Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Motion to Allow: Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Advancement of Defense Expenses Under the 2007-2008 Directors and Officers Insurance Policies by the Excess Policy Insurers filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 4# 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 4# 3 Exhibit A Part 3 of 4# 4 Exhibit A Part 4 of 4) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Motion to Approve Compromise : Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of a Settlement and Compromise with Danske Bank A/S filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/9/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Motion to Assume : Motion Pursuant to Sections 105, 363, and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code to Establish Procedures for the Consensual Amendment and Assumption of Certain Non-Terminated Prepetition Derivatives Contracts filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/9/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #42693 from Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Chase Lincoln First Commercial Corporation(Claim No. 67595). To Maximilian Partners, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Maximilian Partners, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #42693 from Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) /Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s and Creditors Committees Two Hundred Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to JPMorgans Asset Management Fund Claims (No Liability, Misclassified and Duplicative Claims) with hearing to be held on 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 12/9/2011, filed by James Tecce on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N)(Tecce, James) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21088 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (See Attachment for Amount) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Credito Emiliano SPA(Claim No. 62892). To Unione Di Banche Italiane S.C.P.A.. filed by Credito Emiliano SPA.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Second Supplemental Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 327(e) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure to Expand the Scope of Dechert LLP's Retention as Special Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to September 27, 2011 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/9/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/9/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21088 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:DCI Asset Management Ireland Limited,(Claim No.67595, Amount 21,146,424.00). To Chase Lincoln First Commercial Corporation. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of Chase Lincoln First Commercial Corporation.(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (See Attachment for Amount) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca di Credito Cooperative di Alba, Langhe....(Claim No. 48659). To Unione di Banche Italiane s.c.p.a. filed by Banca di Credito Cooperativo di Alba, Langhe e Roero s.c..(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Declaration : Supplemental Declaration of Samuel Lowenthal in Support of the Debtors' Application to Retain Deloitte Tax LLP as Tax Services Provider (related document(s) 7824 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Order Signed on 10/26/2011 Admitting Danielle Kennedy to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 21219 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Northwest Fund Limited(Claim No.67038, Amount $3,556,468.30); Northwest China Opportunities Fund Limited(Claim No.67039, Amount $2,097,549.55). To Deutsched Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No. 11308). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Order Signed on 10/26/2011 Admitting Bennett G. Young to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 21218 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No. 11307). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No. 11307). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced), Ltd(Claim No.42540, Amount $4,211,000.00); Gruss Global Investors Master Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.42540, Amount $3,789,000.00); Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced), Ltd(Claim No.42541, Amount $4,211,000.00); Gruss Global Investors Master Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.42541, Amount $3,789,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No. 11306). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No. 11306). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No. 11305). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Motion to Authorize : Motion of Bank of Taiwan, New York Branch, for an Order Authorizing Assignment of Certain Interests in a Promissory Note and Attendant Claims Against Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Bank of Taiwan, New York Branch. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order# 4 Notice) (Pasquale, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.42457, Amount 44,383.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.36069, Amount 7,519.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management(Claim No.38379, Amount 13,314.99). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.37617, Amount 7,500.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.37615, Amount 8,876.66). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.36359, Amount 7,300.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.40416, Amount 7,397.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21082 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21080 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21079 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Supplemental Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred and Eighty Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Supplemental Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred and Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Galostiftelsen(Claim No.47721, Amount 8,970,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Ostersjostiftelsen(Claim No.47719, Amount 60,099,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Quesada Irisfonden(Claim No.59457, Amount 3,555,555.55). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.64025, Amount 20,000,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Motion to Authorize / Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authority to Sell Interest in Rosslyn Syndication Partners JV LP filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 8/10/2011, (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Motion to Authorize / Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authority (I) to Create Two Auditable Credit-Worthy Guarantors, (II) to Contribute $50 Million to Each Such Entity, and (III) to Make Future Contribution of Up to $50 Million to Each Such Entity if Necessary filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 8/10/2011, (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Joint Motion to Approve / Joint Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., and James W. Giddens, as Trustee for Lehman Brothers Inc., Regarding Lehman Brothers Unclaimed Funds in Court Registry and Related Relief filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 8/10/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Notice of Appearance -Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Bryan R. Kaplan on behalf of CarVal Investors UK Limited. (Kaplan, Bryan) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PIMCO Cayman Japan CorePlus Fund(Claim No.25481, Amount 244,279.71). To PIMCO Cayman Japan CorePlus Seg. Portfolio. filed by PIMCO Cayman Japan CorePlus Seg. Portfolio.