DiFederico et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:11-cv-01508
District Judge Roger W Titus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 4:42 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Erik DiFederico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall Lamb & Hall PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Hall +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 andyhall@hlhlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P Leto +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 mleto@hlhlawfirm.com
No Logo Greg DiFederico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall Lamb & Hall PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Hall +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 andyhall@hlhlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P Leto +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 mleto@hlhlawfirm.com
No Logo Mary DiFederico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall Lamb & Hall PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Hall +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 andyhall@hlhlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P Leto +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 mleto@hlhlawfirm.com
No Logo Nicholas DiFederico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall Lamb & Hall PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Hall +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 andyhall@hlhlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P Leto +1 305 374 5030 +1 305 374 5033 mleto@hlhlawfirm.com
v.
Marriott International, Inc. Marriott International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Franklin Wick +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 rwick@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Helen Maxman +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 478 1735 mmaxman@cozen.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 112 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 111 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
    -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION For Leave to Amend filed by Marriott International, Inc.. Replies due by 6/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Leary, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Under Seal by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 6/30/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        MARGINAL ORDER granting 106 STIPULATION re 104 MOTION For Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/10/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 108 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM ORDER rescheduling hearing to September 15, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/10/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM to Counsel setting date for Telephonic Status Conference on June 10, 2014 at 5:30pm. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/2/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION re 104 MOTION For Leave to Amend by Marriott International, Inc.. (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION to Seal - Unopposed by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 6/9/2014 (Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                  -SEALED- MOTION For Leave to Amend by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 6/9/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Comparison of Complaints, # 3 Exhibit Deposition of Orlob, # 4 Exhibit iJet Report, # 5 Exhibit Marriott FAQ Internal Document)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING with the limitation specified herein 102 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 04/29/2014. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify Scheduling Order by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 5/15/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PAPERLESS ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 98 Defendant's Alternative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 04/14/2014. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 95 Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendant's Objection. Defendant must re-answer Interrogatory No. 6 (Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories) by providing the requested information. The undersigned finds the answer to Interrogatory No. 6 may lead to the discovery of information relevant to whether Marriott's security plan was sufficient to protect its guests. The undersigned appreciates Marriott's concerns for the privacy of its guests. The parties have stipulated to a confidentiality order and Plaintiffs have acknowledged in their motion that they will not disseminate the information beyond this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 04/14/2014. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 98 Defendant's Motion to Strike Section B of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief (ECF No. 97). The undersigned's Order of October 18, 2013 (ECF No. 80) predates Plaintiffs' December 27, 2013 service of their Second Set of Interrogatories on Defendant. The waiver of any objections which could have been asserted (except those based on privilege) concern Plaintiffs' first set of discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 04/14/2014. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Strike 97 Reply to Response to Motion, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Leave to File the Attached Sur-Reply Brief by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 4/24/2014 (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 MOTION to Compel and Overrule Defendant's Objections to Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Senate Testimony, # 2 Exhibit "B" - Guardian Article)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION to Compel and Overrule Defendant's Objections to Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Marriott International, Inc.. Replies due by 4/4/2014. (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Compel and Overrule Defendant's Objections to Second Set of Interrogatories by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 3/21/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING 93 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/10/2014. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: Scheduling Order by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 2/24/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 91 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 1/24/2014. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time /Modify Pretrial Deadlines by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/6/13, before Judge Roger W. Titus. Total number of pages filed: 54. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2014. (krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 57 Amended Complaint, by Marriott International, Inc..(Leary, Paul) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Granting 87 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/02/2013. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: Scheduling Order by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Modification of Scheduling Order)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION extending time to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Answer Due: 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/25/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION re 57 Amended Complaint, by Marriott International, Inc.. (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER DENYING 65 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; confirming filing deadlines and SCHEDULING a two-hour hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for 6/30/2014 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/6/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2013 re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPlaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc. before Judge Roger W Titus. (FTR GOLD 2C) (hbm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              APPROVING 81 Stipulated Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 10/25/2013. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material by Marriott International, Inc.. (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 72 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery; denying 76 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 10/18/2013. (nk, Chambers) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 76 MOTION for Protective Order and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico re 70 Response to Motion, of Filing Autopsy Report in Further Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Autopsy Report)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 75 Unopposed Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/2/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to 72 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery and CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Leary, Paul) Modified title on 10/3/2013 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) Regarding Pretrial Deadlines by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 10/18/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Connelly for discovery. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on September 26, 2013. (kdm, Chambers) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Memorandum Scheduling Hearing on 65 Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2C, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Judge Roger W Titus. (nd, Chambers) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 10/4/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPlaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPlaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. Replies due by 9/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Affidavit of Matthew Leto, # 2 Exhibit "B" - Orlob Senate Testimony, # 3 Exhibit "C" - Guardian Publication)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 67 Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPlaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.; Response now due: 8/26/2013. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/26/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 66 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/26/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            STIPULATION re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPlaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint For extension of time to file response by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Pretrial Deadlines by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 8/29/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPlaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 8/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Leary, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING 62 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Response now due by 8/5/2013 filed by Marriott International, Inc. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 07/19/2013. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    -[FILED IN ERROR]- ORDER APPROVING 62 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint; Response now due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/19/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/22/2013 (bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM/ORDER RESCHEDULING the telephone status conference set for 7/16/2013, at 9:00 a.m. for 7/18/2013, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for the Defendant should initiate the call. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/15/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM/ORDER SCHEDULING a telephone status conference for 7/16/2013, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for the Defendant shall initiate the call. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/11/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Second Request for Conference (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Request for Conference (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mary DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Attachments: # 1 Redline of Amended Complaint)(Hall, Andrew) Modified text on 6/26/2013 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  QC NOTICE regarding: 55 Second Amended Complaint filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the second amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the second amended complaint. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    [FILED IN ERROR] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mary DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico.(Hall, Andrew) Modified on 6/24/2013 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM/ORDER regarding early mediation services and the initiation of discovery. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/13/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/25/2013. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/12/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs up to and including 6/21/2013 to file an Amended Complaint and directing that Defendant SHALL FILE an Answer on or before 7/26/2013. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 5/12/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA "ITEMIZING" the bill of costs in the amount of $949.05 as to 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico (krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER the Court hereby GRANTS 49 the request for a continuance, filed by Marriott International, Inc.; the telephone status conference has been RESCHEDULED for June 12, 2013, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for the Plaintiffs should initiate the call. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 06/06/2013. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Request for Conference (Leary, Paul) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM/ORDER scheduling a telephone status conference on June 10, 2013, at 3:30 p.m. for the purpose of discussing the schedule for further proceedings. Counsel for the Plaintiffs should initiate the call. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 5/28/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA takes effect today as to 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico (krcs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT of USCA "REVERSING" the Judgment of the USDC and "REMANDING" to the USDC for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision as to 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (Attachments: # 1 Published Opinion, # 2 Notice of Judgment)(krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for dates of March 26, 2012, before Judge Roger W. Titus, re 39 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Dunlap, Telephone number 301.344.3912. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? - Y. Redaction Request due 7/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (trd, Court Report) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, denying the bill of costs 38 without prejudice to Defendant filing a new bill of costs within fourteen (14) days of the U.S. Court of Appeals issuing any mandate affirming judgment against Plaintiffs. Motion to Review due by 7/2/2012. (jbp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER Acnowledgment of USCA establishing a deadline for court reporter, Tracy Dunlap to 8/6/12 to file the transcript for hearing held on 3/26/12 as to 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico (krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 Bill of Costs filed by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. Replies due by 6/1/2012. (Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number 12-1635 for 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico (Case Manager - Sue Ellen Nagle) (krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 39 Notice of Appeal,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 36 Memorandum Opinion, 37 Judgment, by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0416-3488044. Appeal Record due by 6/14/2012. (Hall, Andrew) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      BILL OF COSTS by Marriott International, Inc.. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING Complaint and entering JUDGMENT and costs in favor of Marriott International, Inc. against Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/25/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/25/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2012 re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc. before Judge Roger W Titus. (Written order to be entered by the Court) (Court Reporter: T. Dunlap) (hbm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/25/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Without the Presence of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/12/12. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear in Court without the Presence of Local Counsel by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 3/26/2012 (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Wick, Ronald) Corrected title on 12/20/2011 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING 30 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/21/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for an Extension of Time for Defendant Marriott International, Inc., to File a Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Marriott International, Inc.. (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for forum non conveniens filed by Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C", # 4 Exhibit "D", # 5 Exhibit "E", # 6 Exhibit "F", # 7 Exhibit "G", # 8 Exhibit "H", # 9 Exhibit "I", # 10 Exhibit "J")(Hall, Andrew) Modified on 11/18/2011 (kns, Deputy Clerk)(Hard Copy rec'd 11/18/11). (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Scheduling Hearing on 23 Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2C, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Judge Roger W Titus. (nd, Chambers) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Responses due by 11/16/2011.. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/1/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico Responses due by 11/17/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Azrael, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION for an Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Mary DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Greg DiFederico. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/5/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for an Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Albert DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Azrael, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/1/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 10/6/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 21 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/14/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 3 Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Extension pursuant to 19 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte for Judge Roger W. Titus on 8/15/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified text on 8/15/2011 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for an Extension of Time for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Paul K. Leary, Jr. on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. Directing attorney Paul K. Leary, Jr. to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/27/11. (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul K. Leary, Jr. on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3073092) (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Matthew P. Leto on behalf of Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico and Nicholas DiFederico. Directing attorney Matthew P. Leto to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/11. (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Andrew C. Hall on behalf of Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico and Nicholas DiFederico. Directing attorney Andrew C. Hall to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/11. (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. re 7 Notice of Appearance (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          QC NOTICE: 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Marriott International, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew P. Leto by Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico (Filing fee $50, Receipt No. 84637017540) (ns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew C. Hall by Erik DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Mary DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico (Filing fee $50, Receipt no. 84637017539) (ns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Extension re 8 STIPULATION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/11/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H Maxman on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Maxman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Franklin Wick on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. Marriott International, Inc. served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Azrael, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Redline Version of Amended Complaint. (Azrael, Jonathan) Modified on 6/28/2011 (elts, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc., filed by Mary DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Albert DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico.(Azrael, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-3022320.), filed by Mary DiFederico, Greg DiFederico, Erik DiFederico, Nicholas DiFederico. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Demand for Jury Trial, # 3 Summons)(Azrael, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 280 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?