Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Affidavit of Service of Angharad Bowdler of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19627 , 21254 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit First Supplemental Declaration of Dean A. Ziehl in Support of the Retention by the Debtors, Pursuant to Section 327(e) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP as Special Counsel filed by Maria A. Bove on behalf of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Bove, Maria) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Statement In Support Of Confirmation And Consummation Of Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. And Its Affiliated Debtors (related document(s) 19627 ) filed by Brian Trust on behalf of Societe Generale Asset Management Banque, Societe Generale Bank & Trust, Societe Generale. (Trust, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Two Hundred Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow and Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claims (related document(s) 20106 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RBS Securities Inc.(Claim No.36769, Amount 3,925,386.88). To The Royal Bank of Scotland plc. filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of The Royal Bank of Scotland plc.(Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21431 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21439 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Ninety-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims), In re: Claim Nos. 24700 and 24701 filed in case 08-13893 (related document(s) 19903 ) filed by Cory Thabit. (Lopez, Mary) correct PDF File attachment(s) added on 11/3/2011 (Bush, Brent). Filing Date Modified on 11/3/2011 (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Order Reinstating Claim (related document(s) 17369 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/14/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/10/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Objection Limited Objection to Proposed Assumption of Executory Contracts (related document(s) 21254 ) filed by Charles Martin Tatelbaum on behalf of GMAC Mortgage, LLC. (Tatelbaum, Charles) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Highland Credit Strategies Master Fund, L.P.(Claim No.13206, Amount $4,132,000.00); Highland Credit Strategies Master Fund, L.P.(Claim No.16840, Amount $4,132,000.00); Regiment Capital Ltd.(Claim No.21720, Amount $17,500,000.00); Regiment Capital Ltd.(Claim No.21721, Amount $17,500,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 21479 ) filed by Risa M. Rosenberg on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Rosenberg, Risa) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Certificate of Service Of Motion For Entry Of An Order To Lift The Automatic Stay To Permit Assertion Of Counterclaims And Third-Party Claims Against Debtor Lehman Brothers Holding, Inc., In Pending State Court Litigation Commenced By The Debtor; and Declaration Of Todd E. Soloway In Support Of Motion (related document(s) 21438 , 21440 ) filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Jonathan J. Breene, John P. Conroy, NC Land Corporation, Setai (Turks & Caicos) Ltd., Setai Group, LLC. (Fleischer, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Objection to Debtors' Two Hundred Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow and Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claim, In re: Claim No. 36479 (related document(s) 20102 ) filed by Fritz Leisse. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Statement / Notice of ADR Procedures and Scheduling of Claims Objection Hearing with Respect to Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim No. 28487 and 28488 (related document(s) 19378 ) filed by Benjamin Rosenblum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rosenblum, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21412 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Objection /Appeal Against Decision In re: Debtors' Two Hundred Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow and Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claim, In re: Claim No. 36481 (related document(s) 20102 ) filed by Johanna Leisse. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21411 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Two Hundred Twenty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 20861 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (See Attachment for Amount) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 59233). To Dexia Private Bank (Switzerland) Ltd. filed by Dexia Private Bank (Switzerland) Ltd.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No.59233, Amount 2,650,000.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Ninety-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims), In re: Claim No. 24130 filed in 08-13893, (related document(s) 19903 ) filed by Chris Westfahl. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Response to Debtors' Two Hundred and Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow and Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claim, In re: Claim No. 25478 (related document(s) 20107 ) filed by Stephen C. Restelli. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Compound Claims), (related document(s) 19714 ) filed by Brian Monahan. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Response to Debtors' Two Hundred Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow and Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claim, In re: Claim No. 50393 (related document(s) 20104 ) filed by Regina Hernandez Tercero, Jaime Hernandez Gallego. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 21409 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service for November 3, 2011 (Related to Claim Transfer Numbers T000185, T000192 and T000194 filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service Motion to Approve Trustee's Motion for Entry of Litigation Protective Order (related document(s) 3928 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Andrew J. Ehrlich on behalf of Estate of Mark D. Madoff and Andrew H. Madoff, individually and as Executor of the Estate of Mark D. Madoff. (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving the Retention of Browne Jacobson LLP as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 27, 2011 (related document(s) 4489 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Mailing (Related to Claim Transfer Number T000189) filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Mailing of Notice of Trustees Motion and Trustees Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Notice Procedures (related document(s) 4469 ) filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report And Recommendation To The District Court For The Appointment Of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures For Electronic Data Rooms; And (III) An Order Modifying The June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order and Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 4316 , 4290 , 4291 , 4454 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report And Recommendation To The District Court For The Appointment Of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures For Electronic Data Rooms; And (III) An Order Modifying The June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order and Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 4316 , 4290 , 4291 , 4454 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Partial Withdrawal Of Objection (related document(s) 2451 , 2388 ) filed by Steven Bergman on behalf of Harriet Bergman. (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Order signed on 10/27/2011. Re: Granting Supplemental Authority To Stipulate To Extensions Of Time To Respond And Adjourn Pre-Trial Conferences. (related document(s) 3058 , 3141 , 4158 ) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Enter into Certain Securities Purchase Agreements for a $490 Million New Capital Investment and (B) Pay Certain Fees in Connection Therewith, Each to Support Debtors' Plan of Reorganization filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Ex Parte Motion to Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Seal Portions of Their Securities Purchase Agreements filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion to Shorten the Notice Period for Hearing on Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Enter into Certain Securities Purchase Agreements for a $490 Million New Capital Investment and (B) Pay Certain Fees in Connection Therewith, Each to Support Debtors' Plan of Reorganization filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Response / Debtors' Response to the Insurance Related Objections of Gator Monument Partners LLP, Gator South Avenue Partners, Ltd., and Gator Garwood Partners, Ltd to Debtors' Motion to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property [REDACTED] (related document(s) 2073 , 2071 , 2779 , 2791 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Letter to Judge Drain, in re: Letter dated 11/2/11 from James Mazza, Jr., of Kirkland Ellis LLP, counsel for the Debtor filed by William R. Fried on behalf of Grocery Haulers, Inc.. (Fried, William) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for Period August 14, 2011 to September 10, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
DEBTORS' RESPONSE to the Insurance Related OBJECTIONS of Gator Monument Partners LLP, Gator South Avenue Partners, Ltd., and Gator Garwood Partners, Ltd to Debtors' Motion to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2073 , 2071 , 2779 ). FILED UNDER SEAL AS PER DOC. 2779. (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
2790
Filed: None, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF Gator Monument Partners, LLP, Gator South AvenuePartners, Ltd., and Gator Garwood Partners, Ltds OBJECTION to Debtors Motion to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2073 , 2071 ). FILED UNDER SEAL AS PER DOC. 2779. (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Amended Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 2756 , 2788 ) filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Ansonia Commercial LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Office Objections due by 12/5/2011, (Kotler, Lawrence) Modified on 11/3/2011 (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
(Disregard and Refer to Doc. 2789) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 2756 ) filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Ansonia Commercial LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 12/5/2011, (Kotler, Lawrence) Modified on 11/3/2011 (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Nos. 5138 and 6041 filed by John Scott on behalf of Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC.(Scott, John) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 639 ) filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Jonah M. Meer, the Trustee for the Actrade Liquidation Trust. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Statement / Notice of Filing of Quarterly Report of Expenditures of the Actrade Liquidation Trust filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Jonah M. Meer, the Trustee for the Actrade Liquidation Trust. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 532 ) filed by William A. Rome on behalf of M Hakan & R Salkin Ttee Michael J. Hakan$Charitable Re U/A Dtd 12/20/1995. (Rome, William) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Motion to Join Motion to Dismiss Complaint (related document(s) 158 ) filed by William A. Rome on behalf of M Hakan & R Salkin Ttee Michael J. Hakan$Charitable Re U/A Dtd 12/20/1995. (Rome, William) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Joinder in Co-Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and in Co-Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by James Matthew Vaughn on behalf of HTB Investments LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Certificate of Service) (Vaughn, James) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Joinder to Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Individual 19. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Certificate of Service) (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eamon Mason - Seventh Monthly Statement of Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P. as Financial Advisor to the Debtors for Allowance of Compensation for Actual and Necessary Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Out-of-Pocket Expenses Incurred for the Period of September 1, 2011 through September 30, 2011 (related document(s) 249 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for September 2011 filed by Arnold Mitchell Greene on behalf of West End Financial Advisors LLC. (Greene, Arnold) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Hearing /(Status Conference Date: 11/8/11 at 10:00 AM) Notice of Status Conference filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Albert Togut. with hearing to be held on 11/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Motion for Adequate Protection /First Manhattan Development REIT's Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Terminating Debtor's Exclusive Period Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1121, and (II) Requiring Adequate Protection Payments Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363(e) filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of First Manhattan Developments REIT. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 11/10/2011, (Attachments: # 1 First Manhattan's Motion Terminating Debtor's Exclusive Period# 2 Appendix Affidavit of Service) (Luckman, Gerard) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Papers on Behalf of Bank of Montreal filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of Bank of Montreal. (Acker, Ann) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Jon Corzine. (Carroll, Schuyler) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (First Day Orders) (related document(s) 21 , 24 , 19 , 22 , 31 , 20 , 25 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Papers By Mayer Brown LLP On Behalf Of The Bank Of New York Mellon filed by Brian Trust on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Trust, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of MF Global Holdings Ltd.. (Reisman, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Travis D. Lenkner filed by Julie D. Dyas on behalf of Contest Promotions-NY LLC. (Dyas, Julie) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1107763 (related document(s) 17 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 10 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 7 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Statement /Stipulation Extending the Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to March 28, 2012 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/28/2011)