Plymouth County, Iowa v. Merscorp, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 5:12-cv-04022-MWB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 10:27 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plymouth County, Iowa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Levitt +1 312 214 0000 +1 312 214 0001 alevitt@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy, Collins & Bixenman, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott L Bixenman +1 712 546 8844 +5468 546 546 8847 scottbixenman@premieronline.net
Space Michael P Murphy +1 712 546 8844 +5468 546 546 8847 michaelmurphy@premieronline.net
Space Patrick N Murphy +1 712 546 8844 +1 712 546 8847 murphlaw@premieronline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Demet Basar +1 212 545 4664 +1 212 545 4677 basar@whafh.com
Space Malcolm Todd Brown +1 212 545 4714 brown@whafh.com
Space Lydia Keaney +1 212 545 4668 +1 212 545 4653 keaney@whafh.com
v.
No Logo BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "BAC Home Loans Servicing"
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonzalez Saggio & Harlan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kerrie M Murphy +1 515 453 8509 +1 515 267 1408 kerrie_murphy@gshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GuideOne Insurance - DM/IA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff +1 515 267 5285 +1 515 267 5431 lwiedenhoff@guideone.com
No Logo CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, Defendant
No Logo Citimortgage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LUCIA NALE +1 312 701 8857 +1 312 701 7711 lnale@mayerbrown.com
Space Thomas V Panoff +1 312 701 8821 +1 312 701 7711 tpanoff@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo EMC Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Everhome Mortgage Company, Defendant
No Logo GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawlings Ellwanger Jacobs Mohrhauser & Nelson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R Mohrhauser +1 712 277 2373 +2773 277 277 3304 jmohrhauser@rawlings-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space P. Russell Perdew +1 312 443 0700 +1 312 443 0336 pperdew@lordbissell.com
HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidman Redmond Fredregill Patterson Plaza Dykstra & Prahl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan E Fredregill +1 712 255 8838 +2586 258 258 6714 alan.fredregill@heidmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
No Logo John Doe Defendants 1-100, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A Tank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Kathleen Franklin +1 515 246 7941 +2430 243 243 0654 sarahfranklin@davisbrownlaw.com
Space Deborah M Tharnish +1 515 288 2500 +1 515 243 0654 deborahtharnish@davisbrownlaw.com
No Logo Merscorp, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Lange +1 515 447 4725 +1 515 248 9010 lance.lange@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawlings Ellwanger Jacobs Mohrhauser & Nelson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R Mohrhauser +1 712 277 2373 +2773 277 277 3304 jmohrhauser@rawlings-law.com
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse Linebaugh +1 515 248 9006 jlinebaugh@faegre.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew R Louis +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 alouis@buckleysandler.com
Space Matthew Phineas Previn +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 hfreeman@buckleysandler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T Clendenin +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 jtc@nyemaster.com
Space Jay Eaton +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 je@nyemaster.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 430 - Banks and Banking
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - The parties are no longer required to file status reports in this case concerning the status of GMAC's bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/3/14. (djs) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
    STATUS Report Concerning the Status of Defendant GMAC's Bankruptcy Proceedings (Plaintiff's) by Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 102 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
        STATUS Report Concerning the Status of Defendant GMAC Mortgage's Bankruptcy Proceedings (Joint) by Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
          STATUS Report Concerning the Status of Defendant GMAC Mortgage's Bankruptcy Proceedings (Joint) by Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
            STATUS Report Concerning the Status of Defendant GMAC Mortgage's Bankruptcy Proceedings (Joint) by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
              USCA Case Number 13-2334 for 96 Notice of Appeal filed by Plymouth County, Iowa: Transcript ddl 07/03/2013 (Attachment # 1 Correspondence) (kfs) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals RE: 96 Notice of Appeal: Case Number ddl 06/17/2013 (kfs) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appeal as to 71 Judgment, 79 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plymouth County, Iowa. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0862-1616461. (Attachments: # 1 Form A) (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STATUS Report Order. The parties, either jointly or separately, shall file status reports, not less than every 90 days, notifying the court of the status of GMAC's bankruptcy proceedings, and shall promptly notify the court of the conclusion of GMAC's bankruptcy proceedings. Status Report due by 9/3/2013. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/5/2013. (des) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 94 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                      FINAL Judgment In A Civil Case As To Some Defendants in favor of BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, John Doe Defendants 1-100, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, against Plymouth County, Iowa. Plaintiff take nothing and this action is dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2013. (des) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                        LREF
                        Blank 93 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting 89 Motion To Certify Dismissal As Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b). I certify that there is no just reason to delay the entry of judgment pursuant to 70 Memorandum Opinion And Order Regarding 37 Mot ion To Dismiss and 79 Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding 74 Motion To Alter Or Amend The Judgment And For Leave To File An Amended Complaint. I direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of the Dismissed Defendants (that is, all defendants other than GMAC Residential Funding Corp) and against the County on all of the County's claims against the Dismissed Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/4/2013. (des)
                          LREF
