Winters v. Stemberg et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10193
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 7:45 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ann Winters, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Hynes +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 mhynes@btkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pastor Law Office, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERIC L. ZAGAR +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ezagar@btkmc.com
v.
No Logo Arthur M. Blank, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Basil L. Anderson, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Brenda C. Barnes, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Brian T. Light, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo David B. Crosier, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Deborah G. Ellinger, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Demos Parneros, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Edward C. Harsant, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Jack Vanwoerkom, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Jacques Levy, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo James C. Peters, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Jeanne B. Lewis, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Jeffrey L. Levitan, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo John B. Wilson, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo John C. Bingleman, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo John J Mahoney, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Joseph G. Doody, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Louis R. Pepi, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Martin E. Hanaka, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Martin Trust, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Mary Elizabeth Burton, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Patrick Hickey, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo PAUL F. WALSH, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Richard R. Gentry, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Robert C. Nakasone, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Robert J Moore, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Robert K. Mayerson, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Ronald L. Sargent, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Rowland T. Moriarity, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/27/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul V. Kelly +1 617 832 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by LibbyHoopes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alathea E. Porter +1 617 338 9300 +1 617 338 9911 aporter@libbyhoopes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilchrist Sparks, III

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Susan S. Hoyt, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Thomas G. Stemberg, Defendant

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Clarification by Ann Winters.(Pastor, David) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 17 is allowed by this Court as to the federal claims only, without prejudice to revisiting the issue as described above. The case is otherwise administratively closed subject to being reopened, again upon the terms described above." (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Staples, Inc..(Kelly, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION for Leave to File Individual Defendants' Motion that the Court Decline to Consider Plaintiffs' Unauthorized Opposition Brief or, in the Alternative, For Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
          Opposition re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Ann Winters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
            Opposition re 41 MOTION to Stay on Abstention Grounds filed by Ann Winters. (Pastor, David) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros Third Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 MOTION to Stay on Abstention Grounds filed by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Stay on Abstention Grounds by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1# 2 Exhibit A, Part 2# 3 Exhibit B)(Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                        EXHIBIT re 35 Amended Complaint (Verification of Ann Winters) by Ann Winters. (Pastor, David) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 27, 2007 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Donald E. Womack. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at womack@megatran.com or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, or Alternatively, to Stay the Action filed by Staples, Inc.. (Brush, Alathea) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Ann Winters. (Attachments: # 1 Verification)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                Opposition re 33 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, 30 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Abstention in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Ann Winters. (Pastor, David) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brush, Alathea) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros Individual Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Meredith B. Parenti by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(O'Toole, Patrick) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Abstention in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Staples, Inc. of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of A. Gilchrist Sparks, III Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1674998. by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Brush, Alathea) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alathea E. Brush on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Brush, Alathea) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Paul V. Kelly on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Kelly, Paul) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Ann Winters Plaintiffs Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros re 21 Affidavit,, 20 Reply to Response to Motion,,,. (Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan D. Polkes re 20 Reply to Response to Motion,,, by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, or Alternatively, to Stay the Action filed by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, or Alternatively, to Stay the Action filed by Ann Winters. (Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, or Alternatively, to Stay the Action filed by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Polkes' Affidavit Part I# 2 Affidavit Polkes Affidavit Part II# 3 Affidavit Polkes Affidavit Part III# 4 Affidavit Polkes Affidavit Part IV# 5 Affidavit Polkes Affidavit Part V# 6 Affidavit Polkes Affidavit Part VI)(Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, or Alternatively, to Stay the Action by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(Frongillo, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2007 to File Response/Reply by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Ann Winters Certificate of Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 9(b), 12(b)(1) and 23.1 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, or Alternatively, To Stay the Action (Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Hynes by Ann Winters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Michael J. Hynes for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eric L. Zagar by Ann Winters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Eric L. Zagar for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James W. Quinn, Jonathan D. Polks and Ashley R. Altschuler, by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of James W. Quinn# 2 Certificate of Ashley R. Altschuler# 3 Certificate of Jonathan D. Polkes)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr on behalf of Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, Louis R. Pepi, Demos Parneros (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, Richard R. Gentry, Jeanne B. Lewis, Edward C. Harsant, John C. Bingleman, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Jacques Levy, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert J. Moore, Deborah G. Ellinger, Robert K. Mayerson, Jeffrey E. Nachbor, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Staples, Inc., Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros of Service of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  JOINT MOTION of Plaintiffs Ann Winters and Laborers' International Union of North America National (Industrial) Pension Fund and Certain Defendants Regarding Designation of Operative Complaint and Setting a Schedule. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    DECLARATION re 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiffs, Co-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel of Robin Winchester by Ann Winters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiffs, Co-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel by Ann Winters.(Pastor, David) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Joint Motion of Plaintiffs Ann Winters and Laborers' International Union of North America National (Industrial) Pension Fund and Certain Defendants Regarding Designation of Operative Complaint and Setting a Schedule. (Pastor, David) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Jeffrey C. Block. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 30, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint and To Set the Time to File Opposition and Reply Briefs by Ronald L. Sargent, Patrick Hickey, John J. Mahoney, Susan S. Hoyt, Jeffrey L. Levitan, David B. Crosier, James C. Peters, Brian T. Light, Joseph G. Doody, Ann Winters, Jack Vanwoerkom, Robert K. Mayerson, Basil L. Anderson, Brenda C. Barnes, Arthur M. Blank, Mary Elizabeth Burton, Rowland T. Moriarity, Robert C. Nakasone, Martin Trust, Paul F. Walsh, Thomas G. Stemberg, Martin E. Hanaka, John B. Wilson, Louis R. Pepi, Joseph S. Vassalluzzo, Demos Parneros.(Messenger, James) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas G. Stemberg served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Staples, Inc. served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by Ann Winters. (Attachments: # 1 Part Two# 2 Part Three# 3 Civil Cover Sheet # 4 Category Sheet)(Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 212 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?