Unknown
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-md-01790
District Judge Joseph L. Tauro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 3:09 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carrie Marks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo David Marks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Eric Emanuelson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Margaret Moreau, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Marie Montag, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Matthew Leonetti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Stacy Leonetti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
v.
Volkswagen Of America, Inc. Volkswagen Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Chase

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Levin +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 levin@srbc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh J Bode +1 216 687 1311 hbode@reminger.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin T. Galvin +1 216 687 1311 +1 216 687 1841 mgalvin@reminger.com
No Logo Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Levin +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 levin@srbc.com
Audi AG Audi AG, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Levin +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 levin@srbc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh J Bode +1 216 687 1311 hbode@reminger.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin T. Galvin +1 216 687 1311 +1 216 687 1841 mgalvin@reminger.com
Volkswagen AG Volkswagen AG, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Levin +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 levin@srbc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh J Bode +1 216 687 1311 hbode@reminger.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin T. Galvin +1 216 687 1311 +1 216 687 1841 mgalvin@reminger.com
No Logo Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Levin +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 levin@srbc.com
No Logo Carol Carter, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNulty Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John McNulty +1 310 471 2707 +1 310 472 7014 peter@mcnultylaw.com
No Logo Eric Becker, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Plaza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C. Maxwell +1 407 648 4535 +1 407 426 9145
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Vaughan +1 407 648 4535 +1 407 426 9145
No Logo Eugenia Diveroli, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas P. Sobran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Sobran +1 781 741 6075 +1 781 741 6074 tsobran@sobranlaw.com
No Logo James, Craig, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randal R. Kelly +1 303 320 1911

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Antinori +1 609 348 4515
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Judith Yarkony, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilan Joel Chorowsky +1 312 643 5893 +1 312 643 5894 ichorowsky@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

No Logo Ken Winokur, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas P. Sobran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Sobran +1 781 741 6075 +1 781 741 6074 tsobran@sobranlaw.com
No Logo Kenneth Nager, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randal R. Kelly +1 303 320 1911

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Antinori +1 609 348 4515
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Laura Cole, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randal R. Kelly +1 303 320 1911

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Antinori +1 609 348 4515
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Megan Shero, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G. Ruschel +1 216 621 3370 +1 216 621 3371 bruschel@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mark Schlachet

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Nmi Schlachet +1 216 896 0714 +1 216 514 6406 mschlachet@clevelandnet.com
No Logo Mildred Kasten, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson & Tucker PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel L. DiLorenzo +1 205 252 3535 +1 205 252 3536

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Tucker & Angwin PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED K. Stephen Jackson +1 205 252 3535
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Tucker +1 205 252 3535 +1 205 252 3536 josh@jacksonandtucker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sacks & Weston, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Mangan +1 215 925 8200 +1 215 925 0508 cmangan@sackslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K. Weston +1 215 925 8200 +1 215 925 0508 jweston@sackslaw.com
No Logo Patricia Murphy, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randal R. Kelly +1 303 320 1911

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Antinori +1 609 348 4515
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo Scott Tyder, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randal R. Kelly +1 303 320 1911

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Antinori +1 609 348 4515
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com
No Logo William Cohen, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H. Waller +1 205 803 0051 +1 205 803 0053

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl S. Levy +1 215 875 3042 +1 215 875 5707 slevy@bm.net
TERMINATED: 08/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Millstein +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 tmillstein@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie D. Goldstein +1 215 345 7500 +1 215 345 7507 jgoldstein@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN & BOESEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Douglas Tresemer +1 303 320 1911 +1 303 320 1915 ktresemer@irwin-boesen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of M. Clayborn Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Clayborn Williams +1 205 251 5900 +1 205 323 2098

Toggle Switch Represented by Sacks & Weston, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Mangan +1 215 925 8200 +1 215 925 0508 cmangan@sackslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K. Weston +1 215 925 8200 +1 215 925 0508 jweston@sackslaw.com
No Logo Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation, In Re:

