USA v. Swartz
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:11-cr-10260-NMG

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2017 at 2:13 AM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Case Summary (Last Edited by Aaron Greenspan)

Open information activist Aaron Swartz, whose work obtaining PACER data directly led to the creation of PlainSite, was viciously prosecuted by the United States Department of Justice after he used a Massachusetts Institute of Technology wiring closet to download millions of academic journal articles from JSTOR, with which he may have later planned to conduct a quantitative analysis. The DOJ's prosecution ended with Swartz's suicide on January 11, 2013, which many argue was caused by the criminal proceedings.
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Garland +1 617 748 3148 +1 617 748 3960 scott.garland@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen P. Heymann +1 617 748 3100 Stephen.Heymann@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Aaron Swartz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Good & Cormier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew Good +1 617 523 5933 +1 617 523 7554 ag@gscboston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by worldnet.att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Martin Gary Weinberg +1 617 227 3700 +1 617 338 9538 owlmgw@att.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 7/14/2011
County Middlesex
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 & 2...WIRE FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
181030(a)(4) & 2...COMPUTER FRAUD
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
181030(a)(2), (c)(2)(B)(iii) & 2 ...UNLAWFULLY OBTAINING INFORMATION FROM A PROTECTED COMPUTER
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
181030(a)(5)(B),(c)(4)(A)(i)(I)(VI) & 2 ...RECKLESSLY DAMAGING A PROTECTED COMPUTER
Count 13s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
181030(a)(5),(B),(c)(4)(A)(i)(I),(VI) &2...RECKLESSLY DAMAGING A PROTECTED COMPUTER
Count 1s-2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 & 2...WIRE FRAUD
Count 3s-7s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
181030(a)(4),(b)&2...COMPUTER FRAUD
Count 8s-12s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
181030(a)(2),(b),(c)(2)(B)(iii) & 2...UNLAWFULLY OBTAINING INFORMATION FROM A PROTECTED COMPUTER
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags CASREF,VICTIM
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Review of Redactions as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 27, 2013 to File To Complete Review of Redactions as to Aaron Swartz. (Pineault, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 130 Motion for Modification of Time Period for Preparation and Review of Redactions Pursuant to the Court's June 3, 2013 Order as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION Modification of Time Period for Preparation and Review of Redactions as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Pirozzolo, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER by Aaron Swartz (Purcell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 128 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER by Aaron Swartz re 127 Order (Purcell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. Modification to Protective Order as to Aaron Swartz (Attachments: # 1 Tab A, # 2 Tab B) (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                PROPOSED ORDER(S) submitted by Aaron Swartz (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Modification to Protective Order)(Pineault, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Modification to Protective Order as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 31, 2013 to File Proposed Modification to Protective Order as to Aaron Swartz. (Pineault, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 104 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Aaron Swartz re [63] MOTION to Suppress No. 5 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Evidence Transfer Chronology, # (2) Exhibit Finger Print Report Excerpt)(Heymann, Stephen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to Aaron Swartz: Motions due by 5/27/2013 (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Memorandum in Support
                        Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support by Aaron Swartz re [63] MOTION to Suppress DEFENDANT AARON SWARTZ'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Peters, Elliot)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 122 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM and Order as to Aaron Swartz. "In accordance with the foregoing, 1) the motions to intervene by the Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Docket No. 113) and JSTOR (Docket No. 116) for the purpose of partially opposing the motion to modify the protective order are ALLOWED, 2) the motion of defendant's estate to modify the protective order (Docket No. 109) is, with respect to the aspects upon which the parties and intervenors agree, ALLOWED, but, with respect to disclosure of identifying and network information, DENIED, 3) the estate shall afford the intervenors an opportunity to review and redact all documents produced in discovery to address identifying and sensitive network information, and 4) the parties and intervenors shall submit a joint proposed order for modification of the Protective Order consistent with this opinion on or before May 27, 2013. So ordered." (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                            LREF
