TomTom, Inc. v. Norman IP Holdings LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-10348

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:21 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tomtom Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Kroon +1 857 488 4276 +1 857 488 4201 cskroon@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia R. Rich +1 857 488 4290 +1 857 488 4201 prich@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian H Pandya +1 202 719 7457 +1 202 719 7049 bpandya@wileyrein.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Wallace, Jr. +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7207 jwallace@wileyrein.com
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shilepsky Hartley Robb Casey Michon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Hannon +1 617 723 8000 phannon@shilepsky.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Case closed.(Cicolini, Pietro) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 24 the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and granting 8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Cicolini, Pietro) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations re 24 . (Cicolini, Pietro) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
        REPLY TO OBJECTION to 24 Report and Recommendations filed by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
          Objection to 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Norman IP Holdings LLC Recommendation: that the Motion be allowed. by TomTom, Inc. . (Rich, Patricia) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia R. Rich on behalf of TomTom, Inc. (Rich, Patricia) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              Case randomly reassigned to Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV upon his transfer to Boston. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to the case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Recommendation: that the Motion be allowed. Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2012. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                  Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority Regarding Norman's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (this motion is unopposed) by TomTom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Transcript of Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference held on June 12, 2012, before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond Gonsales at 508-984-7003, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond Gonsalves. Redaction Request due 7/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by Norman IP Holdings LLC, TomTom, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Pretrial Schedule. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by TomTom, Inc..(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                              REPLY to Response to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew G. DiNovo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3973681 by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Andrew G. DiNovo)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Rely Brief (Unopposed) by Norman IP Holdings LLC.(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION re 12 Opposition to Motion OF MICHAEL R. GOTTFRIED by TomTom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION re 12 Opposition to Motion OF MICHAEL J. COLLINS by TomTom, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                        Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by TomTom, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Full Pretrial Case Management, and Report and Recommendation on Dispositive Motions. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein. (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2012 to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by TomTom, Inc..(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Norman IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Mancinelli)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Norman IP Holdings LLC.(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2012 to Respond to Complaint by Norman IP Holdings LLC.(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by TomTom, Inc.. Norman IP Holdings LLC served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. Acknowledgement filed by TomTom, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TomTom, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TomTom International, B.V. for TomTom, Inc... (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James H. Wallace, Jr. and Brain H. Pandya Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3824017 by TomTom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Summons issued
                                                          Summons Issued as to Norman IP Holdings LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case
                                                            REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by TomTom, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3822676 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by TomTom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Catagory Form, Exhibit(4) U.S. Patent No. 5502689, Exhibit(5) U.S. Patent No. 5530597, Exhibit (6) U.S. Patent No. 5608873)(Gottfried, Michael) Modified on 2/24/2012 (Johnson, Jay). (Exhibit 3 refiled as separate document, see # 2) (Category Sheet -Attachment 2 replaced on 2/24/2012 for non-fillable form format ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?