ANC Rental Corporation
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-11200
District Judge Mary F. Walrath, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Anc Rental Corporation, Debtor

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roland Gomez

Represented by Adler Giersch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Alexander +1 206 682 0300 +1 206 224 0102

Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2003 Michael David Debaecke +1 302 425 6400 +1 302 425 6464 debaecke@blankrome.com
TERMINATED: 04/11/2006 Bonnie Glantz Fatell +1 302 425 6423 +1 302 425 6464 fatell@blankrome.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2004 Mark J. Packel +1 302 425 6429 +1 302 425 6464
TERMINATED: 06/02/2004 Jason Wade Staib +1 302 425 6400 +1 302 425 6464 staib@blankrome.com
TERMINATED: 06/02/2004 Elizabeth A. Wilburn +1 302 425 6400 wilburn@blankrome.com

Represented by Elliott Greenleaf & Siedzikowski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric J. Bronstein +1 215 977 1000 +1 215 977 1099 ejb@elliottgreenleaf.com

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2004 William J. Burnett +1 302 351 1910 +1 302 351 1919 william.burnett@flastergreenberg.com

Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheldon K. Rennie +1 302 654 7444 +1 302 656 8920 srennie@foxrothschild.com

Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/06/2003 Janice M McAvoy +1 212 859 8000 +1 212 859 4000

Represented by Gazes LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian J. Gazes +1 212 765 9000 +1 212 765 9675 office@GazesLLP.com

Represented by Law Offices of Frank S. Potts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank S. Potts

Represented by Margolis Edelstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Huggett +1 302 777 4680 +1 302 777 4682 jhuggett@margolisedelstein.com

Represented by Proctor Heyman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2004 Elio Battista, Jr. +1 302 472 7300 ebattista@proctorheyman.com

Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Grey +1 302 654 5180 +1 302 654 5181 jg@stevenslee.com
Space Joseph H. Huston, Jr. +1 302 425 3310 +1 610 371 7972 jhh@stevenslee.com
Space Thomas Gerard Whalen, Jr. +1 302 654 5180 +1 610 371 8512 tgw@stevenslee.com
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (8216) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74217 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Certificate Of Service.
Docket Text: Certificate of Service regarding Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Enforcing Confirmation Order (related document(s)74216) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74216 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Motion to Compel (B)
    Docket Text: Motion to Compel Motion for Order Enforcing Confirmation Order Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/24/2010 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/17/2010. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A-Part 12 Exhibit A-Part 23 Exhibit B4 Exhibit C5 Exhibit D6 Exhibit E7 Exhibit F8 Proposed Form of Order 9 Notice) (Burnett, William)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74215 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Notice of Removal (B)
      Docket Text: Notice of Removal from Service List of Bradley S. Eaby, Esq. Filed by The Eaby Firm, LLC. (MDE)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74214 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Order
        Docket Text: Order Granting Motion to Issue New Check(related document(s)74199) Order Signed on 12/17/2009. (Attachments: 1 Certification of Counsel) (MEB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74213 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Certification of Counsel
          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)74199, 74202) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Burnett, William)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74212 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Minute Entry
            Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/16/2009 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (104141)). (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2009 (LMC).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74211 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Order
              Docket Text: Order (WITH REVISIONS BY THE COURT) Granting Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust To Extend Termination Date of The ANC Liquidating Trust (related document(s)74204) Order Signed on 12/14/2009. (Johnston, Julie)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74210 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Order
                Docket Text: Order Granting Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust To Clarify The Trust's Obligations With Respect To Distributors (related document(s)74203) Order Signed on 12/14/2009. (Johnston, Julie)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74209 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                  Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2009 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Burnett, William)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74208 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                    Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection regarding Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Extending Termination Date of the ANC Liquidating Trust (related document(s)74204) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74207 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                      Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection regarding Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust to Clarify the Trust's Obligations With Respect to Distributions (related document(s)74203) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74206 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Declaration
                        Docket Text: Declaration Regarding Service (related document(s)74203, 74204) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List-Part 12 Service List-Part 2) (Burnett, William)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74205 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                          Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Service of Notices -Filed by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.. (MDE) Modified on 11/25/2009 (MDE).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74204 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion to Extend (B)
                            Docket Text: Motion for an Order Extending Termination Date of the ANC Liquidating Trust Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2009 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/9/2009. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Notice) (Burnett, William) Modified on 12/1/2009 (MDE).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74203 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion to Approve (B)
                              Docket Text: Motion to Clarify the Trust's Obligations With Respect to Distributions Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2009 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/9/2009. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Notice) (Burnett, William) Modified on 12/1/2009 (MDE).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74202 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Objection
                                Docket Text: Limited Objection to Motion to Issue New Check, Filed by Matthew Cortez (related document(s)74199) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74201 Filed: 11/22/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                  Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (related document(s)74200) Service Date 11/22/2009. (Admin.)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74200 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 VAN-401 Generic Notice of Hearing
                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on Cortez Trucking's Motion to Allow Issuance of New Check. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2009 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. The case judge is Mary F. Walrath. Objections due by 12/9/2009. (related document(s)74199) (MDE)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74199 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Motion to Allow (B)
                                      Docket Text: Motion to Allow Issuance of New Check- Filed by Cortez Trucking, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2009 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. The case judge is Mary F. Walrath. Objections due by 12/9/2009. (MDE)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74198 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)74177, 74192, 74196, 74197) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Letter Objection) (Burnett, William)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74197 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Response (B)
                                          Docket Text: Response The Motion Regarding Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims (related document(s)74177) Filed by Ella M. Sewell (ALC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74196 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Order
                                            Docket Text: Order Granting Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust to Estimate Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims and Granting Related Relief. (related document(s)74177, 74192) Order Signed on 1/13/2009. (Attachments: 1 Schedule A2 Schedule B3 Schedule C4 Schedule D5 Schedule E) (LCN)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74195 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Order on Motion to Compel
                                              Docket Text: Order Denying Motion to Enforce Agreement and Proceed Without Cost and Denying Motion to Compel Filed by Frederick Grant. (Related Doc # 8077, 8079) Order Signed on 1/13/2009. (LCN)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74194 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Approving settlement
                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Agreement Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Arrowood Indemnity Company (f/k/a Royal Indemnity Company). (Related Doc # 74175) Order Signed on 1/12/2009. (LCN)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74193 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Order
                                                  Docket Text: Order Sustaining the ANC Liquidating Trust's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims With Respect to Claim No. 8790 and Withdrawing, With Prejudice the Objection to Claim No. 8789. (related document(s)7631) Order Signed on 1/12/2009. (LCN)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74192 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)74177, 74184) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Burnett, William)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74191 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Minute Entry
                                                      Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 01/12/2009 Subject: Omnibus - Moved from 1/6 at counsel's request and Status conference - Moved from 1/6 at counsel's request. (vCal Hearing ID (84631)). (related document(s) 74188) (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2009 (LCN).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74190 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (A)
                                                        Docket Text: Notice To Substitute Attorney Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74189 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                          Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)74188) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74188 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2009 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74187 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Status Report
                                                              Docket Text: Status Report Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74186 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Status Report
                                                                Docket Text: Status Report Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74185 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Status Report
                                                                  Docket Text: Status Report Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74184 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Objection
                                                                    Docket Text: Objection by Claimant, Mary Asta to Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust, etc. Filed by 38 Plaintiffs (Bennett, Vincent)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74183 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                      Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report 3rd Quarter/2008 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Disbursements2 Exhibit Receipts) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74182 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                        Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for the 2nd Quarter/2008 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Disbursements2 Exhibit Receipts) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74181 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: 1/2/2009 Declaration
                                                                          Docket Text: Declaration Regarding Service (related document(s)74177) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74180 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            Docket Text: Motion to Dismiss Regarding Various Adversary Cases Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order2 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph) Modified text on 1/9/2009 (ALC).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74179 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Objection
