais, Jeanne M. Heffernan). (Microsoft Attorneys Juanita R. Books, Lara S. Garner). (Dell Attorneys Joel Freed, Joseph Micallef). (mjm) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2267 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                            NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 2258 Corrected MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case, 2261 MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DELL INC. TO SEVER CLAIMS 2-7 AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,649,131 TO ACKERMAN ET AL. FOR TREATMENT IN A SEPARATE CASE (Garner, Lara) (mkz). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2266 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 10/10/2008. Counsel for Dell, Inc. may bring the following equipment into the Federal Building and Courthouse for hearing on 10/14/2008: 1.) Two Laptop Computers and Miscellaneous Peripherals. (cc: USMS) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2265 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 10/10/2008. Counsel for Microsoft Corporation may bring the following equipment into the Federal Building and Courthouse for hearing on 10/14/2008: 1.) Laptop Computers and Misc. Peripherals and 2.) Misc. cables. (cc: USMS) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2264 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                  CORRECTED NOTICE: to clarify and confirm the dates and times of the pending motions. 1) MOTION 2248 for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. is set for 10/14/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. 2) Amended MOTION 2258 to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case is set for 11/10/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (mjm) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2263 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell, Incorporated re 2262 Supplemental Document, 2261 MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DELL INC. TO SEVER CLAIMS 2-7 AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,649,131 TO ACKERMAN ET AL. FOR TREATMENT IN A SEPARATE CASE (Micallef, Joseph) (mkz). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2262 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Dell, Incorporated re 2257 MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case - Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motion. (Micallef, Joseph) (pdc). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2261 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DELL INC. TO SEVER CLAIMS 2-7 AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,649,131 TO ACKERMAN ET AL. FOR TREATMENT IN A SEPARATE CASE by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DELL INC. TO SEVER CLAIMS 2-7 AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,649,131 TO ACKERMAN ET AL. FOR TREATMENT IN A SEPARATE CASE)(Micallef, Joseph)(pdc). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2260 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Amended MOTION 2258 to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case set for 10/14/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (mjm) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2259 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 10/9/2008. Counsel for Lucent Technologies may bring the following equipment into Courtroom 2 for hearing on 10/14/2008: 1.) Projector, 2.) Large Projection Screen, 3.) Laptop Computers and Misc. Peripherals, 4.) Flat Panel Monitors (includes Touch-Screen Enabled Monitors), 5. Document Camera (ELMO), 6.) Switches, 7.) Distribution, 8.) A/V Carts, 9.) Misc. cables to connect everything, 10.) Audio system (includng mixer, speakers, cables, and connectors), 11.) Color Printers, 12.) Battery Power Back Ups (UPS), 13.) Document Scanner, 14.) Wireless Barcode Scanner, 15.) Plasma Screen, 16.) Folding Tables, and 17.) Stopwatches. (cc: USMS) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (jah) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2258 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                              Corrected MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph). (jah). (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2257 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                MOTION to Sever Claims 2-7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. for Treatment in a Separate Case by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef w/ Exhibits A-H, # 3 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph). Modified on 10/9/2008 - Edited attachment description to remove duplicate. Incorrect hearing date, Atty to refiled Motion (jah). (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2256 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                  REPLY re 2254 Objection to the Declarations and Expert Report of Nathaniel Polish filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Heffernan, # 2 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). Modified on 10/7/2008 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2255 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell, Incorporated re 2254 Objection, 2253 Reply to Response to Motion, (Micallef, Joseph). (jah). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2254 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Dell, Incorporated to the September 12, 2008 Declaration of Dr. Nathanial Polish in Support of Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131. (Micallef, Joseph). (jah). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2253 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 2248 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. filed by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef) (Micallef, Joseph). Modified on 9/24/2008 - Edited attachment description to remove duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2252 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. of Change of Firm Name (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). Modified on 9/15/2008 - Name of Firm updated on docket. Atty Maint (jah). (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2251 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 2248 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeanne M. Heffernan ISO Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A to Heffernan Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Heffernan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Heffernan Declaration, # 5 Declaration D to Heffernan Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Heffernan Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Heffernan Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Heffernan Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Heffernan Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Heffernan Declaration, # 11 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). (jah). (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2250 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Scott M. Border appearing for Defendant Dell, Incorporated (mkz) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2249 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 2248 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. (Garner, Lara). (jah). (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2248 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 to Ackerman et al. by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Micallef Declaration Exhibits A -H, # 2 Micallef Declaration, Exhibit I Part 1, # 3 Micallef Declaration, Exhibit I Part 2, # 4 Micallef Declaration, Exhibits J-K, # 5 Proof of Service, # 6 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Micallef, Joseph). Modified on 8/26/2008 - Edited to remove duplicate attachment descriptions (jah). (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2247 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2245 Joint Motion to Set Special Briefing Schedule for Dell, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/18/2008. Dell shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by 8/25/2008. Lucent shall file its opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment by 9/12/2008. Dell shall file its reply in support of Summary Judgment Motion by 9/23/3008. The Motion for Summary Judgment shall be heard on 10/14/2008 at 10:30am. (jah) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2246 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2157 Motion to Retax Costs on Group 2 Patents. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/12/2008. (jah) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2245 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Set Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Motion for Summary Judgment by Dell, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Blackburn, James). Modified on 8/12/2008 - Wrong event. Corrected event and text. Edited text to remove extra caps. Email sent to Atty (jah). (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2243 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2228 Dell Inc.'s Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents are to be filed under seal: Dell Inc.s Reply in Support of Dells Statement of Its Attorneys Fees Incurred as a Result of Lucents Assertion of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/4/08. (asw) (kaj). (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2242 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 2227 Dell Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Dell's Statement of Attorneys' Fees Incurred as a Result of Lucent's Assertion of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/4/08. (asw)(kaj). (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2241 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Newby on behalf of Dell, Incorporated (Newby, John). (jah). (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2240 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Nishimoto on behalf of Dell, Incorporated (Nishimoto, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2236 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE: The Trial set for 6/15/2009 09:00 AM pursuant to 2234 was inadvertently referred to on the docket as a "Bench Trial". A "Jury Trial" is set for 6/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2235 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Lucent's 2213 MOTION Leave to File Under Seal Lucent's Objections to Dell's Statement of Fees Concerning the Doughty '956 Patent. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/29/2008. Lucent's Objections to Dell's Statement of Fees concerning Doughty '956 Patent to be filed under seal, nunc pro tunc to 6/30/2008 as permitted by Order Granting Dell's Motion for Atty's Fees 2195 . (cc: Seal Document Clerk) (jah) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2234 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference was held on 7/23/2008. Opening Briefs on motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 1/23/2009. Opposition briefs on motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 2/6/2009. Reply briefs on motion shall be filed by 2/13/2009. Motions for Summary Judgment shall be heard 3/2/2009 2:00pm in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Bench Trial set for 6/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 5/11/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/23/2008. (jah) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2233 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Case Management Conference held on 7/23/2008. Scheduling order to follow. (ma) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2232 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying Microsoft's 2203 Motion for Award of Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/17/2008. As an alternative ruling, Court determines, in its discretion, that an award of atty's fees is not appropriate on the '954 litigation. (jah) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2231 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Dell, Incorporated of Joint Statement of Proposed Schedule for U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). (jah). (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2229 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell, Incorporated re 2227 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Dell's Statement of Its Attorneys' Fees Incurred as a Result of Lucent's Assertion of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty, 2228 Notice (Other) (Blackburn, James). (jah). (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2228 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Dell, Incorporated to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-2 (Blackburn, James). Modified on 7/14/2008 - Wrong event. Corrected event and edited text. Email sent to Atty (jah). (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2227 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Dell's Statement of Its Attorneys' Fees Incurred as a Result of Lucent's Assertion of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Blackburn, James). (jah). (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2226 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re: Oral Argument on 2203 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/10/2008. Court matter suitable for submission w/o oral argument. No appearances required on 7/15/2008. (jah) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2225 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/10/2008. Microsoft allowed to bring the following equipment into the Courtroom for hearing on Renewed Group 3 Motion for Award of Attys' Fees on 7/15/2008: A.) High Resolution Projector, B.) Large Projection Screen. C.) Laptop Computers (5), D.) Document Camera (ELMO), and E.) Printer. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2224 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Microsoft's 2222 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/9/2008. Microsoft's Reply to its Renewed Motion Group 3 Motion for Award of Attys' Fees and lodged Exhibits in support are to be filed under seal. (cc: Sealed Document Clerk) (jah) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2223 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Regarding Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/9/2008. Lucent allowed to bring the following equipment into the Courtroom for hearings on 7/15/2008: 1.) Projector, 2.) Large Projection Screen, 3.) Laptop Computers and Miscellaneous Peripherals, 4.) Flat Panel Monitors (includes Touch-Screen Enabled Monitors), 5.) Document Camera (ELMO), and 6.) Audio Visual Equipment. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2222 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Pursant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 in support of its Reply to Its Renewed Group 3 Mtn for Award of Attorneys' Fees by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Albert, Francis). (jah). (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2221 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Francis J. Albert in support of Microsoft Corporation's Reply to its Renewed Group 3 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fee by Intervenor Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Albert, Francis). (jah). (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2220 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Lucent's 2217 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 02cv2060. Lucent's Opposition to Microsoft's Renewed Group 3 Motion for Award of Atty Fees, Lodged Exhibits 5, 6, 7, 10 and 12 are to be filed under seal. (cc: Seal Document Clerk) (jah) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2219 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Lucent's 2213 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Objections to Dell's Statement of Fees Concerning the Doughty '956 Patent. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/2/2008. (cc: Seal Document Clerk) (jah) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2218 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 2216 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 2217 MOTION Leave to File Under Seal re 2216 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Lucent's Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 (Hahn, David) (jah). (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2217 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 re 2216 Response in Opposition to Motion. by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Hahn, David). Modified on 7/2/2008 - Wrong event. Corrected motion relief. Edited to remove duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2216 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ephraim Starr in Opposition re 2204 MOTION to File Under Seal Renewed Group 3 Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit 16, # 12 Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit 18, # 14 Exhibit 19)(Hahn, David). Modified on 7/2/2008 - Wrong event. Edited text (jah). (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2215 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: A Case Management Conference shall be held on July 23, 2008, at 9:30 a.m. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Counsel for Plaintiff shall coordinate and initiate the conference call. On or before July 16, 2008, counsel shall submit a joint statement with a proposed schedule for discovery and other pretrial dates as it relates to the '131 patent. (ma) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2214 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript (Hearing to File Mandate) of Proceedings held on 6/23/2008, before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2008. (leh) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2213 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Leave to File Under Seal Lucent's Objections to Dell's Statement of Fees Concerning the Doughty '956 Patent [Filed Under Seal] by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). (jah). (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2212 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Withdrawal of Appearance of John Giust (Giust, John) Modified on 6/27/2008, atty contacted via email re: s/ signature (leh). (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2211 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Withdrawal of Appearance of Matthew C. Bernstein (Bernstein, Matthew) Modified on 6/27/2008, atty contacted via email re: s/ signature (leh). (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2210 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED ORDER Construing Claims of US Patent No. 5,649,131 (Following Remand). The Court hereby construes the claims in dispute for the '131 Patent and issues the relevant jury instructions as written in Exhibit A. Further, the Court hereby defines all pertinent technical terms as written in Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/25/2008. (leh) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2209 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding the Decision of the USDC as to 1736 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dell Incorporated, Microsoft Corporation, 1553 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc., 1840 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (leh) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2208 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Appeal Mandate HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Appeal Mandate Hearing held on 6/23/2008. U.S.C.A. for the Federal Circuit Mandate re: Case Numbers 2007-1334, 2007-1337, and 2007-1376, AFFIRMING-IN-PART, VACATING-IN-PART, and REMANDING - Filed. As to '954 Patent - Case Affirmed. As to '131 Patent - Case Reversed and Remanded. Lead/Consolidated Cases 02CV2060-B(CAB), 03CV0699-B(CAB), and 03CV1108-B(CAB) - Reopened. Amended Claim Construction Order to issue. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Bencivengo for further Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling. Case Consolidation Order of 7/7/03 62 remains in effect. Lead Case 02CV2060-B(CAB). Member cases 03CV0699-B(CAB) and 03CV1108-B(CAB). ALL FUTURE DOCKETING WILL BE DONE IN THE LEAD CASE. (Court Recorder: Noemy Pellegrino). (Lucent Attorneys Paul A. Bondor and John M. Desmarais (telephonic). Also Appearing Boaz Brickman (Telephonic)). (Microsoft Attorneys Juanita R. Books, Roger A. Denning, John W. Thornburg). (Dell Attorneys Joseph Micallef, Ali R. Sharifahmadian). (mjm) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2205 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Microsoft's 2204 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/18/2008. Microsoft's Renewed Group 3 Motion for Award of Attys' Fees, Declaration of Francis J. Albert, and Exhibits A-J are to be filed under seal. (cc: Seal Clerk) (jah) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2204 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Under Seal Renewed Group 3 Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees by Microsoft Corporation (Albert, Francis). Modified on 6/16/2008 - Wrong event, should be motion. Corrected event. Edited text to remove extra caps. Email sent to Atty (jah). (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2203 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees by Microsoft Corporation. (Albert, Francis). Modified on 6/16/2008 - Text entered in all caps. Edited text to remove extra caps. Email sent to Atty (jah). (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2202 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Notice of Spreading the MandateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of HEARING TO FILE MANDATE re U.S.C.A. for the Federal Circuit case numbers 2007-1334, -1337, and -1376, AFFIRMING-IN-PART, VACATING-IN-PART, and REMANDING, as directed, USDC case numbers 02CV2060-B(CAB), 03CV0699-B(CAB), and 03cv1108-B(CAB). Hearing set for 6/23/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 02 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2198 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Dell Inc.'s 2196 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/2/2008. The following documents are to file under seal: 1.) Dell Inc.'s Statement of Attys' Fees incurred as result of Lucent's assertion of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty, 2.) Decl of Joseph A. Micallef in support of Dell Inc.'s Statement of Attys' Fees, w/ Exhibits 1-7 attached, and 3.) Decl of Joel M. Freed in support of Dell Inc.'s Statement of Attys' Fees, w/ Exhibits 1-3 attached. (jah) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2197 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated (Micallef, Joseph). (jah). (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2196 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-2 by Dell Incorporated. (Micallef, Joseph). (jah). (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2195 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Dell, Inc's 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent. Court grants Dell's motion to declare Lucent's patent infringement claim on the Doughty patent as an exceptional case pursuant to 35 USC 285. Gateway's 2169 Notice of Joinder is deemed withdrawn. Dell shall submit a statement of atty's fees by 5/30/2008. Lucent may file objections by 6/30/3008. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 4/30/2008. (jah) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2194 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA - Federal Circuit (Certified Copy) as to 1555 Notice of Appeal, 1553 Notice of Appeal. Appellants' and Appellees' Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal 1555 No. 2007-1336 is Granted. The Voluntary Dismissal of Gateway as Appellee in Appeal 1553 No. 2007-1334 is Granted. Appeal 2007-1336 is dismissed and Gateway is dismissed as appellee in Lucent's Appeal 2007-1334. (leh) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2193 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of Dismissal Between Plaintiffs Multimedia Patent Trust and Defendant Dell re 2191 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. It is Hereby Ordered that the Complaints, Counterclaims, and any other claims in this action between MPT and Dell are hereby dismissed without prejudice without an award of costs, expenses or attorneys' fees to any party. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 2/27/08. (lao) (av1, ). (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2192 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of Dismissal Between Plaintiffs Lucent, Multimedia Patent Trust, and Defendants Gateway re 2190 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. It is Hereby Ordered that the Complaints, Counterclaims, and any other claims in this action between Lucent and Gateway, and between MPT and Gateway, are hereby dismissed without prejudice without an award of costs, expenses or attorneys' fees to any party. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 2/27/08. (lao) (av1, ). (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2191 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Between Multimedia Patent Trust and Dell by Dell Incorporated, Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (vrp). (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2190 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss between Lucent, Multimedia Patent Trust and Gateway by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Plies, Jeffrey) (leh) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2189 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) of Proceedings held on 1/28/2008 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (leh) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2188 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Order for Proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2008. Motion 2161 for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent - Granted. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle.) (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, James Marina). (Gateway Attorney Connie E. Merriett). (Dell Attorney Joel Freed). (mjm) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2187 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 1/25/2008. Lucent Technologies, Inc. permitted to bring the following equipment into the Courtroom for hearings on 1/28/2008: 1. Projector, 2. Large Projection Screen, 3. (4) Laptop Computers and Miscellaneous Peripherals, 4. Table, 5. Document Camera (ELMO), and 6. Cables and distribution amplifiers. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2186 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED NOTICE of Hearing - MOTION 2161 for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent REMAINS SET FOR 1/28/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Time change docketed in error. PLEASE DISREGARD DOCUMENT 2185 . (mjm) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2185 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE: On Court's Own Motion - MOTION 2161 for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent currently set for 1/28/08 at 9:00 AM is RESCHEDULED FOR 1/28/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2183 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Pla's 2179 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 1/17/2008. Exhibits 2-21 of Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit in support in Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motions for Award of Attys' Fees related to Doughty '956 Patent are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2182 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re 2178 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty '956 Patent) filed by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2181 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent filed by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2180 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 2178 Response in Opposition to Motion, 2179 Motion to File Document Under Seal (Hahn, David). Modified on 1/15/2008 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2179 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to File Exhibits to Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit Re: Opposition to Dell's Motion for Award of Attys' Fees Under Seal by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 2178 Response in Opposition to Motion (Hahn, David). Modified on 1/15/2008 - Wrong event used, should be Motion. Corrected entry. Email sent to Atty (jah). (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2178 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty '956 Patent filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit ISO Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees# 2 Exhibit 1 to McDavit Declaration# 3 Exhibit 22 to McDavit Declaration)(Hahn, David). (jah). (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2177 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motion Hearing not held. Lucent's Motion 2157 to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs - Submitted on the Papers per 2159 . (Tape #N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney N/A). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (mjm) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2176 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Microsoft's 2170 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 1/8/2008. Microsoft's Group II Opposition to Lucent's Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs is to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2175 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Lucent's 2171 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 1/8/2008. Lucent's Reply in support of Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2174 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion 2161 for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent set for 1/28/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2173 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE RE Lucent's Motion 2157 to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs set for 1/10/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motion submitted on the papers per 2159 . (mjm) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2171 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Lucent's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Lucent's Reply in Support of its Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs re 2156 MOTION for Leave to File Lucent's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Lucent's Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David). (jah). (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2170 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Microsoft Corporation to File Under Seal its Opposition to Lucent's Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs (Albert, Francis). Modified on 12/28/2007 - Wrong event used, should be Motion. Corrected event and docket text. Email sent to Atty(jah). (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2169 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. re 2162 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, 2166 Declaration,, 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, 2165 Declaration, 2163 Declaration, 2164 Declaration, (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2168 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated re 2162 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, 2166 Declaration,, 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, 2165 Declaration, 2163 Declaration, 2167 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 2164 Declaration, (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2167 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Dell Incorporated re 2162 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, 2166 Declaration,, 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, 2165 Declaration, 2163 Declaration, 2164 Declaration, ORDER Granting Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2166 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 2162 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, 2165 Declaration, 2163 Declaration, 2164 Declaration, of Joseph A. Micallef In SUpport of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, Exhibits E-J, Part 3 by Defendant Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2165 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 2162 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, 2163 Declaration, 2164 Declaration, of Joseph A. Micallef In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, Exhibits A-J, Part 2 by Defendant Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2164 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent, 2163 Declaration, of Joseph A. Micallef In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, Exhibits E-J, Part I by Defendant Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2163 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 2162 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, 2161 MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent, Exhibits A-D by Defendant Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2162 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum In Support of Dell's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees 2161 Related to the Doughty ('956) Patent by Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James). Modified on 1/7/2008 to correct name of document and remove from pending motion list. (mjm). (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2161 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees Related to Doughty ('956) Patent by Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2160 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA - Federal Circuit (Certified Copy) as to 2107 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. The parties having so agreed, it is ordered that the proceeding is dismissed under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (leh) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2159 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Court finds Lucent's Motion to Re-Tax Costs 2157 suitable for submission w/o oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). No appearances required. Parties shall file briefs in accordance w/ Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 11/29/2007. (jah) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2158 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Lucent's 2156 Motion for Leave to File Under Pursuant to Local Rule 79-2. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 11/21/2007. Lucent's motion to retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs shall be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2156 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Lucent's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Lucent's Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2155 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Costs Taxed in amount of $175,850.63 against Lucent Technologies Inc (nsp) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2154 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of USCA (Federal Circuit) receipt of Certificate of Record re 2107 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2008-1022. (leh) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2150 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 2134 Order,, of Gerald Hines Regarding Microsoft Corporation's Group 2 Motion for Award of Costs by Intervenor Microsoft Corporation. (Barnes, Justin) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2149 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Objection to Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Bill of Costs re 2148 Declaration, 2147 Declaration filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2148 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 2134 Order,, of Kyle Huston Regarding Microsoft Corporation's Group 2 Motion for Award of Costs by Intervenor Microsoft Corporation. (Barnes, Justin) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2147 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 2134 Order,, of Gerald Hines Regarding Microsoft Corporation's Group 2 Motion for Award of Costs by Intervenor Microsoft Corporation. (Barnes, Justin) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2146 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing re Plaintiff's motion to compel supplemental production of financial documents set for October 26, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (Plaintiff Attorney Greg Corbett; Paul Bondor).(Defendant Attorney Steve Daniels; Juanita Brooks; Chris Marchese; Joel Freed). (om) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2145 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Severing and Transferring Part of Case. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 10/16/2007. Court orders that all outstanding matters as to US Patent No. 4,383,272 (Group 1), US Patent No. 4,958,226 (Group 1), US Patent No. 4,763,356 (Group 4), US Patent No. 5,347,295 (Group 4), and US Patent No. 4,439,759 (Group 5) are to be severed and transferred for further proceedings, including trial. For the parts of the case retained by this Court, the case number 02cv2060-B(CAB) remains the same. Clerk shall assign a new case to the severed portion and shall docket a copy of this Order as the first entry. Clerk shall terminate consolidated proceedings in case 02cv2060, and members cases 03cv699 and 03cv1108. This case and members are closed. New Case Number for severed portions: 07cv2000. (jah) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2144 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of record transmitted to USCA (Federal Circuit) re 2107 Notice of Appeal. (leh) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2143 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lucent Technologies, Inc. No transcripts designated (transcripts already on file) re: 2107 Notice of Appeal. (leh) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2142 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2008-1022 for 2107 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2141 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. re 2138 Reply,,, 2137 Reply,,, Notice of Joinder by Gateway to Microsoft and Dell's Replies in Support of Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2140 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 2137 Reply,,, 2135 Reply,, Notice of Joinder by Microsoft to Dell Inc.'s and Gateway Inc.'s Replies in Support of Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement (Garner, Lara) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2139 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated re 2138 Reply,,, by Microsoft In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2138 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 2053 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Microsoft for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356 Reply in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356 filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Microsoft's Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 its Redacted Reply ISO MSJ re No Willful Infringement# 2 Declaration of Lara S. Garner in Support of Microsoft's Reply re No Willful Infringement# 3 Exhibit 2 to Lara Garner Declaration ISO MS Reply re No Willful Infringement)(Garner, Lara) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2137 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re 2049 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. filed by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF JOSEPH A. MICALLEF IN SUPPORT OF THE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DELL INC.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT OF THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; AND 4,763,356# 2 Notice of Joinder by Dell Inc. In Gateways Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day# 3 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2136 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 Submitted in Support of Gateway's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) [including Proof of Service] by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2135 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY re 2119 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) filed by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Plies in Support of Gateway's Reply Brief# 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jeffrey B. Plies# 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jeffrey B. Plies# 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jeffrey B. Plies# 5 Proof of Service)(Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2134 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry - A telephonic Bill of Cost hearing was held on October 12, 2007 at 10:00 am regarding "Group II". Microsoft is to file by close of business on October 19, 2007, declarations of Mr. Andrews and Kyle Huston regarding the invoices involving the charges for demonstratives. Any opposition by Lucent Technologies is to be filed by close of business on October 24, 2007. Upon receipt of the additional information, the Clerk's Office will notify the parties if a further hearing will be scheduled. Present telephonically: Frank Albert, Justin Barnes & John Thornburgh for Microsoft Corporation; Paul Bondor and Sean McEldowney for Lucent Technologies, Inc.)(nsp) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2133 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Costs Taxed re: Doughty (956) Patent in amount of $3,522.84 against Lucent Technologies, Inc in favor of Dell Inc. (nsp) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2130 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION REQUEST TO ALLOW COUNSEL FOR DELL INC. TO BRING EQUIPMENT TO THE HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT OF THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; AND 4,763,356 by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2129 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 2093 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Declaration of Paul A. Bondor in Support of Lucent's Objections to Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2128 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Clarifying Chambers Policy re Equipment and granting 2127 Motion to Allow Cousel for Microsoft Corporation to Bring Equipment for 10/19/2007 Hearing. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/10/07. (agp) Modified on 10/10/2007 to add to text (agp)(mam). (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2127 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Request to Allow Counsel for Microsoft Corporation to Bring Equipment to the Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment on No Willful Infringement of The Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356 by Microsoft Corporation. (Garner, Lara) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2126 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to Dell's Second Amended Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2125 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to Gateway's Second Amended Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2124 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to Microsoft's Second Amended Counter-Counterclaims by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2123 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 2120 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgement of No Willfil Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226 (Hasckell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); AND 4,763,356 (Day). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/09/07. (agp) (mam). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2122 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Bill of Cost hearings on Group II and 956 Patent. Pursuant to the request and joint concurrence of the parties, the hearings set for Tuesday, October 9, 2007 at 1:30 pm and 3:00 pm are vacated and rescheduled for Friday, Ocotber 12, 2007 at 10:00 am. (nsp) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2121 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust Proof of Service (Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2120 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust's Request for Leave to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits Submitted ISO Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) re 2119 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2119 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 2049 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759., 2056 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day), 2053 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Microsoft for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356 Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan Malz# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 22)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2118 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Objection to Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Bill of Costs re 2084 (Doughty (956) Patent; Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) Modified on 10/10/2007 to add patent number (nsp). (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2117 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying Dell's 2080 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 10/3/2007. Dell's motion for atty's fees denied w/o prejudice to renewal depending on outcome of appellate proceedings. (jah) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2116 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA (federal Circuit) re 2088 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2115 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA (federal circuit) re 2027 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2114 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation: No Transcripts Designated (transcripts already on file) re 2088 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2113 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1580 for 2088 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Microsoft Corporation. (mkz) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2112 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 2080 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lucent's Opposition to Dell's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Related to the Doughty '956 Patent filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2111 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 2110 Motion for Miscellaneous Administrative Motions to Withdraw Attorney. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/02/07. (agp)(bar). (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2110 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to Withdraw Attorney for Lucent Technologies Inc. and Multimedia Patent Trust by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2109 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1980 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in part and denying in part 1981 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in part and denying in part 1992 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 10/1/2007. (jah) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2108 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David A Hahn on behalf of Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2107 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 2024 Order, by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee Paid, receipt #142932) (mkz) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2106 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jonas McDavit appearing for Plaintiff Lucent Technologies, Inc. (jah) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2105 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 09/26/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (mkz) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2104 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated re 2102 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 2103 Notice (Other) (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2103 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Incorporated re 2102 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DELLS AMENDMENT TO ITS ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO ADD AN UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2102 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Lucent Technologies, Inc. by Dell Incorporated. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2101 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2007 re MOTION 1980 for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Defense of License, MOTION 1981 for Summary Judgment on Trust-Related Defenses and Counterclaims, MOTION 1992 for Summary Judgment re License, Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands. ORDER TO ISSUE. MOTION 2080 for Award Attorneys Fees Related to the Doughty (956) Patent - DEFERRED. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle.) (Lucent Attorneys: Robert A. Appleby, John M. Desmarais, James Marina, Michael P. Stadnick). (Microsoft Attorneys: John Gartman, Cathy L. Reese). (Gateway Attorneys: Steven R. Daniels, W. Bryan Farney, Jeffrey B. Plies). (Dell Attorneys: James S. Blackburn, Joel Freed). (mjm) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2100 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE: On September 25, 2007,documents were filed by Microsoft Corporation relating to the Bill of Cost hearing scheduled for September 25, 2007 at 2:00 pm. The Bill of Cost hearing scheduled for September 25, 2007 at 2:00 pm is vacated and continued to October 9, 2007 at 1:30 pm. (nsp) Modified on 9/25/2007 to correct vacated hearing date (nsp). (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2099 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lodgment of Exhibits in Support of Microsoft Corporation's Reply in support of its Group II Motion for Award of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(nsp) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2098 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of John Gartman Regarding Microsoft Corporation's Reply in Support of its Group II Motion for Award of Costs. (nsp) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2097 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY of Microsoft Corporation in Support of its Group II Motion for Award of Costs (nsp) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2096 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 2095 Request to Seal Reply in support of Microsoft's Group II Motion for Award of Costs. