Felix v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00721
Magistrate Judge Allyne R. Ross, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 6:06 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony, Felix, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Dennis Houdek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Marinelli +1 212 822 1427 +1 718 624 4748 robmarinelli@gmail.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 Through 10, Defendant
No Logo Marlegni Joaquin-Reyes, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Damion Knights, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Shaunda Morales, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant John Doe, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 10 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Marlegni Joaquin-Reyes, Shaunda Morales, Damion Knights, City of New York. Dismissed with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross, undated ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of New York, Marlegni Joaquin-Reyes, Damion Knights, Shaunda Morales (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Settlement Conference held on 6/13/2012. SCHEDULING: The next telephone conference will be held on July 13, 2012, at 12:30 p.m. THE FOLLOWING RULINGS WERE MADE: The parties agreed to settle the case. If they file a stipulation of dismissal no later than July 11, 2012, I will cancel the conference scheduled above; otherwise, I direct the plaintiff's counsel to initiate the telephone conference call. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: May 8, 2012. Settlement Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via fax two business days in advance): June 7, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: June 29, 2012. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: July 31, 2012. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): September 14, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: October 12, 2012. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: December 28, 2012. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via fax two business days in advance): January 18, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: February 1, 2013. Joint pretrial order due by: 30 days after decision on anticipated summary judgment motion. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/8/2012. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 5/8/2012. SCHEDULING: (1) The next settlement conference will be held on June 7, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. (2) A status conference will be held on September 14, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. (3) A pretrial conference will be held on January 18, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. THE FOLLOWING RULINGS WERE MADE: (1) I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (2) No later than June 5, 2012, each party must submit by fax only (NOT by ECF) an ex parte statement of settlement position specifying the terms on which the party is willing to settle the case, whether those terms are negotiable, and an explanation of that position. These statements will be treated as confidential, and will not be docketed. Meaningful settlement discussions will occur at the next conference; clients or other persons with full settlement authority must be present or immediately available by telephone. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Felix. (Marinelli, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by City of New York. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on May 8, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than May 4, 2012, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/29/2012. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Anthony Felix. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 265 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?