SCHWARTZ et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:11-vv-00579

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ALAN SCHWARTZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Berglund & Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W Berglund +1 818 992 1500 +1 818 992 1541 dberglund@bjslawfirm.com
No Logo KATHLEEN SCHWARTZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Berglund & Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W Berglund +1 818 992 1500 +1 818 992 1541 dberglund@bjslawfirm.com
No Logo MARISSA SCHWARTZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Berglund & Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W Berglund +1 818 992 1500 +1 818 992 1541 dberglund@bjslawfirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann Donohue Martin +1 202 307 1815 +1 202 616 4310 ann.martin@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners' Outstanding Medical Records and Statement of Completion due by 12/22/2011. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (at3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/08/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners' Outstanding Medical Records and Statement of Completion due by 12/7/2011. Petitioners' Supplemental Expert Report due by 1/6/2012. Respondent's Rule 4c Report is SUSPENDED. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (at3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/07/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER: Petitioners' Compliance due by 10/28/2011. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (at3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/24/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Donohue Martin for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Martin, Ann) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Denise K. Vowell. (tjk) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
              PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $350, Receipt number 072742) (Filed with Exhibits 1-9), filed by MARISSA SCHWARTZ, ALAN SCHWARTZ, KATHLEEN SCHWARTZ.Respondents Report due by 12/8/2011. (tjk) (tjk). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 247 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?