Ames Department Stores, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-42217
District Judge Robert E. Gerber, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 31, 2017 at 1:51 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp., et al.,"

Toggle Switch Represented by COHEN MOHR, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Samuel Cohen +1 202 835 7517 +1 202 263 7517 dcohen@cohenmohr.com

Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

v.
No Logo Americo Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kera & Graubard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M David Graubard +1 212 681 1600 +1 212 681 1601 zaidiekgh@aol.com
No Logo Bounty Trading Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bounty Trading Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Henry Wander +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 751 6820 dhw@dhclegal.com
No Logo Cellmark Paper, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irve J. Goldman +1 203 674 7920 +1 203 330 2213
No Logo E&e Hosiery, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazarus & Lazarus, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilbert Alan Lazarus +1 212 889 7400 +1 212 684 0314 gillazarus@gmail.com
No Logo General Fabrics Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Fabrics, Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazarus & Lazarus, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilbert Alan Lazarus +1 212 889 7400 +1 212 684 0314 gillazarus@gmail.com
No Logo Groton Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Campbell +1 212 819 8311 +1 212 354 8113 scampbell@whitecase.com
No Logo Habitat International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazarus & Lazarus, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilbert Alan Lazarus +1 212 889 7400 +1 212 684 0314 gillazarus@gmail.com
No Logo Jack Of All Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew B. Eckstein +1 212 885 5000 +1 212 885 5002 aeckstein@blankrome.com
No Logo Jaclyn, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by jarvisandkaplan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Kaplan +1 802 658 9411 +1 802 658 3551 rkaplan@jarvisandkaplan.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Martin S. Siegel +1 212 209 4829 +1 212 209 4801 msiegel@brownrudnick.com
No Logo Linda P, Lay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Martin S. Siegel +1 212 209 4829 +1 212 209 4801 msiegel@brownrudnick.com
No Logo Linda P. Lay as Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin S. Siegel +1 212 209 4829 +1 212 209 4801 msiegel@brownrudnick.com
No Logo Mercury Beach-Maid, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Henry Wander +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 751 6820 dhw@dhclegal.com
No Logo Pepsi Cola Newburgh Bottling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Macreery +1 914 248 0531 +1 914 248 0529 will-macreery@worldnet.att.net
No Logo Revere Mills Inc., in two adversary proceedings, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John S. Graettinger, Jr. +1 312 408 0320 +1 312 408 0321
No Logo Star Ring, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn & Hessen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosanne Thomas Matzat +1 212 478 7200 +1 212 478 7400 rmatzat@hahnhessen.com
No Logo Star Wear, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Henry Wander +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 751 6820 dhw@dhclegal.com
No Logo Turtle Wax, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira A. Reid +1 212 891 3976 +1 212 310 1600 ira.a.reid@bakernet.com
No Logo Vtech Electronics, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "VTech Electronics Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Herrick Feinstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Alex Rubin +1 212 592 1400 +1 212 592 1500 prubi@herrick.com
No Logo Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee

Represented by Sills Cummis Epstein & Gross PC

No Logo Aron Oliner as Chapter 11 Trustee of The Kontrabecki Group, Trustee

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

No Logo Eugene I. Davis, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by ASK Finaancial, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen M. Scheibe +1 651 406 9665 +1 651 406 9676 kscheibe@askfinancial.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ASK LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr. +1 651 406 9665 +1 651 406 9676

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph L. Steinfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary D. Underdahl +1 651 406 9665 +1 651 406 9676 gunderdahl@askfinancial.com

Represented by Neiger LLP

No Logo James W. Giddens, as Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Lehman Brothers Inc., Trustee

Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

No Logo Ames Department Stores, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Karcher
Space Alfredo R. Perez +1 713 546 5184 +2249 224 224 9511

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George A. Davis +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6666 george.davis@cwt.com
Space Deryck A. Palmer +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6666 deryck.palmer@cwt.com
Space John James Rapisardi +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 833 3148 john.rapisardi@cwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Bienenstock +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 833 3148 mbienenstock@dl.com
Space Timothy Q. Karcher +1 212 259 6050 +1 212 259 6333 tkarcher@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Storch Amini & Munves, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bijan Amini +1 212 490 4100 +1 212 490 4208 amini@samlegal.com
Space Avery Daniel Samet +1 212 497 8239 +1 212 490 4208 asamet@storchamini.com
Space Bonnie Alison Tucker +1 212 490 4100 +1 212 490 4208 btucker1@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Togut, Segal & Segal LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil Matthew Berger +1 212 594 5000 +1 212 967 4258 neilberger@teamtogut.com
Space Frank A. Oswald +1 212 594 5000 +1 212 967 4258 frankoswald@teamtogut.com
Space Albert Togut +1 212 594 5000 +1 212 967 4258 alcourt@teamtogut.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori R. Fife +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 833 3148 lori.fife@weil.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bardavid +1 203 363 7638 +1 203 363 7638 jbardavid@wiggin.com
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc., Debtor

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Represented by Colt & Mosle, LLP

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

No Logo Quebecor World (usa) Inc., Debtor

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Giordano, Halleran & Ciesla PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL J. CANNING +1 732 741 3900

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by RICHARDS KIBBE & ORBE LLP

No Logo Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, Claims and Noticing Agent

Represented by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC

No Logo Joanna Baricevic, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Buce J. Duke +1 856 701 0555 +1 856 234 6137 bruceduke@comcast.net
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Stutman, Treister & Glatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric D. Winston
No Logo Liquidators of Lehman Brothers Australia Limited, Liquidator

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Howard Mandell Sprayregen +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jsprayregen@kirkland.com
Space David Richard Seligman +1 312 861 2200 +1 312 862 2200 dseligman@kirkland.com
No Logo Schretlen & Co., Cred. Comm. Chair

