Amisil Holdings Ltd v. Clarium Capital Management LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:06-cv-05255-SBA
District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 9:43 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amisil Holdings Ltd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Basileios Katris +1 312 627 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tita Kanthatham Bell +1 415 659 5963 tkbell@reedsmith.com
Space Harvey Lewis Leiderman +1 415 659 5914 +1 415 391 8269 hleiderman@reedsmith.com
Space Alison B. Riddell +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 ariddell@reedsmith.com
Space Theodore Tyler Ting +1 510 763 2000 +1 510 273 8832 tting@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tressler Soderstrom Maloney & Priess

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Richard Formeller +1 312 627 4000 +6271 627 627 1717 dformeller@tsmp.com
v.
No Logo Clarium Capital Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard S. Caro +1 415 772 6487 +1 415 772 6268 hcaro@hewm.com
Space Cecilia Y. Chan +1 415 772 6000 cecilia.chan@hellerehrman.com
Space Robert B. Hawk +1 650 324 7165 +1 650 324 6016 rhawk@hewm.com
Space Nathaniel Robertson Spencer-Mork +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 nate.spencermork@hellerehrman.com
No Logo Jason Portnoy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard S. Caro +1 415 772 6487 +1 415 772 6268 hcaro@hewm.com
Space Cecilia Y. Chan +1 415 772 6000 cecilia.chan@hellerehrman.com
Space Robert B. Hawk +1 650 324 7165 +1 650 324 6016 rhawk@hewm.com
Space Nathaniel Robertson Spencer-Mork +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 nate.spencermork@hellerehrman.com
No Logo Mark Woolway, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard S. Caro +1 415 772 6487 +1 415 772 6268 hcaro@hewm.com
Space Cecilia Y. Chan +1 415 772 6000 cecilia.chan@hellerehrman.com
Space Robert B. Hawk +1 650 324 7165 +1 650 324 6016 rhawk@hewm.com
Space Nathaniel Robertson Spencer-Mork +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 nate.spencermork@hellerehrman.com
Thiel, Peter Thiel, Peter, Defendant
Officially listed as "Peter Andreas Thiel"
Facebook, Inc. Board Member, Facebook, Inc.
Palantir Technologies, Inc. Officer/Director, Palantir Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Abcellera Biologics Inc.
Officer/Director, Singerman Brian Aaron
Officer/Director, BioCancell Ltd.
Officer/Director, Mithril II Lp
Officer/Director, Mithril II UGP LLC
Officer/Director, Mithril II GP LP
Officer/Director, Adagio Therapeutics, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard S. Caro +1 415 772 6487 +1 415 772 6268 hcaro@hewm.com
Space Cecilia Y. Chan +1 415 772 6000 cecilia.chan@hellerehrman.com
Space Robert B. Hawk +1 650 324 7165 +1 650 324 6016 rhawk@hewm.com
Space Nathaniel Robertson Spencer-Mork +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 nate.spencermork@hellerehrman.com
Office Oakland
Filed 8/28/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing, REFDISC, STAYED
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd., Clarium Capital Management LLC., Jason Portnoy, Peter Andreas Thiel, Mark Woolway (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT, filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway, Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 5/28/2009) Modified on 5/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT, filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway, Amisil Holdings Ltd.. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/27/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 100 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER re: Grewal v. Choudhury, 07-4218. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/27/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 96 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER: Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel, such that the law firm of Reed Smith LLP be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Amisil and the law firm of Manatt, Phelps and Phillips, LLP be permitted to substitute as its counsel. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/19/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION and Proposed Order re 96 Motion to Relate Case filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd., Clarium Capital Management LLC., Jason Portnoy, Peter Andreas Thiel, Mark Woolway (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Relate Case filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 12/4/2008) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel and Substitution of New Counsel by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 12/4/2008) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by Amisil Holdings Ltd, Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Spencer-Mork, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Amisil Holdings Ltd., Jason Portnoy, Peter Andreas Thiel Mark Woolway (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 12/1/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway, Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Spencer-Mork, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified on 6/3/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Clarium Capital Management, LLC., Jason Portnoy, Peter Andreas Thiel, Mark Woolway (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/15/2008) Modified on 10/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amisil Holdings Ltd re [89] Notice of Appearance (Ting, Theodore) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Amisil Holdings Ltd (Ting, Theodore) (Filed on 3/20/2008) Modified on 3/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Riddell, Alison) (Filed on 3/17/2008) Modified on 3/18/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                  ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/3/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Stipulation
                                    STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Requesting the Court to Vacate Case Management Conference (Filed Jointly) by Amisil Holdings Ltd, Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Spencer-Mork, Nathaniel) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2008 02:45 PM., VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/22/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Martin J. Jenkins no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 02/15/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
                                          LREF
                                          Opinion 83 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Order on Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins adopting Report and Recommendations [79] ; granting [12] Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. (mjjlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 82 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/8/06 before Mag. Judge Chen. Court Reporter: Ktherine Powell. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Letter
                                              Letter from Howard S. Caro re Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Clerks Notice
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 1/17/07 discovery motion hearing (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                  CORRECTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re [12] Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/3/2007. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006, Terminated: 9/14/2007 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re [12] Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. Objections to R&R due by 1/8/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/2006. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2006)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 1/17/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Appendix
                                                        Appendix re [74] Reply Memorandum Unpublished Authority Cited In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery Or Alternatively Rule 26(F) Conference filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[74]) (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 12/13/2006)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                          Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery or Alternatively Rule 26(F) Conference filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 12/13/2006)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2006 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 12/8/2006) re [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC,, Peter Andreas Thiel,, Jason Portnoy,, Mark Woolway. Court took matter under submission and will issue order (Court Reporter Kathy Powell 794-6659.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2006)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [71] Proposed Order,, [70] Appendix,, [68] Memorandum in Opposition, [69] Declaration in Support, (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 12/6/2006)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                Proposed Order re [68] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery or Alternatively Rule 26(f) Conference by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 12/6/2006)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Appendix
