United States of America v. Volungus
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-mc-10028
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo John Charles Volungus, Respondent

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 4248(a)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
MOTION For Court To Consider Supplemental Authority by John Charles Volungus. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fick, William) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
    Assented to MOTION to Appoint Specialist Co-Counsel by John Charles Volungus.(Fick, William) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION to Hold Status/Scheduling Conference by John Charles Volungus.(Fick, William) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith H. Mizner on behalf of John Charles Volungus (Mizner, Judith) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Charles Volungus. (Kelley, Page) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Quinlivan on behalf of United States of America (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to July 9, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America.(Grady, Mark) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 25, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America.(Grady, Mark) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Kriegman by John Charles Volungus. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12)(Kelley, Page) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss, 5 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by John Charles Volungus. (Kelley, Page) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss by John Charles Volungus.(Kelley, Page) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John Charles Volungus.(Kelley, Page) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                            Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to John Charles Volungus for Wednesday, February 21, 2007. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Grady on behalf of United States of America (Grady, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Referred for: Appointment of Counsel(Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Certification That Respondent Is A Sexually Dangerous Person and Request for Hearing Pursuant to 18 USC 4248(a) by United States of America (Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?