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Levin +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 levin@srbc.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (445) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 446 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Objection
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Order on Motion to Vacate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Letter/request (non-motion)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Motion to Vacate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                        Amended RESPONSE to Motion re 433 MOTION for Reconsideration re 430 Memorandum & ORDER and for Modification of Dicta, Filed on Behalf of Berger & Montague, P.C.; Russell D. Henkin; and Edward W. Millstein filed by Mark nmi Schlachet. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to Motion re 433 MOTION for Reconsideration re 430 Memorandum & ORDER and for Modification of Dicta, Filed on Behalf of Berger & Montague, P.C.; Russell D. Henkin; and Edward W. Millstein filed by Mark nmi Schlachet. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 433 MOTION for Reconsideration re 430 Memorandum & ORDER and for Modification of Dicta, Filed on Behalf of Berger & Montague, P.C.; Russell D. Henkin; and Edward W. Millstein filed by James Craig. (Shapiro, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Reconsideration re 430 Memorandum & ORDER and for Modification of Dicta, Filed on Behalf of Berger & Montague, P.C.; Russell D. Henkin; and Edward W. Millstein by James Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Russell D. Henkin)(Shapiro, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 431 MOTION for Reconsideration re 430 Memorandum & ORDER -- Chimicles & Tikellis LLP's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's February 10 Opinion filed by James Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-A, # 3 Exhibit 2-B)(Sauder, Joseph) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 430 Memorandum & ORDER -- Chimicles & Tikellis LLP's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's February 10 Opinion by James Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sauder, Joseph) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 430 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: 12/29/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: 5/20/2014 Declaration
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: 5/20/2014 Declaration
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Memorandum of Law
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Affidavit
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Memorandum re Petition
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Response
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Brief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Amended Document
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 12/23/2012, Entered: 12/23/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 12/23/2012, Entered: 12/23/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Case Reopened
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Notice of Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: 8/30/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: 1/9/2012 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: 10/13/2011 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 316 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Order on Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Motion to Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 264 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 263 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 262 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 261 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 260 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 257 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 256 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 254 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 252 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 250 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 248 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 247 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 236 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 231 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 230 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 229 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 228 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 227 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 226 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 225 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 221 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 220 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 216 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 212 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 211 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 204 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 202 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 201 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 200 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter (non-motion) with Objections to the Settlement from Chris Pavlou. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 198 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter (non-motion) from Jose A. Clement with Oil Sludge Settlement Reimbursement Claim Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 197 Filed: 1/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 188 MOTION for Order to TO DESIGNATE OHIO COUNSEL AS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL UNDER DEFINITION 3 OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (DOCKET NO. 160) by Mark Schlachet on behalf of Megan Shero. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Correct Motion to Delete Docket Nos. 189 and 192 by Megan Shero.(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Natalie Campbell Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3230778 by Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Chase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Chase for Keith Frederick (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 193 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Opposition re 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs AMENDED OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (DOCKET NO. 174) filed by Megan Shero. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (DOCKET NO. 174) filed by Megan Shero. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 191 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 188 MOTION for Order to TO DESIGNATE OHIO COUNSEL AS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL UNDER DEFINITION 3 OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (DOCKET NO. 160) AND IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO THE MOTION FOR FEES OF CLASS COUNSEL(DOCKET NO. 174) filed by Megan Shero. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 190 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 188 MOTION for Order to TO DESIGNATE OHIO COUNSEL AS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL UNDER DEFINITION 3 OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (DOCKET NO. 160), 189 Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (DOCKET NO. 174) filed by Megan Shero. (Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 188 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order to TO DESIGNATE OHIO COUNSEL AS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL UNDER DEFINITION 3 OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (DOCKET NO. 160) by Megan Shero.