Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
20882 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Jim Daloia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19627 , 19629 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent). (Attachments: # 1 Part 2# 2 Part 3# 3 Part 4# 4 Part 5# 5 Part 6)(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20881 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to AllowMotion of Representative Claimants Pursuant to F.R.B.P. 9014 Seeking Application of F.R.B.P. 7023 filed by Rene S. Roupinian on behalf of CYNTHIA SWABSIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Certificate of Service) (Roupinian, Rene) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20880 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62723 of Banesco Holdings CA Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20879 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62728 of Spring Star Corp. Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20878 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62727 of Portafolio De Inversiones C2-34, C.A. Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20877 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62726 of Credican, C.A. Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20876 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62724 of Bellair Development Group S.A Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20875 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62723 of Banesco Holdings CA Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20874 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Number 62728 of Spring Star Corp. Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20873 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 20847 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20872 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 20845 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20871 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 20828 ) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dakis, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20870 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 20722 , 20723 ) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dakis, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20869 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20787 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20868 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20782 , 20785 , 20773 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20867 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20866 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20865 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Inconsistent Debtor Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20864 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20863 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20862 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20731 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20861 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20860 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20859 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20850 ) filed by William J. Hine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Hine, William) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20858 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners [Epiq] (related document(s) 20836 ) filed by Lynn P. Harrison III on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Harrison, Lynn) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20857 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Lists for Nina M. Varughese, Esq. filed by Nina M. Varughese on behalf of EXXONMOBIL GAS MARKETING EUROPE LIMITED. (Varughese, Nina) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20856 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Preliminary Objection (related document(s) 19627 ) filed by Drew D. Hansen on behalf of Mason Capital Management LLC. (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20855 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Loyola Synfuels, LLC(Claim No.2415, Amount 4,385,383.43). To Dover Master Fund II, L.P.. filed by Dover Master Fund II, L.P., c/o Longacre Management, LLC.(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20854 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order : Notice of Filing of Settlement Agreements and Revised Proposed Order Relating to Debtors Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to Enter into Settlement with Bond Safeguard Insurance Company and Lexon Insurance Company (related document(s) 20355 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 2)# 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2)# 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2)# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4)(Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20853 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 11513 ) filed by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20852 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of John McCaughran QC (related document(s) 20851 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20851 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Seventy-Third Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20850 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Letter from Lehman Brothers Special Financing, Inc. to Honorable James M. Peck regarding discovery (related document(s) 20570 , 20588 , 20498 , 20730 , 20580 ) filed by William J. Hine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Hine, William) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20849 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policies filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/2/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20848 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Status Report : Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Establishing Procedures for the Debtors to Compromise and Settle Prepetition Claims Asserted by the Debtors Against Third Parties filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20847 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of Motion of Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Restructure its Interests in Italian Real Estate Fund (related document(s) 20311 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20846 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 15200 , 15202 ) filed by Jeffrey D. Vanacore on behalf of The Movants. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/9/2011, (Vanacore, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20845 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Joinder of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Debtors' Objection to Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay (related document(s) 20790 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20844 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeremy D. Weinstein filed by Seth H. Lieberman on behalf of Iberdrola Renewables Energies USA, Ltd., Iberdrola Renewables, Inc., fka PPM Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Lieberman, Seth) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20843 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20741 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20842 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Daniel S. Jo (related document(s) 20807 ) filed by Daniel S. Jo on behalf of James G. Lister. (Jo, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Limited Objection of Cascade Investment, L.L.C. to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by David B. Shemano on behalf of Cascade Investment, L.L.C.. (Shemano, David) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 19106 ) filed by Howard S. Beltzer on behalf of BNP Paribas. (Beltzer, Howard) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19109 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr Recovery ll-C LP to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19108 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr Recovery ll-B-LP to Debtors" One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19107 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr Recovery ll-A-LP to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement In Support Of Approval Of Debtors' Disclosure Statement For Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. And Its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant To Section 1125 Of The Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 18126 ) filed by Howard S. Beltzer on behalf of BNP Paribas. (Beltzer, Howard) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr Recovery 2004-3 LP to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr Recovery 2004-2 LP to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19103 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr Recovery 2004-1 LP to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 19072 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Zephyr 2004-4 LLC to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 18405 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Zephyr Recovery. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection of Linda Neufeld to the Debtors' Second Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Linda Neufeld. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19099 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow/Motion to Object to the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holding Inc and Request for Immediate Payment filed by Chris Stovic. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19098 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motions of Jason T. Taylor and Philip Walsh for a Determination that the Automatic Stay Does Not Apply or, Alternatively, for Relief from Automatic Stay with hearing to be held on 9/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 9/7/2011,. (Paduano, Anthony) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19097 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Fourth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Fourth Interim Application of Paul Hastings LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from February 1, 2011 Through May 31, 2011 for Paul Hastings LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$1062359.02, expenses: $12243.73. filed by Paul Hastings LLP. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19096 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19079 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19095 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19059 , 19058 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19094 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19023 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19093 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 28,402.00). To Jutta Kindor. filed by Jutta Kindor.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19092 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19034 , 19035 , 19031 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19091 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18993 , 18878 , 18992 , 18991 , 18884 , 18994 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19090 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): /Withdrawal of Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) filed by Stichting Waardedepot Finvestor.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19089 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion By Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc. for an Order (A) Compelling Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims and (B) Compelling the Debtors to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts or Alternatively Modifying the Automatic Stay to Permit Movants to Terminate the Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factivia, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19088 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim other than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co.KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 14,201.00). To Manuel Duerr. filed by Manuel Duerr.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19087 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No.15535, Amount $14,970,834.15). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19086 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No.13477, Amount $65,782,598.27). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4688 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Amended Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centro Inc(Claim No.1849, Amount 70.97). To Liquidity Solutions Inc.(related document(s) 4671 ) filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4687 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Amended Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Material Handling Group(Claim No.1375, Amount 21,770.24). To Liquidity Solutions Inc.(related document(s) 4647 ) filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4456 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report And Recommendation To The District Court For The Appointment Of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures For Electronic Data Rooms; And (III) An Order Modifying The June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order to October 19, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 4431 , 4436 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4455 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report And Recommendation To The District Court For The Appointment Of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures For Electronic Data Rooms; And (III) An Order Modifying The June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order to December 21, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 4454 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4454 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report And Recommendation To The District Court For The Appointment Of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures For Electronic Data Rooms; And (III) An Order Modifying The June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order to December 21, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 4290 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4453 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for October 14, 2011 filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4452 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for October 13, 2011 filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4451 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion In Support Of Seventh Application Of Trustee And Counsel For Interim Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses (related document(s) 4376 ) filed by Kevin H. Bell on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4450 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion In Support Of Applications Of International Special Counsel To Irving H. Picard, Trustee, For Interim Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses (related document(s) 4389 , 4381 , 4386 , 4380 , 4387 , 4382 , 4388 , 4383 , 4379 ) filed by Kevin H. Bell on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4449 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion in Support of Second Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, For Interim Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses filed by Kevin H. Bell on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4448 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal / WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION TO TRUSTEES PRODUCTION OF PJs (related document(s) 4444 ) filed by Steven G. Storch on behalf of PJ Administrator LLC. (Storch, Steven) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4447 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion In Support Of The Sixth Application of Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP, For Interim Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses (related document(s) 4391 ) filed by Kevin H. Bell on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4297 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for 8/5/2011 filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4296 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for 