Volpicelli v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00548-RCJ -RAM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 2:24 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7426
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting # 52 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing : Status Conference set for 7/6/2015; time changed to 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 27 Motion for Relief from Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the 12 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Judgement is hereby entered in favor of the defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) Modified on 7/6/2011 (KO)to correct hyperlink.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 12 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED, the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall FILE the Complaint. This order granting in forma pauperis shall not extend to the issuance of subpoenas at government expense. FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk shall issue summons to defendant(s) and deliver to the USM for service. Clerk shall send plaintiff copies of the complaint and USM Form 285 for each defendant (ack'd). Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days to furnish USM the forms. Within twenty (20) days after receiving from the USM a copy of the USM-285 form showing whether service has been accomplished, plaintiff mustfile a notice with the court identifying which defendants were served and which were not serv ed. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of every pleading upon defendants. ( Notice of Compliance is due by 11/10/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) Modified on 10/21/2010 (MLC).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an Affidavit with this court providing further financial information in order for the court to rule on the 1 application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is to file the Affidavit with the Clerk on or before 4:00 P.M. on Friday, October 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 9/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 27 Motion for Relief from Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 60 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?