Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-03858
District Judge Robert W. Gettleman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:33 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adam R Alper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam R Alper

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher R. Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Parker

Toggle Switch Represented by Gianni L Cutri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gianni L Cutri

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilberto Eduardo Espinoza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilberto Eduardo Espinoza
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. On this day, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Innovatio Management, LLC and Noel B. Whitley (collectively, "Innovatio") and Delta Air Lines, Inc. announced to the Court that they have settled their respective claims for relief asserted in the above-captioned actions. The Court, having considered this request, is of the opinion that their request for dismissal should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims by Innovatio against Defendant and by Defendant against Innovatio in the above-captioned actions, including Case Nos. 1:11-cv-09308 (consolidated) and 1:12-cv-03858, are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same.This is a final judgment. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 5/27/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Adam Alper's application to appear pro hac vice 13 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
      MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Case numbers 12 C 3844, 12 C 3856, 12 C 3858, 12 C 3860, 12 C 2862, 12 C 3865, 12 C 3866, 12 C 3870, 12 C 3872, 12 C 3878, 12 C 3874 and 12 C 3882 are consolidated with 11 C 9308 (MDL 2303) for consolidated pretrial purposes. All further filings in the above case should be made in 11 C 9308 as the established lead case for MDL 2303, the individual case number should also be displayed on the documents filed, if the document only pertains to an individual case number. Mailed notice (am) Modified on 7/24/2012 (am). (Main Document 17 replaced on 7/24/2012) (am, ). (Entered: 07/24/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable James F. Holderman for all further proceedings, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/12. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
          NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Cutri, Gianni) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC . by Delta Air Lines, Inc.(Cutri, Gianni) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7333682. (Alper, Adam) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. by Gianni L Cutri (Cutri, Gianni) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. by Gilberto Eduardo Espinoza (Espinoza, Gilberto) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. by Christopher R. Parker (Parker, Christopher) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: By agreement, defendant is given an extension of time to 7/16/2012 within which to answer or otherwise plead. Telephone notice (gds) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The Clerk is to arrange for this case to be transferred to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                            MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                              Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patent by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Matthew G. McAndrews (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7166502. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q Part 1, # 18 Exhibit Q Part 2)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 457 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?