8/3/2011 filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4295 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 8/9/2011 Setting Time to Respond to Summons and Complaint for Foreign Defendants in Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc # 4268 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2705 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Transfer of Claim filed by Joseph E. Sarachek on behalf of Debt Acquisition Group FLA, LLC (related document(s) # 2582 ). (Sarachek, Joseph) Modified on 10/14/2011 (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2704 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses for Country Leasing Limited Partnership (related document(s) 2470 ) filed by Peter Alan Zisser on behalf of Country Leasing Limited Partnership. (Zisser, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2703 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Debtors' Objection to the Motion of U.S. Bank National Association for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim Pursuant to Secs. 365(d)(3) and 503 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2376 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2465 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Mabel Soto (related document(s) 2462 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2464 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation by and between FairPoint and Universal Service Administrative Company Resolving Certain Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 1794 , 1661 , 568 , 1811 , 1604 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 10/21/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 10/21/2011, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2364 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 2292 ) filed by Kevin Evont Bowens on behalf of AZ PAV, LLC. (Bowens, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2363 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Nineteenth Omnibus Notice of Rejection of Executory Contracts filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 10/26/2011, (Karotkin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2362 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/14/2011 Approving Stipulation and Agreement Between Debtors and Kathy Virginia Ray Partially Modifying Automatic Stay (Related Doc # 1867 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2361 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance / Notice of Substitution filed by David W. Parham on behalf of Credera Enterprises Company. (Parham, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2360 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Gia Wakil (related document(s) 2357 ) filed by J. Gregory Milmoe on behalf of Lojas Americanas S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courier Service List# 2 Exhibit B - FedEx Priority Service List)(Milmoe, J.) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2359 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Gia Wakil (related document(s) 2343 , 2342 ) filed by J. Gregory Milmoe on behalf of Lojas Americanas S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Same-Day Courier Service List# 2 Exhibit B - Electronic Mail Service List# (3) Exhibit C - First Class Mail Service List# 4 Exhibit D - ECF/PACER Notification Service List for the Objection of Lojas Americanas S.A.# 5 Exhibit E - ECF/PACER Notification Service List for the Declaration of Murilo Correa)(Milmoe, J.) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2358 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by David P. Foos on behalf of Nicolette Debibo. (Foos, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2309 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Joinder of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., et al., in Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Motions for Extension of Time to File Late Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 2307 ) filed by Abhilash M. Raval on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Raval, Abhilash) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2308 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration Declaration of Frederic F. Brace in Support of Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2307 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Motions for Extension of Time to File Late Proofs of Claim filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2306 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Amended Verified Statement of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019 (related document(s) 918 ) filed by Kristopher M. Hansen on behalf of Holders of the 5.125% Convertible Senior Notes Due 2011 and the 6.75% Convertible Senior Notes Due 2012. (Hansen, Kristopher) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2305 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Notice of Withdrawal (related document(s) 2304 ) filed by Karen L. Gilman on behalf of Lane Valley Road LLC. (Gilman, Karen) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2304 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of Lane Valley Road, LLC to Debtor's Motion Pursuant to Section 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Subleases on Non-Residential Real Property filed by Karen L. Gilman on behalf of Lane Valley Road LLC. (Gilman, Karen) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
2303 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., et al., Regarding Debtors' Second Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Their Exclusive Periods to File and Solicit Votes for a Chapter 11 Plan Pursuant to Section 1121(d) of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2269 ) filed by Abhilash M. Raval on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Raval, Abhilash) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2302 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of WE APP Ozone Park LLC to Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2271 ) filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of WE APP Ozone Park LLC. (Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2301 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of WE APP Ozone Park LLC. (Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2300 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Statement of Certain Holders of the Convertible Notes in Support of the Debtors Second Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Their Exclusive Periods to File and Solicit Votes for a Chapter 11 Plan Pursuant to Section 1121(D) of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2269 ) filed by Kristopher M. Hansen on behalf of Holders of the 5.125% Convertible Senior Notes Due 2011 and the 6.75% Convertible Senior Notes Due 2012. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 (check with court for location) (Hansen, Kristopher) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2299 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to File Under Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Facilities Maintenance Agreement Under Seal filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2298 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion (Limited) Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2271 ) filed by Robert L. LeHane on behalf of Developers Diversified Realty Corp.. (LeHane, Robert) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2196 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Declaration of Service (related document(s) 1908 ) filed by Aaron Hammer on behalf of SFN Professional Services LLC f/k/a Spherion Atlantic Enterprises LLC. (Hammer, Aaron) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2195 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Satisfaction of Claim #158 of City of Mesquite and Mesquite Independent School District filed by City of Mesquite/Mesquite I.S.D.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2194 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Satisfaction of Claim #167 of City of Mesquite and Mesquite Independent School District file by City of Mesquite/Mesquite I.S.D. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2193 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to File Proof of Claim After Claims Bar Date filed by Aaron Hammer on behalf of SFN Professional Services LLC f/k/a Spherion Atlantic Enterprises LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 9/13/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Proposed Order) (Hammer, Aaron) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2192 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Satisfaction of Claim #157 of City of Mesquite and Mesquite Independent School District filed City of Mesquite/Mesquite I. S. D. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2191 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Documents filed by Aaron Hammer on behalf of SFN Professional Services LLC f/k/a Spherion Atlantic Enterprises LLC. (Hammer, Aaron) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2190 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to AllowPermission to Tardily File Administrative Claim filed by Bradley S. Shraiberg on behalf of Alliance Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2189 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Bradley S. Shraiberg on behalf of Alliance Entertainment, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1497 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Courtney Spears - Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Lease Termination Agreements Between: (A) the Debtors and A/R Retail, LLC, Store 592 (Columbus Circle); and (B) the Debtors and the Port of Seattle, Store 756 (Seattle-Tacoma Intl Airport) and Debtors' Ex Parte Motion to Shorten the Notice Period with Respect to Debtors' Motion (related document(s) 1481 , 1483 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1496 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Rejection of Unexpired Leases filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1495 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Granting Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims: (I) Amended Claims, and (II) Wrong Case Claims (related document(s) 1161 ) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A TO THE ORDER# 3 Exhibit B TO THE ORDER)(Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1494 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims: Wrong Case Claims (related document(s) 1160 ) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A TO THE ORDER)(Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1493 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Limited Objection of Trends International LLC to the Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims: Wrong Case Claims (related document(s) 1463 ) filed by Mark Russell Owens on behalf of Trends International LLC. (Owens, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1492 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Granting Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims: Duplicate Claims (related document(s) 1159 ) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A TO THE ORDER)(Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1491 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims: Duplicate Claims filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A TO THE ORDER)(Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1490 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Fort Lee Plaza LLC's Limited Reply to the Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims (Duplicate Claims) & Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of Certain Claims (Wrong Case Claims) Relating to Claim Numbers 2720, 2721, 2722, 2723, 2810, 2811, 2812 and 2813 (related document(s) 1475 ) filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Fort Lee Plaza LLC. ( Donovan, J.) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1489 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Karen A. Gajewski on behalf of Allison F. Bryant. Filing fee collected, receipt #187407. (Cappiello, Karen) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1488 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda for August 10, 2011 Omnibus Hearing filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1487 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Filing of Modified Bid Procedures for Sale of Debtors' IP Assets filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1486 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 1485 ) filed by Erin L. Eliasen on behalf of Port of Seattle. (Eliasen, Erin) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1485 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Deanna Zachrisson in Support of Good Faith Findings in Proposed Order Authorizing Debtors to Enter Into Lease Termination Agreement With the Port of Seattle Concerning Store No. 756 (Seattle-Tacoma International Airport) (related document(s) 1401 ) filed by Erin L. Eliasen on behalf of Port of Seattle. (Eliasen, Erin) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1484 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 1475 ) filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Fort Lee Plaza LLC. ( Donovan, J.) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1483 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Shorten Time / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9006(c)(1) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 9077-1(b) to Shorten the Notice Period with Respect to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Sections 105(A) and 363(B)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code Approving Lease Termination Agreements Between: (A) The Debtors and A/R Realty, LLC, Store 592 (Columbus Circle); and (B) The Debtors and the Port of Seattle, Store 765 (Seattle-Tacoma Int'l Airport) (related document(s) 1481 ) filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Borders Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1463 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for August 10, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 1462 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
490 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Operating Report Reorganized Debtors' Quarterly Operating Report For The Period July 1, 2011 Through September 30, 2011 filed by John Longmire on behalf of EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC. (Longmire, John) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
489 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. Reorganized Debtors' Sixth Post-Confirmation Status Report filed by John Longmire on behalf of EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC. (Longmire, John) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
352 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing (related document(s) 348 , 350 , 347 , 349 ) filed by Holly Rai on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 11/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/1/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Rai, Holly) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
351 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 348 , 350 , 347 , 349 ) filed by Holly Rai on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Rai, Holly) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
350 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Freedman & Taitelman, LLP, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2010 to 8/31/2011, fee:$192,224.00, expenses: $31,105.92. filed by Freedman & Taitelman, LLP. with hearing to be held on 11/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 11/1/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Retention Order# 2 Exhibit B-Timesheets# 3 Exhibit B-Timesheets, Part 2# 4 Exhibit C-Expenses) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
349 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Final Professional Compensation /Commission Relating to Sale of Baccarat Crystal for David R. Maltz & Co., Inc., Auctioneer, period: to, fee:$460.00, expenses: $100.00. filed by Holly Rai. with hearing to be held on 11/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rai, Holly) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
348 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation for CBIZ Mahoney Cohen, Accountant, period: 12/1/2010 to 8/31/2011, fee:$38,709.00, expenses: $61.97. filed by Holly Rai. with hearing to be held on 11/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rai, Holly) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