                                                                              Docket Text: Objection of ANC Liquidating Trust to: (I) Motion to Enforce Agreement and Motion to Proceed Without Cost [Docket No. 8077] and (II) Motion to Compel, Filed by Frederick Grant [Docket No. 8079] (related document(s)8077, 8079) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74178 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)74175, 74176, 74177) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74177 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Motion to Authorize (B)
                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion to Authorize Motion to Estimate Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(c)(1) and for Related Relief Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2009 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/5/2009. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Notice) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74176 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Date Change Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2009 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74175 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Motion to Approve Settlement (A)
                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with Arrowood Indemnity Company Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2009 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/5/2009. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit 3 Proposed Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74174 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                        Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (related document(s)8080) Service Date 12/04/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74173 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Court's Letter
                                                                                          Docket Text: Court's Letter Requesting Claims Registers in Alphabetical and Numerical Order. (JRK)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74172 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                            Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (related document(s)74167 ) Service Date 11/01/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74171 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 5, 2007 @ 10:30am (related document(s)74170 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74170 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 5, 2007 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74169 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 VAN-401 Generic Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                  Docket Text: Amended Notice of Hearing on Amended Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims. Hearing scheduled for 2/6/2008 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (related document(s)74167 ) (JRK, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74168 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection re Motion for Relief from Confirmation Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) and Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9024 and/or for a Declaration that the Discharge and Plan Injunction Do Not Apply (related document(s)74166 ) Filed by Norman Black. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Certificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74167 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 VAN-401 Generic Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on Amended Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims in the amount of $63,789.92. Filed by State of Michigan Department of Revenue Hearing scheduled for 2/6/2008 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (related document(s)8016 ) (JRK, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74166 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Motion to Allow (B)
                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion to Allow Relief from Confirmation Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) and Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9024 and/or for a Declaration that the Plan Injunction Does Not Apply Filed by Norman Black. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/29/2007. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Notice 3 Proposed Form of Order 4 Certificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74165 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Motion for Relief From Stay (B)
                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion for Relief from Stay [Receipt #72429]. Fee Amount $150. Filed by Maria Bousquet Hearing scheduled for 2/10/2005 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Certificate of Service) (MJY, ) Modified Date Terminated on 10/3/2007 (JRK, ). related doc. 7556
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8165 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Filed by Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority. (Embree, Edward)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8164 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                              Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report - 2nd Quarter 2010 - FINAL REPORT Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William) Modified on 8/9/2010 (NAL).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8163 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Order
                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case(related document(s)8158) Order Signed on 5/19/2010. (MEB)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8162 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 05/19/2010 Subject: Motion to Close Case. (vCal Hearing ID (109638)). (related document(s) 8158) (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2010 (LMC).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8161 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2010 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8160 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Objection (A) to Entry of an Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case and (B) Request for Payment of Claim No. 1736 (related document(s)8158) Filed by Huntington C. Brown (MDE)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8159 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)8157, 8158) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8158 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Final Decree (B)
                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion for Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2010 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/12/2010. (Attachments: 1 Exhibits2 Proposed Form of Order 3 Notice) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8157 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Final Report
                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Final Report Notice of Final Distribution to Holders of Class 2 General Unsecured Claims Pursuant to Amended Joint Chapter 11 Liquidating Plan of Debtor's and Statutory Creditors' Committee Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibits) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8156 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report Post-Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report for 1st Quarter/2010 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8155 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Enforcing Confirmation Order (related document(s)74216) Order Signed on 3/5/2010. (SDJ)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8154 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Notice of Address Change(B)
                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Address Change for Flaster/Greenberg P.C. - Delaware Office Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8153 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)74216) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8152 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 02/24/2010 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (104240)). (related document(s) 8151) (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2010 (LMC).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8151 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/24/2010 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8150 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report Post-Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report for 4th Quarter/2009 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8149 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Declaration Regarding Service of Motion for an Order Enforcing Confirmation Order (related document(s)74216) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8148 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Virtual Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Virtual Minutes of: 11/18/2009 Subject: STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING FILED BY ANC LIQUIDATING TRUST.. Appearances: See attached sign-in sheet. Proceedings: Status report given. Will be filing a Motion to Extend Trust with Motion to Close Case. Hope to close case in January or February 2010.. (vCal Hearing ID (102867)). (related document(s) 8146) (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2009 (LMC).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8147 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8146 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Status Conference Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8145 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 3rd Quarter/2009 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements-Part 13 Exhibit Disbursements-Part 24 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8144 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Response to Notice of Interim Distribution to Holders of Class 2 General Unsecured Claims Pursuant to Amended Joint Chapter 11 Liquidating Plan of Debtor's and Statutory Creditors' Committee (related document(s)8141) Filed by Western Protection Agency Pure Trust (MDE)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8143 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 2nd Quarter/2009 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Disbursements2 Exhibit Receipts) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8142 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate of Service of Notice of Interim Distribution to Holders of Class 2 General Unsecured Claims Pursuant to Amended Joint Chapter 11 Liquidating Plan of Debtor's and Statutory Creditors' Committee (related document(s)8141) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8141 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Notice of Proposed Distribution (B)
                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Proposed Distribution Notice of Interim Distribution to Holders of Class 2 General Unsecured Claims Pursuant to Amended Joint Chapter 11 Liquidating Plan of Debtor's and Statutory Creditors' Committee Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibits A & B) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8140 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 07/02/2009 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (94389)). (related document(s) 8136) (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2009 (Johnston, Julie).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8139 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Document (related document(s)8138) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8138 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: **Withdrawn. See doc 8139.**HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2009 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Burnett, William) Modified text on 7/9/2009 (MDE).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8137 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Compelling Enterprise Rent-A-Car, Inc. To Comply With asset Purchase Agreement To Effectuate Assignment of Assigned Contracts (Related Doc # 8133) Order Signed on 6/30/2009. (Johnston, Julie)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8136 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2009 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8135 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)8133) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8134 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)8133) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8133 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Motion to Compel (B)
                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion to Compel Enterprise Rent-A-Car, Inc. to Comply With Asset Purchase Agreement to the Extent Necessary to Effectuate Assignment of Assigned Contracts Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2009 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/25/2009. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Notice) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8132 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Claims Resolution Summary Relating to ADR Procedures for Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Claims Resolution Summary) (Burnett, William) Modified docket text on 5/19/2009 (LMD).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8131 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report Quarter 1, 2009 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8130 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Notice of Removal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Removal From Service List Filed by Archer & Greiner, P.C.. (Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8129 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting Second Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust to Estimate Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claim of David Green and Granting Related Relief.(related document(s)8127) Order Signed on 5/11/2009. (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8128 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation (related document(s)8126). Signed on 5/11/2009. (Attachments: 1 Settlement Stipulation) (SAJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8127 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)8101, 8113) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8126 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8125 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Regarding Various Adversary Cases (Related Doc # 74180) -Signed on 4/29/2009. (MDE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8124 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Granting Second Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust to Estimate Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims and Granting Related Relief (related document(s)8101) -Signed on 4/13/2009. (Attachments: 1 Attachment) (MDE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8123 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Sustaining the Trust's Twentieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7884) -Signed on 4/13/2009. (Attachments: 1 Attachment) (MDE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8122 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Sustaining the Trust's Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7882) -Signed on 4/13/2009. (Attachments: 1 Attachment) (MDE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8121 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Sustaining the Trust's Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s)7502) -Signed on 4/13/2009. (MDE) Modified text on 4/20/2009 (MDE).