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Kramer
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hollie T. Elkins +1 212 510 0500 +1 212 668 2255
Space Mary Elizabeth Tom +1 212 510 0500 +1 212 668 2255
  Entries (629) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4548 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/18/2014 10:13AM RE: Debtors' Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims...et al.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/12/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/20/2016. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/16/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/12/2016. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4545 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
    Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal From Service List filed by Stephan William Milo on behalf of Thinkway Toys, Co.. (Milo, Stephan) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4544 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
      Affidavit of Service of Notice Of Presentment Of Debtors Motion For Order In Aid Of Confirmation (related document(s)4536) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 4543 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
        Order in Aid of Confirmation Signed on 11/17/2015. (related document(s)4536) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
          LREF
          Blank 4542 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
          Certificate of Service AFFIDAVIT OF STORCH, AMINI & MUNVES PC REGARDING SERVICE OF SOLICITATION OF FORM W-8 AND OFAC CERTIFICATION Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
            LREF
            Blank 4541 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
            Affidavit of Service of Notice of Disallowance of Duplicative Note Claims Pursuant to Section 7.8 of Debtors' Chapter 11 Plan filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
              LREF
              Blank 4540 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
              Withdrawal of Claim(s): Administrative Claim - Docket #3523 Dated June 11, 2010 filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4539 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                Letter Filed by Stephan William Milo on behalf of C & C Textiles, Inc. (Milo, Stephan) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4538 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                  Operating Report DEBTORS POST-CONFIRMATION MONTHLY OPERATING REPORT FOR THE PERIOD SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 TO SEPTEMBER 30, 2015 Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4537 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                    Operating Report DEBTORS POST-CONFIRMATION MONTHLY OPERATING REPORT FOR THE PERIOD AUGUST 1, 2015 TO AUGUST 31, 2015 Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4536 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                      Notice of Presentment Notice Of Presentment Of Debtors Motion For Order In Aid Of Confirmation filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/16/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 11/13/2015, (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4535 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                        Affidavit of Service of Notice of Request for Taxpayer Identification Number to be Eligible to Receive Distribution; and Substitute Form W-9. filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4534 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                          Order Signed on 10/27/2015 Denying Matthew J. Chiarenza's Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay. (Related Doc # 4518) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4533 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                            Second Supplemental Order Signed on 10/27/2015 Granting Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors' Books and Records). (related document(s)4525) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4532 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                              Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Defective Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001(e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s)4531) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4531 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Albemarie Griswold Limited Partnership (Claim No. 8974, Amount $357,160.74) To Tamara Kagan Levine (Fee Amount $25, Receipt Number 196631) filed by Tamara Kagan Levine. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4530 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                  Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Defective Notices of Transfer of Claims Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001(e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s)4523, 4524) filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4529 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                    Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001(e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s)4528, 4527, 4526) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4528 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                      Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Aberdeen L.L.C. (Claim No. 1700, Amount $6,199.58) To North Avenue Properties L.L.C. filed by Brian P. Morgan on behalf of North Avenue Properties L.L.C.. (Morgan, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4527 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                        Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Aberdeen L.L.C. (Claim No. 1699, Amount $6,129.03) To North Avenue Properties L.L.C. filed by Brian P. Morgan on behalf of North Avenue Properties L.L.C.. (Morgan, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4526 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Aberdeen L.L.C. (Claim No. 1698, Amount $120,000.00) To North Avenue Properties L.L.C. filed by Brian P. Morgan on behalf of North Avenue Properties L.L.C.. (Morgan, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4525 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO DEBTORS SEVENTY- FIRST OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS SOLELY AS TO CERTAIN CLAIMS Filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4524 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transferors: ARI (AUTOMOTIVE RENTALS, INC.) (Claim No. 4247, Amount $57,734.77); AMI Trucklease Corporation (Claim No. 2184, Amount $339,477.56); AMI Trucklease Corporation (Claim No. 6126, Amount $2,079,239.07) To Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. filed by Glenn A. Manochi on behalf of Trucklease Corporation. (Manochi, Glenn) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4523 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Edinboro Associates (Claim No. 234332, Amount $335,296.21) To Litchfield Shopping Center, LLC (Fee Amount $25, Receipt Number 196583) filed by Litchfield Shopping Center LLC. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4522 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Withdrawal Notice Of Withdrawal Of Debtors Seventy-First Omnibus Objection To Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors Books And Records) Solely As To Certain Claims filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4521 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice Of Adjournment Of Debtors Seventy-First Omnibus Objection To Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors Books And Records) Solely As To Certain Claims filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4520 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)4468) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4519 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Objection to Motion Debtors Objection to Matthew Chiarenzas Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Commence/Prosecute State Court Slip-and-Fall Action against Debtors filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4518 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Amended Motion for Relief from Stay with Notice of Motion filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza with hearing to be held on 10/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion) (Carlino, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4517 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Service (relating to Motion to Lift Automatic Stay) Filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza. (Carlino, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4516 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                              (ENTRY REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT #4518) Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza with hearing to be held on 10/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG). (Carlino, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/15/2015 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4515 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                (ENTRY REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT #4518) Motion for Relief from Stay and Resolve/Value Claim 4607 filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza with hearing to be held on 10/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG). (Carlino, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/15/2015 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4514 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Service (Related to Affidavit in Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Debtors' Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims - Document No. 4513) Filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza. (Carlino, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4513 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Affidavit in Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Debtors' Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4468) Filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza. (Carlino, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4512 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Operating Report Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4494 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter Filed by Jeaneen Rublee. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4487 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          Affidavit of Service Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' 71st Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors' Books and Records) Solely as to Certain Claims and Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors' Books and Records) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4484, 4483) Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4486 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Affidavit of Service Withdrawal of Debtors' 69th Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4482) Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4485 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Debtors' 68th Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4481) Filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4484 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors' Books and Records) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4471) filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/20/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 8/13/2015, (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4483 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' 71st Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Contradict Debtors' Books and Records) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4471) filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4482 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' 69th Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4469) filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4481 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' 68th Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s)4468) filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/20/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 8/13/2015, (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4480 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Response to Motion in Opposition to Debtors' Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims with Certificate of Service (related document(s)4468) filed by Christopher M Candon on behalf of Linda Howe. (Candon, Christopher) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4479 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Response to Debtors' Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza. (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation of Merit # 2 Exhibit Exhibit List # 3 Certificate of Service) (Carlino, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4478 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Response to Motion (related document(s)4471) filed by Denise A. Kuhn on behalf of Commonwealth of PA, Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kuhn, Denise) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4477 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Appearance filed by Denise A. Kuhn on behalf of Commonwealth of PA, Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kuhn, Denise) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4476 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing ON MOTION TO CONFIRM EXCLUSIVE JURISDICTION OF BANKRUPTCY COURT OVER PROPERTY OF THE ESTATE AND ENJOINING ANY ATTEMPTS TO INTERFERE WITH TRUST MONIES filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4475 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4471) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4474 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Seventieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4470) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4473 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Ninth Objection to Claims (related document(s)4469) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4472 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4468) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4471 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/1/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 6/22/2015,. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4470 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Debtors' Seventieth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/1/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 6/22/2015,. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4469 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Debtors' Sixty-Ninth Objection to Claims filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/1/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 6/22/2015,. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4468 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Debtors' Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jeffrey Chubak on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/1/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 6/22/2015,. (Chubak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4467 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Operating Report / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period February 1, 2015 to February 28, 2015 Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4466 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Operating Report / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period January 1, 2015 to January 31, 2015 Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4465 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order Signed on 4/1/2015 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4437) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4464 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order Signed on 4/1/2015 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4439) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4463 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Order Signed on 4/1/2015 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4438) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4462 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order Signed on 4/1/2015 Granting Debtors' Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims to be Expunged). (Related Doc # 4219) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4461 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTORS' SIXTY-SIXTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NO. 3290 OF THE FREDERICK NEWS - POST (related document(s)4439) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4460 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTORS SIXTY-SEVENTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO RESPONDING CLAIMANTS (related document(s)4437) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4459 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTORS SIXTY-FIFTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO RESPONDING CLAIMANTS (related document(s)4438) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4458 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Response to Motion Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4437) filed by Ronald M. Tucker on behalf of Simon Property Group, L.P.. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2015 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Tucker, Ronald) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4457 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTORS SIXTY-SEVENTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO RESPONDING CLAIMANTS (related document(s)4437) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4456 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTORS SIXTY-SIXTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO RESPONDING CLAIMANTS (related document(s)4439) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4455 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTORS SIXTY-FIFTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO RESPONDING CLAIMANTS (related document(s)4438) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4454 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT OF THIRTY-SIXTH OMNIBUS CLAIMS OBJECTION WITH REGARD TO CLAIM OF NELSON SOTO PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2015 AT 9:45 A.M (related document(s)4453) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4453 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT OF THIRTY-SIXTH OMNIBUS CLAIMS OBJECTION WITH REGARD TO CLAIM OF NELSON SOTO PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2015 AT 9:45 A.M (related document(s)4219) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4452 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT OF SIXTY-SEVENTH OMNIBUS CLAIMS OBJECTION PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2015 AT 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4437) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4451 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Adjournment of Hearing NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT OF SIXTY-SIXTH OMNIBUS CLAIMS OBJECTION PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2015 AT 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4439) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4450 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT OF SIXTY-FIFTH OMNIBUS CLAIMS OBJECTION PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2015 AT 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4438) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4449 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Operating Report /Debtor's Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period from December 1, 2014 to December 31, 2014 Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4448 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Operating Report /Debtor's Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period from November 1, 2014 to November 30, 2014 Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4447 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Operating Report /Debtor's Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period from October 1, 2014 to October 31, 2014 Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4446 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Operating Report /Debtor's Post-Confirmation Monthly Operating Report for the Period from September 1, 2014 to September 30, 2014 Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4445 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed on 2/19/2015 Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Insufficient Documentation or No Claim Stated). (related document(s)4323) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4444 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Order Signed on 2/19/2015 Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Insufficient Documentation or No Claim Stated). (related document(s)4321) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4443 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4437) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4442 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4439) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4441 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4438) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4440 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice Of Transmittal Of Record Of Appeal To USDC SDNY (related document(s) (Related Doc # 4436)) . Notice Date 02/13/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4439 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 3/11/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4438 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 3/11/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4437 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 3/11/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4436 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Transmittal of Record of Appeal. All documents have been filed with the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically under Civil Case Number 15-cv-0983 assigned to the Honorable Alison J. Nathan. (related document(s)4396) (Rouzeau, Anatin). (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4435 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1500983 Judge Alison J. Nathan (related document(s)4396) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4434 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Counter Designation (appellee) OF ITEMS FOR THE RECORD ON APPEAL BY DEBTORS AND APPELLEES AMES DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. ET AL. (related document(s)4396, 4415) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4433 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service Amended Affidavit of Service of Debtors Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims and Related Documents (related document(s)4323) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4432 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS' NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-THIRD OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF JUDITH A. GOODISON AND FIXING AND ALLOWANCE OF CLAIM (related document(s)4426) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4431 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service Amended Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claim of Ken Hamilton (related document(s)4428) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4430 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Amended Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claim of Darlene Foultz (related document(s)4427) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4429 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Amended Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' 53rd Omnibus Claims Objection to Claim of Judith A. Goodison (related document(s)4426) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4428 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claim of Ken Hamilton (Amended to Include Proposed Order) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 2/6/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4427 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claim of Darlene Foultz (Amended to Include Proposed Order) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 2/6/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4426 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' 53rd Omnibus Claims Objection to Claim of Judith A. Goodison (Amended to Include Proposed Order) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 2/6/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Sustaining Debtors Fifty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4425 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Signed on 1/26/2015 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4383) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4424 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Signed on 1/26/2015 Granting Debtor's Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4381) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4423 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Signed on 1/26/2015 Granting Debtor's Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4382) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4422 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Signed on 1/26/2015 Granting Debtors' Sixty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Undeliverable Addresses). (Related Doc # 4380) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4421 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-NINTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF KEN HAMILTON (related document(s)4418) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4420 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-SEVENTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF DARLENE FOULTZ (related document(s)4417) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4419 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-THIRD OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF JUDITH A. GOODISON (related document(s)4416) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4418 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Settlement of an Order SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-NINTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF KEN HAMILTON (related document(s)4323) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 2/6/2015, (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4417 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Settlement of an Order SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-SEVENTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF DARLENE FOULTZ (related document(s)4321) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 2/6/2015, (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4416 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Settlement of an Order SUSTAINING DEBTORS' FIFTY-THIRD OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF JUDITH A. GOODISON (related document(s)4300) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 2/6/2015, (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4415 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Designation of Contents (appellant). and Statement of Issues (related document(s)4396) filed by Philip A. Bongiorno on behalf of Lorraine Herter. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4414 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS' SIXTY-THIRD OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NO. 3139 OF NSTAR ELECTRIC (related document(s)4383) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4413 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Sixty-First Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Collegeware USA (related document(s)4380) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4412 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 22, 2015 at 9:45 A.M. filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4411 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Fifty-First Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Judith A. Goodison (related document(s)4298) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4410 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Claims Objection With Regard to Claim of Carolyn Darnall (related document(s)4321) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4409 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Fifty-Second Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Connecticut Department of Revenue, Claim No. 5830 (related document(s)4299) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4408 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Nelson Soto Previously Scheduled for January 22, 2015 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4218) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4407 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Regarding Claim No. 843 Filed by Nelson D. Soto. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4406 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 4045 OF VINCENT J. PUGLIA; 5782.02 OF ST. JOHNSBURY ROUTE 5 ASSOC. LIMITED PARTNER; 6498 OF TDK ELECTRONICS CORP; 871 OF VANITY FAIR INTIMATES, LP (related document(s)4402) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4405 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-THIRD OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 1902 OF LINON HOME DECOR PRODUCTS INC, 2271 OF PAUL MASLEY, 3633 OF RICHLAND ZAMAGIAS L.P., 4415 OF SAUGUS REALTY CO. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, 4316 OF SHERWOOD AMERICA, 4592.01 OF SPRINGFIELD SQUARE (related document(s)4400) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4404 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-SECOND OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 2963 OF F R A ASSOCIATES; 2335 OF DOMENIC FINELLI; 3681 OF FIRST CITY WV PARTNERS, L.P.; 1214 OF GATEWAY MFG INC; 3336 OF GELMART INDUSTRIES INC.; 3943 OF GILMAR ASSOCIATES, LLC; 544.03 OF HILLDAN, INC.; AND 3168 OF MICHELLE KOHAR (related document(s)4401) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4403 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-FIRST OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 2704 OF AMERIWOOD INDUSTRIES, 4607 OF MATTHEW J. CHIARENZA, 6381.02 OF CLEARVIEW MALL ASSOCIATES, 3941.02 OF COLUMBIA MONTICELLO GROUP LLC, AND 4599 OF CRANBERRY MALL (related document(s)4399) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4402 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 4045 OF VINCENT J. PUGLIA; 5782.02 OF ST. JOHNSBURY ROUTE 5 ASSOC. LIMITED PARTNER; 6498 OF TDK ELECTRONICS CORP; 871 OF VANITY FAIR INTIMATES, LP (related document(s)4381) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4401 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-SECOND OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 2963 OF F R A ASSOCIATES; 2335 OF DOMENIC FINELLI; 3681 OF FIRST CITY WV PARTNERS, L.P.; 1214 OF GATEWAY MFG INC; 3336 OF GELMART INDUSTRIES INC.; 3943 OF GILMAR ASSOCIATES, LLC; 544.03 OF HILLDAN, INC.; AND 3168 OF MICHELLE KOHAR (related document(s)4382) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4400 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-THIRD OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 1902 OF LINON HOME DECOR PRODUCTS INC, 2271 OF PAUL MASLEY, 3633 OF RICHLAND ZAMAGIAS L.P., 4415 OF SAUGUS REALTY CO. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, 4316 OF SHERWOOD AMERICA, 4592.01 OF SPRINGFIELD SQUARE (related document(s)4383) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4399 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal OF DEBTORS SIXTY-FIRST OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIM NOS. 2704 OF AMERIWOOD INDUSTRIES, 4607 OF MATTHEW J. CHIARENZA, 6381.02 OF CLEARVIEW MALL ASSOCIATES, 3941.02 OF COLUMBIA MONTICELLO GROUP LLC, AND 4599 OF CRANBERRY MALL (related document(s)4380) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4398 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response /Reply to Debtors' Sixty-Fourth Omibus Objection to Claims filed by Stanley J. Brassington on behalf of Vincent J. Puglia. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4397 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response /Opposition to Debtors' Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claim filed by Michele A. Kohar. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4396 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appeal filed by Philip A. Bongiorno on behalf of Lorraine Herter. Filing fee collected, receipt #195084.(Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4395 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Motion (related document(s)4380) filed by Jeffrey A. Carlino on behalf of Mathew J. Chiarenza. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Carlino, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4394 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service Amended Affidavit of Service of Debtors Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims and Related Documents (related document(s)4393) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4393 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Amended to Include Correct Notice of Hearing and Correct Proposed Order (related document(s)4383) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 1/15/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4392 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Notice of Objection to Claims Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection (related document(s)4383) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4391 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Court Enclosing Response Received from Pro Se Claimant Ken Hamilton to Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors Fifty-Ninth Objection to Claims (related document(s)4361) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4390 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Court Enclosing Response Received from Pro Se Claimant Darlene Foultz to Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors Fifty-Seventh Objection to Claims (related document(s)4359) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4389 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Darlene Foultz Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4321) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4388 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Claims Objection With Regard to Claim of Ken Hamilton Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4333) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4387 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4381) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4386 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4383) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4385 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4382) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4384 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Sixty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4380) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A: Service List)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4383 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 1/15/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4382 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 1/15/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4381 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 1/15/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4380 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 1/15/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Claims to Be Disallowed and Expunged # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Debtors' Sixty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4379 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Signed on 12/16/2014 Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Workers' Compensation Claims to be Expunged). (Related Doc # 4324) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4378 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Report NOTICE OF FILING OF REPORT AS REQUIRED BY LOCAL RULE 3021-1(A) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Report)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4377 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Signed on 12/2/2014 Granting Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Insufficient Documentation or with No Claim Stated). (Related Doc # 4323) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4376 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Signed on 12/2/2014 Granting Debtors' Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Insufficient Documentation or with No Claim Stated). (Related Doc # 4322) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4375 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Signed on 12/2/2014 Granting Debtors' Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Priority Claims to be Expunged or Reclassified as General Unsecured Claims). (Related Doc # 4326) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4374 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Signed on 12/2/2014 Granting Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims with Insufficient Documentation or with No Claim Stated). (Related Doc # 4321) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4373 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed on 12/2/2014 Granting Debtors' Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late Claims). (Related Doc # 4325) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4372 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4371) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4371 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. Objections due by 12/5/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4370 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Debtors' Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by John W. McTierman on behalf of Tamara A. Shumar and Michael A. Shumar. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4369 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Signed on 11/21/2014 Admitting John W. McTiernan to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 4351) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4368 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Notice of Fixing and Allowance of Certain Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4367 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors' Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4366 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4365 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4364 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4363 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4362 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. Objections due by 11/24/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4361 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. Objections due by 11/24/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4360 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. Objections due by 11/24/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4359 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objections to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. Objections due by 11/24/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4358 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Settlement of an Order Sustaining Debtors' Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini & Munves PC. Objections due by 11/24/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4357 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Claims Objection With Regard to Claim of Carolyn Darnall Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4321) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4356 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Honorable Judge Gerber filed by Carolyn Darnall. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4355 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Third Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Judith A. Goodison Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4300) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4354 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Second Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Connecticut Department of Revenue Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4299) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4353 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-First Omnibus Claims Objection With Regard to Claim of Judith A. Goodison Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4298) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4352 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Nelson Soto Previously Scheduled for November 18, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4219) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/22/2015 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4351 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by John W. McTiernan on behalf of Tamara and Michael Shumar. Filing fee collected, receipt #194842. (Porter, Minnie) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4350 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Third Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Judith A. Goodison Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4300) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4349 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Second Omnibus Claims Objection with Regard to Claim of Connecticut Department of Revenue Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4299) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4348 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-First Omnibus Claims Objection With Regard to Claim of Judith A. Goodison Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4298) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4347 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Claims Objection With Regard to Claim of Nelson Soto Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4219) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4346 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claim No. 4482 of Mary Richardson, Claim No. 4565 of Josette Saunders, and Claim No. 4598 of Tamara A. Shumar (related document(s)4322) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4345 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claim No. 2479 of Dorothy Kuzoian (related document(s)4333) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4344 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claim No. 5657 of Edward Burke (related document(s)4321) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4343 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Sixtieth Omnibus Claims Objection Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4322) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4342 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Claims Objection Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4333) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4341 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Claims Objection Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4325) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4340 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Claims Objection Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4326) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4339 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Claims Objection Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4321) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4338 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Claims Objection Previously Scheduled for November 13, 2014 at 9:45 A.M. (related document(s)4324) filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4337 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Motion (related document(s)4322) filed by Robert Bruce Warner on behalf of Josette Saunders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Warner, Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4336 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by Creditor Ed Burke to Objection to Claim (related document(s)4321) filed by Clifford Gordon on behalf of Ed Burke. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Claim and Records # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Clifford) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4252 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Re: Debtor's Forty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4242) filed by Jeaneen Rublee. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4195 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/13/2013 9:48AM RE: Motion of the Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (I) Fixing Certain Administrative Expenses and (II) Expunging Certain Other Administrative Expenses; Motion of Xstelos Corp. Pursuant to Sections 105(A) and 503(B) of the Bankruptcy Code for Allowance and Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim - Oral Argument; Confirmation Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/13/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 4091). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/22/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/16/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/13/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4186 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement / Notice of Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan and Occurance of Effective Date (related document(s)4185) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4185 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Confirming Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan signed on 11/13/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4184 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Order Pursuant to Section 2.1 of the Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (i) Fixing Certain Administrative Expenses and (ii) Expunging Certain Other Administrative Expenses (Related Doc # 4170) signed on 11/13/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4183 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4176, 4174) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4182 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter in Response to Supplemental Declaration of Xstelos Corporation (related document(s)4181) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4181 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Declaration Notice of Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan M. Couchman, Chief Executive Officer, President and Secretary of Xstelos Corp. In Support of Xstelos Corp.s Objection to Debtors Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissal of the Administrative Expense Request filed by David F. Heroy on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Heroy, David) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4180 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Operating Report for the Period August 26, 2013 to September 22, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4179 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Operating Report for the Period July 28, 2013 to August 25, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4178 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Operating Report for the Period June 24, 2013 to July 27, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4177 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service (related document(s)4173) filed by David F. Heroy on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Heroy, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4176 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Robert E. Gerber at One Bowling Green, Courtroom No. 523, New York, New York (related document(s)4091, 4162, 4170) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/13/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4175 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply to Motion Debtors' Reply in Further Support of Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissal of the Administrative Expense Request Asserted by Xstelos Corporation (related document(s)4091) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4174 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Filing of Proposed Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4162) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/13/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4173 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Motion Response to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissal of the Administrative Expense Request Asserted by Xstelos Corp. [Docket No. 4161] filed by David F. Heroy on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L) (Heroy, David) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4172 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time With Respect To Hearing On Debtors Motion For Order Purusant To Section 2.1 Of The Debtors Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (I) Fixing Certain Administrative Expenses And (II) Expunging Certain Other Administrative Expenses (Related Doc # 4168) signed on 11/5/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4171 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Debtors' Motion for Order Pursuant to Section 2.1 of the Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (i) Fixing Certain Administrative Expenses and (ii) Expunging Certain Other Administrative Expenses and accompanying documents (related document(s)4170) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4170 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Disallow Claims Debtors' Motion for Order Pursuant to Section 2.1 of the Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (i) Fixing Certain Administrative Expenses and (ii) Expunging Certain Other Administrative Expenses filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/13/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 11/6/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Debtors' Motion # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4169 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Shortening Time signed on 10/31/2013 re: Debtors Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (I)Fixing Certain Administrative Expenses And (II)Expunging Certain Other Administrative Expenses (related document(s)4168) with hearing to be held on 11/13/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4168 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 3007(a) and 9006(c)(1) With Respect to Hearing on Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Administrative Expense Requests filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4167 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4164, 4162, 4163, 4165, 4166) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4166 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Rolando de Aguiar in Support of Confirmation of the Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4162) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4165 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law / Debtors' Memorandum in Support of Confirmation of the Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan and in Response to the Ohio Tax Department's Objection Thereto (related document(s)4162, 4160) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4164 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Ballots / Certification of Jung W. Song on Behalf of Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Regarding Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes on Debtors' Modified Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4163 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third Amended Plan / Blackline of Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4162) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4162 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third Amended Plan / Debtors' Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4139) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4161 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissal of the Administrative Expense Request Asserted by Xstelos Corporation (related document(s)4091) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Avery Samet in Support of the Debtors' Memorandum of Law # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Avery Samet # 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Avery Samet) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4160 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document(s)4139) filed by Victoria D. Garry on behalf of Ohio Department of Taxation. (Garry, Victoria) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4159 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Robert E. Gerber filed by Irve J. Goldman on behalf of Cellmark Paper Inc.. (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4158 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Endorsed Order signed on 10/8/2013 "Cellmark should respond within 7 calendar days of this date". (related document(s)4156) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4157 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance filed by David F. Heroy on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Heroy, David) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4156 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Concerning Motion for Administrative Expense Claim Asserted by Cellmark Paper Inc. (related document(s)4107) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4155 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Erin Elizabeth Broderick (Related Doc # 4154) signed on 10/7/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4154 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Erin Elizabeth Broderick on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Broderick, Erin) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4153 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service (related document(s)4152) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc.. (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4152 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Motion Reply In Support of Motion of Xstelos Corp. Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Allowance and Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4091) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H) (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4151 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Solicitation Materials for Vote on Debtors' Modified Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4139, 4141, 4143) filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc..(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4150 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service (related document(s)4149) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4149 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing (related document(s)4091, 4147) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. with hearing to be held on 10/8/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4148 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service (related document(s)4147) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4147 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)4091) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. with hearing to be held on 11/13/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4146 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Motion Debtors' (i) Objection to Xstelos Corporation's Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim and (ii) Objection to Proof of Claim No. 6661 (related document(s)4091) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4145 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit Regarding Returned Mail filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4144 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/12/2013 Between All Parties Allowing Administrative Claims of the Burdman Entities. (related document(s)4124) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4143 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Approving Disclosure Statement signed on 9/10/2013. (related document(s)4141) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4142 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Disclosure Statement / Blackline of Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Modified Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4141 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Disclosure Statement / Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Modified Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4140 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Plan / Blackline of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4139 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Plan / Debtors' Modified Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4138 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/9/2013 Between All Parties Allowing Administrative and General Unsecured Claims of the TJX Companies, Inc. and (ii) Withdrawing Pending Objection. (related document(s)4115) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4137 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice of Appearance on behalf of Burdkidz, LLC, DKR Investments, LLC and MBM Investments, LLC filed by Lori Lapin Jones on behalf of Burdkidz, LLC. (Jones, Lori) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4136 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service (related document(s)4135) filed by Irve J. Goldman on behalf of Cellmark Paper Inc.. (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4135 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply to Motion Debtor's Response to Application on Cellmark Paper, Inc. For Allowance of an Administrative Expense filed by Irve J. Goldman on behalf of Cellmark Paper Inc.. (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4134 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled to be Heard on September 9, 2013 at 9:45 A.M. (EST) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4133 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response / Debtors' Response to Cellmark Paper, Inc.'s Limited Objection to Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Disclosure Statement (related document(s)4119) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4132 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4131, 4128, 4130, 4127, 4129) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4131 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order (i) Approving Disclosure Statement, (ii) Establishing Solicitation and Tabulation Procedures, and (iii) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing (related document(s)4079, 4127, 4095, 4081, 4129) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4130 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Disclosure Statement / Blackline of Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4129) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4129 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Disclosure Statement / Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4127) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4128 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Amended Plan / Blackline of Debtors' Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4127) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4127 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Amended Plan / Debtors' Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4079) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4126 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4124) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4125 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4115, 4118, 4117) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4124 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Allowing Administrative Claims of the Burdman Entities (related document(s)3496, 3495, 3497) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 9/12/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 9/11/2013, (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4123 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit Regarding Returned Mail (related document(s)4101, 4096, 4102, 4103, 4100) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4122 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to the Court filed by Annie Ward. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4121 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Motion of Cellmark Paper, Inc. for Allowance of an Administrative Expense and for Related Relief (related document(s)4107) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4120 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service (related document(s)4119) filed by Irve J. Goldman on behalf of Cellmark Paper Inc.. (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4119 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection (Limited) of Cellmark Paper, Inc. to Debtor's Motion for Order (I) Approving Disclosure Statement, (II) Establishing Solicitation and Tabulation Procedures, and (III) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing (related document(s)4095) filed by Irve J. Goldman on behalf of Cellmark Paper Inc.. (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4118 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Operating Report / Monthly Operating Statement for the Period May 26, 2013 to June 23, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4117 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Operating Report / Monthly Operating Statement for the Period April 28, 2013 to May 25, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4116 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement / Notice of Extension of Response Deadline for Burdman Entities to Debtors' Motion for Approval of Disclosure Statement filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/9/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4115 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order (i) Allowing Administrative and General Unsecured Claims of the TJX Companies, Inc. and (ii) Withdrawing Pending Objection (related document(s)4034, 4025) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 9/6/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 9/5/2013, (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4114 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney re: Daniel E. Hitchcock (Related Doc # 4110) signed on 8/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4113 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney re: Mary L. Fullington (Related Doc # 4109) signed on 8/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4112 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Copy of Letter Sent to Timothy Q. Karcher re: Payment of Claim filed by Joseph F. Fillo. (White, Greg) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4111 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4104, 4105, 4106) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4110 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Request for Removal from Electronic Service List filed by Daniel E. Hitchcock on behalf of Union Underwear