Netgear Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00427
District Judge James F. Holderman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 6:36 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Arlo Technologies, Inc.

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

v.
No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/21/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman. This case is consolidated with 11 C 9308, as the lead case number in MDL 2303. All further filings should be made in 11 C 9308 as the established lead case for MDL 2303; the individual case number should also be displayed on the documents filed, if the document only pertains to the individual case number. Mailed notice (lw, ). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
      RECEIVED from Delaware; Case Number 1:11-cv-01139 . (lcw) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
        TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) in MDL No. 2303 - In Re: Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC Patent Litigation transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 01/26/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Transfer of Case Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the R.P.J.P.M.L. and 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 by Netgear Inc. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 01/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment to January 23, 2012 - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC, Netgear Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 12/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment to January 9, 2012 - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC, Netgear Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Netgear Inc.. Innovatio IP Ventures LLC served on 11/17/2011, answer due 12/8/2011. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Netgear Inc. identifying FMR LLC as an other affiliate. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 11/21/2011 (lih). [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,714,559 B1; 7,386,002 B2; 7,535,921 B2; 7,548,553 B2; 5,740,366; 5,940,771; 6,374,311 B1; 7,457,646 B2; 5,546,397; 5,844,893; 6,665,536 B1; 6,697,415 B1; 7,013,138 B2; 7,710,907 B2; 7,916,747 B2; 7,873,343 B2; 7,536,167 B2. (dzs, ) Modified on 11/21/2011 (dzs, ). [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed with Jury Demand against Innovatio IP Ventures LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-976850.) - filed by Netgear Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 6, # 2 Exhibits 7 - 12, # 3 Exhibits 13 - 17, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/30/2012.] (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 536 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?