Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-03784
District Judge Amy Totenberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 8:11 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cox Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
Certified Copy of CTO ORDER from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to the USDC of Delaware from inclusion in MDL 2344. (rvb) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. All proceedings are hereby STAYED until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 01/30/2012. (rvb) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
      MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation with Brief In Support by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Multi-District Litigation in Related Cases by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
          PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending the Time For LPR 4.1, 4.2 and 4.3 Disclosures. (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 1/25/2012 to remove all caps from text (rvb). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Withdrawal of Counsel)(Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
              Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Robert Sheffield Thompson added as attorney. (Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony Miele Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3694529)by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                  APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Furey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3694515)by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/22/2011. (rvb) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                      Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LCC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Plan Deadlines, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Thompson, Robert) Modified on 12/20/2011 to add defendants as joint filers (rvb). (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC.(Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc..(Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 34 Counterclaim by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc..(Thompson, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                              Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Anthony L. Miele. Clerk to follow-up by 1/4/2012. (jkm) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David N. Ventker, and Marissa Marriott Henderson. Clerk to follow-up by 1/4/2012. (jkm) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                  Certificate of Interested Persons by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 8/13/2012.), COUNTERCLAIM against Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. with Jury Demand by Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC, Cox Communications, Inc..(Ludlam, Taylor) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Dial, Audra) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Higgins Ludlam on behalf of Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Turton on behalf of Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC (Turton, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Cahoon on behalf of Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC (Cahoon, Susan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Audra Ann Dial on behalf of Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC (Dial, Audra) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:11-cv-00879. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 10 Motion to Transfer Case and this case is transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/28/11. (tarm) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2011. Appearance of counsel. Dfts' 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC, Cox Communications, Inc. - Argued and Granted, Case transferred to USDC for the Northern District of Georgia. (Court Reporter: Westfall.) (tarm) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      AGREED ORDER, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file and serve their response within fourteen (14) days after the entry of an order deciding their motion to transfer; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' motion for an extension of time in which to file a response [Doc. 13] is DENIED, as moot. (See Order For Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/13/11. (nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit McLeod Declaration)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Hearing Date AMENDED set for October 28, 2011 re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Opposition to 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit AB, # 29 Exhibit AC, # 30 Exhibit AD, # 31 Exhibit AE, # 32 Exhibit AF)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Opposition to 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting appearance Pro hac vice of Michael J. Turton Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683024305. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/21/11. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting appearance Pro hac vice of Mitchell G. Stockwell Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683024305. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/21/11. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting appearance Pro hac vice of Audra Ann Dial Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683024305. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/21/11. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Hearing Date set for October 14, 2011 re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Hearing Date set for October 14, 2011 re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Affidavit)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 USC 1404(a) by Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to deft Cox Communications, Inc. served on 8/29/2011, answer due 9/19/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(nmck, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to deft Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC served on 8/29/2011, answer due 9/19/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(nmck, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting appearance Pro hac vice of Jennifer Bush Furey, Esq. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683023859. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/7/11. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Receipt)(nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David Neil Ventker on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Ventker, David) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Marriott Henderson on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Henderson, Marissa) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Summons Issued and given for service by SPS as to Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC. (nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent 7,889,722. (nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 24683012579.), filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part i, # 2 Exhibit A Part ii, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Letter, # 6 Receipt)(nhall) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?