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8120 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between RCI Inc. and the ANC Liquidating Trust Resolving the Trust's Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims.(related document(s)8116) Order Signed on 4/17/2009. (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8119 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between the ANC Liquidating Trust and the Tennessee Department of Revenue Resolving Objections to Claims and Granting Related Relief. (related document(s)8117) Order Signed on 4/17/2009. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8118 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Property & Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation of Maryland's Motion for Relief from Stay (related document(s)7619) Filed by Property & Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation of Maryland. (McLaughlin, Lisa) Modified docket text on 4/20/2009 (LMD).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8117 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8116 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8115 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 04/13/2009 Subject: Omnibus - Moved from 4/7 at Court's request and Status Report. (vCal Hearing ID (89056)). (related document(s) 8110) (LMC) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2009 (MDE).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8114 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Letter Advising That CT Corporation Is Not The Agend For An Entity By Name of Ari Fleet, LT. Filed by CT Corporation . (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8113 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Response Of Claimant, David Green To Debtor's Second Motion To Estimate Pre-Petition Personal Claims (related document(s)8101) Filed by David Green (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8112 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between the ANC Liquidating Trust and the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Resolving Objection to Claims. (related document(s)8109) Order Signed on 4/13/2009. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8111 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)8110) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8110 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/13/2009 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8109 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8108 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of the Trust's Objection to Claim No. 1817 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8107 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of the Trust's Objection to Claim No. 5527 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8106 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of the Trust's Objection to Claim No. 5499 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8105 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal the Trust's Objection to Claim No.4096 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8104 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal The Trust's Objection to Claim No. 10918 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8103 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of No Objection Filed by Alamo Rent A Car LLC, National Car Rental Systems Inc. and ANC Rental Corporation, Alamo Rent A Car LLC, National Car Rental Systems, Inc. and ANC Rental Corporation, Alamo Rent A Car, LLC, National Car Rental Systems, Inc., ANC Rental Corporation, Car Rental Claims, Inc., and National Car Rental Licensing, Inc.. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8102 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Declaration Regarding Service (related document(s)8101) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8101 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Motion to Authorize (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion to Authorize Second Motion to Estimate Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(c)(1) and for Related Relief Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/13/2009 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/6/2009. (Attachments: 1 Schedules2 Proposed Form of Order 3 Notice) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8100 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Removal From Mailing Matrix Filed by Royal Indemnity Company. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Cobb, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8099 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal with Prejudice of the ANC Liquidating Trust's Schedule B Objection to Reduce Claim Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8098 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal with Prejudice of the ANC Liquidating Trust's Schedule B Objection to Reduce Claim Number 11514 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8097 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal with Prejudice of the ANC Liquidating Trust's Schedule B Objection to Reduce Claim Number 11500 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8096 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal with Prejudice of the ANC Liquidating Trust's Schedule B Objection to Reduce Claim Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8095 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal with Prejudice of the ANC Liquidating Trust's Schedule B Objection to Reduce Claim No. 6506 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8094 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between the ANC Liquidating Trust and the Internal Revenue Service Resolving Objection to Claims. (related document(s)8093) Order Signed on 3/11/2009. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8093 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8092 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between City of Philadelphia and the ANC Liquidating Trust. (related document(s)8090) Order Signed on 3/6/2009. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8091 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Hearing (Rescheduled) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/13/2009 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8090 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Amended Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A (Stipulation)2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8089 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between Classic Custom Vacations, Inc. And The ANC Liquidating Trust. (related document(s)8086) Order Signed on 3/4/2009. (BMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8088 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between Teamsters Local 856 Health & Welfare Fund And The ANC Liquidating Trust Resolving Objection To Claim No. 6028. (related document(s)8085) Order Signed on 3/4/2009. (BMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8087 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report 4th Quarter/2008 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit (Disbursements)2 Exhibit (Receipts)) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8086 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8085 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8084 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8083 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and PAS LLC Resolving Claim No. 11543. (related document(s)8081) Order Signed on 2/2/2009. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8082 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Removal from Mailing Matrix Filed by General Electric Capital Corporation. (Boswell, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8081 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8080 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008 VAN-401 Generic Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Status Conference Hearing. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2009 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. The case judge is Mary F. Walrath. (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8079 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Motion to Compel (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion to Compel For the Third Motion of Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for an Order Extending the Time Within Which Debtors May File Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 501(c) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3004 (related document(s)4776) Filed by Federick Grant. The case judge is Mary F. Walrath. (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8078 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Status Report Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8077 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Motion to Compel (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Regarding $90,000.00 Remaining Balance Filed by Frederick Grant. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2009 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware.The case judge is Mary F. Walrath. Objections due by 12/30/2008. (ALC) Modified text on 11/10/2008 (ALC).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8076 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)8075) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8075 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8074 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)8073 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 1/6/2009 at 11:30 AM., 4/7/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed on 9/5/2008. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8073 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8072 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order (A) Granting Motion of Richard Provost for Relief From Confirmation Order and/or for a Declaration That the Plan Injunction Does Not Apply; and (B) Compelling Debtors to Produce their Insurance Policies Covering Mr. Provost's Claims. (Related Doc # 8062) Order Signed on 8/19/2008. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8071 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel re Motion for Relief from Confirmation Order (related document(s)8062 ) Filed by Richard Provost. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)2 Certificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8070 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Appearance of Christopher D. Loizides, Esquire and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Provost. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8069 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for July 8, 2008 @ 10:30AM (related document(s)8068 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8068 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/8/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8067 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)8066 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8066 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 8,2008 @ 10:30 AM Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/8/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8065 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 2008, Quarter 1 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8064 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 2007, 4th Quarter Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8063 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Autodocket of credit card
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)(01-11200-MFW) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00). Receipt Number 3299909, amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8062 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Motion for Relief From Stay (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion for Relief from Stay / Order (A) Granting Relief from Confirmation Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) and Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9024 and/or for a Declaration that the Plan Injunction Does Not Apply; and (B) Compelling Debtors to Produce their Insurance Policies Covering Mr. Provost's Claims. Fee Amount $150. Filed by Richard Provost. Hearing scheduled for 7/8/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/30/2008. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Notice 6 Proposed Form of Order 7 Certificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8061 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Amadeus Global Travel Distribution, S.A. Resolving Objection to Claims Nos. 7656 and 6858. (related document(s)8058 ) Order Signed on 4/7/2008. (Attachments: 1 Settlement Stipulation) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8060 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)8057 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 7/8/2008 at 10:30 AM., 10/8/2008 at 10:30 AM. Signed on 4/7/2008. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8059 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2008 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8058 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8057 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Omnibus Hearing Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8056 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and The State of Michigan Department of Revenue Resolving Claims. (related document(s)8053 ) Order Signed on 3/26/2008. (Attachments: 1 Settlement Stipulation) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8055 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Expedia, Inc. Regarding Resolution of Objection to Claim 7655. (related document(s)8054 ) Order Signed on 3/26/2008. (Attachments: 1 Settlement Stipulation) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8054 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8053 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8052 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Paciencia Suarez Resolving Objection to Claim No. 5696. (related document(s)8044 ) Order Signed on 3/11/2008. