Cook v. Simtech, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:09-cv-01382
District Judge Richard A. Lazzara, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 9:38 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stefan Frederick Cook, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Hussein Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca Elaine Ausprung +1 703 696 1614 +1 703 696 8126 rebecca.ausprung@us.army.mil

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh Randolph Aderhold, Jr. +1 478 621 2728 Randy.Aderhold@usdoj.gov
Space Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
Space Jakarra Jenise Jones +1 410 209 4804 +1 410 962 9947 jakarra.jones@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth J. Larin +1 313 226 9100 +1 313 226 9782 elizabeth.larin@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Vesper Mei +1 202 514 4686 +1 202 616 8470 vesper.mei@usdoj.gov
Space Emily Sue Newton +1 202 305 8356 emily.s.newton@usdoj.gov
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Space Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
Space D Gerald Wilhelm +1 612 664 5600 gerald.wilhelm@usdoj.gov
Space Eric R. Womack +1 202 514 4020 +1 202 616 8470 eric.womack@usdoj.gov
No Logo Defense Security Services, Defendant
No Logo Larry Grice, Defendant
No Logo Louis B. Wingate, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan Weinstein & McQuay, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Sandra S. McQuay +1 617 348 4300 smcquay@swmlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Rebecca Elaine Ausprung +1 703 696 1614 +1 703 696 8126 rebecca.ausprung@us.army.mil

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
No Logo Simtech, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as frivolous and wholly without merit 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Judgment and 9 Motion for Rehearing re: 6 Order on Motion for Reconsideration of 3 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/6/2009. (DMB) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENDORSED ORDER denying 8 Motion for Recusal as frivolous and wholly without merit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/6/2009. (DMB) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
      MOTION to alter judgment, MOTION for ReHearing re 6 Order on motion for reconsideration, 3 Order on motion for temporary restraining order by Stefan Frederick Cook. (BSN) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        MOTION for recusal of District Judge Richard A. Lazzara by Stefan Frederick Cook. (BSN) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Simtech, Inc., Larry Grice, Defense Security Services, Louis B. Wingate, Robert M. Gates, Barack Hussein Obama, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BSN) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER ATTACHED denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Original Verified Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction and dismissing case without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/27/2009. (DMB) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Simtech, Inc., Larry Grice, Defense Security Services, Louis B. Wingate, Robert M. Gates, Barack Hussein Obama with Jury Demand filed by Stefan Frederick Cook. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(BSN) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION for reconsideration re 1 Motion for TRO by Stefan Frederick Cook. (BSN) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice 1 Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/23/2009. (DMB) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to Simtech, Inc., Larry Grice, Defense Security Services, Louis B. Wingate, Robert M. Gates, Barack Hussein Obama, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BSN) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                      MOTION for temporary restraining order by Stefan Frederick Cook. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(BSN) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 56 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?