(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 187 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter (non-motion) with Objection to Stipulation of Legal Action from Steven Klurfeld. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 186 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Allan Van Gestel, Special Master: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered DENIED 183 Motion for Reconsideration of and Objection to Special Master's Memorandum and Order (Dkt. No. 182) Denying Motion (Dkt. No. 179). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Allan Van Gestel, Special Master: ORDER entered ALLOWED re 184 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Audi, AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 183 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration of and Objection to Special Master's Memorandum and Order (Dkt. No. 182) Denying Motion (Dkt. No. 179) by Megan Shero.(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 182 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF Special Master: DENIED as to 179 Motion for Entry of the Attached Procedural Order Governing Fee Allowances Among Class Counsel Inter Se. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter (non-motion) regarding Class Action Settlement Notice from Susan M. Gowen. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 179 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE ATTACHED PROCEDURAL ORDER GOVERNING FEE ALLOWANCES AMONG CLASS COUNSEL INTER SE, 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Megan Shero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhubit A: Alabama Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Alabama Order)(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE ATTACHED PROCEDURAL ORDER GOVERNING FEE ALLOWANCES AMONG CLASS COUNSEL INTER SE by Megan Shero. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF Special Master entered as to 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Special Master, Hon. Allan van Gestel (Ret.) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of Special Master regarding Hearing entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF Special Master entered re 169 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Plaintiffs may submit briefs not to exceed sixty (60) pages. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Carol Carter, Laura Cole, James Craig, Eric Emanuelson, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Carrie Marks, David Marks, Marie Montag, Margaret Moreau, Scott Tyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23)(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Carol Carter, William Cohen, Laura Cole, James Craig, Eric Emanuelson, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Carrie Marks, David Marks, Marie Montag, Margaret Moreau, Scott Tyder.(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 172 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement Brief in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Carol Carter, Laura Cole, James Craig, Eric Emanuelson, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Carrie Marks, David Marks, Marie Montag, Margaret Moreau, Scott Tyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement by Carol Carter, Laura Cole, James Craig, Eric Emanuelson, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Carrie Marks, David Marks, Marie Montag, Margaret Moreau, Scott Tyder.(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Thomas P. Sobran by Ken Winokur. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sobran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Ohio Counsel, Mark Schlachet, in Support of 168 Motion for Attorney Fees by Megan Shero.(Schlachet, Mark) Modified on 12/29/2010 to correct docket event. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 12/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motionf or Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Carol Carter, Laura Cole, James Craig, Eric Emanuelson, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Carrie Marks, David Marks, Marie Montag, Margaret Moreau, Scott Tyder.(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees of Mark Schlachet, Counsel to Megan Shero and others Similarly Situated by Megan Shero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schlachet Time and ExpenseDetails, # 2 Exhibit Ruschel Time and Expense Details)(Schlachet, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Conference regarding Expert Discovery and Attorney Fees by Special Master. SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINE DETAILS. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 166 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. This Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS the September 22, 2010 164 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law and Recommendations of the Special Master Relating to the Conditional Approval of Class Settlement, Direct Notice to the Settlement Class and to Scheduled a Final Fairness Hearing of Special Master Allan van Gestel. The Final Fairness Hearing has been scheduled for 3/11/2011 10:30 AM. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 11/15/2010 to correct time entered as PM instead of AM. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. Pursuant to a hearing conducted by the Special Master on 9/14/2010 regarding conditional approval of the parties' proposed settlement, and the recommendation of the Special Master this Court hereby orders that: the proposed settlement between the parties is conditionally approved. See Order for details. The Final Fairness Hearing is set for 3/11/2011 10:30 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 164 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Special Master. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUBSTITUTED EXHIBIT 3 re 160 Settlement Agreement. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION To Substitute Exhibit 3 to Settlement Agreement by Audi, AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 160 Settlement Agreement, by Carol Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 18.1, # 6 Exhibit 18.2, # 7 Exhibit 19, # 8 Exhibit 20, # 9 Exhibit 21, # 10 Exhibit 22, # 11 Exhibit 22.1, # 12 Exhibit 22.2, # 13 Exhibit 23, # 14 Exhibit 24)(McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Carol Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 10.1, # 12 Exhibit 10.2, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 14.1, # 18 Exhibit 14.2)(McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 154 MOTION for Settlement of Jeffrey L. Chase in Support of Conditional Approval of Class Settlement by Audi, AG, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Barry, David) Modified on 9/14/2010 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Errata by Carol Carter to 156 Declaration, ALL REFERENCES TO "JOINT" MOTION HAVE BEEN REMOVED. (McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Carol Carter. Document received: Proposed Order. (McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 154 MOTION for Settlement FOR CONDITIONAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, CERTICATION OF A CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL, APPROVAL OF THE FORM AND MANNER OF CLASS NOTICE AND DIRECTING CLASS NOTICE TO BE MAILED, SCHEDULING by Carol Carter. (McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 154 MOTION for Settlement FOR CONDITIONAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, CERTICATION OF A CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL, APPROVAL OF THE FORM AND MANNER OF CLASS NOTICE AND DIRECTING CLASS NOTICE TO BE MAILED, SCHEDULING filed by Carol Carter. (McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement FOR CONDITIONAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, CERTICATION OF A CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL, APPROVAL OF THE FORM AND MANNER OF CLASS NOTICE AND DIRECTING CLASS NOTICE TO BE MAILED, SCHEDULING A DATE FOR FILING OF PLAINTIFF/CLASS COUNSELS PETITION FOR FEES AND COSTS AT LEAST THIRTY (30) DAYS BEFORE THE DATE OF THE FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING AND SCHEDULING A DATE FOR THE FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING by Carol Carter.