Berliner v. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-03152

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 31, 2016 at 1:12 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cynthia Berliner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LOUIS A. ZAYAS +1 201 295 9977 +1 201 295 9565 lzayas@zayaslawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Jetblue Airways Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G. Kelly +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 ckelly@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/16/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Tramontano +1 212 513 3598 +1 212 385 9010 christine.tramontano@hklaw.com
No Logo John Does 1-3, Defendant
No Logo Police Officers Matthew Walpole, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Gill Miller +1 212 435 3434 +1 212 435 3834 kmiller@panynj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Samuel Noren +1 212 435 3488 +1 212 435 3834 bnoren@panynj.gov
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Gill Miller +1 212 435 3434 +1 212 435 3834 kmiller@panynj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Port Authority Of Ny & Nj

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Samuel Noren +1 212 435 3488 +1 212 435 3834 bnoren@panynj.gov
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/14/11, before Judge Melancon. Court Reporter/Transcriber G. Rudolph, Telephone number 718-613-2538. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2012. (Rudolph, Gene) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Cynthia Berliner. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0207-5194201. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal) (Zayas, Louis) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
      Jury Instructions Marked as Court Exhibit 2. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 79 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
        JURY VERDICT FORM Marked as Court Exhibit 1. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
          EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            JUDGMENT in favor of defendant Matthew Walpole and against plaintiff Cynthia Berliner. Ordered by Visiting Judge VJ-Tucker L. Melancon on 11/14/2011. (Corey, Bruce) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Jury Selection held on 11/7/2011. Jury selection completed. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/6/2011, Entered: 11/6/2011 Exhibit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/6/2011, Entered: 11/6/2011 Proposed Voir Dire
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Proposed Voir Dire
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Order on Motion to Intervene
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Motion to Intervene
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Telephone Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Witness List
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Exhibit
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Exhibit
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Exhibit
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: 10/13/2011 Witness List
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Trial Brief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: 10/4/2011 Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Exhibit
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Telephone Conference
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Scheduling Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Telephone Conference
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Scheduling Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011 Transcript
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Scheduling Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Declaration
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011 Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Letter
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Clerks Judgment
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008 Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Letter
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008 Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?