Bonilla et al v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01061-MMC
District Judge Maxine M. Chesney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vicente A. Portillo Quijada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by jobelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Bradford Jobe +1 415 956 5513 +1 415 840 0308 bob@jobelaw.com
No Logo Vicente Quijada Bonilla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by jobelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Bradford Jobe +1 415 956 5513 +1 415 840 0308 bob@jobelaw.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Herman Pardo, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Lynne Skeirik, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office San Francisco
Filed 2/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County San Francisco
Terminated 4/22/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to Dismiss and Proposed Order by Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Emilio T. Gonzalez, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Lynne Skeirik, Herman Pardo, Condoleezza Rice. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Letter
      Letter dated 3/17/08: from The Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison re Service. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Summons Returned Executed
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vicente Quijada Bonilla, Vicente A. Portillo Quijada. Michael Chertoff served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Department of Homeland Security served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Emilio T. Gonzalez served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Lynne Skeirik served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Herman Pardo served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Condoleezza Rice served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008. (Jobe, Robert) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Clerks Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register
          CLERK'S NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) by e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re [1] Complaint and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Emilio T. Gonzalez, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Lynne Skeirik, Herman Pardo, Condoleezza Rice. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/21/2008) (aaa, Court Staff).
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2008 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/21/08. (Attachments: # (1) MMC Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order)(aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Complaint
                COMPLAINT FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Emilio T. Gonzalez, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Lynne Skeirik, Herman Pardo, Condoleezza Rice ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611016094.). Filed byVicente Quijada Bonilla, Vicente A. Portillo Quijada. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/21/2008) (aaa, Court Staff).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 84 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?