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Statement / Notice of Filing of Alvarez and Marsal North America, LLC's Eleventh Quarterly Report of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from March 1, 2011 Through May 31, 2011 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Giants Stadium LLC(Claim No.64071, Amount 301,804,617.14). To Bank of America, N.A.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Giants Stadium LLC(Claim No.64070, Amount 301,804,617.14). To Bank of America, N.A.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Order Signed on 7/26/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Fiftieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative Claims). (Related Doc # 17472 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Giants Stadium LLC(Claim No.64071, Amount 301,804,617.14). To Bank of America, N.A.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Giants Stadium LLC(Claim No.64070, Amount 301,804,617.14). To Bank of America, N.A.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/20/2011 2:03PM RE: Pre Trial Conference, Adv 09-01262, 11-01283 09-01480; Pre-Trial Conference and Debtors' Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding 11-01875. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/24/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veriotext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/1/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/25/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/24/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.59053, Amount 1,455,602.50). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.42610, Amount 901,763.50). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.41071, Amount 1,093,477.00). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.40951, Amount 532,537.50). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:VeriFone Systems, Inc.(Claim No.67555, Amount 9,000,000.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.37673, Amount 49,703.50). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.37205, Amount 475,733.50). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.37205, Amount 7,100.50). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.36860, Amount 78,105.50). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18745 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/20/2011 10:01AM RE: Debtor's Motion for Authorization to Terminate and Settle or Reject Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts fro which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief; Debtors' Motion to Amend the Order Establishing Procedures to (i) Restructure, (ii) make New or Additional Debt or Equity Investments in, and/or (iii) Enter Into Settlements and Compromises in Connection with Existing Real Estate Investments...et al..... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/19/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/28/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/11/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/22/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/19/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Operating Report REORGANIZED DEBTORS QUARTERLY POST-CONFIRMATION REPORT AND DISBURSEMENT SCHEDULE FOR THE QUARTER ENDING DECEMBER 31, 2010 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Operating Report REORGANIZED DEBTORS' QUARTERLY POST-CONFIRMATION REPORT AND DISBURSEMENT SCHEDULE FOR THE QUARTER ENDING SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Operating Report REORGANIZED DEBTORS' QUARTERLY POST-CONFIRMATION REPORT AND DISBURSEMENT SCHEDULE FOR THE QUARTER ENDING JUNE 30, 2010 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Operating Report REORGANIZED DEBTORS' QUARTERLY POST-CONFIRMATION REPORT AND DISBURSEMENT SCHEDULE FOR THE QUARTER ENDING MARCH 31, 2010 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Operating Report REORGANIZED DEBTORS' QUARTERLY POST-CONFIRMATION REPORT AND DISBURSEMENT SCHEDULE FOR THE QUARTER ENDING DECEMBER 31, 2009 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Operating Report REORGANIZED DEBTORS' QUARTERLY POST-CONFIRMATION REPORT AND DISBURSEMENT SCHEDULE FOR THE QUARTER ENDING SEPTEMBER 30, 2009 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Designation of Contents (appellant). Filed on behalf of Appellants Lemania SICA V-SIF, NBK Banque Prive S.A., National Bank of Kuwait S.A.K., Aozora Bank Ltd., Nicholas Rosamilia and a large group of other investors, Upstate New York Bakery Drivers and Industry Pention Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local 2 Annuity Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York, Health Benefit Fund, Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, Local No. 2, AFL-CIO, Building Trade Employers Insurance Fund, Central New York Laborers Annuity Fund, Central New York Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Central New York Laborers Pension Fund, Central New York Laborers Training Fund, Construction Employers Association of CNY, Inc., Construction and General Laborers' Local No. 633, AFL-CIO, Engineers Joint Welfare Fund, Engineers Joint Training Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 43 and Electrical Contractors Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 43 and Electrical Contractors Welfare Fund, plus remaining ones listed on document as this field is full. (related document(s) 4242 , 4228 , 4235 , 4251 , 4240 , 4213 , 4229 , 4221 , 4232 , 4216 , 4218 , 4258 , 4222 , 4215 , 4249 , 4225 , 4212 , 4233 , 4238 , 4230 , 4219 , 4220 , 4259 , 4223 , 4237 , 4226 , 4224 ) filed by Richard A. Cirillo on behalf of Lemania SICAV-SIF, NBK Banque Privee (Suisse) SA, National Bank of Kuwait, S.A.K.. (Cirillo, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/12/2011 10:07AM RE: Motion an Order Approving an Initial allocation of Property to the Fund of Customer Property and Authorizing an Interim Distribution to Customers. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/11/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/20/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/15/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/11/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on June 28, 2011 10:08 RE: Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Approving Settlements Between the Debtors and the BLMIS Trustee. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/6/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/15/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/8/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/6/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