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8051 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Mansfield Oil Company Regarding Resolution of Objection to Claims 7763 and 7796. (related document(s)8048 ) Order Signed on 3/11/2008. (Attachments: 1 Settlement Stipulation) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8050 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal From Case; Request to Stop Electronic Notice and Request for Removal From the Mailing Matrix Filed by Camille J. Iurillo. (Mangan, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8049 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Rescheduled Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2008 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8048 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8047 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and The Missouri Department of Revenue Resolving Claims. (related document(s)8045 ) Order Signed on 2/19/2008. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8046 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice ofWithdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal of Service Lists Filed by Tara L. Lattomus. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Lattomus, Tara) Modified text on 2/20/2008 (JRK, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8045 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A (Stipulation)2 Exhibit B (Proposed Form of Order)3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8044 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit for Certification of Counsel2 Proposed Order3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8043 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled - HEARING CANCELLED (related document(s)8042 ) Filed by ANC Rental Corporation. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8042 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Rental Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 2/6/2008 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8041 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Virtual Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Virtual Minutes of: 02/06/2008 Subject: Omnibus. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: HEARING CANCELLED: No matters going forward. Counsel to file agenda canceling the hearing.. (vCal Hearing ID (49770)). (LMC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8040 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Order Dismissing Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: (Copy From District Court) Order Dismissing Appeal #06-36 [CA# 06-389] (related document(s)7883 ) Signed on 1/28/2008. (JRK, ) Modified Text on 2/5/2008 (LC, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8039 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s)8031, 8034, 8033, 8032 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/11/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8038 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement With Marjorie Joan Martin. (Related Doc # 8032) Order Signed on 1/9/2008. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8037 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement with Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc. and (II) Sale of Certain Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances. (Related Doc # 8031) Order Signed on 1/9/2008. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8036 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Virtual Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Virtual Minutes of: 01/11/2008 Subject: Omnibus. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: HEARING CANCELLED: Orders entered under CNOs. Counsel to file amended agenda.. (vCal Hearing ID (62067)). (LMC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8035 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s)8031, 8034, 8033, 8032 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/11/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/4/2008. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8034 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Liquidating Trust of ANC Rental Corporation for an Order (i) Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9019, Approving Settlement with Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc. and (ii) Sale of Certain Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances (related document(s)8031 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8033 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection for Motion of Liquidating Trust of ANC Rental Corporation for an Order Pursuant to Fed.Bankr.P. 9019, Approving Settlement with Marjorie Joan Martin (related document(s)8032 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8032 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Motion of Liquidating Trust of ANC Rental Corporation for an Order Pursuant to Fed.R.P.9019, Approving Settlement with Marjorie Joan Martin Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/11/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/4/2008. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Proposed Form of Order 4 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8031 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Motion of Liquidating Trust of ANC Rental Corporation for an Order (i) Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9019, Approving Settlement with Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc. and (ii) Sale of Certain Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/11/2008 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/4/2008. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Proposed Form of Order 4 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8030 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for the Third Quarter of 2007 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8029 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Pleadings. Filed by John Ramey. (JRK, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8028 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Status Report F Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8027 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Status Report E Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8026 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Status Report J Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8025 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Status Report Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8024 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Order on Motion to Allow
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting Relief from Confirmation Order and/or for a Declaration That the Discharge and Plan Injunction Do Not Apply. (Related Doc # 74166) Order Signed on 11/5/2007. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8023 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Second Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 5, 2007 @ 10:30am (Hearing Cancelled) (related document(s)8022 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8022 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Second Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8021 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Virtual Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Virtual Minutes of: 11/05/2007 Subject: Omnibus. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: HEARING CANCELLED: Order entered under CNO. Counsel to file amended agenda.. (vCal Hearing ID (49769)). (related document(s) 74170) (LMC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8020 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/3/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (related document(s)74169 ) Service Date 11/02/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8019 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Amended Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)8018 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8018 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 5, 2007 @ 10:30am Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8017 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Withdrawal of Michigan Department Of Treasury's Administrative Proof Claim Priority Proof of Claim and Unsecured Proof of Claim.(Related Document(s)5255) Filed by Michigan Department of Treasury. (ALC, ) Modified text on 9/27/2007 (ALC, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8016 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Amended Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims in the amount of $63,789.92. Filed by State of Michigan Department of Revenue. (JRK, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8015 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Denying The ANC Liquidating Trust's Motion for an Order Amending Current Procedures or the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims and Granting Related Relief. (Related Doc # 7999) Order Signed on 8/7/2007. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8014 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)8008, 8007, 7999 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8013 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/06/2007 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (38172)). (related document(s) 8011) (LMC, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2007 (MJY, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8012 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Amended Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)8011 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8011 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s)8009 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/6/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8010 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)8009 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8009 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 6, 2007 @ 10:30 a. m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/6/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8008 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Response to Motion to Amend the ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Amending Current Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims and Granting Related Relief (related document(s)7999 ) Filed by Alma Rosa Garcia (JRK, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8007 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Letter / Response to Motion to Amend the ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Amending Current Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims and Granting Related Relief (related document(s)7999 ) Filed by Kenneth Fleck . (JRK, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8006 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)8004 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 11/5/2007 at 10:30 AM., 2/6/2008 at 09:30 AM. Signed on 7/27/2007. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8005 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)7999 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8004 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8003 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Notice of Address Change(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Address Change for Montgomery, McCracken, Walker & Rhoads, LLP - Delaware Office Filed by Eastern Avenue Assocs., L.P.. (Burnham, Noel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8002 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Notice of Entry of Judgment(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Order Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8001 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 2nd Qtr/2007 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8000 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)7999 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7999 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Motion to Amend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion to Amend the ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Amending Current Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims and Granting Related Relief Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/6/2007 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/30/2007. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B4 Exhibit C5 Proposed Form of Order) (Burnett, William) Modified text on 7/20/2007 (JRK, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7998 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Status Report E Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7997 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Status Report C Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7996 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Reducing Claim Numbers 11564.01 and 11564.02 Filed by Claimant New York State Department of Taxation and Finance(related document(s)7977 ) Order Signed on 7/2/2007. (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7995 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 07/02/2007 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (38171)). (SAJ, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2007 (MJY, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7994 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation (Regarding Trust's Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims of Saratosa Manatee Airport Authority) (related document(s)7989 ) Order Signed on 6/27/2007. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7993 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Agends of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 2, 2007 at 11:30 a.m. (related document(s)7992 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7992 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing On July 2, 2007 at 11:30 a. m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2007 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7991 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)7977 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7990 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claims (related document(s)7639, 7631 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7989 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Saratosa Manatee Airport Authority Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7988 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Alliance Holdings, Ltd. (related document(s)7986 ) Order Signed on 6/19/2007. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7987 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between David Hawkins and Helen Hawkins and the ANC Liquidating Trust. (related document(s)7982 ) Order Signed on 6/19/2007. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7986 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel RE: Alliance Holdings, Ltd. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7985 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: (Amended) Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims In The Amount of $11,855.15 Filed by State of Michigan Department of Treasury. (ALC, ) Modified text on 10/24/2007 (JRK, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7984 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 1st Qtr/2007 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7983 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 4th Qtr/2006 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7982 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7981 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)7977 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7980 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 4, 2007 at 4:00p.m. (Cancelled) (related document(s)7979 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7979 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2007 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7978 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice To Substitute Attorney Filed by Port of Oakland. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Green, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7977 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Supplemental Objection to Claim Number 11564 by Claimant(s) New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. . Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2007 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/25/2007. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B4 Exhibit C5 Proposed Form of Order) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7976 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing Held on: 5/14/07 (LMC, )Subject: Final Pretrial Conferences in adversaries Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (LCN, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7975 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Appearance Filed by Internal Revenue Service, Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Saiz, Beatriz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7974 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Request for Status of Proposed Resolution of Claim -Filed by Victor Quinones and Davis Nieves . (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7973 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service Cancelled Hearing on May 2, 2007 at 4:00 p.m. (related document(s)7972 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7972 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2007 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7971 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of Service for Substitution of Counsel Filed by State of Michigan Department of Treasury. (Curling, Julius)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7970 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice To Substitute Attorney Filed by State of Michigan Department of Treasury. (Curling, Julius)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7969 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address Filed by Gentempo Realty, L.P.. (Conlan, Mark) Modified text on 3/27/2007 (MDE, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7968 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)7967 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7967 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 3/23/2007 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7966 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)7965 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 5/2/2007 at 04:00 PM., 6/4/2007 at 04:00 PM., 7/2/2007 at 11:30 AM., 8/6/2007 at 10:30 AM. Signed on 3/8/2007. (JSJ, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7965 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7964 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Amended Notice of Agenda for February 23, 2007 @ 9:30 a.m. (related document(s)7963 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7963 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2007 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7962 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)7961 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7961 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 23, 2007 @ 9:30 a. m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2007 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7960 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Non-Residential Real Property Leases. (related document(s)7959, 7156 ) Order Signed on 1/29/2007. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7959 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)7156 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Proposed Form of Order) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7958 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Scheduling Order for Adv No. 06-50924 Signed on 1/22/2007. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2007 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Discovery due by 2/28/2007. Trial date set for 1/14/2008 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7957 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Granting Motion of Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge to Withdraw as Bankruptcy Counsel to Adonay Baptista (Related Doc # 7950, 7953) -Signed on 1/22/2007. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7956 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 01/22/2007 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (34163)). (related document(s) 7954) (LMC, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2007 (JSJ, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7955 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 22, 2007 at 9:30 am (related document(s)7954 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7954 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 22, 2007 @ 9:30am Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/22/2007 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7953 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Service (Supplemental) Re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney to Adonay Baptista (related document(s)7950 ) Filed by Adonay Baptista. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Olivere, Mark) Modified Text on 12/29/2006 (LC, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7952 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/22/2006 Subject: Omnibus and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference and Status Conference. (vCal Hearing ID (28909)). (related document(s) 7947) (LMC, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2006 (BJM, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7951 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)7949 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 1/22/2007 at 09:30 AM. Signed on 12/21/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7950 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney to Adonay Baptista Filed by Adonay Baptista. (Attachments: 1 Notice of Motion2 Proposed Form of Order 3 Certificate of Service) (Olivere, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7949 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7948 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)7947 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7947 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 22, 2006 @11:30am Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2006 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Schedule of Adversary Actions) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7946 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Before Honorable Mary F. Walrath, Held on July 21, 2005. (related document(s)7628, 7625 ) (JWS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7945 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Notice of Address Change(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Address Change of Attorney- Filed by Expo Collision Center, Inc.. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7944 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Letter Request for Status of Claim -Filed by Goldstein Buckley Chechman Rice & Purtz, P.A. . (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7943 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 21, 2006 @ 11:30am (related document(s)7942 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7942 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2006 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7941 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Adversary case 06-50924. Complaint by The Liquidating Trust of ANC Rental Corporation against Vanguard Car Rental USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $250 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/15/2007. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7940 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 3rd Quarter/2006 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7939 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for 2nd Quarter/ 2006 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph) Modified image on 12/4/2006 (MDE, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7938 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2006 @ 9:30am which is Cancelled (related document(s)7937 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7937 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2006 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7936 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Status Report C - The Trust expects to file requests for entry of Default and Judgment in these cases within the next thirty (30) days. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7935 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Status Report C - The Trust expects to file requests for entry of Default and Judgment in these cases within the next ten (10) days. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7934 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Kathryn Hobart Regarding Resolution of Request for Payment of Administrative Claim. (related document(s)7930 ) Order Signed on 9/27/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7933 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between Liquidating Trust and Federal Realty Investment Trust and Union Station Venture, LTD. Resolving Proofs of Claim. (related document(s)7929 ) Order Signed on 9/27/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7932 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Notice of Address Change(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Address Change as to Notices for Claim Nos. 02928 and 07459- Filed by RCI Travel Inc. and Endless Vacation. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7931 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers - Filed by RCI Travel Inc. and Endless Vacation. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7930 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7929 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7928 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Colleen Garrity, Esquire. (Related Doc # 7927) Order Signed on 9/27/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7927 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Motion to Appear pro hac vice (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number 144828, Fee Amount $25. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7926 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order (AMENDED DATE SIGNED) Sustaining in Part the Debtors Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims. (related document(s)7408, 7923 ) Order Signed on 9/20/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7925 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)7924 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7924 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2006 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7923 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Sustaining in Part the Debtors Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims. (related document(s)7408 ) Order Signed on 9/20/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7922 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)7918 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7921 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 22nd, 2006@9:30a.m. (related document(s)7920 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7920 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 22, 2006 @ 9:30 a.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2006 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7919 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Motion to Reconsider (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion of Alliance Holdings, Ltd. for Reconsideration of Order Reducing its Claim (related document(s)7797 ) Filed by Alliance Holdings, Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 04:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/6/2006.. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Proposed Form of Order 3 Exhibit 14 Exhibit 25 Exhibit 36 Exhibit 47 Exhibit 58 Exhibit 69 Certificate of Service) (Sullivan, William) Modified duplicate text on 9/19/2006 (MDE, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7918 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Objection to Motion to Enforce Stipulated Final Judgment and Compel Immediate Payment (related document(s)7914 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7917 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)7916 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 04:00 PM., 11/21/2006 at 11:30 AM., 12/22/2006 at 11:30 AM. Signed on 9/14/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7916 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order for Omnibus Hearing dates) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7915 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Appearance (Amended) and Change of Address - Filed by Federal Express Corporation. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7914 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Motion to Compel (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion to Compel Motion to Enforce Stipulated Final Judgment and Compel Immediate Payment Filed by Adonay Baptista Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2006 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 9/15/2006.. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B4 Exhibit C5 Exhibit D6 Proposed Form of Order 7 Certificate of Service 8 Service List) (Olivere, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7913 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Withdrawal of Claim Filed Against National Car Rental Filed by Peoples Gas Light & Coke Co. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7912 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/23/2006 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (24553)). (related document(s) 7909) (LMC, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2006 (LCN, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7911 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Objection to 20th Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7884 ) Filed by Sunshine Drive Service Corp (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7910 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Affidavit of Service (related document(s)7909 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7909 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 23, 2006 @ 10:30 A.M. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7908 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Response to Nineteenth Omnibus Claims Objection (Substantive) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by William Tabert (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7907 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and DFK Investments LLC Resolving Claim No. 7138. (related document(s)7903 ) Order Signed on 8/17/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7906 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Objection to Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS INC (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C) (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7905 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Objection to Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by NAMS AUTO BODY SHOP INC (Attachments: 1 Attachment) (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7904 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Objection to Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by Sunshine Drive Service Corp (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7903 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7902 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Motion to Appear pro hac vice (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Philip Ashman, Esq. Receipt Number misplaced, Fee Amount $25. Filed by Law Enforcement Systems, Inc.. (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7901 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Response to The ANC Liquidating Trust's Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims (Docket No. 7882) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by Portside Truck & Auto Repair (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Wasserman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7900 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Response to The ANC Liquidating Trust's Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims (Docket No. 7882) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by DIVERSIFIED AUTOMOTIVE INC (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Wasserman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7899 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Objection to Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by AutoReg LLC (MDE, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7898 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim foar the Nineteenth and Twentieth Substantive Omnibus Objections to Claims Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service 2 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7897 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for ANC (related document(s)7884 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7896 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for ANC's Nineteenth Omnibus Objection (related document(s)7882 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List for ANC's Nineteenth Omnibus Objection) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7895 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between Reorganized Debtors and Iowa Department of Revenue and Finance Resolving Proofs of Claim. (related document(s)7894 ) Order Signed on 8/1/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7894 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7893 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Servicefor Notice of Agenda Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 24, 2006 @ 4:00 p.m. (related document(s)7892 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7892 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2006 at 04:00 PM at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, District of Delaware, 824 Market Street, 3rd Floor, Wilmington, DE 19801. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7891 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request to Be Removed from All Service Lists (related document(s)7579, 7582, 7617, 7577 ) Filed by General Motors Acceptance Corporation. (Harker, James). Duplicate text removed on 7/18/2006 (MDE, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7890 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)7889, 7888 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7889 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s)7888 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/26/2006 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7888 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/26/2006 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7887 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Ryan T. Murphy, Esquire. (Related Doc # 7885) Order Signed on 6/19/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7886 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Transcript Of Hearing Before The Honorable Mary F. Walrath on April 24, 2006. (related document(s)7861, 7856 ) (JWS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7885 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Motion to Appear pro hac vice (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Ryan T. Murphy, Esquire. Receipt Number 143821, Fee Amount $25. Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin. (Yoder, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7884 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Objection to Claim(s) (20th Omnibus Objection, Substantive Objection) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 8/16/2006. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Declaration 3 Exhibit A4 Exhibit B5 Exhibit C6 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7883 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Transmittal of record on appeal.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Transmittal of Record on Appeal to U.S. District Court [Appeal #06-36] [CA# 06-389] Notice of docekt ing REcord on Appeal D.C. docket #5(related document(s)7870, 7878, 7867, 7871 ) Filed by U.S.B.C.. (MJY, ) Modified to add CA# on 9/17/2007 (JRK, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7882 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Objection to Claim(s) (19th Omnibus Objection, Substantive Objection) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 8/16/2006. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Declaration 3 Exhibit A4 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7881 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between Illinois Department of Revenue and the ANC Liquidating Trust. (related document(s)7879 ) Order Signed on 6/14/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7880 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Service Of Response To Proposed Resolution of Claim Filed by Jacquelyn Skaff. (ALC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7879 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7878 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Counter Designation (Appellee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal (Additional items)(related document(s)4232, 4438, 4415, 3053, 968, 3205, 3367, 942, 936, 3395 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service)(Burnett, William) Modified on 5/26/2006 (NAL, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7877 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices Filed by Dash & Berger, Esqs.. (KPB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7876 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Damand for Service of Papers Filed by Dash & Berger, Esqs.. (Iannone, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7875 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)7872 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 6/26/2006 at 10:30 AM., 7/24/2006 at 04:00 PM., 8/23/2006 at 10:30 AM., 9/22/2006 at 09:30 AM. Signed on 5/22/2006. (TK, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7874 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda Matter Scheduled for Hearing on May 24th, 2006 @ 11:30 a.m. (related document(s)7873 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7873 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 24, 2006 @ 11:30 A.M. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7872 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Ominbus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7871 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Statement of Issues on Appeal (Ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Statement of Issues on Appeal, and Designation of the Record (related document(s)7870, 7867 ) Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service)(Yoder, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7870 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Amended Notice of Appeal (Ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Amended Notice of Appeal from the Order (D.I. #7865) and Memorandum Opinion (D.I. #7864) issued by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware on April 28, 2006, denying the Motion of Marjorie Joan Martin for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim. (related document(s)7865, 7867 ) Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin Appellant Designation due by 5/25/2006. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service)(Yoder, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7869 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report for ANC Liquidating Trust 1st Quarter 2006 Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7868 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Autodocket of credit card
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal (Ap)(01-11200-MFW) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00). Receipt Number 2548900, amount $ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7867 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Notice of Appeal (Ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Appeal from the Order (D.I. #7865) and Memorandum Opinion (D.I. 7864) issued by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware on April 28, 2006, denying the Motion of Marjorie Joan Martin for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim. Fee Amount $255. (related document(s)7865, 2738, 1932, 1923, 2733, 1926, 1931, 1927, 2747, 2384, 1940, 2161, 1933, 3862, 1963, 2186, 2734, 2088, 2737, 1357, 1929, 2951, 2382, 1941, 2208, 2134, 2080, 2739, 2744, 2159, 2740, 2090, 2742, 1365, 2745, 2736, 2387, 2089, 1944, 2081, 3210, 2086, 1359, 2152, 1362, 2154, 3318, 2741, 3784, 2150, 1837, 1938, 2735, 1937, 2157, 2207, 2743, 1366, 1942, 3130, 1936, 801, 2082, 2746, 1928, 1364, 2414, 2085, 1943, 2083, 2087, 1925, 2789 ) Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin Appellant Designation due by 5/15/2006. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service)(Yoder, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7866 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate of Service - Opinion and Order regarding the Motion of Marjorie Joan Martin for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)7865 ) Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin (Yoder, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7865 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order DENYING Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Claim (related document(s)7848, 7847, 7855, 7864 ) (CAF, )Order Signed on 4/28/2006. (CAF, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7864 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Memorandum/Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Memorandum Opinion DENYING Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Claim (related document(s)7848, 7847, 7855 ) (CAF, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7863 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawlof Attorney Filed by The CIT Group/ Equipment Financing, Inc. (Brown, William) Modified on 4/27/2006 (KPB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7862 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Conneticut Department of Revenue Services With Respect to Claims Nos. 1803, 11509, 11515 and 11516. (related document(s)7860 ) Order Signed on 4/24/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7861 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s)7856 ) (LCN, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2006 (LCN, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7860 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7859 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Notice of Address Change(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Address Change Notice of Email Address Change Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7858 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate of Service for Objection of Liquidating Trust of ANC Rental Corporation to Marjorie Joan Martin's Motion (related document(s)7855 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7857 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 24, 2006 @ 2:00 P.M. (related document(s)7856 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7856 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 24, 2006 @ 2:00 p.