Ghazi et al v. United State Department of State et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01237-SI
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 6:02 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fatima Mohamed Yahya Ghazi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by balloutlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Haitham E. Ballout +1 650 373 1122 +1 650 373 1121 hb@balloutlaw.com
Space Stanley Dale Radtke +1 650 373 1122 stan@balloutlaw.com
No Logo Samyah A. Ghazi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by balloutlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Haitham E. Ballout +1 650 373 1122 +1 650 373 1121 hb@balloutlaw.com
Space Stanley Dale Radtke +1 650 373 1122 stan@balloutlaw.com
No Logo Yasser A. Ghazi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by balloutlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Haitham E. Ballout +1 650 373 1122 +1 650 373 1121 hb@balloutlaw.com
Space Stanley Dale Radtke +1 650 373 1122 stan@balloutlaw.com
v.
No Logo Christina Poulos, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Maura Harty, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Stephen A. Edson, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Stephen A. Seche, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo United State Department of State, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo United States Embassy in Sana'a, Yemen, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office San Francisco
Filed 2/29/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOPTERM, E-Filing
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Clerks Notice
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2008 02:00 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Joint MOTION to Vacate or Continue CMC filed by Christina Poulos, United State Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Stephen A. Edson, United States Embassy in Sana'a, Yemen, Stephen A. Seche. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in Opposition [6] to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Fatima Mohamed Yahya Ghazi, Samyah A. Ghazi, Yasser A. Ghazi. (Radtke, Stanley) (Filed on 9/3/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER exempting case from formal ADR process. re [8] Signed by Judge Illston on 8/15/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Clerks Notice
          CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2008 03:30 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/19/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Joint MOTION to Be Excused From the Formal ADR Process filed by Christina Poulos, United State Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Stephen A. Edson, United States Embassy in Sana'a, Yemen, Stephen A. Seche. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE by Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Stephen A. Edson, Stephen A. Seche of Unavailability (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Christina Poulos, United State Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Stephen A. Edson, United States Embassy in Sana'a, Yemen, Stephen A. Seche. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Dybdahl Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER continuing cmc to 9/12/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/16/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Stipulation
                    STIPULATION to Extend; Proposed Order by Christina Poulos, United State Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Stephen A. Edson, United States Embassy in Sana'a, Yemen, Stephen A. Seche. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 4/16/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2008 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2008. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2008)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fatima Mohamed Yahya Ghazi, Samyah A. Ghazi, Yasser A. Ghazi upon US Attorney's Office Civil Division. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2008 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) standing orders and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT (No Process) for declaratory and injunctive relief and for a writ in the nature of mandamus against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611016427.). Filed byFatima Mohamed Yahya Ghazi, Samyah A. Ghazi, Yasser A. Ghazi. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                              CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?