Nuance Communications Inc. v. Voice Signal Technologies Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10363
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nuance Communications Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, CERENCE INC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Greenbaum, +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 310 8007
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Samuels +1 213 430 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Margaret Cendali +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 dale.cendali@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery A. Fehervari +1 213 430 6407 +1 213 430 6407 jfehervari@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandy Jennifer Glad +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 jglad@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Ono +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 dono@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C. Scarsi +1 213 430 6529 +1 213 430 6407 mscarsi@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Voice Signal Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carla Miriam Levy +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 clevy@ll-a.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew B. Lowrie +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 mlowrie@ll-a.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Silverman +1 617 395 7041 +1 617 395 7070 rsilverman@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MONICA R. GERBER, M.D., PH.D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton, Tidwell & Schroeder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly B. Tidwell +1 903 792 7080 +1 903 792 8233 kbt@texarkanalaw.com
v.
No Logo Voice Signal Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carla Miriam Levy +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 clevy@ll-a.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew B. Lowrie +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 mlowrie@ll-a.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Silverman +1 617 395 7041 +1 617 395 7070 rsilverman@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MONICA R. GERBER, M.D., PH.D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton, Tidwell & Schroeder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas H. Patton +1 903 792 7080 +1 903 792 8233 nickpatton@texarkanalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly B. Tidwell +1 903 792 7080 +1 903 792 8233 kbt@texarkanalaw.com
No Logo Nuance Communications Inc., Counter-Defendant
Unknown Role, CERENCE INC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Samuels +1 213 430 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery A. Fehervari +1 213 430 6407 +1 213 430 6407 jfehervari@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandy Jennifer Glad +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 jglad@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Ono +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 dono@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C. Scarsi +1 213 430 6529 +1 213 430 6407 mscarsi@omm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER GRANTING STAY OF LITIGATION DURING PATENT REEXAMINATIONS entered. "This case is now administratively closed pending the outcome of the re-examination proceedings." (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Stay re 64 MOTION to Stay Litigation During Reexaminations filed on behalf of all parties by Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc..(Lowrie, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM in Support re 64 MOTION to Stay Litigation During Reexaminations filed by Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibit A - Part 3# 4 Exhibit B - Part 1# 5 Exhibit B - Part 2# 6 Exhibit B - Part 3# 7 Exhibit B - Part 4# 8 Exhibit C - Part 1# 9 Exhibit C - Part 2# 10 Exhibit D - Part 1# 11 Exhibit D - Part 2# 12 Exhibit D - Part 3# 13 Exhibit E# 14 Exhibit F# 15 Exhibit G# 16 Exhibit H - Part 1# 17 Exhibit H - Part 2# 18 Exhibit I# 19 Exhibit J)(Silverman, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 64 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION to Stay Litigation During Reexaminations by Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc..(Silverman, Robert) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2007 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 03/27/2007)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc.. (Silverman, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by David Greenbaum on behalf of Nuance Communications Inc. (Greenbaum, David) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr on behalf of Nuance Communications Inc. (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                NOTICE issued to Attorney Dale M. Cendali, Jeffery A. Fehervari, Brandy Jennifer Glad, Lance Lee, David W. Ono, Nicholas H. Patton, Mark Samuels, Mark Scarsi, and Kelly B. Tidwell regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Miriam Levy on behalf of Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc. (Levy, Carla) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Silverman on behalf of Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc. (Silverman, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Lowrie on behalf of Voice Signal Technologies Inc., Voice Signal Technologies Inc. (Lowrie, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                          Case transferred in from the Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 5:06-cv-00071-DF-CMC. Certified copy of transfer order, docket sheet, and Complaint received. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet - Eastern District of Texas# 2 Complaint) (Paine, Matthew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 394 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?