Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01023-JSW
District Judge Jeffrey S. White, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org
Space David L. Sobel +2027 979 009 x104 +1 202 797 9066 sobel@eff.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 2/20/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
308-cv-02997-JSW
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing, RELATE
  Entries (130) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING (121 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) AND (102 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 120 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER GRANTING 119 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/3/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
        LREF
        Blank 119 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Stipulation
        STIPULATION re 118 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING (98 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation TO CONTINUE CMC (117 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Stipulation TO CONTINUE CMC. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Stipulation
            STIPULATION (Second) to Continue Case Management Conference by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/14/2010) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING (96 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/23/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Stipulation
                STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/23/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
                  CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 USCA Mandate
                    MANDATE of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Clerks Notice
                      CLERKS NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 USCA Memorandum
                        USCA ORDER AMENDING and AMENDED OPINION as to-AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED in part (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 USCA Order
                          OPINION of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) Modified on 2/19/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 USCA Order
                            ORDER of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 USCA Order
                              ORDER of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER re Notice (83 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) and Notice (101 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) DENYING Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 13, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 USCA Order
                                  ORDER of USCA as to 99 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 USCA Case Number
                                    USCA Case Number 09-17235 9th Circuit for 99 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence Reply in Support of Emergency Filing for Stay Pending Appeal Determination (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Emergency Filing for Temporary Stay Pending Decision by Solicitor General Regarding Appeal and Immediate Administrative Stay filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Telephone Conference
                                          Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 10/9/2009). (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence Emergency Filing for Stay, per direction of Ninth Circuit (Attachments: # 1 Ninth Cir. Stay Order, # 2 Emergency Stay Motion filed in Ninth Cir., # 3 EFF Opposition to Stay Mtn filed in Ninth Cir., # 4 Stay Reply filed in Ninth Cir., # 5 Notice of Appeal)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence re 99 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Notice of Appeal
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Leave to File by Department of Justice. Filing fee waived. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence Notice of Appeal (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/8/2009) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING (91) Motion to Stay; DENYING (93) Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:08-cv-01023-JSW; DENYING (73) Motion to Stay; and DENYING (75) Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:08-cv-02997-JSW. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                      Reply Memorandum re 91 MOTION to Stay re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 Days Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General MOTION to Stay re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 Days Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General filed byDepartment of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for a 60 Day Stay Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/6/2009) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                          Declaration of Susan L. Kim in Support of 93 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Request that Reconsideration be Granted Without Further Briefing filed byDepartment of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 NSD Second Revised Vaughn Index)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/6/2009) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Request that Reconsideration be Granted Without Further Briefing filed by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/6/2009) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING Modified Stipulation re (91 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) MOTION to Stay re (90) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 Days Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General; MOTION to Stay re (90) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (73 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) MOTION to Stay re (72) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 days pending appeal determination by Solicitor General MOTION to Stay re (72) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 2, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                MOTION to Stay re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 Days Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General filed by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Stipulation to Expedite Motion for 60-Day Stay Pending Appeal Determination)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/30/2009) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White in case 3:08-cv-01023-JSW; DENYING (29) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:08-cv-02997-JSW and GRANTING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation of Joint Statement of Consideration of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 8/21/2009) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER WTIHDRAWING (70 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation and SUGGESTION for Consent. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 17, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER REFERRING Consolidated Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE Setting Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment on 8/14/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                            Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 84 Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D part 1, # 5 Exhibit D part 2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 84 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/2/2009) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Reply to Opposition
                                                                              Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/2/2009) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                Declaration of Susan Kim in Support of 79 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 revised Vaughn index)(Related document(s) 79 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                  Declaration of Melanie Ann Pustay in Support of 79 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration of Paul Colborn in Support of 79 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 revised Vaughn index)(Related document(s) 79 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                      Declaration of John Hackett in Support of 79 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice Notice of Filing (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Status Report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 4/24/2009) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White dated March 23, 2009 GRANTING (70) Motion to Stay in case 3:08-cv-01023-JSW and GRANTING (53) Motion to Stay in case 3:08-cv-02997-JSW. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 75 Response in Support of Motion for a Stay of Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/3/2009) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Response in Support
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support 70 of Motion for a Stay of Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/3/2009) Modified on 3/4/2009 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 70 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/24/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER RE MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Proposed Order by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2009) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Correction in year for date of hearing). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 70 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 70 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2009) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2009) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [62] Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 17, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING (27) Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008, Terminated: 7/17/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule and Proposed Order by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING IN PART Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 5, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Kirschner (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING (23 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 60 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Berman (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 11/13/2008) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR COURT ORDER PRODUCTION SCHEDULE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [54] MOTION to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Joint Case Management StatementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT of Reconsideration of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re [54] MOTION to Relate Case filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 6/20/2008). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2008 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008, Terminated: 7/8/2008 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Relate Case filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marcia Hofmann, # (2) Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 ADR Phone Conference held
                                                                                                                                                ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 6/18/08 by DB. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                    ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/18/08 at 2:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/10/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Appear by Telephone At Case Management Conference filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [45] Stipulation Requesting to Extend Date of Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2008 01:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008, Terminated: 5/21/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Requesting to Extend Date of Case Management Conference by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [43] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Hackett Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Sessoms Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Colborn Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Hitter Declaration, # (5) Exhibit Hardy Declaration, # (6) Exhibit Kovakas Declaration)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING [7] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Preliminary Injunction HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/4/2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 4/4/2008). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [40] Order by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 31, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [37] Response in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-G)(Related document(s)[37]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Response in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Sessoms Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Colborn Declaration, # (3) Affidavit Pustay Declaration, # (4) Affidavit Hackett Declaration, # (5) Exhibit EFF Order, # (6) Exhibit EPIC Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Certificate Of Service.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation for Civil Standing Orders of Judge Jeffrey S. White (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING Modified [11], [28] Motion Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [28] MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelimina MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelimina filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2008 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [31] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Sobel (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008, Terminated: 3/12/2008 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-David Sobel ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016824.) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [28] MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelimina MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelimina by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [28] MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelimina MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelimina filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[28]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008, Terminated: 3/13/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum in Support of Amended Application for Order to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Document (Proposed) Order [31] by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Initial Scheduling Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2008.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/10/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [24] Stipulation to Exceed Page Limit for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/10/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Renotice motion hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Renotice motion hearing filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION To Extend Page Limit For Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JuCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Irwin Warden (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying motion to relate cases. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Certificate Of Service.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re [16] Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re [14] Proposed Order, [13] Declaration in Support, [12] Brief, [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[11]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief re [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[11]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008, Terminated: 3/13/2008 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, [9] Proposed Order, [8] Declaration in Support, (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D, # (2) Exhibit E-H, # (3) Exhibit I-K, # (4) Exhibit L, # (5) Exhibit M, # (6) Exhibit N, # (7) Exhibit O-R, # (8) Exhibit S-V)(Related document(s)[7]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Re-Issued as to Defendant Department of Justice. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Re-Issued as to Defendant Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORIGINAL SUMMONS in a Civil Case Returned Unexecuted Filed by Plaintiff Electronic Frontier Foundation as to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons Filed by Plaintiff Electronic Frontier Foundation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 5/20/2008 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 5/27/2008 at 10:00 AM.. (Attachments: #(1) EDL Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2008: # (2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief - [Summons Issued] against Office of the Director of National Intelligence & Department of Justice, [Filing Fee:$350.00, Receipt Number 34611016029]. Filed by Plaintiff Electronic Frontier Foundation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Office of the Director of National Intelligence & Department of Justice. (tn, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?