KLAY et al v. PANETTA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00350

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 11:46 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARIANA KLAY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo CARLA BUTCHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo CHRISTIAN EVERAGE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo ELLE HELMER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo ERIC PRATT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo ERICA DORN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo JANET GALLA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo LAMANDA CUMMINGS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo MARIEL MARMOL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo NICOLE MCCOY , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo REBECCA BLUMER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
No Logo ROBIN KAHLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L. Burke +1 202 386 9622 +1 202 232 5513 sburke@burkepllc.com
v.
No Logo DONALD C. WINTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo GORDON ENGLAND, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES F. AMOS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES T. CONWAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo LEON PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL W. HAGEE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
No Logo RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012 J. Marcus Meeks +1 202 616 4176 +1 202 616 4314 marcus.meeks@usdoj.gov
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 15 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ROBIN KAHLE, MARIEL MARMOL, REBECCA BLUMER, JANET GALLA, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, CHRISTIAN EVERAGE, ELLE HELMER, ERICA DORN, CARLA BUTCHER, ERIC PRATT, NICOLE MCCOY, ARIANA KLAY ; USCA Case Number 13-5081. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion)(rd) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 15 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT re 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION, 13 ORDER by REBECCA BLUMER, CARLA BUTCHER, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, ERICA DORN, CHRISTIAN EVERAGE, JANET GALLA, ELLE HELMER, ROBIN KAHLE, ARIANA KLAY, MARIEL MARMOL, NICOLE MCCOY, ERIC PRATT. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3240397. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Burke, Susan). (Entered: 03/06/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/2013. (lcabj2)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by REBECCA BLUMER, CARLA BUTCHER, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, ERICA DORN, CHRISTIAN EVERAGE, JANET GALLA, ELLE HELMER, ROBIN KAHLE, ARIANA KLAY, MARIEL MARMOL, NICOLE MCCOY, ERIC PRATT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burke, Susan) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JAMES F. AMOS, JAMES T. CONWAY, GORDON ENGLAND, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL W. HAGEE, RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD C. WINTER (Attachments: # 1 Decision)(Martin, Edward) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Edward Martin on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Marcus Meeks (Martin, Edward) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance and Withdrawal of Counsel for the Defendants by JAMES F. AMOS, JAMES T. CONWAY, GORDON ENGLAND, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL W. HAGEE, RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD C. WINTER (Martin, Edward) Modified on 9/11/2012 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMES F. AMOS, JAMES T. CONWAY, GORDON ENGLAND, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL W. HAGEE, RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD C. WINTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meeks, J.) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2012, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by REBECCA BLUMER, CARLA BUTCHER, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, ERICA DORN, CHRISTIAN EVERAGE, JANET GALLA, ELLE HELMER, ROBIN KAHLE, ARIANA KLAY, MARIEL MARMOL, NICOLE MCCOY, ERIC PRATT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burke, Susan) (Entered: 07/21/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION to Dismiss by REBECCA BLUMER, CARLA BUTCHER, JAMES T. CONWAY, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, ERICA DORN, CHRISTIAN EVERAGE, JANET GALLA, ELLE HELMER, ROBIN KAHLE, ARIANA KLAY, MARIEL MARMOL, NICOLE MCCOY, ERIC PRATT (Burke, Susan) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by J. Marcus Meeks on behalf of All Defendants (Meeks, J.) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Dismiss by JAMES F. AMOS, JAMES T. CONWAY, GORDON ENGLAND, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL W. HAGEE, RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD C. WINTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order in Cioca v. Rumsfeld, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meeks, J.) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/2012, Entered: None
                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAMES F. AMOS, JAMES T. CONWAY, GORDON ENGLAND, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL W. HAGEE, RAY MABUS, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD C. WINTER filed by REBECCA BLUMER, ARIANA KLAY, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, ELLE HELMER, MARIEL MARMOL, ERICA DORN, NICOLE MCCOY, ROBIN KAHLE, JANET GALLA, CARLA BUTCHER, ERIC PRATT, CHRISTIAN EVERAGE.(znmw, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2012, Entered: None
                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by REBECCA BLUMER, LAMANDA CUMMINGS, ERICA DORN, ELLE HELMER, ROBIN KAHLE, ARIANA KLAY, MARIEL MARMOL, NICOLE MCCOY (Burke, Susan) Modified on 6/4/2012 (dr). (Entered: 06/03/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?