                            Blank 102 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [100] Motion for Leave to File as to Aaron Swartz (1); granting [101] Motion for Leave to File as to Aaron Swartz (1); Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document (Patch, Christine)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance of Christopher H. Lindstrom for the Massachusetts Institute of Technology by Massachusetts Institute of Technology as to Aaron Swartz (Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013, Terminated: 1/11/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Dismiss as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Government's Response, # (2) Exhibit A to Government's Response, # (3) Exhibit B to Government's Response)(Heymann, Stephen)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance of Jonathan L. Kotlier Appearing for Massachusetts Institute of Technology by Massachusetts Institute of Technology as to Aaron Swartz (Kotlier, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013, Terminated: 1/11/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                    MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT AARON SWARTZ'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Peters, Elliot)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Kevin Guthrie by JSTOR as to Aaron Swartz 116 Response to Motion filed by JSTOR, 117 Memorandum in Support, filed by JSTOR (Pearlstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 99 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Aaron Swartz: Expert Witness List due by 1/25/2013. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Moore, Kellyann)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Jeremy Feigelson by JSTOR as to Aaron Swartz 116 Response to Motion filed by JSTOR, 117 Memorandum in Support, filed by JSTOR (Pearlstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. NOTICE. Please see order for details. (Moore, Kellyann)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by JSTOR as to Aaron Swartz re 109 MOTION Modification of Protective Order Memorandum of Law of JSTOR In Support of Its Motion to Intervene and In Support of Modification of the Protective Order (Pearlstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 97 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Aaron Swartz Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/25/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Hohler, Daniel)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by JSTOR as to Aaron Swartz re 109 MOTION Modification of Protective Order and Motion to Intervene by JSTOR (Pearlstein, Mark) Modified event on 4/1/2013 (Moore, Kellyann). (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Interim Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on 12/14/2012 (Attorneys present: Hayman, Peters, Pineault, Purcell (by phone). )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Cheryl Dahlstrom (617-951-4555). Court is in session. Court hears from the partiess as to the necessity of an evidentiary hearing. Court orders hearing on 1/25/2013 at 1:00 p.m. Experts designated by 1/25/2013. Trial to begin on 4/1/2013. (Hohler, Daniel)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Emily J. Grannon by Massachusetts Institute of Technology as to Aaron Swartz 114 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Kotlier, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Aaron Swartz re [88] MOTION to Continue DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE to June 10, 2013 to Continue trial date (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 114 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Massachusetts Institute of Technology as to Aaron Swartz re 109 MOTION Modification of Protective Order and in Support of the Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Motion to Intervene (Kotlier, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Reply to Response
                                                            SEALED REPLY in Support of [63] MOTION to Suppress , [61] MOTION to Suppress , [62] MOTION to Suppress , [64] MOTION to Dismiss , [59] MOTION to Suppress , [60] MOTION to Suppress by Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Cover Letter)(Moore, Kellyann)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by Massachusetts Institute of Technology as to Aaron Swartz re 109 MOTION Modification of Protective Order and MOTION to Intervene by Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Kotlier, Jonathan) Modified on 5/13/2013 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [86] Motion for Leave to File Reply Briefing and Exhibit Under Seal. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Jack W. Pirozzolo by USA as to Aaron Swartz 111 Response to Motion filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A, # 2 Exhibit Tab B, # 3 Exhibit Tab C, # 4 Exhibit Tab D, # 5 Exhibit Tab E, # 6 Exhibit Tab F, # 7 Exhibit Tab G)(Pirozzolo, Jack) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 12/14/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Aaron Swartz re 109 MOTION Modification of Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A)(Pirozzolo, Jack) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [85] Motion for Hearing as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jack W. Pirozzolo appearing for USA. (Pirozzolo, Jack) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by Aaron Swartz re [85] Assented to MOTION for Hearing Status Conference DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE (Peters, Elliot)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION Modification of Protective Order as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Resnick Decl ISO, # 2 Affidavit Pineault Decl ISO, # 3 Exhibit Pineault Decl - Ex A, # 4 Exhibit Pineault Decl - Ex B, # 5 Exhibit Pineault Decl - Ex C)(Peters, Elliot) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Memorandum in Support
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Aaron Swartz re [88] MOTION to Continue DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE to June 10, 2013 to Continue trial date (Peters, Elliot)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012, Terminated: 12/17/2012 Motion to Continue
                                                                                  MOTION to Continue DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE to June 10, 2013 to Continue trial date as to Aaron Swartz. (Peters, Elliot)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Transcript of Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on December 14, 2012, before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 3/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2013. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Reply to Response
