Round Rock Research LLC v. American Apparel Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01238
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 12:14 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Apparel, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Berrebi jberrebi@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Todd Hohenthaner +1 212 446 4832 +1 212 446 4900 jhohenthaner@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice, filed by Round Rock Research LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2014. (nms) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ORDER: The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report in 30 days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC, Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
              Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Chiu as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                    Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                        Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Apparel Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER Administratively Closing Cases. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter. It is further Ordered that the parties shall promptly notify the Court when the reexaminations are complete and the stays should be lifted so that the cases may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Granting (19 in 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA, 21 in 1:11-cv-01238-RGA, 16 in 1:11-cv-01245-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01237-RGA, 20 in 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 26 in 1:11-cv-01243-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 29 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 12 in 1:12-cv-00309-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Pleadings and to Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                              Joint STIPULATION To Amend Pleadings and To Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit by Amazon.com Inc., V F Corporation, Gap Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Motorola Solutions Inc., American Apparel Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation Inc., Fruit of the Loom Inc., Dole Food Company Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings Inc., Hanesbrands Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Postponing Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/27/2012) (nms). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                  PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                    Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding March 28 Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                      Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Request for Continuance of the Scheduling Conference Set for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 at 1:00 p.m.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 3/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Scheduling Conference on March 28, 2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/28/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2012. (nms) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by American Apparel Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Round Rock Research LLC, by American Apparel Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 2/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey J. Zuber and Attorney Tristan F. Mackprang - filed by American Apparel Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Compliant to February 13, 2012 - filed by American Apparel Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on American Apparel, Inc. on 1/6/2012, filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner, Jason Berrebi, and Eugene Chiu of Desmarais LLP - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to February 6, 2012 - filed by American Apparel Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Apparel Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. American Apparel Inc. served on 12/15/2011, answer due 1/5/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E;. (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against American Apparel Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-991609.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 546 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?