Coach, Inc. et al v. E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-06700
District Judge Joan H. Lefkow, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Joan H. Lefkow
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bell Boyd & Lloyd, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Patrick McKey +1 312 372 1121 pmckey@bellboyd.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy E Breihan +1 312 602 5113 +1 312 698 7513 amy.breihan@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bell Boyd & Lloyd, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Patrick McKey +1 312 372 1121 pmckey@bellboyd.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy E Breihan +1 312 602 5113 +1 312 698 7513 amy.breihan@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Crossan Intellectual Property Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Crossan +1 312 670 6860 jrc@crossaniplaw.com
No Logo Kristina Wagner, Defendant

Represented by Crossan Intellectual Property Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Crossan +1 312 670 6860 jrc@crossaniplaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Pursuant to Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 34 , case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs. Status hearing of 4/3/2012 stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Breihan, Amy) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing of 3/8/2012 stricken and reset for 4/3/2012 at 08:30 AM by agreement.Mailed and telephoned notice (mad, ) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kristina Wagner by Yasmin S Schnayer (Schnayer, Yasmin) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kristina Wagner by James Patrick White (White, James) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held and continued to 3/8/2012 at 8:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. Motion of defendant Kristina Wagner for withdrawal of counsel 28 is granted. John R. Crossan is withdrawn as counsel for defendant Kristina Wagner. Defendant Kristina Wagner's motion for appointment of pro bono counsel 28 taken under advisement. Plaintiffs given leave to file an amended complaint by 2/23/2012. Defendant's motion for order requiring a simplified, short amended complaint 14 is moot.Mailed notice (nf, ) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kristina Wagner in support of motion to appoint counsel 28 in place of Mr. Crossan, due to conflict between the defendants (Crossan, John) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kristina Wagner to appoint counsel to replace John R. Crossan (Crossan, John) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
K Wagner's NOTICE of Motion by John R. Crossan for presentment of before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/2/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Crossan, John) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
Change of Attorney Address, Phone by E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd., Kristina Wagner (Crossan, John) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Maria Valdez:Settlement conference held on 1/19/2012. Parties are unable to reach settlement at this time. Parties are encouraged to continue to discuss settlement options. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge. Judge Honorable Maria Valdez no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Motion hearing regarding defendants' motion for an order requiring filing of a simplified, short amended complaint 14 reset to 2/2/2012 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing of 1/19/2012 reset for 2/2/2012 at 08:30 AM.Mailed and telephoned notice (mad, ) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Maria Valdez: Parties will appear for settlement conference on 1/19/12. Therefore, the status hearing set for 1/17/12 is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Maria Valdez: Case is set to 01/19/12 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1300 for settlement conference. Judge Valdez requires full compliance with the Court's Standing Order on Settlement Conference found on Judge Valdez's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, or the parties can contact courtroom deputy, Yolanda Pagan, at 312/408-5135 for a copy. Failure to comply with the provisions of the Court's Standing Order may result in the unilateral cancellation of the settlement conference by the Court. Absent leave from the Court, cancellation will result if the Plaintiff fails to submit to chambers copies of the settlement letters four days prior to the settlement conference. Because of the volume of settlement conferences conducted by Judge Valdez, once a settlement conference date has been agreed upon, no continuance will be granted without a motion showing extreme hardship. Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Maria Valdez: Status hearing held on 11/2911. Defendant was not present. Status hearing is set for 1/17/12 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Status hearing of 11/22/2011 stricken.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Maria Valdez: This case has been referred to Judge Valdez to conduct a settlement conference. Judge Valdez requires full compliance with the Court's Standing Order of Settlement Conference found on the Judge's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties shall jointly contact the courtroom deputy, Yolanda Pagan, at 312/408-5135 with mutually agreeable dates or appear at 9:30 a.m. on 11/29/11 to set a settlement conference date. Because of the volume of settlement conferences conducted by Judge Valdez, once a settlement conference date has been agreed upon, no continuance will be granted without a motion showing extreme hardship.Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Motion hearing held on 11/10/2011 regarding defendants' motion for an order requiring filing of a simplified, short amended complaint 14 and continued to 1/19/2012 at 08:30 AM. All proceedings in this case, including time to answer the complaint, are stayed. Status hearing is set for 1/19/2012 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Maria Valdez for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(mad, )Mailed notice. (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd., Kristina Wagner to amend/correct Complaint Filed in the Action 14 (Breihan, Amy) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd., Kristina Wagner to amend/correct Complaint Filed in the Action (Crossan, John) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by John R. Crossan for presentment of before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/10/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Crossan, John) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd., Kristina Wagner by John R. Crossan (Crossan, John) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to E-Z Tan Boutique, Ltd. on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to Kristina Wagner on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing set for 11/22/2011 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
Notification of Change of Attorney Name by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Breihan, Amy) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
Rule 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Malinowski, Amy) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Amy E Malinowski (Malinowski, Amy) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6406434.(McKey, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 142 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?