(McNulty, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Eugene R. Richard (Richard, Eugene) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Allan Van Gestel. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Box of German Documents received 6/24/2010. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Box of German Documents received 6/15/2010. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND MEMORANDUM RELATING TO SETTLEMENT EFFORTS, THIRD REVISED SCHEDULING AND RELATED MATTERS. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Box of German Documents received 1/5/2010. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Kirk D. Tresemer (Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by David A. Barry (Change of Address of Herzfeld & Rubin, P.C.) (Barry, David) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM RE: Settlement Efforts by Allan Van Gestel. Revised Scheduling and Related Matters. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Relating to Revised Scheduling and Related Matters. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks Amended Notice of Translation of 5/27/09 Letter from Central Authority in Lower Saxony (Doc #140) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Translation of 5/27/09 Letter from Central Authority (Lower Saxony))(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks Notice of Translation of 5/27/09 Letter from Central Authority in Lower Saxony (Doc #140) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Translation of 5/27/09 Letter from Central Authority (Lower Saxony))(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Herrn Baum. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER of the Court Regarding Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters to Der Prasident des Oberlandesgerichts Munchen. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters to Niedersachsiches Justizministerium (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Special Master Relating to Scheduling and Related Matters. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order of Special Master for Conference on Joint Status Report and Proposed Discovery Schedule. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Joint Status Report and Proposed Discovery Schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript of 10-23-08 Hearing)(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 23, 2008, before Judge Tauro. Court Reporter: Helana L. Kline at 508/525-7769. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2009: # 1 Transcript) (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 130 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum and Order of Special Master on a Motion. 108 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P is DENIED. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. Allan Van Gestel appointed.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from German Consul General, Friedrich Ludwig LOHR. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 114 MOTION to Quash filed by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG. (Barry, David) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their Motion to Quash Deposition Notices and for a Protective Order by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barry, David) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Submission in Response to Plaintiffs' "Comments" Regarding the Court's Appointment of a Special Discovery Master Letter/request (non-motion). (Barry, David) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Comments Regarding the Court's Appointment of a Special Discovery Master Letter/request (non-motion). (Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Submission in Response to Court Order Regarding Appointment of A Special Discovery Master Letter/request (non-motion). (Barry, David) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/03/2008 to Submit Comments Regarding Special Discovery Master by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks.(Shapiro, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Seal Document s Marked Confidential by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks, Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation.(Barry, David) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 114 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notices and Plaintiffs' Request for Sanctions filed by Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Tresemer, Kirk) Modified on 9/18/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) Defendants' Request for Oral Argument. (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 108 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P filed by Carol Carter, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG of Availability of Documents Subject To Motion For Protective Order (Barry, David) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 114 MOTION to Quash filed by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc, Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I)(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash and For a Protective Order by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc, Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levin, Andrew) Modified on 9/4/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Case Management Conference held on August 13, 2008, before Judge Tauro. Court Reporter: Carol Lynn Scott at 617/330-1377. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of DanielV. Gsovski in Support re 108 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P filed by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 108 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P filed by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Taking Depositions by Carol Carter, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks (Tresemer, Kirk) Modified on 8/21/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Re Discovery Disputes. (Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered re: DISCOVERY. A Further Conference will be held on January 21, 2009 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 102 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference (Exhibit 9) by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Barry, David) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT re 102 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference (Exhibit 8) by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems). (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Pending Motions by Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks (Tresemer, Kirk) Modified on 8/6/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by Marie Montag, Matthew Leonetti, Stacy Leonetti, Eric Emanuelson, Margaret Moreau, David Marks, Carrie Marks, Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24)(Tresemer, Kirk) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to 57 Amended Complaint, by Audi, AG.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to 57 Amended Complaint, by Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems).(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to 57 Amended Complaint, by Volkswagen AG.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ElectronicDISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro: Electronic ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:(Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint SUR-REPLY to Motion re 71 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. and Reply re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declarations of Keith Frederick and Robert Cameron filed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero. (Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Andrew R. Levin, Esquire. (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Combined Reply to Answer to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike, and Surreply to Reply to Plaintiffs Answer to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, in a Brief of No More Than 25 Pages in Length by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero.(Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 71 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Declarations in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Leave to File Granted on May 20, 2008 filed by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to File a Single, 25-Page Memorandum in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered 87 Motion to Reconsider and Extend is ALLOWED. Defendants shall file their Opposition to 81 Motion to Strike the Declarations and Exhibits by May 21, 2008, at which point this court will consider the merits of the Motion. No extensions will be granted. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Reconsideration and to Extend by Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems).(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered 81 Motion to Strike Declarations and Exhibits is ALLOWED WITHOUT OPPOSITION. See order for details re: 71 Motion to Dismiss. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. filed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero. (Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. 80 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation is ALLOWED as to exceeding the page limitation and DENIED as to the requested number of pages. Plaintiffs shall refile their Opposition, of no more than 65 pages by April 25, 2008. Defendants may file a reply by May 9, 2008. Plaintiffs may file a surreply by May 23, 2008. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 81 MOTION to Strike 76 Exhibit, 74 Declaration, 73 Declaration,, 75 Declaration,, MOTION to Strike 76 Exhibit, 74 Declaration, 73 Declaration,, 75 Declaration,, by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero. (Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 81 MOTION to Strike 76 Exhibit, 74 Declaration, 73 Declaration,, 75 Declaration,, MOTION to Strike 76 Exhibit, 74 Declaration, 73 Declaration,, 75 Declaration,, filed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero. (Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike 76 Exhibit, 74 Declaration, 73 Declaration,, 75 Declaration,, by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero.(Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero.(Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 71 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. filed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero. (Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend Pre-Trial Order No. 1 by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems).(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 74 Declaration of Robert Cameron by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 71 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. Of Keith Frederick (Corrected Copy) by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Robert Cameron by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems). (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION Of Keith A. Frederick by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Errata F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 71 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. filed by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems). (Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems).(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limitation on Motion to Dismiss by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems).(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Amend 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin C. Maxwell (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation Withdrawal of Appearance of Joseph Antinori, Esquire as co-counsel for Plaintiffs (Goldstein, Julie) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin C. Maxwell (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE issued to Attorney Julie D. Goldstein regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Julie D. Goldstein on behalf of Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs and Defendants Pursuant to Court Order of 12/19/07 by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Barry, David) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered 60 Motion to Amend is ALLOWED. No further extensions to be granted. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. (Lovett, Zita) Modified on 12/20/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend Pre-Trial Order No. 1 and Scheduling Order No. 1 by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems).(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. Stipulation and Order Re: Confidentiality of Documents and Information.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order and for Entry of Stipulation by Volkswagen AG, Audi, AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Order Re Confidentiality of Documents and Information)(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Megan Shero.(Levy, Sheryl) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney M. Clayborn Williams terminated. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend 5 Scheduling Order, 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial by Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Amend the Class Action Complaint by Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Complaint)(Sobran, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered - 9 Motion to Substitute Pages is ALLOWED. 27 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Eugenia Diveroli and Ken Winokur is ALLOWED. 28 Motion of Eugenia Diveroli and Ken Winokur for Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 is WITHDRAWN. 36 Motion of Eugenia Diveroli and Ken Winokur for Court Approval of their Voluntary Dismissal of All Counts Against Volkswagen of America, Inc. and Audi of America, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 41(a) is ALLOWED. 40 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 is ALLOWED. 41 Joint Motion of the Parties to Amend Pretrial Order No. 1 is ALLOWED. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Henkin on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder, Volkswagen of America, Inc(c/o C.T. Corporation Systems), Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Levy, Sheryl) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder.(Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan H. Waller (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. The parties shall jointly file a status report by August 3, 2007, updating the court as to the present posture of the case. The parties shall indicate which motions remain pending and which motions are now moot. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend 5 Scheduling Order, 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft, Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P. (Generally Applicable Grounds) (Corrected) filed by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft. (Barry, David) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder. Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft served on 6/7/2007, answer due 6/27/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Carol Carter; Eugenia Diveroli; Ken Winokur; Eric Becker; Judith Yarkony; Mildred Kasten; William Cohen; James Craig; Kenneth Nager; Patricia Murphy; Laura Cole; Scott Tyder. (Mangan, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder. Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft served on 6/8/2007, answer due 6/28/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Carol Carter; Eugenia Diveroli; Ken Winokur; Eric Becker; Judith Yarkony; Mildred Kasten; William Cohen; James Craig; Kenneth Nager; Patricia Murphy; Laura Cole; Scott Tyder. (Mangan, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P. (Generally Applicable Grounds) filed by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft. (Barry, David) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P. (Generally Applicable Grounds) by Volkswagenwerk Aktien-Gesellschaft, Audi Aktien-Gesellschaft.(Barry, David) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend Pretrial Order No. 1 by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder.(Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw 28 MOTION for Order to Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 by Carol Carter, Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder.(Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Order to Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 filed by Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Barry, David) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 28 MOTION for Order to Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 filed by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Judith Yarkony, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/18/2007 to Respond to Motion of Diveroli and Winokur by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder.(Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion of Eugenia Diveroli and Ken Winokur for Court Approval of Their Voluntary Dismissal of all Counts Against Volkswagen of America, Inc. and Audi of America, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 41(A).(Sobran, Thomas) Modified on 5/15/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended COmplaint Purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Grounds Applicable to Particular Plaintiffs) Response of Eugenia Daveroli and Ken Winokur to the Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Motion of Volkswagen of America, Inc. to Dismiss M.G.L. c.93A Claims filed by Ken Winokur. (Sobran, Thomas) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Volkswagen of America, Inc re 33 Joint MOTION to Amend 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial AMENDED. (Barry, David) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 11, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION for Order to Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re: Contact Information from Ilan Chorowsky. (Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur re 27 MOTION to Dismiss. (Sobran, Thomas) Modified on 4/18/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to substitute method of service by Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur.(Sobran, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Relief from Pretrial Order No. 1 by Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur.(Sobran, Thomas) Modified on 4/18/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Eugenia Diveroli, Ken Winokur.(Sobran, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended COmplaint Purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Grounds Applicable to Particular Plaintiffs) of Keith A. Frederick by Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - Aug 04 VW letter# 2 Exhibit Ex B - Aug 04 Audi letter# 3 Exhibit Ex C - Marks Sale Contract# 4 Exhibit Ex D - Carter Sale Contract# 5 Exhibit Ex E - Nager Title Documents# 6 Exhibit Ex F - Kasten Sale Documents# 7 Exhibit Ex G - Emmanuelson & Moreau Sale Invoice-Cert. of Search# 8 Exhibit Ex H - Yarkony Application for Title# 9 Exhibit Ex I - Montag Bill of Sale# 10 Exhibit Ex J - Craig Bill of Sale)(Barry, David) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended COmplaint Purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Grounds Applicable to Particular Plaintiffs) of Robert Cameron by Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - List of VW Assets)(Barry, David) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended COmplaint Purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Grounds Applicable to Particular Plaintiffs) filed by Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Barry, David) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Grounds Applicable to Particular Plaintiffs) by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Generally Applicable Grounds) by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Generally Applicable Plaintiffs) filed by Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Barry, David) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Generally Applicable Plaintiffs) by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Amend 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Levin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Phillip A. Bock Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1470938. by Judith Yarkony. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Richard, Eugene) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1470927. by Judith Yarkony. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Richard, Eugene) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ilan Chorowsky Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1470899. by Judith Yarkony. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Richard, Eugene) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER Appointing International Process Server entered. (Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder re 13 Assented to MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server. (Mangan, Charles) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Carol Carter, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mangan, Charles) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend 4 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial Order No. 1 by Volkswagen of America, Inc.(Barry, David) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder re 9 MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint. (Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 9 MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder. (Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder.(Millstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder re 7 Amended Complaint. (Millstein, Edward) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Carol Carter, Eric Becker, Mildred Kasten, William Cohen, James Craig, Kenneth Nager, Patricia Murphy, Laura Cole, Scott Tyder.(Millstein, Edward) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Thomas P. Sobran. (Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/30/2008 02:15 PM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL PRETRIAL ORDER(Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered regarding status conference scheduled for Nov. 7, 2006 at 2:30 pm. (Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-1 in MDL Case 1790 received form Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation requesting transfer of cases In Re Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation for consolidated pretrial proceedings - MDL assigned to Judge Tauro. (Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order (first) in MDL Case 1790 received from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation requesting transfer of cases In Re Volkswagen and Audi Warranty Extension Litigation for consolidated pretrial proceedings - MDL assigned to Judge Tauro. (Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 235 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?