CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED et al v. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-02125
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 1:37 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Stanwood Herrick +1 305 858 2332 +1 305 858 6347 pherrick1@comcast.net
No Logo CARIB PETROLEUM, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Stanwood Herrick +1 305 858 2332 +1 305 858 6347 pherrick1@comcast.net
v.
United States Coast Guard United States Coast Guard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tricia Dianne Francis +1 202 616 2257 +1 202 514 8780 tricia.Francis@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/18/2011 Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 16 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED, CARIB PETROLEUM, INC. ; ORDERED that the motion for leave to file surreply be denied; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary affirmance be granted. USCA Case Number 12-5165. (md, ) (Entered: 01/05/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
    ORDER of USCA as to 16 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED, CARIB PETROLEUM, INC. ; ORDERED that the motion for leave to file surreply be denied; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary affirmance be granted. USCA Case Number 12-5165. (md, ) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 16 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 15 Memorandum & Opinion, 14 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED, CARIB PETROLEUM, INC.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2940409. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER denying 10 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 23, 2012. (lcegs6) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tricia D. Francis on behalf of UNITED STATES COAST GUARD Substituting for attorney Christian Natiello (Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Patterson, # 2 Declaration Steel)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Attorney Fees by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED, CARIB PETROLEUM, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/29/2010. (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 1/12/2011 to correct service dated(jf, ). (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed in a FOIA Case as to the U.S. Attorney for DC; UNITED STATES COAST GUARD served on 12/29/2010, answer due 1/28/2011 for U.S. Attorney. (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 1/12/2011 to correct served/answer due date (jf, ). (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CARIB PETROLEUM, INC. identifying Corporate Parent NONE for CARIB PETROLEUM, INC. (rdj) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                  LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED identifying Corporate Parent NONE for CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED. (rdj) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 23, 2012. (lcegs6) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616034916) filed by CALYPSO CARGO LIMITED, CARIB PETROLEUM, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?