MCLAUGHLIN v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00543

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 4:14 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEMETRIUS MCLAUGHLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R41297-018

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DEMETRIUS MCLAUGHLIN
v.
No Logo United States Drug Enforcement Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Englund +1 202 252 2568 +1 202 252 2599 nicholas.englund@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/01/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jean Seo +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 514 8780 michelle.seo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013 Sean Joseph Vanek +1 202 252 6027 +1 202 252 6047 sean.vanek@usdoj.gov
No Logo EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE U.S. ATTORNEYS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Englund +1 202 252 2568 +1 202 252 2599 nicholas.englund@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/01/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jean Seo +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 514 8780 michelle.seo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013 Sean Joseph Vanek +1 202 252 6027 +1 202 252 6047 sean.vanek@usdoj.gov
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Order Directing Prisoner Payment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 4 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?