USA v. Uba
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cr-00158-JW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo Nwadinaume Uba, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Humy +1 408 291 7753 nicholas_humy@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Jose
Filed 3/13/2008
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) Filing False Tax Return
Def Custody Status Released
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Status Conference from 8/25/2008 to 9/15/2008 as to Nwadinaume Uba re [12] Stipulation filed by Nwadinaume Uba. Status Conference set for 9/15/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Time excluded from 8/25/2008 to 9/15/2008. Signed by Judge Hon. James Ware on 8/11/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference; (Proposed) Order by Nwadinaume Uba (Humy, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/7/2008) Modified on 8/8/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Receipt
      Receipt# 54611003465 for Non-Cash Collateral received on 7/3/08. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BOND HEARING; ORDER re[10] as to Nwadinaume Uba. Bond Hearing set for 7/3/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/26/08. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008) Modified on 6/26/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Stipulation
          Stipulation to Continue Bond Hearing; Proposed Order by Nwadinaume Uba (Humy, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/25/2008) Modified on 6/26/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Bond HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Bail Review Hearing as to Nwadinaume Uba held on 5/29/2008 Further Bail Review Hearing set for 6/25/2008 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. If the property has been posted prior to that date the hearing will be vacated.(Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. James Ware:Status Conference as to Nwadinaume Uba held on 5/19/200. Status Conference set for 8/25/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Defendant's appearance previously excused from hearing. Time excluded from 5/19/2008 to 8/25/2008.(Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                NO Bail Warrant Returned Executed on 3/27/08 as to Nwadinaume Uba. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Receipt for Passport
                  Receipt#54611003025, US Passport#213557032, Receipted on 4/23/08 as to Nwadinaume Uba (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                    Rule 5(c)(3)Documents Received from USDC, Nevada, Las Vegas (A portion of the documents are in the sealed room) as to Nwadinaume Uba (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/22/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2008: # (1) Additional Rule 5 documents) (cfe, Court Staff).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nwadinaume Uba (1) 250,000 BOND secured by property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/22/08. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 CJA23 Submitted
                        CJA23 Submitted (From dkt#6) as to Nwadinaume Uba
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Detention Hearing as to Nwadinaume Uba held on 4/18/2008 Status Conference set for 5/19/2008 01:30 PM. (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2008)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Initial Appearance; Nicholas P. Humy present as to Nwadinaume Uba held on 4/14/2008, Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Nwadinaume Uba (1) Count 1-3 held on 4/14/2008. Detention Hearing set for 4/17/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Arrest
                              Arrest of Nwadinaume Uba (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/27/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Indictment
                                INDICTMENT as to Nwadinaume Uba (1) count(s) 1-3. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?