Enerson v. Joens et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-00316
District Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Enerson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Institutional Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Cooley Lentz +1 352 375 2494 +1 352 271 4366 klentz@filsinc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MIGRANT FARMWORKER JUSTICE PROJECT - LAKE WORTH FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Kieran Dwyer +1 407 883 5963 +1 352 331 5202 Robert@floridalegal.org
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Jacques Felipe Lamour, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Benjamin Berger +1 786 268 6803 +1 305 373 2294 evan.berger@csklegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Lury +1 954 523 7008 +1 954 523 7009 slury@qpwblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Robert C. Joens, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Ronald Holmes, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Sandra Peterson, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 111 Motion to Take Deposition from Robert Enerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/9/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
    RESPONSE in opposition re 111 MOTION to take deposition from ROBERT ENERSON filed by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lentz, Kristen) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER the Clerk of Court shall correct defense counsel's entry on the docket and the docket entry shall read "motion for substitution of counsel." 109 . Defendant Lamour's "stipulated motion for substitution of counsel" 109 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/31/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION to take deposition from ROBERT ENERSON by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Lury, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Lury on behalf of Jacques Felipe Lamour (Lury, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION to substitute counsel by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Berger, Evan) Modified on 11/1/2011 to edit event and docket text pursuant to 112 (SLU). (Entered: 10/27/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 107 Related case order and notice of designation of track 1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Enerson. Related case(s): no (Lentz, Kristen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/26/2011. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/12/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Dwyer on behalf of Robert Enerson (Dwyer, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Cooley Lentz on behalf of Robert Enerson (Lentz, Kristen) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 99 Motion to appoint counsel Appointed Kristen Cooley Lentz for Robert Enerson. The Clerk of Court shall mail a complete copy of the file along with the docket sheet in this action to Attorney Kristen Lentz. Appointed counsel should file a Notice of Appearance in this case as soon as possible. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/20/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                        PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Resume of Dr. Stern)(Berger, Evan) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                          PLAINTIFF'S PRETRIAL NARRATIVE STATEMENT by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Robert Enerson re: 99 MOTION to appoint counsel by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in support re 99 Motion to appoint counsel filed by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION to appoint counsel by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                  PROPOSAL for settlement by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (SLU) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier: Settlement Conference held on 8/17/2011. OUTCOME: Not settled. (BJH) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER denying 95 Defendant Lamour's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Signed by Judge Charlene E. Honeywell on 8/11/2011. (BGS) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Berger, Evan) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Setting Hearing Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2011 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. The Court requires that the Florida Department of Corrections produce Robert Enerson, on Wednesday, August 17, 2011, for the Conference at 9:30 a.m.. The Clerk of Court shall provide a copy of this Order to the Warden at Plaintiff's current place of incarceration, Plaintiff's Classification Officer, and Carol Stokley, Correctional Services Administrator, Population Management. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 8/8/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                            JUDGMENT in favor of Robert C. Joens, Ronald Holmes, and Sandra Peterson against Robert Enerson (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SLU) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Lamour's Motion for Summary Judgment 76 is DENIED for the reasons set forth herein. Defendant Lamour and Plaintiff SHALL participate in a MANDATORY settlement conference before the United States Magistrate Judge, with details contained in a forthcoming order. The Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of Defendants Joens, Holmes, and Peterson 82 is GRANTED in their individual and official capacities. These Defendants are dismissed from this action with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and correct the caption of this action. Signed by Judge Charlene E. Honeywell on 7/20/2011. (BGS) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 89 Motion for extension of time to complete discovery. Defendants shall comply with the Court's April 27, 2011 Order within ten (10) days from the date on this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/5/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                  DEFENDANT, Jacques Felipe Lamour, M.D.'s notice of compliance re 88 Order on motion to compel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on motion for issuance filed by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Evan) Modified on 5/5/2011 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                    First MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery and Notice of Partial Compliance by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson. (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting in part to the extent that Defendants shall produce requests numbered #2, #13, #14, and #15 and shall file a Notice of Compliance with the Court within seven (7) days from the date on this Order and denying in part the remainder of 68 Motion to compel; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion specifically to hold Defendant Lamour's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance; granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion specifically to hold Defendant Lamour's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance. Upon receipt of discovery from Defendants, Plaintiff shall notify the Court within seven (7) days whether he wishes to file amended responses to the Defendant's respective motions for summary judgment, or whether he wishes to submit copies of any of the discovery to his previously filed responses to his amended exhibits. Absent a notice from Plaintiff, the Court will deem the matters ripe for review within fourteen (14) days from the date on this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/26/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 86 Motion for extension of time to file. Within seven (7) days of the Plaintiff filing a Pre-trial statement, all Defendants must file ter respetive Pre-trial statements pursuant to the Court's November 19, 2010 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/8/2011. (RMT) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for extension of time to file document pretrial narrative statement by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson. (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in opposition re 82 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to hold Defendant's Joens, Holmes, and Peterson's Motion for Summary Judgment in abeyance, MOTION for issuance of order as to plaintiff's "second" motion to compel discovery by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in opposition re 76 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Robert Enerson. (RMT) Modified on 4/8/2011 to correct document link(kma). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                  MOTION for summary judgment by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavits)(Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to hold Defendant Lamour's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance, MOTION for issuance of Order as to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 75 Motion for extension of time to file. Defendants may file their dispositive motion on or before February 7, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/07/2011. (RMT) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Jacques Felipe Lamour of Joinder (Berger, Evan) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of compliance re 66 Case management and scheduling order by Jacques Felipe Lamour (Attachments: # 1 RESPONSE to plaintiff's request for documents by Jacques Felipe Lamour)(Berger, Evan) Modified on 4/8/2011 to clarify docket text as to exhibit 1. Created hyperlink to 68 Motion to Compel per staff attorney/aj (kma). (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in opposition re 68 Motion to compel discovery in compliance by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson. (Belitzky, Joe) Modified on 1/11/2011 to edit docket entry relationship and text (SLU). (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                              MOTION for summary judgment by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Evan) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for extension of time to file document Motion for Summary Judgment by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson. (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER directing Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Jacques Felipe Lamour, Sandra Peterson to respond to 68 MOTION to compel within seven (7) days from the date on this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/4/2011. (SLU) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER that document 69 first request for admission and demand for jury trial, 70 first request for production of documents, 71 first set of interrogatories and 72 demand for trial by jury and request for deposition are construed to be motions are denied. The Clerk shall strike and return documents as improperly filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/7/2010. (RMT) Modified on 12/8/2010 to correct docket text(kma). (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                      DEMAND for trial by Jury and request for depositions by Robert Enerson. (RMT) STRICKEN on 12/7/2010 pursuant to 73 (RMT). (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        FIRST set of interrogatories to defendants. (RMT) STRICKEN on 12/7/2010 pursuant to 73 (RMT). (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          FIRST request for production of documents by Robert Enerson (RMT) STRICKEN on 12/7/2010 pursuant to 73 (RMT). (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            FIRST request for admissions and demand for jury trial by Robert Enerson (RMT) STRICKEN on 12/7/2010 pursuant to 73 (RMT). (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                              MOTION to compel discovery in compliance with this Honorable Court's Order by Robert Enerson. (RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Marcus Graper on behalf of Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson (Graper, Marcus) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: Counsel Beltizky, who represents Defendants Jeons, Holmes, and Peterson, shall inquire as to the status of Plaintiff's request for copies of his medical record. Defendants shall ensure Plaintiff has said copies within fourteen (14) days from the date on this Order. Counsel Berger, who represents Defendant Doctor Lamour, shall supplement Counsel Beltizky's production of discovery on behalf of Defendants, as needed so as not to be duplicative, in response to Plaintiff's discovery requests [61-1]. Defendants Joens, Holmes, and Peterson shall comply with the remaining discovery matters discussed in the Court's November 5, 2010 Order within fourteen (14) days from the date on this Order. Dispositive motions for summary judgment due by 1/5/2011, Pretrial statement due by 2/9/2011 for Plaintiff and due by 3/9/11 for Defendants. The parties are encouraged to consider attending a status conference to discuss settlement of the claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/19/2010. (SLU) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: Discovery Hearing held on 11/19/2010. Court heard arguments of Counsel regarding the outstanding discovery issues. Written order to follow. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of compliance re 62 Order to strike by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Belitzky, Joe) Modified on 11/15/2010 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing. Defense counsel shall appear for a Discovery Hearing set for 11/18/2010 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Plaintiff, who is incarcerated at DeSoto Correctional Annex, shall appear by teleconference. The Court will initiate the teleconference at the DeSoto Correctional Institution Annex, phone number (863) 993-7837. The Clerk of Court shall immediately fax a copy of this Order to the Florida Department of Corrections, Attn: Carol Stokely; and DeSoto Correctional Institution Annex, Attn: Classification Officer Orton at (863) 993-7839. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2010. (SLU) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER to strike as improperly filed re: 59 Reply to response to motion filed by Jacques Felipe Lamour. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a courtesy copy of the rules on discovery. Motions denied: 53 MOTION to compel filed by Robert Enerson. Motion denied: 57 MOTION to dismiss Complaint filed by Jacques Felipe Lamour. Counsel for the DOC Defendants must produce the uncontested discovery to Plaintiff within seven (7) days from the date on this Order and shall file a Notice of Compliance. Motion denied without prejudice: 60 MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery filed by Robert Enerson. The Court will schedule a hearing on this matter by separate Order to expedite these matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2010. (SLU) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition re 57 MOTION to dismiss Complaint filed by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(SLU) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REQUEST for extension of time to complete discovery by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY to response to motion re 57 MOTION to dismiss Complaint filed by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Berger, Evan) STRICKEN on 11/5/2010 pursuant to 62 (SLU) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in opposition re 57 MOTION to dismiss Complaint filed by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION to dismiss Complaint by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Berger, Evan) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to motion re 53 MOTION to compel filed by Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Sandra Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT in favor of Florida Department of Corrections against Robert Enerson (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SLU) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 43 Motion to dismiss filed on behalf of Defendant Florida Department of Corrections. The Florida Department of Corrections is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and correct the caption of the case. Signed by Judge Charlene E. Honeywell on 6/29/2010. (BGS) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION to compel discovery by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 51 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Plaintiff shall serve any discovery requests for Defendant Doctor Lamour on Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/17/2010. (SLU) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Joe Belitzky to withdraw as attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER that Counsel Evan Berger and Joe Belitzky, who entered appearances as "lead counsel" for Defendant Lamour, shall file a Motion as directed within five (5) days from the date on this Order; granting 42 Motion for extension of time to complete discovery. Plaintiff shall propound all discovery on appropriate counsel, as discussed, on or before July 22, 2010. Any motions relating to discovery, such as, a motion to compel, are due on or before August 27, 2010; denying as moot 47 Motion for a scheduling order and instructions to plaintiff; denying as moot 48 Motion to dismiss. The deadline for the filing of Pre-trial Motions is temporarily suspended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/9/2010. (SLU) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in opposition re 48 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with Court Order filed by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(SLU) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with Court Order by Florida Department of Corrections, Ronald Holmes, Robert C. Joens, Jacques Felipe Lamour, Sandra Peterson. (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for a Scheduling Order and Instructions to a Pro Se Litigant regarding a Motion for Final Summary Judgment by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Berger, Evan) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Jacques Felipe Lamour re 44 Final MOTION for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Main Document Dr. Jacques Felipe Lamour's Affidavit)(Berger, Evan) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition re 43 First MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Final MOTION for summary judgment by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dr. Lamour)(Berger, Evan) STRICKEN on 1/13/2011 pursuant to 80 (RMT). (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint by Florida Department of Corrections. (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery by Robert Enerson. (SLU) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 39 Order on motion for order to show cause filed by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(SLU) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      US Marshal 285 form for service of complaint. RETURN of service executed on 1/13/10 by Robert Enerson as to Florida Department of Corrections. (U.S. Marshal fees $65.00) (SLU) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 38 Motion for order to show cause. Plaintiff shall show cause pursuant to Local Rule 3.10 on or before Wednesday, February 3, 2010, why this action should not be dismissed for his lack of prosecution. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/25/2010. (SLU) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for issuance of order to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution by Jacques Felipe Lamour. (Berger, Evan) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Benjamin Berger on behalf of Jacques Felipe Lamour (Berger, Evan) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Case reassigned to Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. New case number: 2:09-cv-316-FTM-36SPC. Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (RKM) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Florida Department of Corrections on 10/30/09 by Robert Enerson (SLU) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/6/2010, Dispositive motions due by 3/3/2010, Pretrial statement due by 5/3/2010 for plaintiff and due by 5/24/10 for defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/22/2009. (SLU) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 18 Amended complaint by Robert C. Joens, Ronald Holmes, Sandra Peterson, Jacques Felipe Lamour.(Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Belitzky on behalf of Robert C. Joens, Ronald Holmes, Sandra Peterson, Jacques Felipe Lamour (Belitzky, Joe) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN of service executed on 7/28/09 by Robert Enerson as to Jacques Felipe Lamour. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          US Marshal 285 form for service of summons as to Jacques Felipe Lamour. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN of service executed on 7/27/09 by Robert Enerson as to Robert C. Joens. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              US Marshal 285 form for service of summons as to Robert C. Joens. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN of service executed on 7/23/09 by Robert Enerson as to Sandra Peterson. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  US Marshal 285 form for service of summons as to Sandra Peterson. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN of service executed on 7/28/09 by Robert Enerson as to Ronald Holmes. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      US Marshal 285 form for service of summons as to Ronald Holmes. (JS) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of correction by Robert Enerson re 18 Amended complaint (SLU) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert C. Joens on 7/14/09 by Robert Enerson. (JS) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Ronald Holmes on 7/14/09 by Robert Enerson. (JS) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sandra Peterson on 7/14/09 by Robert Enerson. (JS) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jacques Felipe Lamour on 7/14/09 by Robert Enerson. (JS) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert C. Joens, Ronald Holmes, Sandra Peterson, Jacques Felipe Lamour, Florida Department of Corrections with Jury Demand filed by Robert Enerson. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Robert Enerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (service copies provided)(SLU) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of correction by Robert Enerson re 1 Complaint (SLU) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing service by U.S. Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Return of Service Form)(SLU) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 13 Related case order and notice of designation of track 1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Enerson. Related case(s): yes (SLU) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to complete service forms. Plaintiff is directed to return forms within 30 days of the date of this order. The Clerk of Court shall fax a copy of this order (and 7 the prisoner consent form)to the Administrator of Inmate Accounts for the Florida Department of Corrections. The Clerk of Court shall alwo forward 5 sets of service forms to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/22/2009. (kma) Modified on 5/22/2009 (kma). (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/2/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/22/2009. (LAG) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/20/08. (SLU) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment (signed by deputy clerk). (SLU) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case transferred in from Florida Southern; Case Number 1:09-cv-20744. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 9, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Transferring the Case. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 5/19/2009. (tas) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT RE TRANSFER TO CORRECT VENUE re 1 Complaint filed by Robert Enerson. Recommending the Clerk be directed to transfer this civil action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Ft. Myers Division, pursuant to 28U.S.C. §1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 5/14/2009. (tw) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEE BUT ESTABLISHING DEBT TO CLERK OF $350.00 and Granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 5/1/2009. (tw) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION TO PROCEED Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Robert Enerson. (asl) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT Filing Fee due by 5/1/2009. Motions due by 5/1/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 4/6/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit IFP) (tw) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LCIVIL RIGHTS ITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 4/6/2009. (tw) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Correction by Robert Enerson (jc) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White (rb) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SWORN COMPLAINT against Robert C. Jones, Ronald Holmes, Sandra Peterson, Jacques Felipe Lamour, Florida Department of Corrections, filed by Robert Enerson. No Filing Fee Paid.(rb) [Transferred from flsd on 5/20/2009.] (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?