347 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation for LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP, Trustee's Attorney, period: 12/1/2010 to 8/31/2011, fee:$365,865.00, expenses: $9,614.80. filed by Holly Rai. with hearing to be held on 11/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Certification# 2 Exhibits) (Rai, Holly) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eamon Mason of Order Granting the TSC Debtors Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim; and Notice of Filing Informal Responses Received in Connection with TSC Debtors Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 235 , 234 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (related document(s) 236 ) filed by Christopher J. Caruso on behalf of Aldo I. Perez. (Caruso, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
212 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claim of LOAR Corporate Servicing, Inc. (Claim No. 45) (related document(s) 171 ) filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Waterscape Resort LLC. (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
206 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to File Schedules. / Notice of Amendment to Debtor's Schedules filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Amended Schedule F)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation of Settlement filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Spitulation of Settlement)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Danielle Zahaba of Third Monthly Statement of Deloitte Tax LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Tax Services Provider to the TSC Debtors for the Period from June 1, 2011 through June 30, 2011; Disclosure Statement for the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Terrestar Corporation, Motient Communications Inc., Motient Holdings Inc., Motient License Inc., Motient Services Inc., Motient Ventures Holding Inc., MVH Holdings Inc., Terrestar Holdings Inc. and Terrestar New York Inc.; Notice of Hearing and Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement for the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of the TSC Debtors and (B) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures with Respect to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of the TSC Debtors; and Notice of Filing of Exhibits to the Disclosure Statement for the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Terrestar Corporation, Motient Communications Inc., Motient Holdings Inc., Motient License Inc., Motient Services Inc., Motient Ventures Holding Inc., MVH Holdings Inc., Terrestar Holdings Inc. and Terrestar New York Inc. (related document(s) 148 , 150 , 152 , 149 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve TSC Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the TSC Debtors' Management Compensation Program Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter regarding the recent announcenment regarding the debtor's stock as being worthless to it shareholders filed by Thomas L. Willis. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion REPLY OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (related document(s) 25 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Davis on behalf of David H Deming, Roberto G Mendoza. (Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Reply to Motion / Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Eugene Shanks, Jr. in Support of Motions to Dismiss (related document(s) 48 ) filed by Michael E. Wiles on behalf of Eugene Shanks, Jr.. (Wiles, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 93 ) filed by Scott A Ziluck on behalf of Robert C Merton. (Ziluck, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion Reply Brief In Support of Motion To Dismiss Adversary Complaint's Third and Fourth Causes of Action (related document(s) 96 ) filed by Paul A. Rachmuth on behalf of James McTaggart. (Rachmuth, Paul) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Reply to Motion / Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Adversary Complaint (related document(s) 22 ) filed by John G. Hutchinson on behalf of Jose Luis Daza. (Hutchinson, John) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion for Order Approving Debtors' Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 84 ) filed by Maureen T. Bass on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A.. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 8/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of Objection) (Bass, Maureen) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter filed by Jeffrey S. Davis on behalf of David H Deming, Roberto G Mendoza. (Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7012(b) (related document(s) 40 ) filed by Scott A Ziluck on behalf of Robert C Merton. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Ziluck, Scott) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement in Compliance with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7012(b) (related document(s) 77 , 22 ) filed by Lee Stein Attanasio on behalf of Jose Luis Daza. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attanasio, Lee) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1107256 (related document(s) 70 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the United States Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation / Third Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum of Law in Support of Citi Hedge Fund Services Ltd.'s Motion to Withdraw the Reference, dated October 14, 2011 (related document(s) 70 ) filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Jerilin Buzzetta in Support of Citi Hedge Fund Services Ltd.'s Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court, dated October 14, 2011 (related document(s) 70 ) filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibits B-I) (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Withdraw the Reference /Notice of Motion of Defendant Citi Hedge Fund Services Ltd. to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court, dated October 14, 2011 filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers, dated October 14, 2011 filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for September, 2011 filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Miller Cicero, LLC as Appraiser Nunc Pro Tunc to September 26, 2011 (Related Doc # 45 ) signed on 10/13/2011. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Counter Designation (appellee) / Trustee's Counter-Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal and Counter-Statement of the Issues to the Presented on Appeal (related document(s) 42 , 41 , 38 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Designating Email Address Upon Which to Serve Defendants filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Designating Email Address Upon Which to Serve Defendants filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(REVISED TO CORRECT DEBTOR'S ADDRESS) Request for 341(a) Notice with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/12/2011 at 02:30 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow/Motion of First Manhattan Developments REIT for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 543(d)(2), Excusing Receiver from Requirements Imposed by 11 U.S.C. Sections 543(a) and (b)(1) filed by Adam L. Rosen on behalf of First Manhattan Developments REIT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas P. Battistoni in Support of Motion# 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Battistoni - Appointment Order# 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Battistoni - Order Authorizing Retention of Property Manager) (Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 9077-1(a) in Support of Order Scheduling Expedited Hearing on Motion under 11 U.S.C. Section 543 filed by Adam L. Rosen on behalf of First Manhattan Developments REIT. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Hearing on Shortened Notice and Limiting Notice of Motion under 11 U.S.C. Section 543 in accordance with Local Rule 9006-1(b)) (Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |