Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Letter /Trustee's Supplemental Letter Regarding Confidentiality Designations Affecting The Trustee's Extraterritoriality Submission (related document(s)92) Filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)94) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Conference on Trustee's Letter regarding Confidentiality Designations Affecting the Trustee's Extraterritoriality Submission (related document(s)92) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)92) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
Letter Regarding Confidentiality Designations Affecting The Trustee's Extraterritoriality Submission Filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
Supplemental Memorandum of Law Consolidated Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of The Transferee Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based on Extraterritoriality Motion filed by Bruce M Ginsberg on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund. (Ginsberg, Bruce) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
Supplemental Memorandum of Law Consolidated Supplemental Memorandum of Law In Support of The Transferee Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based On Extraterritoriality Motion filed by Bruce M Ginsberg on behalf of Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank. (Ginsberg, Bruce) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
Supplemental Memorandum of Law Consolidated Supplemental Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Transferee Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Based On Extraterritoriality Motion filed by David Y. Livshiz on behalf of Tensyr Limited. (Livshiz, David) (Entered: 01/01/2015)
So Ordered Order Signed On 12/10/2014, Re: Concerning Further Proceedings On Extraterritoriality Motion And Trustees Omnibus Motion For Leave To Replead And For Limited Discovery (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)85) Filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery and Opportunity for Hearing (related document(s)75) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with presentment to be held on 12/10/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/5/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)83) filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Statement /Trustee's Statement Regarding Amendments to Exhibits to Proposed Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery (related document(s)75) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 4) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to May 20, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Response to Limited Objections to Proposed Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery (related document(s)80) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Response - Trustee's Response to Limited Objections to Proposed Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery (related document(s)75) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 11/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)78) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Notice of Hearing on Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery and Opportunity for Hearing (related document(s)75) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 11/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)75) filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery and Opportunity for Hearing filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)73) filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)71) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
Letter /October 2, 2014 Letter to Judge Bernstein regarding Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and Defendants' Request for Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion (related document(s)67) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)68, 67, 69) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Declaration of Regina Griffin in Support of the Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and Court Order Authorizing Limited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) (related document(s)68, 67) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 10/22/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Memorandum of Law /Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and Court Order Authorizing Limited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) (related document(s)67) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Motion to Allow/Notice of Motion for Leave to Replead Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and Court Order Authorizing Limited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff with hearing to be held on 10/22/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to December 17, 2014 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference Rescheduled to January 29, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference Rescheduled for November 20, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)52) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Continued Hearing for Matters Scheduled to be Heard on May 30, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)50) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Continued Hearing filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to December 19, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Affidavit of Service of Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)47) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
Notice of Withdrawal / Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)43) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)45) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Notice of Withdrawal /Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)42) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Affidavit of Service Order To Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Required To Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures Or To Provide Immediate Notice Of Certain Adversary Proceedings entered by the Court on May 8, 2012 (related document(s)40, 41, 42, 39, 43) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Order signed on 5/8/2012 to show cause why defendants should not be required to make expedited limited initial disclosures or to provide immediate notice of certain adversary proceedings with hearing to be held on 5/16/2012 at 10:00AM in courtroom 623. (BRL) (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Notice of Proposed Order /[Proposed] Order To Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Required To Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures Or To Provide Immediate Notice Of Certain Adversary Proceedings (related document(s)39) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Affidavit of Torello H. Calvani in Support of the Trustees Application by Way of Order to Show Cause Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures, Or to Provide Immediate Notice of Certain Adversary Proceedings (related document(s)39) filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Trustees Application by Way of Order to Show Cause Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures, Or to Provide Immediate Notice of Certain Adversary Proceedings (related document(s)39) filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit C# 3 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Motion to Approve Application by Way of Order to Show Cause Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures, Or to Provide Immediate Notice of Certain Adversary Proceedings filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to September 20, 2012 filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