                                                                  Appendix re [68] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery or Alternatively Rule 26(f) Conference filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Related document(s)[68]) (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 12/6/2006)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                    Declaration of Cecilia Y. Chan in Support of [68] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery or Alternatively Rule 26(f) Conference filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[68]) (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 12/6/2006)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery or Alternatively Rule 26(f) Conference filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 12/6/2006)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part [55] Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time to Hear [64] Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery or, Alternatively, Rule 26(f) Conference. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: [64] Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                            Proposed Order re [64] MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery Or Alternatively Rule 26(F) Conference by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                              Declaration of Tita K. Bell in Support of [64] MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery Or Alternatively Rule 26(F) Conference filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[64]) (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006, Terminated: 1/30/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery Or Alternatively Rule 26(F) Conference filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 12/27/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                    Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery by Clarium Capital Management LLC. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                      Declaration of Cecilia Y. Chan in Support of [60] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery filed byClarium Capital Management LLC. (Related document(s)[60]) (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery filed byClarium Capital Management LLC. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 12/8/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amisil Holdings Ltd re [56] Declaration in Support, [55] MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery, [57] Proposed Order (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                              Proposed Order re [55] MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                Declaration in Support of [55] MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Related document(s)[55]) (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006, Terminated: 11/21/2006 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                  MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2006 12:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Conference reset for 3/6/2007 02:00 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2007. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motions to Dismiss Hearing. Motions hearing reset for 2/6/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2006)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC,, Peter Andreas Thiel,, Jason Portnoy,, Mark Woolway,. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/26/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER resetting hearing date from 11/21 to 11/29/06 on MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC,, Peter Andreas Thiel,, Jason Portnoy,, Mark Woolway,, [49] Stipulation filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd,, [43] Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/06. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset from 11/21/06 to 11/29/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Continuance of Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to re [33] Reply Memorandum, Improper Evidence cited in Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [46] Appendix,,, [45] Response ( Non Motion ), [44] Reply Memorandum, (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Appendix
                                                                                                                      Appendix re [44] Reply Memorandum, of Unpublished Authority in Support of Defendants' Opening and Consolidated Reply Briefs in Support of Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike Time-Barred Allegations filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Attachments: # (1) Tab 1# (2) Tab 2# (3) Tab 3# (4) Tab 4# (5) Tab 5# (6) Tab 6# (7) Tab 7# (8) Tab 8# (9) Tab 9# (10) Tab 10)(Related document(s)[44]) (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [42] Objection to Request for Judicial Notice by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum re [27] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations, [21] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [35] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; and Setting Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to re [22] Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Clarium Capital Management, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Appendix
                                                                                                                                  Appendix re [40] Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Clarium Capital Management, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Related document(s)[40]) (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re [21] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [27] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: # (1))(Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/17/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [35] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply, [36] Declaration in Support by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Tita K. Bell in Support of [35] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Related document(s)[35]) (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006, Terminated: 10/23/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [33] Reply Memorandum, in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum re [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support, [31] Memorandum in Opposition, Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [29] Proposed Order,, [27] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations, [28] Proposed Order, (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [27] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations by Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [27] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations by Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 1/5/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Strike Time Barred Allegations filed by Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC re [23] Proposed Order, [22] Request for Judicial Notice, [21] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, [25] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Clerks Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register
                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re [1]. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [21] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Clarium Capital Management LLC. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re [21] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byClarium Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[21]) (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006, Terminated: 1/5/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed byAmisil Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Harvey L. Leiderman in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint# (2) Affidavit Declaration of Tita K. Bell in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond)(Bell, Tita) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [14] Proposed Order, [17] Declaration in Support,, [13] Declaration in Support,, [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support, [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support, [16] Proposed Order by Mail (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway re [14] Proposed Order, [17] Declaration in Support,, [13] Declaration in Support,, [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support, [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support, [16] Proposed Order by Messenger (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Cecilia Y. Chan in Support of [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[15]) (Chan, Cecilia) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006, Terminated: 9/14/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint ; Memorandum in Support filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Howard S. Caro in Support of [12] MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support filed byClarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[12]) (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration; Memorandum in Support filed by Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Caro, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amisil Holdings Ltd re Case Referred to ECF, [1] Complaint, [2] ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons served on Mark Woolway (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amisil Holdings Ltd re Case Referred to ECF, [1] Complaint, [2] ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons served on Peter Thiel (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amisil Holdings Ltd re Case Referred to ECF, [1] Complaint, [2] ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons on Jason Portnoy (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amisil Holdings Ltd re Case Referred to ECF, [1] Complaint, [2] ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons on Clarium Capital Management, LLC (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING [4] Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Daniel R. Formeller. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING [3] Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Basileios Katris. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JuCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Amisil Holdings Ltd Declination of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. (Bell, Tita) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Daniel R. Formeller for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3389555) filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION of Basileios Katris for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3389555) filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2006. Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2006 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT; summons issued against Clarium Capital Management LLC, Peter Andreas Thiel, Jason Portnoy, Mark Woolway (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3389367). Filed by Amisil Holdings Ltd. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2006 (slh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?