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7855 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Objection to Marjorie Joan Martin's Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)7847 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7854 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Appearance as Claimant by way of assignment from InterPlan Architecture, Inc. Filed by Huntington C. Brown. (NAL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7853 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice To Substitute Attorney for USAA Filed by United Services Autmobile Association. (Huggett, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7852 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims in the Amount of 363,321.00 [Taxes]. Filed by New York State Department Of Taxation & Finance. (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7851 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Amended Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for March 28, 2006 (related document(s)7850 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7850 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 28, 2006 @ 11:30 a.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7849 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order (REVISIONS BY THE COURT) Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s)7772 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 3/28/2006 at 11:30 AM., 4/24/2006 at 02:00 PM., 5/24/2006 at 11:30 AM. Signed on 3/23/2006. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7848 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Memorandum of Law in Support of Marjorie Joan Martin's Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)7847 ) Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin (Attachments: 1 Affidavit Lee La Bore, Esq.2 Exhibit A through D to Affidavit3 Exhibit E through G to Affidavit4 Exhibit H part 1 to Affidavit5 Exhibit H part 2 to Affidavit6 Certificate of Service) (Casarino, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7847 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Motion to Allow (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion to Allow - Motion of Marjorie Joan Martin for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Filed by Marjorie Joan Martin Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2006 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 4/17/2006.. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Proposed Form of Order 3 Affidavit of Lee La Bore, Esq.4 Exhibit A through D5 Exhibit E through G to Affidavit6 Exhibit H, Part 1 to Affidavit7 Exhibit H, Part 2 to Affidavit8 Certificate of Service) (Casarino, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7846 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 28, 2006 @ 11:30 a.m. (related document(s)7845 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Service List for Hearing on March 28, 2006 @ 11:30 am) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7845 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 28, 2006 @ 11:30 A. M. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7844 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Granting the ANC Liquidating Trust's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Objections to Claims (Related Doc # 7843) Order Signed on 3/16/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7843 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Motion to Extend Time Ex Parte Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order Order Granting Ex Parte Extension of Deadline2 Certificate of Service For Debtor's Ex Parte Motion For A Further Extension of Time) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7842 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Objection to Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of Eddie Rose. (related document(s)7819 ) Filed by Eddie R. Rose (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7841 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s)7835 ) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7840 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Notice of Removal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Removal Notice of Request for Removal from Service List Filed by ERNIE MILLER PONTIAC - GMC, INC., Windy Auto Body. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Cross, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7839 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Notice of Removal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Removal Filed by Rock Island County Collector. (Bare, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7838 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection for ANC Liquidating Trust's Motion of Third Omnibus Seeking Approval Of Compromises Of Certain Claims Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service2 Exhibit A - Notice and Motion3 Exhibit B - Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7837 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Partially Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of National Car Rental of Oklahoma (Claim No. 10934) (related document(s)7831 ) Order Signed on 2/21/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7836 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 24th, 2006 @ 2:00pm (related document(s)7835 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Service List Service List for ANC Liquidating Trust) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7835 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 24, 2006 @ 2:00 P. M. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Attachment List of Status Report in adversary cases) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7834 Filed: 2/20/2006, Entered: 2/20/2006 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report Quarterly Report for 4th Quarter Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7833 Filed: 2/20/2006, Entered: 2/20/2006 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report 3rd Quarterly Report Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Receipts2 Exhibit Disbursements) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7832 Filed: 2/20/2006, Entered: 2/20/2006 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Service of Response to Proposed Resolution of Claim Filed by Daisy Santiago. (Phillips, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7831 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7830 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Resolving Claim No. 10922. (related document(s)7829 ) Order Signed on 2/15/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7829 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7828 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Resolving Claim No. 8415. (related document(s)7823 ) Order Signed on 2/10/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7827 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Sustaining the Trust's Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims. (related document(s)7808 ) Order Signed on 2/9/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A through C) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7826 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Resolving Claim No. 8416. (related document(s)7814 ) Order Signed on 2/9/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7825 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Resolving Claim No. 8417. (related document(s)7813 ) Order Signed on 2/9/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7824 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Resolving Claim No. 8425. (related document(s)7812 ) Order Signed on 2/9/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7823 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7822 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Sustaining the Trust's Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Non-Substantive Objection to Duplicate and Amended Claims. (related document(s)7810 ) Order Signed on 2/8/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit C) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7821 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Alief Independent School District With Respect to Claim No. 11580. (related document(s)7809 ) Order Signed on 2/8/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7820 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of William Owen (related document(s)7806, 7503 ) Order Signed on 2/6/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7819 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of Eddie Rose (related document(s)7805 ) Order Signed on 2/6/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7818 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of James Parker (related document(s)7804, 7631 ) Order Signed on 2/6/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7817 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of MCI WorldCom (related document(s)7803, 7631 ) Order Signed on 2/6/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7816 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of South Tahoe Public Utility District (related document(s)7802 ) Order Signed on 2/6/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7815 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of Chevron Creditor Bank, N.A. (related document(s)7801, 7574 ) Order Signed on 2/6/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7814 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7813 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7812 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7811 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal and Request to be Removed From Service Lists Filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Jameson, Bruce)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7810 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit C3 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7809 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7808 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Order) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7807 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Objection to Motion of The Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims. (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by Theolonius Paige, Jr., et al. (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7806 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7805 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7804 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7803 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7802 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7801 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7800 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Signed in Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Authorizing Retention of CPT Group, Inc. as Offical Noticing and Claims Agent Signed in Court (related document(s)7770 ) Signed on 1/26/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7799 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Signed in Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Shortening Notice with Respect to Expedited Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust for the Entry of an Order Authorizing Retention of CPT Group, Inc. as Offical Noticing and Claims Agent Signed in Court (related document(s)7770 ) Signed on 1/26/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7798 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s)7784, 7790 ) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7797 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claims of Alliance Holdings, LTD. (related document(s)7759 ) Order Signed on 1/25/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7796 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Sustaining in Part ANC Liquidating Trust's Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claims of Toye Realty Holdings, Inc. (related document(s)7758 ) Order Signed on 1/25/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7795 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claims of Dick Dinsmore Tires, Inc. (Claim No. 1116) (related document(s)7760 ) Order Signed on 1/25/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7794 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting Limited Withdrawal of Counsel (related document(s)7745, 7783 ) Order Signed on 1/25/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7793 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Reassigning Certain Adversary Proceedings to the Honorable Kevin J. Carey Signed on 01/24/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7792 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)7770 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7791 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 26,2006 @ 9:30 a.m. (related document(s)7790 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7790 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Scheduled on January 26, 2006 @ 9:30 a.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7789 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation between ANC Liquidating Trust and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Resolving Proofs of Claim (related document(s)7778 ) Order Signed on 1/23/2006. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7788 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation between ANC Liquidating Trust and Randy J. Ungar with Respect to Claim No. 3481 (related document(s)7780 ) Order Signed on 1/23/2006. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7787 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Stipulation between ANC Liquidating Trust and ATEL Capital Equipment Fund VIII, LLC with Respect to Claims Nos. 2940, 2940.01, 2940.02 and 2940.03 (related document(s)7779 ) Order Signed on 1/23/2006. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7786 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Sustaining ANC Liquidating Trust's Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Administrative Claims with Respect to the Claim of SNS Enterprises, Inc. (related document(s)7777 ) Order Signed on 1/23/2006. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7785 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 26,2006 @ 9:30 a.m. (related document(s)7784 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7784 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 26th 2006 @ 9:30 a.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7783 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection For Stevens & Lee, PC As Counsel For the ANC Liquidating Trust With Respect To Certain Limited Matters (related document(s)7745 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit CNO - Exhibit A2 Exhibit CNO - Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service CNO Certificate of Service4 Service List CNO - Service List) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7782 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Service Notice of Filing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Attachment Letter to Charity E. Owen2 Certificate of Service) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7781 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7780 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7779 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7778 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7777 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7776 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate of Service for Entry of an Order Authorizing Retention Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7775 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of Service Declaration regarding service (related document(s)7770 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7774 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Notice of Appearance(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Appearance Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7773 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Response to Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by New York State Department Of Taxation & Finance (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (O'Brien, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7772 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order for Omnibus Hearing dates) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7771 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation Between ANC Liquidating Trust and Newmark Properties and Herbert L. Newmark Resolving Administrative Claim Request. (related document(s)7768 ) Order Signed on 1/12/2006. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7770 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Motion to Shorten (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion to Shorten Time Expedited Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust for the Entry of an Order Authorizing Retention of CPT Group, Inc. as Offical Noticing and Claims Agent Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 1/26/2006 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 1/23/2006.. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order Order Shortening Notice2 Proposed Form of Order Order Authorizing Retention3 Expedited Motion of ANC4 Exhibit A5 Exhibit B) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7769 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice To Substitute Attorney Stipulation and Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7768 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Stipulation2 Exhibit B - Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7767 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Service Notice of Filing Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Attachment Letter to Eddie R. Rose2 Attachment Letter to James Parker3 Certificate of Service) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7766 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation (RE: Adv. No. 03-58465). Order Signed on 12/28/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (LCN, ) Modified text on 12/29/2005 (LCN, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2005 (LCN, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7765 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation (RE: Adversary No. 03-58043). Order Signed on 12/28/2005. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7764 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation. (related document(s)7761 ) Signed on 12/22/2005. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (JMP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7763 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing /All Matters on this Agenda are Being Continued Until January 26, 2006 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2005 at 02:00 PM (check with court for location). (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7762 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting the ANC Liquidating Trust's Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims Order Signed on 12/21/2005. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7761 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification of Counsel re Supplemental Stipulation Allowing the Claim Of the Aldine Independent School District and Resolving Harris County Advo. Pro. (related document(s)7605 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7760 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Counsel for the Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)7503 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7759 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel for the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)7532 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7758 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel for the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)7532 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7757 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation (related document(s)7756 ) Order Signed on 12/19/2005. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7756 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7755 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Ex Parte Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust's for a Further Extension of the Deadline to File Objections to Claims (Related Doc # 7754) Order Signed on 12/13/2005. (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7754 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion to Extend Time Ex Parte Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust's for a Further Extension of the Deadline to File Objections to Claims Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7753 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim for Third Omnibus Objection Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Submission for Third Omnibus Proof of Claims) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7752 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim for the Seventeenth Substantive Omnibus Objections Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service for Seventeenth Substantive Omnibus Objections to Claims) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7751 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Sustaining, in Part the Trust's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s)7741 ) Order Signed on 12/8/2005. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A and B) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7750 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Sustaining, in Part the Trust's Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s)7744 ) Order Signed on 12/8/2005. (Attachments: 1 Exhibits A - C) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7749 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Sustaining the Trust's Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims, Non-Substantive Objection to Duplicate and Amended Claims (related document(s)7743 ) Order Signed on 12/8/2005. (Attachments: 1 Declaration A and B) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7748 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification of Counsel (related document(s)7738 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A"2 Exhibit "B") (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7747 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Response to Liquidating Trust's Seventeenth Omnibus Objection Regarding State of Michigan's Claims (related document(s)7728 ) Filed by State of Michigan Department of Treasury (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service) (Harris, Juandisha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7746 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Response to Motion of The Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims. (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by William Tabert (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Exhibit E6 Letter Regarding Late Filing of Response.) (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7745 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Motion of Stevens & Lee, P.C. to Withdraw as Counsel to the ANC Liquidating Trust With Respect to Certain Limited Matters) Filed by Stevens & Lee, P.C. Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2005 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/22/2005.. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7744 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Amended Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7743 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7742 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7741 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7740 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Stipulation between ANC Liquidating Trust and Truman Arnold Companies, Inc. (related document(s)7736 ) Order Signed on 12/1/2005. (Attachments: 1 Stipulation) (DKP, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7739 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Signed in Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Granting Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay and the Permanent Injunction. (related document(s)7706 ) Signed in Court on 11/30/2005. (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7738 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s)7734, 7731 ) (LCN, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7737 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Response to Proposed Resolution of Claim. Filed by Leon Wright (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7736 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Counsel Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B) (Whalen Jr., Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7735 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service for Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 30th, 2005 at 4:00 p.m. (related document(s)7734 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7734 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 30th, 2005 at 4:00 p.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7733 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Objection to Motion of The Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims. (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by Alma Rosa Garcia (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7732 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit of Service for Notice of Agenda Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 30th, 2005 at 4:00 p.m. (related document(s)7731 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7731 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 30, 2005 at 4:00 p.m. Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust. (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7730 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Motion to Approve (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Third Motion to Approve (Third Omnibus Motion Seeking Approval of Compromises of Certain Claims) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2005 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/22/2005.. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B4 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7729 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) (18th Omnibus Objection, Non-Substantive Objection) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2005 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/22/2005. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Declaration 3 Exhibit A4 Exhibit B5 Exhibit C6 Proposed Form of Order) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7728 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) (17th Omnibus Objection, Substantive Objection) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2005 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/22/2005. (Attachments: 1 Declaration 2 Proposed Form of Order 3 Exhibit A4 Exhibit B5 Exhibit C6 Notice) (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7727 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Limited Objection to Motion of the ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh PA (Casarino, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7726 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Objection to OBJECTION OF THE ESTATE OF CLARK SMITH, LINDA C. SMITH AND TERESA ERCOLANI, CO-ADMINISTRATORS OF THE ESTATE OF CLARK SMITH, AND DIANE VALIQUETTE TO THE MOTION OF THE ANC LIQUIDATING TRUST FOR AND ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR THE TREATMENT OF CERTAIN PRE-PETITION PERSONAL INJURY CLAIMS (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by Estate of Clark Smith, et. al. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Motion for Relief2 Certificate of Service) (Hogan, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7725 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Objection to Motion of The Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims. (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by Crystal Richardson (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7724 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Response to Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims Filed by 38 Plaintiffs (Alexander, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7723 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Response to Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims Filed by ANC Rental Corporation (Alexander, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7722 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Objection to the Motion of the Estate of Clark Smith, Linda C. Smith and Teresa Ercolani, Co-Adminstrators of the Estate of Clark Smith, and Diane Valiquette for Relief from Automatic Stay under Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Permanent Injunction Contained in the Amended Joint Liquidating Plan (related document(s)7706 ) Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Burnett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7721 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Response to and Limited Objection to Motion of ANC Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by Royal Indemnity Company (Attachments: 1 Affidavit of Service) (Cobb, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7720 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Objection to Motion of The Liquidating Trust for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Treatment of Certain Pre-Petition Personal Injury Claims. (related document(s)7709 ) Filed by Malecka Davis (MJY, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7719 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Status Report Status E - Adversary Proceeding Settled, Notice of Dismissal not yet filed Filed by ANC Liquidating Trust (Grey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 575 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?