Co. d/b/a Fruit Of The Loom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hitchcock, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4109 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Request for Removal from Electronic Service List filed by Mary L. Fullington on behalf of Union Underwear Co. d/b/a Fruit Of The Loom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Fullington, Mary) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4108 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document(s)4107) filed by Irve J. Goldman on behalf of Cellmark Paper Inc.. (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4107 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses and For Related Relief for Cellmark Paper Inc., Other Professional, period: to, fee:$2,012,957.86, expenses: $. filed by Irve J. Goldman. with hearing to be held on 9/9/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (SCC) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Application for Allowance of An Administrative Expense and for Related Relief # 2 Order) (Goldman, Irve) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4106 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Operating Report for the Period March 24, 2013 to April 27, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4105 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Operating Report for the Period February 24, 2013 to March 23, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4104 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Operating Report for the Period January 27, 2013 to February 23, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4103 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Muhammed Habib (related document(s)4096) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4102 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Muhammed Habib (related document(s)4096) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4101 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Muhammed Habib (related document(s)4096) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4100 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Muhammed Habib (related document(s)4096) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4099 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter filed by John McTiernan on behalf of Tamara Shumar, with change of address for Caroselli, Beachler, McTiernan & Conboy and request to update records filed by John McTiernan. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4098 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Daniel P. Murray (related document(s)4097) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4097 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of the TJX Companies, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 503(b) for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expenses Claim (related document(s)4034) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/9/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4096 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion to Set Hearing / Notice of Debtors' Motion for Order (i) Approving Disclosure Statement, (ii) Establishing Solicitation and Tabulation Procedures, and (iii) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing (related document(s)4095) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4095 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Order (i) Approving Disclosure Statement, (ii) Establishing Solicitation and Tabulation Procedures, and (iii) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing (related document(s)4081) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4094 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4093) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4093 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of the TJX Companies, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 503(b) for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4034) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/31/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4092 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service (related document(s)4091) filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4091 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Allow Claims MOTION OF XSTELOS CORP. PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 105(A) AND 503(B) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE FOR ALLOWANCE AND PAYMENT OF AN ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIM filed by Carmen H. Lonstein on behalf of LFD Operating, Inc. n/k/a Xstelos Corp.. with hearing to be held on 8/1/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 7/25/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E Part 1 # 6 Exhibit E Part 2) (Lonstein, Carmen) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4090 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of the TJX Companies, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 503(b) for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4034) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/17/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4089 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4086) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4088 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Liquidity Solutions, Inc. Pursuant to 105(a) and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4031) filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of LIquidity Solutions, Inc.. (Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4087 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Sowon Yoon (related document(s)4080, 4079, 4081) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4086 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of the TJX Companies, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 503(b) for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4034) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4085 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of Claim(s): 6408 filed May 19, 2003 in Ames Realty II, Inc. (Case No. 01-42220) filed by Kevin Michael Newman on behalf of Salmon Run Shopping Center, L.L.C.. (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4084 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Withdrawal of Claim(s): 6406 filed May 19, 2003 in Ames Realty II, Inc. (Case No. 01-42220) filed by Kevin Michael Newman on behalf of Lanesborough Enterprises NewCo, LLC. (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4083 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of Claim(s): 6403 filed May 19, 2003 in Ames Realty II, Inc. (Case No. 01-42220) filed by Kevin Michael Newman on behalf of Pyramid Mall of Ithaca, L.L.C.. (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4082 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of Claim(s): 6401 filed May 19, 2003 in Ames Realty II, Inc. (Case No. 01-42220) filed by Kevin Michael Newman on behalf of Carousel Center Company LP. (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4081 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure Statement for Debtors' Modified First Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4079) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4080 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Plan / Blackline of Debtors' Modified First Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4079) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4079 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Plan / Modified First Amended Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)4023) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4078 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of the TJX Companies, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 503(b) for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4034) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/25/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4077 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Liquidity Solutions, Inc. Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4031) filed by Jeremy B Reckmeyer on behalf of LIquidity Solutions, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/26/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Reckmeyer, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4076 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Debtors' 34th Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 4062) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4075 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Debtors' 33rd Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 4061) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4074 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Debtors' 32nd Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 4060) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4073 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order signed on 5/23/2013 re: Debtors' Thirty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims. (related document(s)4041) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4072 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Debtors 30th Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) (Related Doc # 4058) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4071 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Debtors 29th Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) (Related Doc # 4057) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4070 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Debtors 28th Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) (Related Doc # 4056) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4069 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Debtors 27th Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) (Related Doc # 4055) signed on 5/23/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4068 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Liquidity Solutions, Inc. for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4031) filed by Jeremy B Reckmeyer on behalf of LIquidity Solutions, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/11/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Reckmeyer, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4067 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection (related document(s)4043) filed by Carol Stewart. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4066 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service (related document(s)4065) filed by Mark R. Somerstein on behalf of The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Somerstein, Mark) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4065 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing on Motion of the TJX Companies, Inc. Pursuant to Sections 105(A) and 503(B) of the Bankruptcy Code for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4034) filed by Mark R. Somerstein on behalf of The TJX Companies, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/18/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 6/11/2013, (Somerstein, Mark) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4064 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Operating Report / Monthly Operating Statement for the Period December 23, 2012 to January 26, 2013 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4063 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Liquidity Solutions, Inc. Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4031) filed by Jeremy B Reckmeyer on behalf of LIquidity Solutions, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/22/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Reckmeyer, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3903 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order signed on 7/13/2011 Granting Debtors' Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims.(Related Doc #3865) (Cantrell, Deirdra) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2011 (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18256
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18180 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18255
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17905 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18254
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18066 , 18061 , 18083 , 18063 , 18080 , 18062 , 18058 , 18082 , 18064 , 18060 , 18072 , 18059 , 18065 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18253
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.50717, Amount 255,721.33). To New Finance Alden SPV. filed by New Finance Alden Spv.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18252
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17915 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18251
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/30/2011 10:06AM. RE: Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims; Debtors'Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims; Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims..... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/29/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/8/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/1/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/29/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18250
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Marathon 44 Investments Limited(Claim No.41879, Amount 102,240.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18249
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Shaila Investments Limited(Claim No.41876, Amount 284,000.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18248
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Galemar Inc(Claim No.41878, Amount 211,580.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18247
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Phoenix Group Enterprises Ltd(Claim No.41885, Amount 88,040.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18246
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18135 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18245
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18127 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18244
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Biarritz Worldwide Limited(Claim No.41888, Amount 281,160.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18243
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18106 , 18116 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18242
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18105 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18241
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Genova Marketing Limited(Claim No.41877, Amount 69,580.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18240
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18102 , 18100 , 18103 , 18099 , 18114 , 18101 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18239
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Chan Lai Ping(Claim No.47900, Amount 128,464); Liang Xue Ling(Claim No.48447, Amount 385,391); Yu Suk Ying(Claim No.39397, Amount 64,232); Cheung Ping Kee(Claim No.38970, Amount 64,232); Choi Wai Mui(Claim No.39346, Amount 65,000); Kang Bei Sheng, Liu Han Oin(Claim No.39261, Amount 150,000); Cheng Mei Jun Winnie, Lim Siong Kiau(Claim No.48413, Amount 115,617); Cheung Yan On(Claim No.38690, Amount 64,232); Li Tim Chu(Claim No.39424, Amount 64,232); Mak Lai Ping(Claim No.37849, Amount 256,927). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18238
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.24530, Amount 1,466,739.00). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18237
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.24541, Amount 1,466,739.00). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18236
