Gaft v. Equifax et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01941
District Judge Nina Gershon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Gaft, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaft, Mark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Gaft +1 646 404 2404

Toggle Switch Represented by Reitano, Spata & Yalcin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent F. Spata +1 718 236 7600 +1 718 236 7870 vfspata@gmail.com
v.
No Logo AAC, Defendant
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Express"
Officer/Director, Ids Financial Corp/mn/
Officer/Director, Concur Technologies, Inc.
No Logo Asset Accept, Defendant
No Logo Bombardier, Defendant
Equifax, Inc. Equifax, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Equifax"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. O'Reilly +1 212 649 4761 +1 212 333 5980 moreilly@gibbonslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Greenstein +1 404 815 9275 +1 404 541 3314 agreenstein@kilpatrickstockton.com
Experian Corporation Experian Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Experian"
No Logo First USA Bank, Defendant
No Logo Fleet CC, Defendant
Mitsubishi Corporation Mitsubishi Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitsubishi"

Toggle Switch Represented by Olshan, Grundman, Frome, Rosenzweig & Wolosky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Cavanaugh +1 973 335 7400 +1 973 335 8018 kcavanaugh@olshanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Meryl Green +1 212 451 2300 +1 212 451 2222 rgreen@olshanlaw.com
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors Credit Of America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Portfolio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winne Banta Hethrington Busralian & Kahn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Griff Chalier +1 201 487 3800 +1 201 487 8529 hchalier@winnebanta.com
No Logo Portfolio RC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winne Banta Hethrington Busralian & Kahn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Griff Chalier +1 201 487 3800 +1 201 487 8529 hchalier@winnebanta.com
No Logo Sherman Acquisition LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sherman Acquitions"

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Elliot +20333394 41x 332 5727 +1 203 333 1489 jelliot@znclaw.com
TransUnion Corporation TransUnion Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Transunion"

Toggle Switch Represented by Satzberg, Trichon, Kogan & Wertheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P. Creech +1 215 575 7600 +1 215 575 7688 tcreech@mstkw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 9/14/06 that the application of defendant Equifax Information Services LLC, dated 9/6/06, is granted as follows: The response in opposition filed by Equifax on 9/6/06, which is listed on the docket sheet as document number 60, is hereby stricken from the record. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the document from the public file and the docket sheet. ( Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 9/14/06 )(Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Order on Motion for More Definite StatementCourt Filing
    ORDER dated 9/5/06 that plaintiff's Rule 60(b) motion and belated application to reinstate this action are DENIED. ( Ordered by JudgeNina Gershon on 9/5/06 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Response in Opposition to Motion
      (SEALED)RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION for More Definite Statement pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the FRCP, filed Supplemental filed by Equifax. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Greenstein, Amy) Modified on 9/18/2006 (Guzzi, Roseann). **NOTE: these documents are now SEALED AND PLACED IN VAULT AS PER JUDGE GERSHON'S ORDER OF 9/14/06. Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2006 (Guzzi, Roseann). Modified on 9/18/2006 (Guzzi, Roseann). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Letter
        Letter of Opposition to Motion to Vacate by Mitsubishi Motors Credit of America, Inc.. (Wong, Christine) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Response in Opposition to Motion
          RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION for More Definite Statement pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the FRCP, filed filed by Equifax, Transunion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Release of Trans Union with Plantiff's notarized signature)(Creech, Timothy) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Motion for More Definite Statement
            MOTION pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the FRCP, filed by Mark Gaft. (Galeano, Sonia) Fwd. to USDJ Gershon. (Entered: 08/09/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
              ORDER OF DISMISSAL dated 3/27/06 that the action is discontinued with prejudice and without cost to any party, but with leave to re-open if the settlement agreement is not consummated and application for reinstatement is made within sixty days of the date of this order. ( Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 3/27/06 )(Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Letter
                  Letter to Discontinue Action by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Letter
                    Letter Dismissal Letter by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Letter
                      Letter of Settlement by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Creech on behalf of Transunion (Creech, Timothy) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Sherman Acquisitions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gershon, dated 2/2/06) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                            Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant Sherman Acquisitions. SO ORDERED. ( Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 2/3/06 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sherman Acquitions (Elliot, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Letter
                                Letter of Adjournment by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Letter
                                  Letter by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal against Mitsubishi Motors Credit. (Signed by Judge Gershon, dated 11/17/05) SO ORDERED. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal against defendants, Portfolio RC, First Bank USA, Asset Acceptance, and Bombardier. SO ORDERED (Signed USDJ Judge Gershon, dated 11/17/05) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                        Letter from Vincent Spata to Judge Gershon Regarding Mitsubishi. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                          Letter from Vincent F. Spata to Judge Gershon Regarding Dismissal of Bombardier, First bank USA, Mitsubishi, Portfolio and asset acceptance. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 36 Motion of Amy Greenstein for admission to practice pro hac vice. Ordered by JudgeMarilyn D. Go on 11/14/05. (DeVeaux, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Letter
                                              Letter from Debra Wabnik, Esq. to Hon. Nina Gershon Regarding request for pre-motion conference. (Wabnik, Debra) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Transunion.(Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 36 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Equifax. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 36 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Equifax. (O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Equifax. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Equifax.(O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Mark Gaft.(Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                            Letter from Jonathan D. Elliot to Magistrate Judge Go Regarding Notify court of settlement between plaintiff and Sherman Aquisition, LP. (Elliot, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to American Express. (Signed by Judge Gershon, dated 8/30/05) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by plaintiff Mark Gaft dismissing action with prejudice as to Bank of America, N.A., sued herein as Fleet CC. (Signed by Judge Gershon, dated 8/30/05) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Letter
                                                                  Letter from Vincent Spata to Magistrate Go Regarding Application for an Adjournment. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Sherman Acquitions.(Elliot, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Gaft. (Spata, Vincent) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Letter
                                                                          Letter from Steven S. Rand, Esq. to Honorable Marilyn D. Go Regarding extending the time of defendant Bank of America to respond to the complaint until September 6, 2005. (Rand, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Letter
                                                                            PLEASE DISREGARD THIS FILING. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. CORRECTED FILING TO FOLLOW. Letter from Steve S. Rand, Esq. to Honorable Marilyn D. Go, U.S.M.J. Regarding extending the time of Bank of America N.A., U.S.A. to respond to the complaint until September 6, 2005. (Rand, Steven) Modified on 8/5/2005 (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Filing Fee Received
                                                                              FILING FEE: $ 25.00, receipt number 313325 re: pro hac vice motion of David Israel. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Israel for defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. ( Ordered by JudgeMarilyn D. Go on 7/21/05 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Letter
                                                                                  Letter from Steven S. Rand to Honorable Marilyn D. Go, U.S.M.J. Regarding extending the time of defendant Bank of America, N.A., U.S.A. to respond to plaintiff's complaint to and including August 5, 2005. (Rand, Steven) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sherman Acquitions. (Elliot, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transunion. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Transunion.(Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Portfolio RC, Portfolio. (Weisgal, Helen) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Letter
                                                                                            Letter from Steven S. Rand to Honorable Marilyn D. Go Regarding extending the time of Bank of America N.A. to serve a response to the complaint until July 20, 2005. (Rand, Steven) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by JudgeMarilyn D. Go on 6/27/05. (Jackson, Ramona) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kathleen Cavanaugh by Mitsubishi. (Jackson, Ramona) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portfolio RC, Portfolio. (Weisgal, Helen) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER endorsed on letter dated 6/13/05 from Davin Z. Goldsztajn to Judge Gershon re: adjournment; application granted. Time to respond to the complaint is extended to 7/11/05. ( Ordered by Judge Marilyn D. Go on 6/14/05 )(Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Defend by Transunion. (Creech, Timothy) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE by Mitsubishi Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Green, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Mitsubishi.(Green, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Elliot on behalf of Sherman Acquitions (Elliot, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Disclosure of Interested Parties
                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Equifax.(O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                Equifax Information Services, L.L.C.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Equifax.(O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Portfolio RC, Portfolio.(Weisgal, Helen) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                    Letter dated 5/25/05 from Debra L. Wabnik, Esq. to USMJ Go, confirming that the initial conf. set for 6/15/05 has been adjourned to 7/11/05 at 10:00. (Permaul, Jenny) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: Initial conference scheduled for June 15, 2005 at 11:00 a.m. as per attached order. Ordered by Judge Marilyn D. Go on 5/23/05. (DeVeaux, Yvonne) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by First USA Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wabnik, Debra) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Disclosure of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by First USA Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wabnik, Debra) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Portfolio RC, First USA Bank, AAC, Asset Accept, Bombardier, American Express, Fleet CC, Equifax, Experian, Transunion, Mitsubishi, Sherman Acquitions, Portfolio $ 250, filed by Mark Gaft. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 300 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?