                          Blank 93 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting 89 Motion To Certify Dismissal As Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b). I certify that there is no just reason to delay the entry of judgment pursuant to 70 Memorandum Opinion And Order Regarding 37 Motion To Dismiss and 79 Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding 74 Motion To Alter Or Amend The Judgment And For Leave To File An Amended Complaint. I direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of the Dismissed Defendants (that is, all defendants other than GMAC Residential Funding Corp) and against the County on all of the County's claims against the Dismissed Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/4/2013. (des) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY BRIEF to re 89 MOTION to Certify Dismissal as Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b) AMENDED filed by Plymouth County, Iowa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                              REPLY BRIEF RE: 89 Motion to Certify Dismissal as Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b) filed by Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachment # 1 Exhibit A) (Levitt, Adam) Modified text on 05/31/2013 (kfs) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                Response to Motion re 89 MOTION to Certify Dismissal as Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Wiedenhoff, Laurie) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Certify Dismissal as Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Corinthian Mortgage Company filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Levitt, Adam) Modified text on 05/07/2013 (kfs) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Lydia Keaney filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 04/05/2013 (kfs) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Malcolm Brown filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 04/05/2013 (kfs) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Demet Basar filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 04/05/2013 (kfs) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                            MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 80 Notice of Appeal RE: 83 Judgment: The formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter (kfs) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to 80 Notice of Appeal filed by Plymouth County, Iowa: Appellees' motion to dismiss the appeal is granted: This dismissal is without prejudice to any parties' ability to file a timely appeal upon the entry of a final judgment or other appealable order in the matter: The Court's mandate shall issue forthwith (kfs) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                USCA Case Number 12-3656 for 80 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County Iowa (Attachment # 1 8CC Correspondence) (kfs) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals RE: 80 Notice of Appeal: Case Number ddl 11/05/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appeal as to 71 Judgment, 79 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plymouth County, Iowa. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0862-1497093. (Attachments: # 1 Appellant's Form A) (Murphy, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Amend/Correct. The motion is granted to the extent that the court has reconsidered the conditional request to amend which it overlooked in its Ruling On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss 70 , but denied as to the conditional and post-dismissal requests for leave to amend. The request to alter, amend, or set aside the Judgment 71 is denied. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/16/2012. (Mastalir, Roger)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Amend/Correct. The motion is granted to the extent that the court has reconsidered the conditional request to amend which it overlooked in its Ruling On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss 70 , but denied as to the conditional and post-dismissal requests for leave to amend. The request to alter, amend, or set aside the Judgment 71 is denied. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/16/2012. (Mastalir, Roger) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY BRIEF RE: 74 Motion to Amend/Correct 71 Judgment, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Docketed pursuant to 77 Order) (kfs) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: Granting 76 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief RE: 74 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment: The Clerk of Court shall detach the overlength reply brief and file it as the Plaintiff's reply. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/16/12. (kfs) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief RE: 74 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment and for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) (Keaney, Lydia) Modified to add link on 10/16/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                RESISTANCE to Motion re 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 71 Judgment, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Bank of America NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - G, # 2 Exhibits H - GG) (Wiedenhoff, Laurie) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 71 Judgment, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment and for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Demet Basar in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment and for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D) (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 09/20/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    DOCKETED IN ERROR: Attorney to refile: Brief in Support of 72 Motion to Amend 71 Judgment, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Demet Basar in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment and for Leave to File an Amended Complaint # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 09/19/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      DOCKETED IN ERROR: Attorney to refile: Motion to Amend 71 Judgment, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment and for Leave to File an Amended Complaint # 2 Proposed Amended Complaint) (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 09/19/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        JUDGMENT: Plaintiff take nothing and this matter is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/12. (kfs) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. The County's Class Action Petition is dismissed in its entirety for failure to state claims upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/21/12. (djs)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. The County's Class Action Petition is dismissed in its entirety for failure to state claims upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/21/12. (djs) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER Staying Discovery. Discovery is stayed pending the court's ruling on defendants' 37 motion to dismiss. The parties' obligation to submit a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan are hereby suspended pending the court's ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss. If the court's ruling does not result in the dismissal of this action, parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan within 30 days after the date of said ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/10/12. (djs) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2012. Order to follow. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (djs) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 62 Defendant' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief In further support of their Joint Motion To Dismiss 37 . The Clerk of Court shall detach the overlength reply brief and attach it to the defendants' Reply (docket no. 63 ). The defendants' Reply is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 07/03/2012. (src) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 07/09/2012 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 07/03/12. (kfs) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      STATUS Report Defendants' Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Issues by BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Lange, Lance) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        STATUS Report Plaintiff's Report Regarding Scheduling Issues by Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to re 37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-B, # 2 Exhibit 1-C, # 3 Exhibit 1-D, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7-A, # 10 Exhibit 7-B, # 11 Exhibit 8) (Filed by Clerk as filing attorney's office was having CM/ECF issues) (pac) (Additional attachment added on 7/3/2012 pursuant to order at 67 : # 12 Amended Reply Brief) (src). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Brief) (Lange, Lance) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              DOCKETED IN ERROR: ATTORNEY TO REFILE: Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief for Reply Brief in Support of 37 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Reply Brief # 3 Exhibit 1A # 4 Exhibit 1B # 5 Exhibit 1C # 6 Exhibit 1D # 7 Exhibit 1E # 8 Exhibit 2 # 9 Exhibit 3 # 10 Exhibit 4 # 11 Exhibit 5 # 12 Exhibit 6 # 13 Exhibit 7A # 14 Exhibit 7B # 15 Exhibit 8) (Lange, Lance) Modified to add link on 07/02/2012 (kfs) Modified text on 07/02/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. for Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Mohrhauser, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Gregory J. Marshall by Defendant HSBC Bank USA NA. Signed by Clerk on 06/20/12. (kfs) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Robert M Brochin as to Defendants Merscorp Inc and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. Signed by Clerk on 06/19/12. (kfs) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Marshall ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1425804) by Defendant HSBC Bank, USA, NA (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Brochin (Pro Hac Vice Fee $75: Receipt Number 0862-1425090) by Defendants Merscorp Inc and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Mohrhauser, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/12/12. The clerk of court shall detach Plymouth County's overlength brief and re-file it as an attachment to Plymouth County's resistance at 54 . (djs) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESISTANCE to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Demet Basar in Support of Plaintiff's Brief in Resistance to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition filed by Plymouth County, Iowa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (Keaney, Lydia) (Additional attachment(s) added pursuant to 55 Order on 6/12/2012: # 7 Plaintiff's Brief in Resistance) (djs). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief Resistance to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Brief) (Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DOCKETED IN ERROR: Attorney to refile: Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief Resistance to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Petition by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Resistance # 3 Declaration of Demet Basar # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Demet Basar # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Demet Basar, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Demet Basar # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Demet Basar # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of Demet Basar # 9 Exhibit F to Declaration of Demet Basar) (Keaney, Lydia) Modified text on 06/11/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: This action is stayed as to Defendant Corinthian Mortgage Corporation pursuant to the automatic stay in bankruptcy 11 U.S.C. Section 362(a). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/05/12. (kfs) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Corinthian Mortgage Corporation Notice of Bankruptcy and Effect of Automatic Stay (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: This action remains stayed as to Defendant GMAC Residential Funding Corporation: The automatic stay shall not extend to the non-bankrupt Defendants or this entire action: This action shall proceed in the ordinary course against the non-bankrupt Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 05/30/12. (kfs) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STATUS Report Plaintiff's Status Report by Plymouth County, Iowa (Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATUS Report by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation (Perdew, P) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STATUS Report Non-Bankrupt Defendants' Status Report by BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Lange, Lance) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Staying Case as to GMAC Residential Funding Corp re 44 Notice of Bankruptcy and Effect of Automatic Stay filed by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation. This action is stayed as to defendant GMAC Residential Funding Corporation. Not later than 5/29/12, the plaintiff, the bankrupt defendant, and the non-bankrupt defendant in this action shall file status reports and/or motions concerning the need, or lack thereof, to extend the stay to this entire action. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/21/12. (djs) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation of Bankruptcy and Effect of Automatic Stay (Perdew, P) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 42 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' 37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have to and including 6/8/2012 to file a response. Defendants shall have to and including 6/29/2012, to file any reply. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/11/12. (djs) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Kathleen Franklin on behalf of Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Franklin, Sarah) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah M Tharnish on behalf of Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Tharnish, Deborah) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Mohrhauser on behalf of Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (Mohrhauser, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank, USA, NA (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Responses due by 5/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support) Filed by Clerk pursuant to 36 Order. (djs) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach nos. 35-2 and 35-3 and refile them as the defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and supporting brief, respectively. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/1/12. (djs) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief for Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc, Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, EverHome Mortgage Company, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exceed Page Limit, # 2 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff"s Class Action Petition, # 3 Brief, # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (Lange, Lance) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Corinthian Mortgage Corporation (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation (Perdew, P) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by P Russell Perdew on behalf of GMAC Residential Funding Corporation (Perdew, P) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E Fredregill on behalf of HSBC Bank, USA, NA (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting 26 and 27 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorneys Thomas V Panoff and Lucia Nale for Defendant CitiMortage Inc: Granting 28 and 29 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorneys Andrew Richard Louis and Matthew P Previn for Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 04/26/12. (kfs) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Matthew P Previn by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate, # 2 ECF Registration) (Clendenin, John) Modified text on 04/26/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Andrew Richard Louis (Pro Hac Vice Fee $75 - Receipt Number 0862-1393635) by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate, # 2 ECF Registration) (Clendenin, John) Modified text on 04/26/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lucia Nale ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1393352) by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Certificate, # 2 ECF Registration) (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Panoff ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1393311) by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Certificate, # 2 ECF Registration Form) (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kerrie M Murphy and Laurie J Wiedenhoff on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc (Murphy, Kerrie) Modified text on 04/19/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc identifying Other Affiliate SunTrust Bank, Other Affiliate SunTrust Bank Holding Company, Other Affiliate SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. (Lange, Lance) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Lance W Lange and Jesse L Linebaugh on behalf of SunTrust Mortgage, Inc (Lange, Lance) Modified text on 04/19/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Mohrhauser on behalf of GMAC Residential Funding Corporation (Mohrhauser, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by WMC Mortgage Corporation identifying Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate WMC Finance Co., Other Affiliate WMC Mortgage, LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Services, Inc., Other Affiliate General Electric Company for WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Eaton, Jay) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal by WMC Mortgage Corporation (Clendenin, John) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John T Clendenin on behalf of WMC Mortgage Corporation (Clendenin, John) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Eaton on behalf of WMC Mortgage Corporation (Eaton, Jay) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Malcolm T Brown: Granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lydia A Keaney: Granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Demet Basar as to Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa. Signed by Clerk on 03/27/12. (Copy w/NEF to non-ECF attorneys) (kfs) Modified text on 03/28/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Demet Basar ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1375337) by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lydia A. Keaney ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1375334) by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Malcolm T. Brown ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1375316) by Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Adam J Levitt as to Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa. Signed by Clerk on 03/23/12. (kfs) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Adam J Levitt (Pro Hac Vice Fee $75 - Receipt Number 0862-1374854) filed by Plaintiff Plymouth County Iowa (Attachment # 1 Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois) (Murphy, Michael) Modified text on 03/23/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E Fredregill on behalf of Corinthian Mortgage Corporation (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 9 UNRESISTED Motion for Establishment of Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading filed by Bank of America NA, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, EverHome Mortgage Company, Plymouth County, Iowa, BAC Home Loans Servicing. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/30/12. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 3/20/12. (djs) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNRESISTED Motion for Establishment of Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, EverHome Mortgage Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, Plaintiff Plymouth County, Iowa (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LOCAL RULE 81.1 RE: 1 Notice of Removal by BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA, EverHome Mortgage Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5 # 6 Exhibit 6) (Murphy, Kerrie) Modified text on 03/16/2012 (kfs) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by EverHome Mortgage Company (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BAC Home Loans Servicing, Bank of America NA (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Lange, Lance) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET Annotation. Please find attached Civil Removal Actions new case packet. Also, please note attorney Kerrie Murphy previously opened this removal action with case number 12cv30 in error. Clerks office has now corrected to properly be Western Division case number 12cv4022. (des) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Plymouth County, Iowa (des) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Staying Case as to GMAC Residential Funding Corp re 44 Notice of Bankruptcy and Effect of Automatic Stay filed by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation. This action is stayed as to defendant GMAC Residential Funding Corporation. Not later th an 5/29/12, the plaintiff, the bankrupt defendant, and the non-bankrupt defendant in this action shall file status reports and/or motions concerning the need, or lack thereof, to extend the stay to this entire action. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/21/12. (djs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Removal from Plymouth, case number CVCV034041. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0862-1367871), filed by Bank Of America NA, Everbank. Scheduling Report due by 6/20/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 365 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?