HAMBALI v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00407-JDB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 16, 2020 at 10:31 AM DT (11.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by 1660 West 2nd Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine J. Adinaro +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 cathi_adinaro@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Asst. Federal Public Defender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bjorn Lange +1 603 226 7360

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Cahoon Curtis +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 claire_curtis@fd.org
TERMINATED: 11/17/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith H. Mizner +1 617 223 8061 +1 617 223 8080 judith_mizner@fd.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darin Thompson +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 darin_thompson@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Federal Public Defender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos Warner +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 carlos_warner@fd.org
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Olivia R. Hussey Scott +1 202 616 1972 +1 202 514 6770 olivia.hussey.scott@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Koenig +1 202 616 0495 michael.koenig@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/04/2016 Scott Douglas Levin +1 202 616 9193 +1 202 305 2685 Scott.Levin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT GATES, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Koenig +1 202 616 0495 michael.koenig@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEVEN BLAISDELL, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Koenig +1 202 616 0495 michael.koenig@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo TOM COPEMAN, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Koenig +1 202 616 0495 michael.koenig@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit Habeas Corpus (General)
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ERRATA to Notice to the Court by STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II 75 Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice to the Court, # 2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI re 27 Notice (Other) (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Thompson on behalf of RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI re 27 Notice (Other) (Adinaro, Catherine) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Jean Adinaro on behalf of RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Adinaro, Catherine) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Civil Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Civil Statement from Joseph R. Lloren, Jr on behalf of plaintiff ("Let this be filed" by Judge John D. Bates). (td, ) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for petitioner and for appointment of new counsel by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 10019 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 55 respondents' supplemental motion to deem certain additional words protected. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/26/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 55 respondents' supplemental motion to deem certain additional words protected. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/26/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SEALED MOTION (Supplemental) to Deem Protected Additional Words in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10019, filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Under Seal Filing by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER staying obligations under Case Management Order. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/20/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER staying obligations under Case Management Order. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/20/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Certification Pertaining to the Production of Exculpatory Information by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 9/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 48 respondents' Consent Motion for Partial Two-Week Extension of Time. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/28/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 48 respondents' Consent Motion for Partial Two-Week Extension of Time. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/28/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Order for Partial Two-Week Extension of Time to Deposit Small Number of Classified Documents with the Classified Information Security Officer Pursuant to the Court's Order of September 28, 2012 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 9/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 46 respondents' Motion for Leave to Deposit Exculpatory Information with the Classified Information Security Officer. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/28/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 46 respondents' Motion for Leave to Deposit Exculpatory Information with the Classified Information Security Officer. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/28/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION for Order For Leave To Deposit Exculpatory Information With The CISO Pending Resolution Of Counsel-Authorization Issues by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 44 Respondents' Opposed Motion to Deem Certain Information Protected. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/26/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 44 Respondents' Opposed Motion to Deem Certain Information Protected. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/26/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10019 , filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Narrative Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(zdr) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Opposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10019 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 41 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Exculpatory Information Pursuant to Section 1.D.1 of the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/9/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 41 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Exculpatory Information Pursuant to Section 1.D.1 of the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/9/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to disclose exculpatory information pursuant to Section 1.D.1 of the Case Management Order by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 39 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Exculpatory Information Pursuant to Section 1.D.1 of the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/27/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Exculpatory Information Pursuant to Section 1.D.1 of the Case Management Order by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/18/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Order (Case Management Order) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI. (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of amended petition by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of BARACK OBAMA, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, (Henry, Terry) Modified on 10/3/2011 to edit filers (dr). (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER relating to the government's classified filing of March 24, 2011. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/18/11. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's March 24, 2011 Filing by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by BARACK OBAMA (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Petitioner's authorization)(Mizner, Judith) Modified event title on 12/17/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Errata to Factual Return filed with CSOs by STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file amended complaint by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 10/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing the Factual Return via the CSO by BARACK OBAMA (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Koenig on behalf of STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memo of Understanding, # 2 Exhibit Acknowledgement, # 3 Exhibit Affirmation, # 4 Exhibit Signed Protective Order)(Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Bjorn Lange on behalf of RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (jeb, ) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Executed Memorandum of Understanding by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) Modified on 5/4/2010 to enhance text (dr). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Hussey on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Douglas Levin on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI.(jeb, ) (Entered: 04/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (jeb, ) (Entered: 04/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Judith H. Mizner on behalf of RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (jeb, ) (Entered: 04/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel: the Office of the Federal Defender for the districts of Rhode Island, Massachusetts, and New Hampshire is appointed to represent the Petitioner, Riduan Bin Isomuddin Hambali. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/10/10. (ds ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 7/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 39 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Exculpatory Information Pursuant to Section 1.D.1 of the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/27/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI (dr) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 5/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/18/2012. (lcjdb1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.) filed by RIDUAN BIN ISOMUDDIN HAMBALI. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(dr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dr) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?