Stipulation Extending the Trustee's Time to Respond to Defendant Tensyr Limited's Motion to Dismiss and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1109501 (related document(s)32) filed by Clerk's Office of the United States Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s)32) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Natixis' Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court (related document(s)32) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Declaration of Joseph Cioffi in Support of Natixis' Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court (related document(s)32) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2) (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)23) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
(This document is unsealed pursuant to an order signed on 4/12/2011 in lead case number 08-1789 and is now available for view) Complaint against Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc., Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Tensyr Limited. Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Murphy, Keith) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2011 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE AFFIDAVIT OF SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP AS SPECIAL COUNSEL TO THE DEBTORS PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 327(e) AND 328(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE AND RULE 2014 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE filed by Peter V. Pantaleo on behalf of Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP. (Pantaleo, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Claims Hearing on October 27, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Wilhelm & Ingrid Bruns(Claim No.59259, Amount 624,184.00); Ingrid Bruns(Claim No.59260, Amount 85,116.00). To Bethmann Bank AG. filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Two Hundred Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Insufficient Documentation Claims) as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Nos. 25448 and 25233 on behalf of COLORADO HOUSING & FINANCE AUTHORITY filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation Resolving Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Stay and Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/31/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Statement / Notice of Filing of Alvarez and Marsal North America, LLCs Twelfth Quarterly Report of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from June 1, 2011 Through August 31, 2011 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sparkasse Oberhessen(Claim No.60631, Amount 5,716,014.03). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sparkasse Wetzlar(Claim No.60631, Amount 825,876.49). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21046 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Portafolio de Inversiones(Claim No.62727, Amount 15,427,500.00). To Brooke Financial Services Ltd.. filed by Christy Rivera on behalf of Brooke Financial Services Ltd..(Rivera, Christy) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/05/2011 10:06AM RE: Debtor's One Hundred Seventy-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims ( No Liability Derivatives Claims) Debtors' One Hundred Eightieth Objection to Claims( Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims)...et al..... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/19/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 19401 , 16867 , 19399 , 19381 , 19396 , 18444 , 19377 , 19390 , 19386 , 17468 , 19391 , 12533 , 19392 , 16860 , 19387 , 19378 , 19400 , 19393 , 19398 , 9656 , 19384 , 19397 , 18407 , 19383 , 19388 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/28/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/21/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/19/2012. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/19/2011 10:02AM RE: Debtor's Motion for Approval of a Settlement Agreement Among ESP Funding I, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, BNP Paribas, Natixis Financial Products LLC, Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc., and Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc; Debtors' Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreements with (i) Bank of America, N.A and (ii) Merrill Lynch International and Its Affiliates..et al..... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/19/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/28/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/21/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/19/2012. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response of Claimant Banca di Credito Cooperativo di Roma Societa Cooperativa to Debtors' Notice of Allowed Claim Amount; Claim Number 58222 filed by Lorraine S. McGowen on behalf of Banca di Credito Cooperativo di Roma Societa Cooperativa. (McGowen, Lorraine) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response of ICCREA Banca S.p.A. to Debtors' Notice of Allowed Claim Amount; Claim Number 58221 filed by Lorraine S. McGowen on behalf of ICCREA Banca S.p.A.. (McGowen, Lorraine) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.67078, Amount 1,360,796.77). To Fir Tree Capital Opportunity Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Joseph G. Minias on behalf of Fir Tree Capital Opportunity Master Fund, L.P..(Minias, Joseph) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Debtors' Two Hundred Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow And Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claim, In re: Claim No. 41133 (related document(s) 20103 ) filed by Alberto M. Borrino. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.(Claim No.66108, Amount 10,750,000.00). To Stone Lion Portfolio, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.(Claim No.66107, Amount 10,750,000.00). To Stone Lion Portfolio, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Order signed on 10/25/2011 Granting Application for Allowance of Interim Compensation for the period of June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 and Reimbursement of Expenses for Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, fees awarded: $3,503,744.65, expense awarded: $787,642.86. (Related Doc # 13493 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CFIP Master Fund(Claim No.66600, Amount $20,843,820.00); CFIP Master Fund(Claim No.66601, Amount $20,843,820.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Bank Leumi Le-Israel B.M.(Claim No.35943, Amount 130,000); Bank Leumi Le-Israel B.M.(Claim No.35942, Amount 130,000). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A,. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Opposition to Debtor's One Hundred Ninety-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Debtor Claims) (related document(s) 19880 ) filed by Tal Unrad on behalf of Year Up, Inc.. (Unrad, Tal) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response of SCOR Reinsurance Company to Notice of Proposed Claim Amount Regarding Claim Number 20293 filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of SCOR Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 10/25/2011 Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and the Estate of Fannie Marie Gaines Providing for Limited Relief From the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 20835 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Partial Transfer) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:GEO High Income I Ltd.(Claim No.2419, Amount $17,076.072.82); Treasury Services SA(Claim No.2425, Amount $5,361,381.18). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Order Signed on 10/25/2011 Denying Motion of Deutsche Bank AG to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Reclassify Claims. (Related Doc # 20321 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Compound Claims), In re: Claim No. 18087 (related document(s) 19714 ) filed by Karen M. Simon Krieger. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Debtors' Two Hundredth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims), In re: Claim No. 66885 (related document(s) 19921 ) filed by John P. Christian on behalf of John Rosekrans. (Attachments: # 1 continuation of exhibits) (Lopez, Mary) Modified on 10/25/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Danielle Kennedy on behalf of Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance CO. Ltd., an SPV Derivatives Counterparty. Filing fee collected, receipt #187916. (Dawes, Jeanelle) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Bennett G Young on behalf of Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance CO. Ltd., an SPV Derivatives Counterparty. Filing fee collected, receipt #187915. (Dawes, Jeanelle) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Paul jasper on behalf of Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance CO. Ltd., an SPV Derivatives Counterparty. Filing fee collected, receipt #187917. (Dawes, Jeanelle) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Compound Claims), In re: Claim No. 18087 (related document(s) 19714 ) filed by Karen M. Simon Krieger. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response on Why Claim No. 20183 Should not be Reclassified, and Request to Appear at Hearing Telephonically, filed by Cory Wishengrad. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Disallowance and Expungement of Claim No. 10424, Claimant: A.M. Best Company, filed by Michalina Del Rio. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Ninety-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Debtor Claims), In re: Claim No. 12081 (related document(s) 19880 ) filed by Michelle M. Newhouse. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Response to Debtors' Two Hundredth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims), In re: Claim No. 19570 (related document(s) 19921 ) filed by Owen H. Joiner, Owen Joiner. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.64025, Amount 20000000). To CVF Lux Securities Trading Sarl. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Riehl, Abigail) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Motion to Appoint : Debtors' Motion for Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b), and 1142(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Appointing the Director Selection Committee, Approving Retention of Korn/Ferry International by LBHI as Such Committees Executive Search Advisors, and Granting Certain Related Relief filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/9/2011, (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20909 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim Number 29702 filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Order Signed on 10/20/2011 Admitting Jordan Connors to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 20590 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Order Signed on 10/20/2011 Admitting Justin A. Nelson to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 20589 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Eightieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Twentieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Ninety-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #55854 from Yorvik Partners LLP to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #55854 from Yorvik Partners LLP to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Response of Skandinaviska Enskilda Banken AB to the Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19817 ) filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Skandinaviska Enskilda Banken AB. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Response of Skandinaviska Enskilda Banken AB to the Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Skandinaviska Enskilda Banken AB. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Ninety-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Amended Response to Motion of Debtors to Reclassify Claims 3373 and 3374 (Debtor's 130th Omnibus Objection) filed by Robert N. Michaelson on behalf of Henry Morgan Lawrence III. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Michaelson, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Ninety-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Habib Bank AG Zurich(Claim No.42693, Amount 3,024,000.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Eighty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to Investcorp Interlachen Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20886 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20914 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank Hapoalim B.M.(Claim No.55854, Amount 2,880,000.00). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims) as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Order Signed on 10/20/2011 Admitting Jeremy D. Weinstein to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 20844 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Granting Insured Persons' Motion for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policy to Settle the California Municipalities Actions. (Related Doc # 20310 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Statement AGENDA FOR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 26, 2011 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Motion to Approve Abandonment of Property (This administrative entry was entered to reflect the accurate docket code) (related document(s)4552) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Motion to Approve /Trustee's Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Notice Procedures filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Marc J. Kurzman on behalf of Orthopaedic Specialty Group P.C. Plan Participants. (Kurzman, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Certificate of Service of Motion of Daniel G. Kamin Gardiner LLC for (I) Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 356(d)(3) and 503(B)(1)(A); and/or (II) Turnover of Non-Debtor Property Wrongfully Retained by the Estate (related document(s) 2742 , 2741 ) filed by Jordan S. Blask on behalf of Daniel G. Kamin Gardiner LLC. (Blask, Jordan) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Motion to Approve Motion of Daniel G. Kamin Gardiner LLC for (I) Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§356(d)(3) and 503(B)(1)(A); and/or (II) Turnover of Non-Debtor Property Wrongfully Retained by the Estate (related document(s) 2741 ) filed by Jordan S. Blask on behalf of Daniel G. Kamin Gardiner LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 11/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Proposed Order) (Blask, Jordan) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Notice of Hearing Motion of Daniel G. Kamin Gardiner LLC for (I) Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§356(d)(3) and 503(B)(1)(A); and/or (II) Turnover of Non-Debtor Property Wrongfully Retained by the Estate filed by Jordan S. Blask on behalf of Daniel G. Kamin Gardiner LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 11/7/2011, (Blask, Jordan) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Eighth Monthly Fee Statement of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Independent Auditor and Tax Advisor for the Debtors, for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from September 1, 2011 through September 30, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLC. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Ninth Monthly Fee Statement Submitted In Compliance With Order Establishing Procedures For Interim Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses For Professionals For The Period September 1, 2011 Through September 30, 2011 filed by Michael Earl Comerford on behalf of FTI Consulting, Inc.. (Comerford, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Motion to Compel /Claimant's Motion for an Order Requiring Debtor to Produce Claimant's Accident Report, Rug and Surveillance Security Video Camera Tape filed by Tanit Buday. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Office (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Motion for Relief from Stay with supporting Memorandum of Law, Exhibits (including proposed order) and Declaration of Service filed by Mark T. Sadaka on behalf of Jami Foschini. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Filing fee collected, receipt #45063. (Claire Logue Togher) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Prevailing Eastern Time filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Objection to Motion /Debtors' Objection to the Motion of U.S. Bank National Association for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim Pursuant to Secs. 365(d)(3) and 503 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2703 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Order Approving Consensual Extension of the Deadline Under § 365(d)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2375 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: Amundi Alternative Investments, LLC. filed by Matthew W. Olsen on behalf of Fund 15. (Olsen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Objection to Motion / Reorganized Debtors' Objection To The Motion of Carlos Gonzalez For Relief From The Automatic Stay, Enforcing The Plan Provisions or Modifying The Discharge Injunction To Permit Movant To Proceed Against The Insurance Policies Covering Movant's Personal Injury Claims And For Reconsideration of The Movant's Proof of Claim (related document(s) 482 ) filed by John Longmire on behalf of EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Longmire, John) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service Regarding Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement Of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Counsel For Debtors And Debtors In Possession, For Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses and Fourteenth Statement of Fees and Disbursements of BDO Consulting Corporate Advisors, LLC for the Period September 1, 2011 Through September 30, 2011 (related document(s) 339 , 340 ) filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Eighth Monthly Fee Statement of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP for Interim Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Services Rendered During the Period from September 1, 2011 through September 30, 2011 filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for the Period from September 1, 2011 to September 30, 2011 filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eamon Mason - Notice of Presentment of Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 107(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 Establishing Procedures for the Protection of Confidential Information; [Proposed] Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 107(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 Establishing Procedures for the Protection of Confidential Information (related document(s) 240 , 239 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Statement Fee Statement of Schiff Hardin LLP from September 1, 2011 through September 30, 2011 filed by Alyson M. Fiedler on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Fiedler, Alyson) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Statement /Fee Statements of Troutman Sanders LLP, Counsel to the Debtor, for the Month of September 2011 filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Waterscape Resort LLC. (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for SilvermanAcampora LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 1/25/2011 to 10/12/2011, fee:$264,100.50, expenses: $1,719.80. filed by Adam L. Rosen, SilvermanAcampora LLP. with hearing to be held on 11/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 11/8/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Category List# 2 Exhibit B - Professionals List# 3 Exhibit C - Disbursements List# 4 Exhibit D - Invoices - Part 1 of 2# 5 Exhibit D - Invoices - Part 2 of 2# 6 Exhibit E - Attorney Certification# 7 Appendix Affidavit of Service) (Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to June 27, 2012 (related document(s) 59 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Stipulation / Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Tensyr Limited filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 23 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Application for an Order Authorizing Procedures for Payment of Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Pursuant to General Order of the Bankruptcy Court and 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 331 (related document(s) 22 ) filed by Robert D. Raicht on behalf of Contest Promotions-NY LLC. with presentment to be held on 11/7/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/31/2011, (Raicht, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Motion to Approve Application for an Order Authorizing Procedures for Payment of Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Pursuant to General Order of the Bankruptcy Court and 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 331 filed by Robert D. Raicht on behalf of Contest Promotions-NY LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Raicht, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2011)