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/25/07. (nsp) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2094 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/24/2007. Lucent Technologies allowed to bring and set-up the following equipment in the Courtroom of Judge Brewster for hearings on 9/26/2007: 1.) projector, 2.) large projection screen, 3.) 2 laptop computers and miscellaneous peripherals, 4.) audio visual equipment, and 5.) document camera (ELMO). (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2093 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. Lucent's Objections to Microsoft's Group II Bill of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Aaron Schechter# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (mkz). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2092 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION 1992 for Summary Judgment re License, Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands and STATUS RE MOTION 2080 for Award Attorneys Fees Related to the Doughty (956) Patent set for 9/26/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2091 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 2053 for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356 by Microsoft and Motion 2056 for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (FLEMING); 4,958,226 (HASKELL); 4,383,272 (NETRAVALI); AND 4,763,356 (DAY) by Gateway. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (mjm) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2090 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/19/2007. Counsel for Microsoft Corpauthorized to bring and set-up into the courtroom for hearings on 9/26/2007 the following equipment: A.) high resolution projector, B.) large projection screen, C.) (5) laptop computers, D.) external hard drive, E.) document camera (ELMO), and F.) printer. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2089 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Re: Equipment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/19/2007. Dell, Inc. is authorized to bring 2 laptop computers into the the courtroom for summary judgment motion hearings on 9/26/2007. (cc: USMS)(jah) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2088 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 1977 Judgment, by Microsoft Corporation. (Filing fee Paid, receipt #142597) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Part 2# 2 Notice of Appeal Part 3)(mkz) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2087 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. re 2080 MOTION for Attorney Fees Filed by Dell, Inc. related to Doughty ('956) Patent (Plies, Jeffrey) (mkz). (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2086 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lucent Technologies, Inc.: No Transcripts Designated (transcripts already on file) re 2027 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2085 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to 1018 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. and Multimedia Patent Trust with, COUNTERCLAIM against Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc t/w jury demand (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Plies, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/19/2007 to add jury demand made with this amended answer(mam). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2084 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE: A Bill of Costs was filed by Dell Inc scheduling a hearing for October 9, 2007 at 3:00 pm. Any opposition to this Bill of Cost is to be filed by close of business on October 4, 2007. All parties requesting to appear telephonically for this hearing are to join on a conference call, then call 619-557-6415. (nsp) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2083 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint In Case No. 03-CV-1108 B (CAB) 922 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lucent Technologies, Inc. by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) Modified on 9/19/2007 to note that there is a jury demand with this amended answer (mam). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2082 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated re 2081 Bill of Costs, 2080 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Micallef, Joseph) (mkz). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2081 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BILL OF COSTS submitted by Defendant Dell Incorporated in the amount of $ $7953.22. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Dells Bill of Costs Related to the Doughty (956) Patent# 2 Declaration in Support of Dells Memorandum of Costs Related to the Doughty (956) Patent# 3 Bill of Costs)(Micallef, Joseph) (mkz). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2080 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Dells Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Related to the Doughty (956) Patent# 2 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef in Support of Dells Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Related to the Doughty (956) Patent, Exhibits A-D# 3 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef in Support of Dells Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Related to the Doughty (956) Patent, Exhibits E-H)(Micallef, Joseph) (mkz). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2079 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Microsoft Corporation's Second Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim by Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust, Counter COUNTERCLAIM against Multimedia Patent Trust, Lucent Technologies, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation.(Vyas, Shekhar) (mkz). (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2078 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1546 for 2027 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (mkz) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2077 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request to File Documents Under Seal by Dell Incorporated. (Request previously granted per 9/14/2007 Order 2068 ) (jah) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2076 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Defendants' 1972 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/14/2007. Court finds good cause for the amendments. Dfts shall file amended pleadings by 9/18/2007. Plaintiffs shall file any responsive pleading no later than 20 days after service of Dfts' amended answer and counterclaims.(jah) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2068 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Dell Inc's Request to File Under Seal, re Dell Inc's Reply in Support of its Motion on Behalf of All Defendants for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on the Defense of License; and Exhibits 1 through 11 attached to the Declaration of James S. Blackburn in Support of Dell Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion on Behalf of All Defendants for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on the Defense of License. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 09/13/07. (jcj) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2067 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 2063 Motion, allowing Microsoft Corporation to file pleadings under seal in support of its reply brief regarding its motion for summary judgment on counter-counterclaims and defense related to multimedia patent trust. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/13/07. (vrp)(mam). (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2066 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2064 Multimedia Patent Trust's and Lucent's Request to file under seal pursuant to civil Local Rule 79-2. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/13/07. (vrp) (mam). (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 1992 MOTION for Summary Judgment re License, Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands--filed by hand with the Court 8/17/07 filed by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Motion to File Under Seal Multimedia Patent Trust's and Lucent's Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2063 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to file documents under seal in support of Microsoft's Reply Brief regarding its Motion for Summary Judgment on Counter-Counterclaims and Defenses Related to MPT by Microsoft Corporation. (Gartman, John) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2062 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Order Entry on 9/12/07: The Court grants MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Two Exhibits Submitted in Support of Gateway's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4, 439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.(tlm) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2061 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated for Dell Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion on Behalf of All Defendants for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on the Defense of License [Filed Under Seal] (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2060 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated re 2056 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2059 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 2056 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) filed by Gateway (Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Two Exhibits Submitted in Support of Gateway's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4, 439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated re 2053 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Microsoft for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Gateways's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement# 2 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Plies in Support of Gateway's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Proof of Service)(Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2055 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. re 2053 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Microsoft for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356 (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2054 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that a Motion Hearing is set for 10/19/2007 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/10/07 (agp)(mam). (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2053 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Microsoft for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356 by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356# 2 Declaration of John E. Gartman in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356# 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Gartman in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295 and 4,763,356)(Gartman, John) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2052 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. re 2049 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2051 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Order Entry of proceedings on 9/10/07 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff during motion hearing proceedings in 07cv0747-H: 2049 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. set 10/19/07 at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff (tlm) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2050 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 2049 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. Notice of Joinder by Microsoft to Dell Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement (Gartman, John) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2049 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Dell Inc.s Motion for No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759.# 2 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef in Support of Dell Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759, attaching Exhibit 1.# 3 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2048 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brian M. Rostocki appearing for Intervenor Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendants Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation (agp)(mam). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2040 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 2015 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal re: Gateway's Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/4/07. (aje) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2039 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Microsoft Corporation's Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2 in Support of its Microsoft Corporation's Group II Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Award of Costs. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 09/05/07. (agp)(mam). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2034 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Allowing Microsoft Corporation to File Exhibits Under Seal in Support of its Opposition to Lucent Technologies, Inc.'s and Multimedia Patent Trust's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 09/04/07. (agp) (mam). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2032 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 2031 Dell Inc.'s Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/4/07. (aje) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2031 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(aje) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2028 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2016 Multimedia Patent Trust's Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-2. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/4/07. (aje) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2027 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1977 Judgment, by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee Paid, receipt #142120) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Part 2)(mkz) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2026 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Cathy L. Reese appearing for Intervenor Microsoft Corporation, Counter Claimants Microsoft Corporation, Counter Defendants Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (agp)(mam). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2025 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2007. MOTION 1989 for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759 - Granted. MOTION 1990 for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) - Granted. MOTION 1995 for Leave to File Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356 - Granted. Order 2011 issued. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle). (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, Michael P. Stadnick). (Microsoft Attorneys Lara S. Garner, John Gartman, Christopher S. Marchese). (Gateway Attorney Jeffrey B. Plies). (Dell Attorneys Joel Freed, Joseph Micallef, Ali R. Sharifahmadian). (mjm) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2024 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED PARTIAL JUDGMENT following Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 only, under FRCP 54(b). The Court enters judgement as to the 956 patent as follows: (1) no literal infringement; (2) no infringement under the doctrine of equivalents; (3) no inducing infringement; and (4) no contributory infringement. The Court finds that there is no just reason for delay and upon an express direction for the entry of judgment, the Court therefore enters final judgment on these issues under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). Any causes of action remaining with respect to the 956 patent shall remain pending off-calendar to abide the results of the appeal. This judgment shall not terminate the action as to any other patents in this consolidated case.. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 09/04/07. (agp)(mam). (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2023 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated re 2022 Notice of Joinder, 2021 Notice of Joinder (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2022 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated in Microsoft Corporations Opposition to Lucent Technologies, Inc.s and Multimedia Patent Trusts Motion for Summary Judgment (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2021 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated in Gateways Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2020 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway, Inc. to Dell Inc.'s Opposition to MPT's and Lucent's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment on Trust Related Defenses and Counterclaims (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2019 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway, Inc. to Microsoft Corporation's Opposition to Lucent and MPT's Motion for Summary Judgment (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2018 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 08/29/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (mkz) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2017 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re 2016 Response in Opposition to Motion, Lucent's Notice of Joinder to Multimedia Patent Trust's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Trust-Related Issues filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2016 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 1980 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Defense of License Declaration of Gerard Deblasi in Support of Multimedia Patent Trust's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Trust-Related Issues filed by Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bernard Zucker# 2 Request to File Under Seal# 3 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2015 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Gateway's Opposition to Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust's Motion for Summary Judgment by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service re: 1) Gateway's Motion to File Under Seal and 2) Gateway's Opposition to Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2014 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation to Gateway, Inc.'s Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lucent and Multimedia Patent Trust (Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2013 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 2012 Declaration, of James Blackburn filed by Dell, Inc. in support of it's Opposition to Lucent's Motion for Summary Judgment re Trust Issues (Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2012 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of James S. Blackburn in Support of Dells Opposition to Multimedia Patent Trusts and Lucents Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment on Trust Related Defenses and Counterclaims with Exhibits 1-10; by Defendant Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2011 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Microsoft, Dell and Gateway's 1989 Motion for Leave to File to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement, 1990 Motion for Leave to File to Motion for Partial Judgment of No Willful Infringement, and granting 1995 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Sumamry Judgment of No Willful Infringement. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/29/2007. Dfts are directed to obtain new hearing date from chambers of Judge Huff and re-notice abd refile motions based on new date. (jah) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2009 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/28/2007. Gateway's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Gateway's motion for summary judgment on the defenses of license, equitable estoppel and unclean hands is to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2004 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Allowing Microsift to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/27/2007. Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment on counter-counterclaims and defenses related to Multimedia Patent Trust and Lucent's motion for summary on counter-counterclaims and defenses related to Multimedia Patent Trust, Microsoft's Request to File Under Seal, Declaration of Christopher S. Marchese w/ Exhibits A-G are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2001 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Multimedia Patent Trust and Lucent's motion documents under seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/27/2007. Multimedia Patent Trust and Lucent's Memorandum of Points and Authorities motions for summary judgment on trust-related defenses and counterclaims and Declaration of James E. Marina w/ attached Exhibits 1-24 are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1998 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Dell's 1997 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/27/2007. Dell's motion for summary judgment on behalf of all Dfts and Exhibits 1,3-11,14,16-21,23,24,28-39 to the Declaration of James S. Blackburn are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1997 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document by Dell Incorporated. (jah) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1996 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 1735 Notice of Cross Appeal, 1554 Notice of Appeal: Appeal nos. 2007-1335 and 2007-1338 are dismissed. All parties shall bear their own costs as to appeal nos. 2007-1335 and 2007-1338. (mkz) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1995 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356 by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356# 2 Declaration Declaration of John E. Gartman in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of JOhn E. Gartman in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John E. Gartman in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John E. Gartman in Support of Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; and 4,763,356)(Gartman, John) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1994 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 1991 Notice of Joinder, Notice of Joinder by Microsoft to Dell Inc.'s and Gateway, Inc.'s Motions for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement (Gartman, John) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1993 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment REQUEST TO FILE MSJ RE LICENSE, EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL AND UNCLEAN HANDS UNDER SEAL by Gateway, Inc.. (Clegg, Richard) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1992 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment re License, Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands--filed by hand with the Court 8/17/07 by Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven Daniels in Support of MSJ re License, Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to SRD Dec# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to SRD Dec# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to SRD Dec# 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to SRD Dec# 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to SRD Dec# 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to SRD Dec# 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to SRD Dec# 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to SRD Dec)(Clegg, Richard) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1991 Filed: 8/25/2007, Entered: 8/25/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. re 1989 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. Filed by Dell Inc. (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1990 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,439,759 (Fleming); 4,958,226 (Haskell); 4,383,272 (Netravali); and 4,763,356 (Day) by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Gateway's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement# 2 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Plies in Support of Gateway's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement (with Exhibits 1-2)# 3 Proof of Service)(Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1989 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759. by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Dell Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759.# 2 Declaration of Joseph A. Micallef in Support of Dell Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226; 4,383,272; 5,347,295; 4,763,356; and 4,439,759, attaching Exhibits# 3 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1988 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Microsoft's 1987 Motion for Extension of Time to File Group II Motion for Award of Costs and Bill of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/20/2007. Microsoft is granted 14 day extension until 9/4/2007 to file its Bill of Costs of Group II Case of the consolidated case nos. 02cv2060, 03cv699 and 03cv1108. (jah) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1987 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Motion for Award of Costs and Bill of Costs by Microsoft Corporation. (Albert, Francis) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1986 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated in Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counter-Counterclaims and Defenses Related to Multimedia Patent Trust (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1985 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Joinder by Dell Incorporated IN GATEWAYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE DEFENSES OF LICENSE, EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL AND UNCLEAN HANDS (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1984 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation to Group 1 Gateway's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Defenses of License, Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands (Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1983 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Joinder by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. to Motions for Summary Judgment Filed by Microsoft and Dell (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1982 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Joinder by Microsoft Corporation re 1980 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Defense of License filed by Dell re Group 1 Video (Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1981 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Multimedia Patent Trust's and Lucent's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment on Trust-Related Defenses and Counterclaims by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Motion to File Under Seal# 2 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1980 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Defense of License by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James S. Blackburn in Support of Dells Motion on Behalf of All Defendants for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Defense of License, with Exhibits 1-7# 2 Exhibit 8-39 to the James S. Blackburn Declaration in Support of Dells Motion on Behalf of All Defendants for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Defense of License# 3 Proof of Service)(Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1979 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry re proceedings before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: The 8/15/2007 motion hearing - vacated. Lucent's Group II Motion 1787 for Award of Attorney Fees - Denied as moot. Microsoft's Sealed Motion 1946 to Retax Costs (Group 2) - Granted. (See 1976 .) (Court Reporter N/A). (mjm) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1978 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal and Cross-Appeal re U.S. Patent No. 4,317,956 (Appeal Nos. 2007-1335 and 2007-1338) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Corbett, Gregory) Modified on 8/8/2007 ro indicate cc: USCA (Federal Circuit) (mkz). (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1977 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED AND SUPERCEDING JUDGMENT in favor of Microsoft against Lucent. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/6/2007. Lucent shall bear the costs of suit. This judgment terminates the action as it pertains to US Patent Nos. 5,341,457 and RE 39,080, it shall not terminate the action as to any other patents in this consolidated case. (jah) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1976 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot Lucent's 1787 Motion for Attorney Fees. Microsoft's motion to retax costs is granted. Court Clerk's award of costs to Lucent is vacated. The 8/15/2007 hearing date on the motions is vacated. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/6/2007. (jah) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part Microsoft's 1785 Motion for New Trial. Denying as moot Lucent's 1786 Motion to Amend or Alter the Judgment Re: US Patent Nos. 5,341,457 and RE 39,080. Granting in part and denying in part Microsoft's 1788 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/6/2007. (jah) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1971 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1970 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 8/1/2007. Dfts' motion for leave to file amended answers and counterclaims, Decl of James S. Blackburn and Gateway's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1970 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Dell Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(jah) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1969 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ISO of Suppl Memo re Ownership of New Work# 2 Exhibit B ISO of Suppl Memo re Ownership of New Work# 3 Exhibit C ISO of Suppl Memo re Ownership of New Work)(Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1968 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Group 1 Notice of Errata Lodging Second Amended Reply to Lucent and MPT Counterclaims and Assertion of Additional Claims by Microsoft Against Lucent and MPT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vyas, Shekhar) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael P. Stadnick in Support of Lucent's Supplemental Post-Trial Brief Concerning U.S. Patent No. RE 39,080# 2 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1966 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 1959 Notice of Hearing on Motion Lucent's Reply in Opposition to Microsoft's Group II Motion to Retax Costs filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Omar Khan# 2 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07/26/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (mkz) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Order for Proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motion Hearing Held and the following motions are submitted: 1785 Motion for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents; 1786 Motion to alter or amend the Group 2 Judgment pursuant to FRCvP 59(e); 1788 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents (Court Reporter J. Hinkle / CRD A Ramos / Robert A. Appleby, Esq., Paul A Bondor, Esq., John Desmarais, Esq., and Michael P. Stadnick, Esq. appeared for Lucent Technologies / ALan D. ALbright, Esq., Justin M. Barnes, Esq., Matthew C. Bernstein, Esq., John M. Bustamante, Esq., John E. Gartman, Esq., Stephen P. McGrath, Esq., Thomas N. Millikan, Esq., and John W. Thornburg, Esq., appeared for Microsoft)(acr) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying in part Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment on US Patent No. 4,383,272. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Dell's motions regarding invalidity of the '272 patent for lack of written description and anticipation are denied. (Motion filed in 03cv1108, No. 47)(jah) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07/25/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (mkz) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1961 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2007. MOTION 1785 for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents, MOTION 1786 to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e), and MOTION 1788 for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents - held and cont to 07-26-07 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle). (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, Paul A. Bondor, John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick). (Microsoft Attorneys Alan D. Albright, Justin M. Barnes, Matthew Bernstein, John M. Bustamante, John Gartman, Stephen P. McGrath, Thomas N. Millikan, John W. Thornburg). (mjm) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1960 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07/24/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting, Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Lucent's Motion 1787 for Award of Attorney Fees (Group II) set for 8/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1958 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Lucent's 1886 Motion to Retax Group III Costs, Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/25/2007. (jah) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1957 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Microsoft's Sealed Motion 1946 to Retax Costs (Group 2) set for 8/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1956 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Miscellaneous (Motion) Hearing held on 7/24/2007 as to Motion Filed in consolidated Case 03cv1108-B(CAB) - Sealed Motion 47 for Summary Judgment on the Asserted Claim of US Patent No. 4,383,272 to Netravali - Submitted. Court to issue order. Status re Motions set for 7/25/07 and 7/26/07 held. (Court Reporter Jennie Hinkle). (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick). (Microsoft Attorney Christopher Marchese). (Gateway Attorneys Jeffrey B. Plies). (Dell Attorneys Matthew Bathon, Joel Freed). (mjm) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1955 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 1886 MOTION to Retax Microsoft's Group III Costs filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service re Lucent's Reply in Support of Motion to Retax Microsoft's Group III Costs)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1954 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER amending scheduling order re briefing trust/licensing issues. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/20/07. (tkl) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1953 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Allowing Counsel for Dell Inc. to Bring Equipment to Trial Group I Summary Judgment Hearing. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/18/07. (vet) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1952 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order Regarding Briefing on Trust/Licensing Issues by Microsoft Corporation, Lucent Technologies, Inc., Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Dell Incorporated, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1951 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Allowing Counsel for Lucent Technologies Inc. to Bring Equipment into Courtroom. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/17/07. (vet) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1950 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request and ORDER to Withdraw Attorneys for Defendant Dell Inc. Attorneys Sidney A. Rosenzweig and Truc Nguyen may withdraw as counsel for defendant Dell Inc. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/12/07. (vet) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1949 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 1886 MOTION to Retax Microsoft's Group III Costs filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Albert, Francis) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying Gateway's motion for summary jgm that U.S. Pantent No. 4,383,272 is invalid under 35 USC 102(g) and granting summary adjudication on certain predicate issues pertaining to this defense.. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/12/07. (tkl) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1944 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Microsoft's request to file pleadings and exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/12/2007. Microsoft's Motion to retax costs, Declaration of Francis J. Albert and Exhibits A-N are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1943 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey B Plies (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1942 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re 1941 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Multimedia Patent Trust's Response to Gateway's Notice of Proposed Order Concerning Gateway's Motion for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent No. 4,383,272 is Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 102(g) filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1941 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc. of Proposed Order for Gateway's Motion for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent No. 4,383,272 is Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(g)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1940 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Order on Motion to CertifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying Microsoft's 1843 Motion to Certify Order Disqualifying the Firm of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP for Interlocutory Appeal to the Federal Circuit Under 28 USC 1292(b).Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/9/2007. (jah) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1939 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part Dell's Motions for Summary Judgment on US Patent Nos. 4,958,226 and 4,383,272. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/5/2007. Dell's motion as to no infringement of "226 and '272 patents by Sonic products is granted. Dell's motion as to no recovery of pre-suit damages is denied. Dell's motion as to anticipation of '226 patent is denied. Remaining motions on obviousness as to '226 patent and invalidity of '272 patent based on anticipation and lack of written description are deferred. (Motions filed in 03cv1108, Nos. 46 and 47).(jah) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1938 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part/denying in part Dfts' motion for no infringement of US patent no. 4,958,226. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/3/2007. Dfts' motion is granted as to no infringment under the doctine of equivalents and denied as to no literal infringement. (jah) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1937 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/3/2007. Denying Gateway's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Recovery of Pre-Suit Damages Regarding US Patent Nos. 4,958,226 and 4,383,272.(jah) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1936 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing as to Motion Filed in consolidated Case 03cv1108-B(CAB) - Motion 47 for Summary Judgment on the Asserted Claim of US Patent No. 4,383,272 to Netravali - Granted in Part / Denied in Part / Deferred in Part on 6/21/07. Further MOTION (Miscellaneous) Hearing is set for 7/24/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1935 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Costs Taxed (Group 2)in amount of $388,092.58 against Microsoft Corporation (nsp) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re 1920 Response in Opposition to Motion, For 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) Certification of Disqualification Order filed by Microsoft Corporation. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1929 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Lucent's Motion to File Response to Objections to Group II Supplemental Bill of Costs Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 7/2/2007. Lucent's Response to Microsoft's Objections to Group II Bill of Costs and Supplemental Declaration of Jason Choy are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1928 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. Proof of Service of Lucent's Response to Microsoft's Objections to Lucent's Group II Supplemental Bill of Costs Filed Under Seal (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1924 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Microsoft Corporation's request to file under seal pursuant to civil local rule 79-2 in support of its response to Lucent Technologies' Group 2 Bill of Costs Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/27/07. (vet) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1923 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting-in-part and denying-in-part plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on U.S. Patent No. 4,383,272. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/27/07. (vet) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1922 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting-in-part and denying-in-part plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 4,958,226. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/27/07. (vet) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1921 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting-in-part and denying-in-part summary judgment of no infringement on U.S. Patent No. 4,383,272. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/27/07. (vet) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1920 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 1843 Motion to Certify Disqualification Order for 1292(b) Interlocutory Appeal Motion to Certify Disqualification Order for 1292(b) Interlocutory Appeal Lucent's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Certification of Disqualification Order filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1919 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of USCA receipt of Certificate of Record re 1554 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2007-1335 (mkz) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1918 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of USCA receipt of Certificate of Record re 1553 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2007-1334 (mkz) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1917 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of USCA receipt of Certificate of Record re 1555 Notice of Appeal filed by Gateway Companies, Inc., Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway, Inc. USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2007-1336 (mkz) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1916 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of USCA receipt of Certificate of Record re 1736 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dell Incorporated, Microsoft Corporation. USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2007-1337 (mkz) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of USCA receipt of Certificate of Record re 1735 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Gateway Companies, Inc., Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway, Inc. USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2007-1338 (mkz) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of USCA receipt of Certificate of Record re 1840 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. USCA Case Number 2007-1376 (mkz) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Miscellaneous (Motion) Hearing held on 6/21/2007. Sealed MOTION 1406 (Group 3) for Award of Attorneys' Fees - Deferred Until Further Order of the Court. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle). (Lucent Attorneys John M. Desmarais, Ephraim Starr). (Microsoft Attorneys Frank J. Albert, John Gartman, John W. Thornburgh). (mjm) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1912 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/21/07 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (jcj) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/20/07 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (jcj) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED as to ruling on Motion 47 Filed in consolidated Case 03cv1108-B(CAB). Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2007. Motion 477 for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 4,383,272 is Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 102 (g)(2) - Denied. Motion 493 for Summary Judgment concerning U.S. Patent 4,383,272 - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. Sealed Motion 519 for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of US Patent No 4,383,272 - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. As to Motion Filed in consolidated Case 03cv1108-B(CAB) - Motion 47 for Summary Judgment on the Asserted Claim of US Patent No. 4,383,272 to Netravali - Granted in Part / Denied in Part/ Deferred in Part. Further Hearing date to be determined by Court at appropriate time. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle) (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick). (Microsoft Attorneys Christopher Marchese, Thomas N. Millikan). (Gateway Attorneys W. Bryan Farney, Jeffrey B. Plies). (Dell Attorneys Joel Freed, Joseph Micallef). (mjm) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1909 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2007. Motion 477 for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 4,383,272 is Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 102 (g)(2) - Denied. Motion 493 for Summary Judgment concerning U.S. Patent 4,383,272 - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. Sealed Motion 519 for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of US Patent No 4,383,272 - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. As to Motion Filed in consolidated Case 03cv1108-B(CAB) - Motion [47-1] for Summary Judgment on the Asserted Claim of US Patent No. 4,383,272 to Netravali - Denied. (Court Reporter Jennifer Hinkle) (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick). (Microsoft Attorneys Christopher Marchese, Thomas N. Millikan). (Gateway Attorneys W. Bryan Farney, Jeffrey B. Plies). (Dell Attorneys Joel Freed, Joseph Micallef). (mjm) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1908 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/19/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (mkz) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1907 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster :Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2007 Denying 478 Motion for Summary Judgment; Ggranting in part and Denying in part 486 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in part and Denying in part 515 Motion for Summary Judgment; Case:03cv1108 Granting in part and Denying in part[46-1]Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing continued to 6/20/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (Court Reporter J. Hinkle.)(Plaintiff Attorney Robert Appleby/John Desmarais/ Michael Stadnick).(Defendant Attorney W. Bryan Farney/ Jeffrey Plies/ Joel Freed/Joseph Micallef/ Counter-defendant Attorney Christopher Marchese/John Gartman/Thomas Millikan/Shekhar Vyas). (lsf ) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1903 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Lucent's Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/18/2007. Lucent's Group II Supplemental Bill of Costs, Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Bill of Costs, Declaration of Jason Choy and Exhibits A-L are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1902 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. Proof of Service of Documents Filed Under Seal re Lucent's Group II Supplemental Bill of Costs (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Allowing Counsel to Bring Equipment to Hearing for Group III Motion for Award for Attys' Fees. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/14/2007. Counsel permitted to bring and setup into the courtroom of Judge Brewster the following equipment for Microsoft's Group 3 Motion for Award of Attys' Fees to be held on 6/21/2007: A) high resolution projector, B) large projection screen, C) five laptop computers, D) document camera (ELMO), and E) printer. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1900 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Allowing Microsoft Corporation to Bring Equipment to Hearing. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/14/2007. Counsel for Microsoft permitted to bring Laptop Computers and Miscellaneous Peripherals into the courthouse on 6/19/07, 6/20/07, and 6/21/07. Microsoft will be allowed to enter the courthouse at 8:30am to set up the equipment in advance of the hearing. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1899 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Allowing Dell, Inc to Bring Equipment to Trial Group 1 Summary Judgment Hearing. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/14/2007. Counsel for Dell, Inc. permitted to bring into the courtroom and set-up two laptop computers for the Trial Group 1 Summary Judgment to be held on 6/19-20/2007. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1898 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Allowing Lucent to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/14/2007. Counsel for Lucent permitted to bring the following equipment into the Courtroom for hearings on 6/19/07, 6/20/07, and 6/21/07: 1.) projector, 2.) large projection screen, 3.) three laptop computers and miscellaneous peripherals, 4.) five flat panel monitors (includes touch-screen enabled monitors, 5.) document camera (ELMO), 6.) switches, 7.) distribution amplifiers, 8.) four A/V carts, and 9.) nine VGA cables. Lucent will be allowed into the courtroom at 8:30am to set-up equipment. (cc: USMS) (jah) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1895 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Lucent's Motion to File the Declaration of Denise McGlone Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/12/2007. Declaration of Denise McGlone in support of Lucent's motion to alter or amend the judgment pursuant to FRCP 59(e) to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1894 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Lucent's 1879 Motion (Filed as Notice) to File Exhibits 53 and 55 Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/12/2007. Exhibits 53 and 55 to the supplemental declaration of Elizabeth T. Bernard in support of Lucent's reply in support of Group 2 motion for award of attys fees shall be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA re 1840 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1892 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA re 1736 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1891 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA (Federal Circuit) re 1735 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA (Federal Circuit) re 1554 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1889 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA (Federal Circuit) re 1553 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA (Federal Circuit) re 1736 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION 1886 to Retax Microsoft's Group III Costs set for 7/30/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1886 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Retax Microsoft's Group III Costs by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct 1884 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 1788 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents Microsoft's Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Group 2 Audio Patents by Microsoft Corporation. (Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 1788 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents GROUP 2 Notice of Errata re Microsoft's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1883 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 1881 Reply to Response to Motion, 1882 Reply to Response to Motion GROUP 2 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits to Microsoft's Replies to Post Trial Motions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 90# 2 Exhibit Ex. 91# 3 Exhibit Ex. 92# 4 Exhibit Ex. 93# 5 Exhibit Ex. 94# 6 Exhibit Ex. 95# 7 Exhibit Ex. 96# 8 Exhibit Ex. 97# 9 Exhibit Ex. 98# 10 Exhibit Ex. 99# 11 Exhibit Ex. 100# 12 Exhibit Ex. 101# 13 Exhibit Ex. 102# 14 Exhibit Ex. 103# 15 Exhibit Ex. 104# 16 Exhibit Ex. 105# 17 Exhibit Ex. 106# 18 Exhibit Ex. 107# 19 Exhibit Ex. 108# 20 Exhibit Ex. 109)(Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 1785 MOTION for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents GROUP 2 filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1881 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 1788 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents GROUP 2 filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY re 1786 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1781 MOTION to Amend/Correct Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lucent's Motion to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Notice of Motion Lucent's Reply in Support of its Motion to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Barnard# 2 Notice Motion to File Under Seal# 3 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1879 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1877 Reply, Lucent's Motion to File Exhibits 53 and 55 to the Supplemental Declaration of Elizabeth T. Bernard in Support of Lucent's Reply in Support of its Group 2 Motion for Award of Attorney Fees Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-2 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison). (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1877 Reply, Exhibit 44 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45# 2 Exhibit 46# 3 Exhibit 47# 4 Exhibit 48# 5 Exhibit 49# 6 Exhibit 50# 7 Exhibit 51# 8 Exhibit 52# 9 Exhibit 54# 10 Exhibit 56)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re 1787 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lucent's Notice of Group II Motion for Award of Attorney Fees Lucent's Reply in Support of its Group 2 Motion for Award of Attorney Fees filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth Bernard# 2 Exhibit 39# 3 Exhibit 40# 4 Exhibit 41# 5 Exhibit 42# 6 Exhibit 43)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER for Groups 1,4,5,and 6 Patents: Discovery Conference on 6/6/2007. Motions for Summary Judgment shall be heard 6/19/2007 and 6/20/2007 9:00am in Courtroom B before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motions Re: Trust/Licensing on Group 1/6 Patents shall be heard 9/6/2007 9:00am before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Dfts shall file opening briefs on the obviousness defense re: Groups 1/6, 4 and 5 patents by 11/30/2007. Pla shall file opposition brief by 12/14/2007. Dfts shall file reply briefs on the obviousness defense by 12/21/2007. Motions for Summary Judgment on the Obviousness Defense shall be heard 1/7/2007 10:30am in Courtroom H before Judge Marilyn Huff. Jury Trial set for 2/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom H before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom H before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Memo of Content of Facts and Law due by 1/14/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/28/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/7/2007. (jah) Modified text on 6/20/2007 to indicate "Jury Trial" in place of "Bench Trial", as per Huff Chambers (jcj). (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Lucent's 1863 Motion to File Exhibits MX 17 and 18 to Declaration of Jason Choy in Opposition to Microsoft's Post-Trial Motions Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/5/2007. (jah) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Costs Taxed in amount of $12,000.00 against Lucent Technologies Inc as to Group 3 (Patent 4,701,954) (nsp) Modified on 6/6/2007 to include patent number (nsp, ). (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Microsoft's Request to File Exhibits Re: Group Oppositions to Lucent's Post-Trial Motions Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/5/2007. Declaration of Thobias Jones, Declaraton of Matthew Roberts and Notice of Lodgment and Lodgment of Exhibits 1-79 are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1833 Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance by Attys David G. Hetzel, Ronald W. Zdrojeski and Mark A. Walsh. Attorneys Ronald W Zdrojeski; David G Hetzel and Mark A Walsh terminated. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/4/2007. (jah) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Cecil E Key (Key, Cecil). Modified on 6/5/2007 - Atty's address updated in case. Atty Maint (jah). (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1376 for 1840 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Motion to File Exhibits MX 17 and MX 18 to the Declaration of Jason Choy Under Seal re 1850 Declaration, by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1862 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MX 11# 2 Exhibit MX 12# 3 Exhibit MX 13# 4 Exhibit MX 14# 5 Exhibit MX 15# 6 Exhibit MX 16# 7 Exhibit MX 19# 8 Exhibit MX 20)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibit MX 9 to Choy Declaration (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MX 4# 2 Exhibit MX 5# 3 Exhibit MX 6# 4 Exhibit MX 7)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DX 6099# 2 Exhibit DX 6356# 3 Exhibit DX 6489# 4 Exhibit DX 6715# 5 Exhibit DX 7049# 6 Exhibit DX 7050# 7 Exhibit DX 7051# 8 Exhibit MX 1# 9 Exhibit MX 2)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX 3136# 2 Exhibit PX 3142# 3 Exhibit PX 3143# 4 Exhibit PX 3144# 5 Exhibit PX 3145# 6 Exhibit PX 3146# 7 Exhibit PX 3147# 8 Exhibit PX 3148# 9 Exhibit PX 3149# 10 Exhibit PX 3173)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX 1559# 2 Exhibit PX 1560# 3 Exhibit PX 1832# 4 Exhibit PX 1843# 5 Exhibit PX 1871# 6 Exhibit PX 1872# 7 Exhibit PX1873# 8 Exhibit PX 3037)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Declaration of Choy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX 1537)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Declaration of Choy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX 1503# 2 Exhibit PX 1505# 3 Exhibit PX 1512# 4 Exhibit PX 1513# 5 Exhibit PX 1514# 6 Exhibit PX 1515# 7 Exhibit PX 1532# 8 Exhibit PX 1534# 9 Exhibit PX 1535)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Declaration of Choy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX 23# 2 Exhibit PX 34# 3 Exhibit PX 36# 4 Exhibit PX 79# 5 Exhibit PX 128# 6 Exhibit PX 129# 7 Exhibit PX 140# 8 Exhibit PX 142)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit PX 1# 4 Exhibit PX 3# 5 Exhibit PX 10# 6 Exhibit PX 16)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Choy Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 # 5)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1851 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1850 Declaration, Exhibits to Declaration of Choy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 1849 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 1848 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Jason Choy in Support of Lucent's Oppositions to Micrrosoft's Post-Trial Motions on the Group 2 Patents by Plaintiff Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 1785 MOTION for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents Lucent's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for a New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 1788 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents Lucent's Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 1786 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1781 MOTION to Amend/Correct Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lucent's Motion to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Notice of Motion filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Napper ISO Microsoft Opposition to Lucent Motion to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment# 2 Exhibit Ex A to Dec of Brian Napper ISO MS Opp to Group 2 Motion to Amend Judgment# 3 Exhibit Ex B to Dec of Napper ISO MS Opp to Group 2 Mot to Alter or Amend Judgment)(Barnes, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 1787 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lucent's Notice of Group II Motion for Award of Attorney Fees filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Barnes, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Discovery conference held on 5/30/2007 to discuss scheduling of discovery for Groups 4 and 5. A follow-up conference shall be held on June 6, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate and initiate the call. (ma) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION 1843 to Certify Disqualification Order 1791 for 1292(b) Interlocutory Appeal. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motion to be submitted on the papers at that time. No appearances necessary. (mjm) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Motion to Certify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Disqualification Order for 1292(b) Interlocutory Appeal by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Microsoft Motion for 28 USC 1292(b) Certification of Disqualification Order) (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re: Bill of Cost Hearing (Audio Coding). The Bill of Cost hearing scheduled for May 30, 2007 is vacated and rescheduled for Monday, July 2, 2007 at 2:00 pm. Any additional briefing to be submitted by Lucent is to be filed and served by close of business on Friday, June 15, 2007. Any response is to be filed by close of business on Tuesday, June 26, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Letter from Attorney Bondor# 2 Letter from Attorney Albert)(nsp) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lucent Technologies, Inc: No Transcripts Designated (Already on file with the USDC) re 1840 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1251 Judgment by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee Paid, receipt # 138534) (mkz) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc: No Transcripts Designated re 1555 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc: No Transcripts Designated (already on file with the USDC) re 1735 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Mircosoft's Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/22/2007. Microsoft's Group 3 Reply to Motion for Award of Attys' Fees and Declaration of Francis J. Albert t/w Exhibits A-F are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1833 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hetzel, Zdrojeski & Walsh by Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway, Inc.. (Zdrojeski, Ronald) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1832 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Group 2 Motions: as to Lucent - MOTION 1786 to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) and MOTION 1787 for Attorney Fees re Group II; as to Microsoft - MOTION 1785 for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents and MOTION 1788 for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents. Motion Hearing currently set for 6/21/07 is VACATED and RESET FOR 7/25/2007 and 7/26/07 each at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Miscellaneous (Motion) Hearing currently set for 5/29/2007 is VACATED and RESET FOR 6/21/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster re Motion 1406 re Attorney's Fees (Group 3). (mjm) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1830 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Lucent Technologies, Inc. Lucent Supplemental Objections to Microsoft Group III Motion for Award of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1829 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lucent Technologies, Inc: No Transcripts Designated re 1554 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1828 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lucent Technologies, Inc: No Transcripts Designated re 1553 Notice of Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1827 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA Federal Circuit (Certified Copy) as to 1701 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dell Incorporated: This appeal is Dismissed. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1826 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of USCA (Federal Circuit) receipt of Notice of Withdrawl re 1701 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dell Incorporated. USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1339 (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1825 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1339 for 1701 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dell Incorporated. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1824 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1338 for 1735 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1823 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1337 for 1736 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Microsoft Corporation, Dell Incorporated. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1822 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1336 for 1555 Notice of Appeal filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1821 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1335 for 1554 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA (Federal Circuit) Case Number 2007-1334 for 1553 Notice of Appeal filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (mkz) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1816 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Lucent's Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/16/2007. Lucent's Opposition to Microsoft's Group 3 Motion for Award of Atty Fees and Declaration of Jason Choy t/w Exhibits 1-16 are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1815 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying Lucent's 1390 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 1378 MOTION for Reconsideration of Lucent's Notice of Motion and Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) for Reconsideration of the Judgment of No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 and 1388 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 1378 MOTION for Reconsideration of Lucent' Notice of Motion and Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) for Reconsideration of the Judgment of No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/16/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1814 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1270 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement on Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 filed by Dell Incorporated. Granting in part and denying in part 1294 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claims 1-4 of U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 to Fleming filed by Gateway, Inc. Gateway Companies, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc,. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/16/2007. (jah, ) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1813 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying part 908 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re U.S. Patent No. 4,763,356 filed by Lucent Technologies, Inc.; Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/16/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Miscellaneous (Motion) Hearing set for 5/29/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster re Motion 1406 re Attorney's Fees (Group 3). (mjm) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1811 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Lodgment and Lodgment of Exhibits in Support of Group 2 Audio Opening Post-Trial Motions by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodgment Part 2)(jah) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (jah, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2007 (tel, ). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1810 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: In light of the trial dates for Groups 4 and 5 being vacated 1780 , a discovery conference shall be held on May 30, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Bencivengo. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate and initiate the call. On or before May 24, 2007, counsel shall submit a joint statement with a proposed schedule for discovery and exchange of reports. (ma) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1809 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Lucent's 1397 Motion to Strike the Tyler Article and denying Gateway's Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity of US Patent No. 4,763,356. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. In light of ruling on Lucent's motion to strike, any further analysis of Gateway's motion for summary judgment on the invalidity of the '356 patent based upon Tyler article is unnecessary. (jah) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1807 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. Microsoft's Request to File Document Under Seal is granted. Microsoft's Exhibit 73 in support of Group 2 Audio Opening Post-Trial Motions is to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1802 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. Lucent's Request to File Bill of Costs, Memorandum of Costs in Support, Declaration of Jason Choy and Exhibits A-D are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. Lucent's Amended Request to file its Group 2 Motion for Atty Fees Under Seal is granted. Lucent's Group 2 Motion for Attys Fees and Declaration of Elizabeth Bernard t/w Exhibits 39-76 are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1797 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER vacating as moot by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/07 Ex Parte MOTION 1766 to Supplement Group IV Technical Expert Reports in View of the Supreme Court's Recent Decision in KSR Int'l Co. v. Teleflex, Inc. No Hearing held. No appearances. Current Trial Dates Vacated per 1780 . (mjm) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1796 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: MOTION 1785 for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents; MOTION 1786 to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e); MOTION 1787 for Attorney Fees re Group II; MOTION 1788 for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Plaintiff's and Defendant's 910 Motion for Summary Judgment and 1372 Motion for Summary Judgment regarding the invalidity of US Patent No. 4,763,356.Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1794 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part/denying in part Lucent's 1328 MOTION for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER . Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. Court grants Dfts Dell and Gateway's motions for no direct infringement (literal and under doctrine of equivalents) and grants Dfts' motions for no indirect infringement (contributory and inducing infringement). Dfts' and Lucent's cross-motions for summary judgment pertaining to affirmative defense of implied licence are moot.(jah) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute ORDER on Motions by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/11/07: MOTION 1324 for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 - Moot. MOTION 1328 for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. MOTION 1294 for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claims 1-4 of U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 to Fleming, et. al. - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. MOTION 1327 for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 (Doughty) - Granted. MOTION 1269 for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty - Granted. MOTION 1270 for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 to Fleming, et al. - Granted in Part / Denied in Part. (mjm) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Order on Motion to Disqualify CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Lucent's 1424 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Court finds that disqualification of the Gibson Dunn firm is required under Calif law, and consistent w/ Ninth Circuit analyses, as it applies to the circumstances of an imputed conflict created in the context of a single on-going litigation. The Gibson Dunn firm is disqualified as Microsoft's counsel in this litigation. Attorney Mark A Perry; Matthew D McGill and Theodore B Olson terminated. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part Lucent's 908 Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding US Patent No. 4,763,356. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/15/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for all proceedings (previously ordered and on file with the USDC) by Dell Incorporated, Microsoft Corporation re 1736 Notice of Cross Appeal (mkz) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Group 2 Audio Patents by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Audio Patents)(Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees Lucent's Notice of Group II Motion for Award of Attorney Fees by Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Adema, Alison) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Adema, Alison). Modified on to conform text to document title 7/20/2007 (mjm). (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Motion for New Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of its Motion for a New Trial or Remittitur on the Group 2 Audio Patents)(Thornburgh, John) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1782 Declaration,, Exhibit 17 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18# 2 Exhibit 19# 3 Exhibit 20# 4 Exhibit 21# 5 Exhibit 22# 6 Exhibit 23# 7 Exhibit 24)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Lucent Technologies, Inc. re 1782 Declaration,, Exhibit 9 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10# 2 Exhibit 11# 3 Exhibit 12# 4 Exhibit 13# 5 Exhibit 14# 6 Exhibit 15# 7 Exhibit 16)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 1781 MOTION to Amend/Correct Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lucent's Motion to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Declaration of Elizabeth T. Bernard in Support of Lucent's Motion to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) by Plaintiff Lucent Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lucent's Motion 1786 to Alter or Amend the Group 2 Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) by Lucent Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wayne Hoeberlein# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F) (Adema, Alison) Modified on 5/15/2007 to term incorrectly filed motion (mkz). Modified to add link (motion #) on 7/20/2007 (mjm). (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2007 re Group 5 - Fleming and Doughty Patents - 4,439,759 and 4,582,956: MOTION 1324 for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 - MOOT. MOTION 1328 for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 - GRANTED IN PART / DENIED IN PART. MOTION 1294 for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claims 1-4 of U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 to Fleming, et. al. - GRANTED IN PART / DENIED IN PART. MOTION 1327 for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 (Doughty) - GRANTED. MOTION 1269 for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 4,582,956 to Doughty - GRANTED. MOTION 1270 for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement on the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 4,439,759 to Fleming, et al. - GRANTED IN PART / DENIED IN PART. All Pretrial / Trial Dates as to Group 4 and 5 - VACATED. Group 4 - Jury Dates: 05/21, 05/22, 05/23, 05/24, 05/24, 05/29, 05/30, 05/31, 06/01, 06/04, 06/05, 06/06, 06/07, 06/11, 06/12, 06/13, and 06/14/07. Group 5 - Pretrial Conference 07/06/07 and Jury Dates: 07/16, 07/17, 07/18, 07/19, 07/23, 07/24, 07/25, 07/26, 07/30, 08/01, 08/02, 08/06, 08/07, 08/08, and 08/09/07. (Court Reporter Nancy Cablay / Jennie Hinkle). (Lucent Attorneys Robert A. Appleby, John M. Desmarais, James Marina). (Microsoft Attorney Juanita R. Books.) (Gateway Attorneys W. Bryan Farney, Jeffrey B. Plies, Andrew N. Thomases, Joshua Walsh-Benson). (Dell Attorneys Joel Freed, Joseph Micallef.) (mjm) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 05/11/2007 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (mkz) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying Lucent's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Re: Microsoft's Preservation of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/10/2007. (jah) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Plies re 477 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Part 2# 2 Declaration Part 3)(jah) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jaswant Raj Jain, Ph.D Re: 477 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (jah) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY Brief in Support of 477 Motion for Summary Judgment Re: US Patent No. 4,383,272 filed by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(jah) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Defendants' 1767 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/8/2007. Exhibits 1,3,5,6,7, and 8 to the Declaration Jeffrey B. Plies in support of Gateway's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: US Patent No. 4,383,272 are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Gateway, Inc., Gateway Country Stores LLC, Gateway Companies, Inc.. (jah) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement Group IV Technical Expert Reports in View of the Supreme Court's Recent Decision in KSR Int'l Co. v. Teleflex, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Permit the Supplementation of Group IV Technical Expert Reports in View of the Supreme Court's Recent Decision in KSR Int'l Co. v. Teleflex, Inc.# 2 Declaration of Owais A. Siddiqui in Support Ex Parte Motion to Permit the Supplementation of Group IV Technical Expert Reports in View of the Supreme Court's Recent Decision in KSR Int'l Co. v. Teleflex, Inc.# 3 Exhibit A to Siddiqui Declaration# 4 Exhibit B to Siddiqui Declaration# 5 Exhibit C to Siddiqui Declaration# 6 Exhibit D to Siddiqui Declaration)(Brooks, Juanita) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Order on Motion to Disqualify CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute ORDER submitting Motion 1424 to Disqualify Counsel Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP from representing Microsoft Corporation by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/10/07. (mjm) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Microsoft's Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/9/2007. Microsoft's Notice of Lodgment and Lodgment of Exhibits, Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings before Judge Rudi M. Brewster: MOTION 1424 to Disqualify Counsel Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP from representing Microsoft Corporation - Submitted. Court to issue Order. (Court Reporter N/A). (mjm) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Microsoft's Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/8/2007. Microsoft's Group 3 Supplement to Bill of Costs in support of Motion for Award of Costs, Declaration of Francis J. Albert t/w Exhibits A-F are to feiled under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing re: Motion 477 for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 4,383,272 is Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 102 (g)(2); Motion 478 for Summary Judgment that Lucent May Not Recover Pre-Filing Damages under 35 U.S.C. 287(a); Motion 486 for Summary Judgment concerning U.S. Patent 4,958,226; Motion 489 for Summary Judgment on Gateway's Affirmative Defense of "Release" and Related Counterclaim for "Breach Of Contract"; Motion 493 for Summary Judgment concerning U.S. Patent 4,383,272; Sealed Motion 515 for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of US Patent No 4,958,226; Sealed Motion 519 for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of US Patent No 4,383,272. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/07 and 5/18/07 Vacated and Reset for 6/19/2007 09:00 AM and 6/20/07 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. (mjm) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute ORDER by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/8/07. Amended MOTION 1390 for Reconsideration Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) of the Judgment of No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 (Submitted on the Papers on 5/3/07) - DENIED. Order to Issue. (mjm) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Microsoft's Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/8/2007. Microsoft's Reply to MPT's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Re: US Patent No. 4,383,272, and Declaration of Christopher S. Marchese t/w Exhibits A-G are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Mircosoft's Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 5/8/2007. Micrsoft's Reply to MPT's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Re: US Patent No. 4,958,226 and Declaration of Christopher S. Marchese t/w Exhibits A-E are to be filed under seal. (jah) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings before Judge Rudi M. Brewster. Motion hearing set for 5/3/07 - VACATED. Amended MOTION 1390 for Reconsideration Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) of the Judgment of No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,649,131 - SUBMITTED ON THE PAPERS. Order to Issue. (Court Reporter N/A). (mjm) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Lucent Technologies, Inc., Lucent Technologies Guardian I LLC, Gateway Country Stores LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Gateway Manufacturing LLC, Cowabunga Enterprises Inc, Dell Incorporated,Gateway, Inc., Gateway Companies, Inc., Dell Computer Corporation, Multimedia Patent Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lucent's Trial Exhibits# 2 Exhibit Defendants' Trial List# 3 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) Modified on 5/8/2007 to edit duplicate names(mkz). (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re 493 Motion for Summary Judgment Reply Brief in Support of Multimedia Patent Trust's Motions for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent No. 4,383,272 filed by Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dell Incorporated (Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 1742 Reply to Response to Motion, 1741 Reply to Response to Motion of Joseph A. Micallef in Support of Dell's Replies in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment Concerning U.S. Patent Nos. 4,958,226 and 4,383,272 by Defendant Dell Incorporated. (Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 493 Motion for Summary Judgment Dell's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the Asserted Claim of U.S. Patent No. 4,383,272 to Netravali, et al. filed by Dell Incorporated. (Micallef, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace