Round Rock Research LLC v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00362

Tags
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 5:50 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Brian Williams +1 302 622 4211 +1 302 656 8920 gwilliams@foxrothschild.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Round Rock Research LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/5/2014. (nms) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ORDER: The Stay is continued until December 8, 2014,. Any unsettled cases are reopened as of December 8, 2014. Parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule no later than December 15, 2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 1:12-cv-00362-RGA(nms) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORAL ORDER: The Stay is Continued until 11/21/2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
              Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORAL ORDER: The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report in 30 days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC, Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Administratively Closing Case. The parties shall promptly notify the Court when the reexamination is complete and the stay should be lifted so that the case may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/9/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SO ORDERED Granting 9 Stipulation and Order to Stay Case Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION And Proposed Order to Stay Case Pending Reexamination of Patents-in-suit, by Round Rock Research LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Williams, Gregory) Modified on 5/8/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to May 11, 2012 - filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER Postponing Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/27/2012) (nms). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                      Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding March 28 Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Scheduling Conference on March 28, 2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. served on 3/21/2012, answer due 4/11/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (lih) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1042166.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Attachment 11 replaced on 3/21/2012) (lih). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/21/2012) (lih). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/21/2012) (lih). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/21/2012) (lih). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/21/2012) (lih). (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 515 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?