Achekzai et al v. Rice et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01058-EDL
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Firiba Achekzai, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clemons, Holley et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Beth Kaufman +1 415 392 6161 +1 415 392 8208 marybethkaufman@gmail.com
No Logo Mohammad Hamid Rahimi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clemons, Holley et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Beth Kaufman +1 415 392 6161 +1 415 392 8208 marybethkaufman@gmail.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chang, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert S. Mueller, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 2/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County San Francisco
Terminated 6/25/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER re [9] Stipulation filed by Michael Chang, Michael Chertoff, Michael Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III, Condoleeza Rice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 25, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to Dismiss; and Proposed Order by Condoleeza Rice, Michael Chertoff, Michael Chang, Robert S. Mueller, III, Michael Mukasey. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
      CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Condoleeza Rice, Michael Chertoff, Michael Chang, Robert S. Mueller, III, Michael Mukasey (Joint).. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference to 7/1/2008 10:00 AM re [6]. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/23/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Stipulation
          STIPULATION to Extend Date of CMC; and Proposed Order by Condoleeza Rice, Michael Chertoff, Michael Chang, Robert S. Mueller, III, Michael Mukasey. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Clerks Notice
            CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 6/3/2008 10:00 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2008. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint byCondoleeza Rice, Michael Chertoff, Michael Chang, Robert S. Mueller, III, Michael Mukasey. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING Case Management Conference to 5/28/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Laporte. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2008. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 5/20/2008 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 5/27/2008 at 10:00 AM.. (Attachments: #(1) EDL Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2008: # (2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tn, COURT STAFF).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus - [Summons Issued] against Condoleeza Rice, Michael Chertoff, Michael Chang, Robert S. Mueller, III & Michael Mukasey, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611016089]. Filed by Plaintiffs Firiba Achekzai & Mohammad Hamid Rahimi. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008) (tn, COURT STAFF).
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                      CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Condoleeza Rice, Michael Chertoff, Michael Chang, Robert S. Mueller, III & Michael Mukasey. (tn, COURT STAFF)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 94 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?