AMENDED Order signed on 10/26/2011 Enforcing the Lease Rejection Order, Compelling Subtenant to Vacate the Premises and Granting Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 2458 , 1616 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Second Interim Application of FTI Consulting, Inc. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from February 1, 2011 Through April 30, 2011 (related document(s) 2395 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2398 ) filed by Karel S. Karpe on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. and its various subsidiaries and affiliates. (Karpe, Karel) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Response LIMITED OBJECTION AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS OF YAHOO! INC. TO NINETEENTH OMNIBUS NOTICE OF REJECTION OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS (DOCKET NO. 2363) filed by Karel S. Karpe on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. and its various subsidiaries and affiliates. (Karpe, Karel) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Declaration Declaration of Todd Brents in Support of FairPoint's Omnibus Objections to Claims (related document(s) 2389 , 2391 , 2390 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) -FairPoint's Eighty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims ((A) Claims Satisfied by Cure Scheduled Only Liabilities Claims, (B) Claims Satisfied by Cure, (C) Claims to Be Reduced and Allowed, (D) No Basis in Books and Records, (E) No Basis and Late Filed Claims, and (F) Amended Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 8/18/2011, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) -Fairpoint's Eighty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Satisfied By Cure Scheduled Only Liabilities) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 8/18/2011, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) -FairPoint's Eighty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Satisfied by Cure Scheduled Only Liabilities) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 8/18/2011, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Application of Public Service Company of New Hampshire for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expenses (related document(s) 2240 ) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Public Service Company of New Hampshire ('PSNH"). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2384 ) filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of FairPoint Litigation Trust. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2383 ) filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of FairPoint Litigation Trust. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Motion (with Motion) Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 to Approve a Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving the Adversary Proceeding Commenced by John DeGroote Services, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee, against American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (related document(s) 2179 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): by Notice (Claim No. 334) filed by Brett D. Goodman on behalf of Federal Insurance Company LLC.(Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): by Notice (Claim No. 333) filed by Brett D. Goodman on behalf of Federal Insurance Company LLC.(Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): by Notice (Claim No. 332) filed by Brett D. Goodman on behalf of Federal Insurance Company LLC.(Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Notice of Agenda - Agenda for Hearing on November 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Notice of Hearing / NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING (related document(s) 897 ) filed by Jonathan M. Landers on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Landers, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Notice of Dismissal Re: Defendant Ingalls & Snyder LLC filed by Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross on behalf of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for Period July 1, 2010 Through July 31, 2010 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for Period June 1, 2010 Through June 30, 2010 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for Period May 1, 2010 Through May 31, 2010 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for Period April 6, 2010 Through April 30, 2010 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Monthly Operating Report (Bozel, LLC) for Period September 1, 2011 Through September 30. 2011 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for Period September 1, 2011 Through September 30, 2011 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/26/2011, Establishing Procedures For The Protection Of Confidential Information. (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Amended Notice of Hearing to Consider Fee Applications (related document(s) 226 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2011 (check with court for location) (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/25/2011 10:15AM RE: Debtor's Objection to Claim Number Two Filed by Edward Don & Company, Inc; Debtor's Objection to Claim Number Twernty-Two Filed by Canon Financial Services, In; Debtor's Objection to Claim Number Thirty Filed by De La Large Landen Financial Services, Inc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/24/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/2/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/28/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/24/2012. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Agreed Order signed on 10/25/2011 Recharacterizing Claim of Park Avenue Building & Roofing Supplies, LLC (Claim No. 34). (related document(s) 168 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of David C. Cooper of the Debtor's Reply to Objection of First Manhattan Developments REIT to Debtor's Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of The Weitzman Group, Inc. as Real Estate and Financial Consultant to The Debtor nunc pro tunc to September 27, 2011 (related document(s) 68 ) filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement of Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citicorp North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited, dated July 26, 2011. filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citibank North America, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Citibank N.A., Citicorp North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited's Motion to Dismiss the Trustee's Complaint, dated July 26, 2011 (related document(s) 19 ) filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citibank North America, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference (related document(s) 4 , 1 , 11 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Letter to the Honorable James M. Peck regarding removal of State Court Action (related document(s) 14 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Hobart Truesdell, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference (related document(s) 4 , 1 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendant (related document(s) 1 , 3 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 07/26/2011)