                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Aaron Swartz re [63] MOTION to Suppress , [61] MOTION to Suppress , [62] MOTION to Suppress , [64] MOTION to Dismiss , [59] MOTION to Suppress , [60] MOTION to Suppress DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 1 AND 2 OF SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT [REDACTED VERSION] (Peters, Elliot)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Aaron Swartz. Counts dismissed: All counts dismissed. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012, Terminated: 12/4/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEFING AND EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL as to Aaron Swartz. (Peters, Elliot)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISMISSAL as to Aaron Swartz (Heymann, Stephen) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012, Terminated: 12/3/2012 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Hearing Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Aaron Swartz re [64] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Aaron Swartz re [63] MOTION to Suppress , [61] MOTION to Suppress , [59] MOTION to Suppress , [62] MOTION to Suppress , [60] MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit JSTOR Policy Before Download, # (2) Exhibit JSTOR Policy Cover Sheet, # (3) Exhibit JSTOR's Terms of Service, # (4) Exhibit MIT's Guest Rules of Use, # (5) Exhibit Guerilla Open Access Manifesto, # (6) Exhibit MIT Guest Registration, # (7) Exhibit MIT Registration and DHCP Log Excerpts, # (8) Exhibit Building 16 Door and No Trespassing Sign, # (9) Exhibit Wiring Closet Exterior, # (10) Exhibit Wiring Closet Interior and Cardboard Box, # (11) Exhibit Equipment in Closet, # (12) Exhibit Network Cable and Network Switch, # (13) Exhibit January 4 Entrance, # (14) Exhibit January 6 Entrance, # (15) Exhibit January 6 Packing, # (16) Exhibit January 6 Exit, # (17) Exhibit Equipment in Building 20, # (18) Exhibit MIT Records Policy, # (19) Exhibit Arrest Report, # (20) Exhibit B&E Legislative History, # (21) Exhibit USB Drive Search Warrant, # (22) Exhibit MIT Policy)(Garland, Scott)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [72] Assented to MOTION Extension of Response Brief Deadline, Permission to File Response Brief Exceeding Local Rule's Page Limits, and Filing a Reply Brief as to Aaron Swartz by USA. "The Government may file a consolidated brief in opposition to defendant's motions to suppress and it may do so by November 16. Defendant is granted leave to file a reply brief by December 3. The Government's consolidated brief, however, may not exceed 55 pages and the Defendant's reply is not to exceed 10 pages." (Moore, Kellyann)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [74] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Elliot R. Peters. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to Aaron Swartz (1); granting [75] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel E. Purcell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Moore, Kellyann)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012, Terminated: 11/9/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel E. Purcell Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-4195073. as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Pineault, Michael)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012, Terminated: 11/9/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elliot R. Peters Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-4195066. as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Pineault, Michael)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Pineault appearing for Aaron Swartz. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Pineault, Michael)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012, Terminated: 11/13/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION Extension of Response Brief Deadline, Permission to File Response Brief Exceeding Local Rule's Page Limits, and Filing a Reply Brief re [63] MOTION to Suppress , [61] MOTION to Suppress , [62] MOTION to Suppress , [64] MOTION to Dismiss , [59] MOTION to Suppress , [60] MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Garland, Scott)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [70] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Martin G. Weinberg terminated as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012, Terminated: 11/1/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Martin Weinberg as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthias A. Kamber appearing for Aaron Swartz. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Kamber, Matthias)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                                                                      Sealed EXHIBITS by Aaron Swartz [63] MOTION to Suppress filed by Aaron Swartz, [61] MOTION to Suppress filed by Aaron Swartz, [65] Notice requesting courtesy copy,, [62] MOTION to Suppress filed by Aaron Swartz, [64] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aaron Swartz, [59] MOTION to Suppress filed by Aaron Swartz, [60] MOTION to Suppress filed by Aaron Swartz (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [66] Motion to Seal as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [63] MOTION to Suppress , [61] MOTION to Suppress , [62] MOTION to Suppress , [64] MOTION to Dismiss , [59] MOTION to Suppress , [60] MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz Counsel who filed these documents are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Suppress as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                        Judge update in case as to Aaron Swartz. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein no longer assigned to case. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:Arraignment as to Aaron Swartz (1) Count 1s-2s,3s-7s,8s-12s,13s held on 9/24/2012, Plea entered by Aaron Swartz Not Guilty on counts all. (Attorneys present: Garland and Weinberg. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Aaron Swartz Arraignment set for 9/24/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012, Terminated: 9/24/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Reason for referral: P as to Aaron Swartz (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                    SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Aaron Swartz (1) count(s) 1s-2s, 3s-7s, 8s-12s, 13s. (Attachments: # (1) JS45)(Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from August 15, 2012 until February 4, 2013. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Order on Motion for Speedy Trial Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [50] Motion for Speedy Trial as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012, Terminated: 8/24/2012 Motion for Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Speedy Trial Exclusion as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Interin Pretrial Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on 8/15/2012. Counsel anticipate trial lasting 2 weeks. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Government's initial expert disclosures by 11/19/12, Defendant's by 12/10/12, and additional experts by 12/31/12. Motions in limine due by 1/14/2013; oppositions to Motions in Limine, Exhibit/Witness Lists, and proposed voir dire due by 1/21/2013; objections to exhibit/witness lists, proposed jury instructions, and proposed verdict form due by 1/21/2013. Government to file assented-to Motion to Exclude all time between 8/15/12 and 2/4/13. (Attorneys present: Weinberg, Heymann. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Cheryl Dahlstrom (617-951-4555). (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                              Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Aaron Swartz: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 8/15/12. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Order on Report and Order on Final Status Conference by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered acknowledging [44] Report and Order on Final Status Conference by Magistrate Judge as to Aaron Swartz (1) Interim Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot [18] Motion for Protective Order as to Aaron Swartz (1); finding as moot [19] Motion to Compel as to Aaron Swartz (1); finding as moot [24] Motion as to Aaron Swartz (1); finding as moot [11] Motion to Unseal Document as to Aaron Swartz (1); finding as moot [13] Motion to Exclude as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [40] Motion for Discovery as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 7/26/12 until 10/30/12. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012, Terminated: 8/2/2012 Report and Order on Final Status Conference by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz Discovery to be completed by 8/15/2012; dispositive motion are due 9/28/12 and Govt. response to dispositive motions due 10/30/12. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                          Judge update in case as to Aaron Swartz. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein no longer assigned to case. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Status Conference by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Final Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on 7/26/2012, Motion Hearing as to Aaron Swartz held on 7/26/2012 re [40] MOTION for Discovery filed by Aaron Swartz; Counsel report current case status; USMJ Dein hears arguments on motion and takes motion under advisement. Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Aaron Swartz (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Aaron Swartz re [40] MOTION for Discovery (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012, Terminated: 8/1/2012 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Discovery as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 5/17/12 until 7/26/12. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 7/26/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on 5/22/2012; Counsel report discovery is ongoing and seek further conference for 7/26/12 @ 2:30pm.(Attorneys present: Heymann and Weinberg. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by Aaron Swartz (Weinberg, Martin) Modified docket text on 5/16/2012 (Moore, Kellyann).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING from 5/17/12 to 5/22/12 from as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 5/22/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 5/17/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 3/1/12 until 5/17/12. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas) (Main Document 36 replaced on 5/22/2012) (Quinn, Thomas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 5/17/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Filed Jointly by the Parties by USA as to Aaron Swartz (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [33] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/7/2012 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Redacted) as to Aaron Swartz. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 1/25/12 until 3/15/12. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [31] Motion to Exclude as to Aaron Swartz (1); granting [31] Motion to Continue as to Aaron Swartz (1)( Status Conference set for 3/15/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/20/2012 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Excludable Delay from January 25, 2012 to March 15, 2012 , Joint MOTION to Reschedule Next Interim Status Conference From January 25, 2012 Until March 15, 2012 ( Responses due by 2/2/2012) as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Heymann, Stephen) Modified on 1/20/2012 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 12/14/11 until 1/25/12. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 1/25/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on 12/14/2011; Counsel report discovery is ongoing and seek further conference for 1/25/12 @ 10:00am(Attorneys present: Garland and Weinberg. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Aaron Swartz (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 11/2/11 until 12/14/11. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:Motion Hearing as to Aaron Swartz held on 11/8/2011 re [24] MOTION Discovery order re [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Aaron Swartz, [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Aaron Swartz; Counsel report they are working on an agreement on a protective order and the form which discovery will be produced.(Attorneys present: Garland and Weinberg. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Aaron Swartz Discovery Hearing set for 11/8/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [26] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Andrew Good terminated as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:Motion Hearing as to Aaron Swartz held on 11/2/2011 re [24] MOTION Discovery order re [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Aaron Swartz, [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Aaron Swartz; USMJ Dein hears arguments from counsel and victim and continues hearing to 11/8/11 @ 2:30pm. (Attorneys present: Garland and Weinberg. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/3/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrew Good as to Aaron Swartz. (Good, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Martin G. Weinberg appearing for Aaron Swartz. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/1/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Discovery order re [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit August 12, 2011 Letter)(Good, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Memorandum (not related to a motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum regarding Report to the Court re Discovery as to Aaron Swartz (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Aaron Swartz: Discovery Hearing. (Moore, Kellyann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:Motion Hearing as to Aaron Swartz held on 10/11/2011 re [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Aaron Swartz, [18] MOTION for Protective Order filed by USA; USMJ Dein hears arguments from Dft., Govt. and victims counsel(Feigelson); supplemental filings are due 10/24/11 and further hearing is set for 11/2/11 @ 2:30pm. (Attorneys present: Garland and Good and Feigelson )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Aaron Swartz re [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition by Aaron Swartz re [18] MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit JSTOR Announcement)(Good, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings as to Aaron Swartz Discovery Hearing set for 10/11/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Aaron Swartz re [19] MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit August 12, 2011 Letter (Good, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2011: (Catino3, Theresa). (Main Document 20 replaced on 9/28/2011...incorrect exhibit attached per request of T. Quinn...) (Catino3, Theresa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/1/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Discovery as to Aaron Swartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Good, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/1/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Garland, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [15] Motion Change Residential Address as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 8/16/11 until 11/2/11. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 11/2/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Status Conference as to Aaron Swartz held on 9/9/2011; Counsel report current case status and seek further conference for 11/2/11 @ 2:30pm. Motion hearing is set for 10/11/11 @ 11:00am. (Attorneys present: Garland, Heymann and Good. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/20/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Change Residential Address as to Aaron Swartz. (Good, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Joint) by USA as to Aaron Swartz (Garland, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/1/2012 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Excludable Delay as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Victim Rights
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Victim Rights as to Aaron Swartz (1); granting [12] Motion as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [11] Motion as to Aaron Swartz (1) The US Attorney's Office is responsible to provide copies to the defendant and Middlesex District Attorney's Office. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011, Terminated: 7/27/2011 Motion for Victim Rights
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Victim Rights in case as to Aaron Swartz( Responses due by 8/4/2011), MOTION For Alternative Victim Notification as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011, Terminated: 7/27/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION Unseal Warrants and Applications, MOTION to Unseal Document ( Responses due by 8/4/2011) as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Garland appearing for USA. (Garland, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT as to Aaron Swartz (Heymann, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Aaron Swartz. Time excluded from 7/19/11 until 8/16/11. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Aaron Swartz Status Conference set for 9/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Aaron Swartz. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appearance and Compliance Bond Entered as to Aaron Swartz in amount of $ 100,000.00 (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011, Terminated: 7/19/2011 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Case as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:Initial Appearance as to Aaron Swartz held on 7/19/2011, Arraignment as to Aaron Swartz (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 7/19/2011, Plea entered by Aaron Swartz (1) Count 1,2,3,4. by Aaron Swartz Not Guilty on counts all. USMJ Dein informs the Dft. of his rights and charges; Dft. has retained counsel; Govt. states maximum penalties; Dft. is released on bond with conditions. 1st conference is set for 9/9/11 @ 10:00am(Attorneys present: Heyman and Good. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest of Aaron Swartz (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Aaron Swartz. Attorney Andrew Good added. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [4] Motion to Unseal Case as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Aaron Swartz; Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman as to Aaron Swartz. (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Aaron Swartz (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (Attachments: # (1) JS45)(Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011, Terminated: 7/14/2011 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Case as to Aaron Swartz by USA. (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [1] Motion to Seal Case as to Aaron Swartz (1) (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 2,314 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?