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lau Siu Ping Susie(Claim No.38559, Amount 128,464); Chan Chin Ling(Claim No.38209, Amount 64,232); Ngai Hoi, Mak Wing Fan Emily(Claim No.39515, Amount 64,232); Ng Sui Ling(Claim No.39347, Amount 64,232); Chan Mok Sau Ching Susanna(Claim No.38181, Amount 128,464); Koon Yan Fong(Claim No.38613, Amount 64,232); Yu Mei Fong, Tam Man Yin Shirley(Claim No.39035, Amount 130,000); Ho Kwok Chung Dominic(Claim No.39,000, Amount 70,000); Ching Tin Shun(Claim No.47842, Amount 65,000); Kwok Mo Lim(Claim No.38189, Amount 64,232). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18235
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Appleton Industries Limited(Claim No.41887, Amount 203,060.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18234
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tang Yuk Bing(Claim No.38671, Amount 128,464); Li Hou Guang(Claim No.39602, Amount 128,464); Kwok Fuk Fu(Claim No.38706, Amount 64,232); Zhang Yan(Claim No.48416, Amount 64,232); Lai Sau Chun(Claim No.38313, Amount 65,000); Du Maoqin(Claim No.39694, Amount 200,000); Mak Po Tin(Claim No.38053, Amount 75,000); Hsieh Tse Yu(Claim No.39520, Amount 65,000); Wang Zhouyu(Claim No.39222, Amount 1,000,000); Chia Yue Ing(Claim No.38208, Amount 64,232). To Standared Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18233
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Mak Leong Chu(Claim No.38798, Amount 64,232); Suen Kwai Kei, Chu Shuk Ling Gladys(Claim No.39423, Amount 64,232); Ma Da De(Claim No.39664, Amount 130,000); Wan Kai Yiu, Li Mei Ching(Claim No.38839, Amount 64,232); Liu Digjin(Claim No.48450, Amount 77,078); Lee Kit Chong Anita(Claim No.47534, Amount 64,232); Esler Lindsay Brydon(Claim No.67691, Amount 256,927); Young Oi Wah(Claim No.39332, Amount 64,232); Kwok Yik Ming(Claim No.39141, Amount 64,232); Chan Hoi Lam, Chiu Wai Ming(Claim No.39152, Amount 128,464). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18232
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.67359, Amount 562,926.99). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18231
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19521, Amount 822,533.93). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18230
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19537, Amount 611,513.41). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18229
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.67358, Amount 739,294.81). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18228
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19531, Amount 1,372,383.37). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18227
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nip Chung Yin(Claim No.47899, Amount 102,771); Lui Pak Kan(Claim No.39064, Amount 64,232); Wong Pang, Wong Sau Kee(Claim No.48065, Amount 64,232); Cheung Shing Cho(Claim No.38947, Amount 64,232); Lau Pui Pui, Lee Kwok Ching(Claim No.38788, Amount 64,232); Yeung Sun Wai(Claim No.39212, Amount 642,319); Hui Tsui King(Claim No.39385, Amount 77,078); Yu Yuemei(Claim No.39705, Amount 100,000); Sun Ying(Claim No.39282, Amount 64,232); Lee Kei Yip, Au Yeung Kin Chor(Claim No.37842, Amount 120,000). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18226
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19530, Amount 562,928.99). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18225
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19533, Amount 822,533.93). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18224
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19526, Amount 611,513.41). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18223
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19538, Amount 739,296.25). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18222
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Liechtensteinische Landesbank Aktiengesellschaft(Claim No.60940, Amount 129,785.09). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18221
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Liechtensteinische Landesbank Aktiengesellschaft(Claim No.60940, Amount 40,377.58). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.19528, Amount 1,372,383.37). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18219
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery Related to Plan Confirmation filed by John E. Jureller Jr. on behalf of Retirement Housing Foundation. (Jureller, John) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18218
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Liechtensteinische Landesbank Aktiengesellschaft(Claim No.60940, Amount 729,680.62). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18217
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Liechtensteinische Landesbank Aktiengesellschaft(Claim No.60940, Amount 60,566.38). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18216
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Liechtensteinische Landesbank Aktiengesellschaft(Claim No.60940, Amount 98,059.85). To The Varde Fund IX-A. L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18215
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.50717, Amount 127,364.74). To New Finance Alden SPV. filed by Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18214
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Liechtenstienische Landesbank Aktiengesellschaft(Claim No.60940, Amount 383,587.04). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18213
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP [See Attachment for Complete Transferee Name] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.50717, Amount 9,980,947.76). To Alden Global Distressed Opportunities Master Fund. filed by Alden Global Distressed Opportunities Master Fund, L.P..(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lam Tung Leung(Claim No.38899, Amount 128,464); Loh Catherine(Claim No.39155, Amount 64,232); Or Kam Hon(Claim No.38136, Amount 80,000); Lau Kwai San(Claim No.38130, Amount 89,925); Lo Mei Ling, Yu Miu Ying(Claim No.38730, Amount 64,232); Han Wing Yam(Claim No.39504, Amount 64,232); Chuah Jin Chong(Claim No.39240, Amount 80,000); Tam Chi Ming(Claim No.38880, Amount 65,000); Wong Man Wah(Claim No.48075, Amount 64,232); Shen Zehua(Claim No.39713, Amount 80,000). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18211
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 14,201.00). To Ewald Almstaedt. filed by Ewald Almstaedt.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18210
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 7,100.50). To Christa Gleim, Helmut Gleim. filed by Helmut Gleim, Chirsta Gleim.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18209
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response In re: Disclosure Statement filed by Rose Seraydar. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18208
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Requesting Payment of $4,823.85 filed by Rosalind Ebanks. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18207
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No.39821, Amount 15,028,774.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Pacific Life & Annuity Company(Claim No.40642, Amount 15,028,774.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18205
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement / Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18204
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 11 Plan / Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4621
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Bruce M. Sattin. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4620
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4619 ) filed by Gary D. Underdahl on behalf of Eugene I. Davis. (Underdahl, Gary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4619
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing filed by Gary D. Underdahl on behalf of Eugene I. Davis. with hearing to be held on 7/29/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice# 2 Exhibit B to Notice# 3 Exhibit A to Order)(Underdahl, Gary) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4618
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reclamation of Claim filed by Dynaric, Inc..(Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3895
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3894
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3893
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3891
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3890
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response with certificate of service (related document(s) 3864 ) filed by Stephen G. Murphy on behalf of Massachusetts Department Of Revenue. (Murphy, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3889
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response with certificate of service (related document(s) 3865 ) filed by Stephen G. Murphy on behalf of Massachusetts Department Of Revenue. (Murphy, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3540 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Grass Chopper's Inc.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3539 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Illinois Office of the Secretary of State. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3538 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Illinois Office of the Secretary of State. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3537 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Illinois Office of the Secretary of State. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3536 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Thomas E. Donaruma. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3535 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Mary Ann Julian. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3534 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Sylvia C. Synder. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3533 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Fairfax County, Virginia. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3532 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Thomas Lafrance. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3531 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 3512 ) filed by Steven T. Hoort on behalf of TJX Companies, Inc.. (Hoort, Steven) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3530 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Chris A. Lista. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3529 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Inez Wells. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3528 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Town of Morristown. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3527 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Random House, Inc.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3526 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Denise Strenroski. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3525 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Thomas E. Febbie. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3524 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Debra Ann T. Bailey. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3523 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3522 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Mary Ann Owens. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3521 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Groton Industries, Inc.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3520 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by The Hoover Company. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3519 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by State of Connecticut/Department of Revenue Services. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3518 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Town of Enfield Connecticut. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3517 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses - ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIM REQUEST, with ADDENDUM TO ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIM REQUEST OF LUMBERMENS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY. filed by Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company. (Gamell, Mark) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3516 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Sheila R. Schwager, ARAMARK Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC fka ARAMARK Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc. dba ARAMARK Uniform Services. (Schwager, Sheila) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3515 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Regina Cohen, The Hoover Company. (Cohen, Regina) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3514 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Sheila R. Schwager, Esq. (Related Doc # 3513 ) signed on 6/15/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3513 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Sheila R. Schwager on behalf of ARAMARK Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC fka ARAMARK Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc. dba ARAMARK Uniform Services. (Schwager, Sheila) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3512 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses Renewed Request for Payment of Administrative Claims of The TJX Companies, Inc.. filed by TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Hoort, Steven) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3511 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses - REQUEST FOR ALLOWANCE AND PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIM PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. SECTIONS 503(a), 503(b)(1)(A) AND 365(d)(3). filed by Chittenango Plaza Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3510 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Era C. Reid. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3509 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Arlene Logan. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3508 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response filed by Jascha W. Blake. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3507 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Park Manor Plaza, LLC. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3506 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Eileen M. Thompson. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3505 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Margaret D. Hippensteel. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3504 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Sandra M. Myers. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3503 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Allow and Pay Administrative Claim Request of Unical Enterprises, Inc. filed by Robert J. Kaplan on behalf of Unical Enterprises, Inc.. (Kaplan, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3502 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Hall's Landscaping. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3501 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Barbara Benford-Jackson. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3500 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Mary J. Vann. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3499 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses REQUEST FOR PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIM OF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF 12.5% SENIOR NOTES DUE 2003. filed by Charlotte P. Bodell. (Bodell, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3498 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Achim Importing Company, Inc.. (May, Laurence) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3497 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to AllowMotion of MBM Investments, LLC for Order (i) Allowing and Directing Payment of Unpaid Post-Petition, Administrative Rent Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 365(d)(3) and/or 503(b), and (ii) Compelling Payment of Interest and Attorney Fees filed by Timothy M. Reardon on behalf of MBM Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit "C"# 4 Exhibit "D"# 5 Exhibit "E"# 6 Exhibit "F") (Reardon, Timothy) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3496 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to AllowMotion of DKR Investments, LLC for Order (i) Allowing and Directing Payment of Unpaid Post-Petition, Administrative Rent Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 365(d)(3) and/or 503(b), and (ii) Compelling Payment of Interest and Attorney Fees filed by Timothy M. Reardon on behalf of DKR Investmens, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit "C"# 4 Exhibit "D"# 5 Exhibit "E"# 6 Exhibit "F") (Reardon, Timothy) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3495 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to AllowMotion of Burdkidz, LLC for Order (i) Allowing and Directing Payment of Unpaid Post-Petition, Administrative Rent Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 365(d)(3) and/or 503(b), and (ii) Compelling Payment of Interest and Attorney Fees filed by Timothy M. Reardon on behalf of Burdkidz, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit "C"# 4 Exhibit "D"# 5 Exhibit "E") (Reardon, Timothy) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3494 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Requesting Removal from Further ECF/CM E-mail Notifications filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, P.A.. (Komrower, Stuart) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3493 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by David Silver. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3492 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Mark Constable. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3491 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by City of Torrington. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3490 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3489 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Fuji Film USA, Inc. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3488 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Belkis Ramos. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3487 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by City of Meriden Tax Collector. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3486 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Kathleen Lea Richards. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3485 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Maintech Group of Industries. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3484 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Karen Costopulos. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3483 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Gail Ormsbee. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3482 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service by First Class Mail (related document(s) 3474 ) filed by Laurence May on behalf of Achim Importing Company, Inc.. (May, Laurence) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3481 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Timothy M. Reardon (Related Doc # 3479 ) signed on 6/2/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3480 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Timothy M. Reardon (Related Doc # 3478 ) signed on 6/2/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3479 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Timothy M. Reardon on behalf of DKR Investments L.L.C. Burdkidz, L.L.C. MBM Investments, L.L.C. & DKR Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (Reardon, Timothy) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3478 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Timothy M. Reardon on behalf of DKR Investments L.L.C. Burdkidz, L.L.C. MBM Investments, L.L.C. & DKR Family Limited Partnership. (Reardon, Timothy) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3477 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter filed by Judith Goodison. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3476 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Judith N. Spaits. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3475 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by City of Rockland, Maine. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3474 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Allow Claims / Achim Importing Company, Inc.'s Motion for Order Directing Payment of Administrative Expenses filed by Laurence May on behalf of Achim Importing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit "A"# 3 Exhibit "B"# 4 Exhibit "C") (May, Laurence) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3473 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Kay Wildes. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3472 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Yvonne P. Stevens. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3471 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by Mark Von Mayrhauser. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3470 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response filed by Diana Reilly. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3469 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response filed by Kenneth Beavers. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3468 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Publication of USA Today (related document(s) 3462 ) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3467 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Publication of The Wall Street Journal (related document(s) 3462 ) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3466 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Amended Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (Related docket no. 3465) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3465 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer Agreement FRBP Amended Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:USA Detergents(Claim No.06571, Amount 37,838.40). To Argo Partners.(related document(s) 2608 ) filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3464 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 4/22/10 10:00 AM RE: Case Conferences and Status Conferences. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/22/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/30/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/24/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/22/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3463 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order signed on 4/27/2010 Pursuant to Section 1121(d) of the Bankruptcy Code Extending Period During which Debtors May Solicit Acceptances for Chapter 11 Plan. (Related Doc # 3459 ) (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3462 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Establishing a Final Date for Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims and (b) Approving Proposed Notice Proceduressigned on 4/23/2010. (related document(s) 3458 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3461 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 6/12/2008 RE: Motion to Vacate Default Judgement and to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/12/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Rand Reporting & Transcription, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/19/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/13/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/12/2010. (Frazier, Christopher) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3460 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Heather L. Aaronson (related document(s) 3459 , 3458 ) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3459 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Presentment of Motion of Debtors for Order Pursuant to Section 1121(d) of the Bankruptcy Code Extending Period During Which Debtors May Solicit Acceptances for Chapter 11 Plan filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 4/27/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 4/23/2010, (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3458 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Presentment of Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 503(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2002 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Entry of an Order (a) Establishing a Final Date for Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims and (b) Approving Proposed Notice Procedures filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 4/21/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 4/20/2010, (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3457 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing to Address Status of Open Preference Proceedings filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/22/2010 (check with court for location) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3456 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance Notice of Change of Address filed by Charlotte P. Bodell on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bodell, Charlotte) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3455 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/15/07 RE: Letter to Judge Gerber Regarding Non-Compliance with Mediation Order of June 25, 2007 filed by Buan Amini. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/18/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Regency Reporting Inc..]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/24/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/22/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/18/2010. (Acosta, Annya) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3454 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Operating Report for the Period August 23, 2009 to September 26, 2009 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3453 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application for an Order Pursuant To Sections 363 and 364 Of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing The Extension of Post-Petition Letters of Credit With General Electric Capital Corporation (Related Doc # 3451 ) signed on 1/12/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3452 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment Of Proposed Order Pursuant To Sections 363 and 364 Of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing Further Extension Of Post-Petition Letters Of Credit With General Electric Capital Corporation and Application with underlying Exhibits (related document(s) 3451 ) filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Magaliff, Howard) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3451 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Approve /(PRESENTMENT DATE: 12/23/2009 at 12:00 Noon; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/21/2009 at 4:00 PM) Application for an Order Pursuant To Sections 363 and 364 Of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing The Extension of Post-Petition Letters of Credit With General Electric Capital Corporation filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Pleading Notice of Presentment) (Magaliff, Howard) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3450 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit and Disclosure Statement on behalf of the Axelrod Firm, LLC in Order to have Document Electronically filed in The United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Sheryl L. Axelrod. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3448 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              So Ordered Stipulation and Order signed on 11/20/2009 Regarding Satisfaction of Claims of Old Republic Insurance Company. (related document(s) 3444 ) (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3447 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Copy Order signed on 11/17/2009 by Judge Robert P. Doherty, Jr. from the Circuit Court, Roanoke County, VA. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3446 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Heather L. Aaronson (related document(s) 3444 ) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3271 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Withdrawal of Claim(s): Withdrawal of Transfer of Claim for Rugged Equipment in the Amt. of $37,985.40 filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3270 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order signed on 2/20/2008 re: Substituting Dewey & Leboeuf LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to December 7, 2007. (related document(s) 3268 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3269 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Laura Saal (related document(s) 3268 ) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3268 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Presentment of Order Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Rule 2014(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and Rules 2014-1, 2016-1, and 2090-1(e) of the Local Bankruptcy Rules Substituting Dewey & Leboeuf LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to December 7, 2007 (Objection Deadline: February 19, 2008 at 11:30 a.m.) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 2/19/2008 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 2/19/2008, (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3267 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Endorsed Order Granting Extension of Time signed on 1/31/2008 re: Letter dated 1/30/2008 by Bijan Amini. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3266 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of Certificate of Default filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service by Megan Altman) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3265 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration in Support of Certificate of Default filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service by Megan Altman) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3264 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Operating Report for the Period September 30, 2007 through October 27, 2007 filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Berger, Neil) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3263 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service regarding Objection of Skyway Wood Products, Inc. to Notice of Presentment of Order Granting Judgment by Default (related document(s) 3262 ) filed by Constantine Pourakis on behalf of Skyway Wood Products, Inc.. (Pourakis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3262 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Motion Objection of Skyway Wood Products, Inc. to Notice of Presentment of Order Granting Judgment by Default filed by Constantine Pourakis on behalf of Skyway Wood Products, Inc.. (Pourakis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3261 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter regarding Mediation filed by Dan Shaked on behalf of Barrow Manufacturing Company, Bond Manufacturing Company, Kolcraft Enterprises Inc., M & M News Agency, Memtek Products, Inc., Mondo USA, Inc., Radica USA Ltd., Studio 33. (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3260 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Motion Seeking Entry of Order Granting Judgment by Default filed by Ronald L. Daugherty on behalf of Matisse Jewelry Inc.. (Daugherty, Ronald) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3259 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Ronald L. Daugherty (Related Doc # 3258 ) signed on 12/3/2007. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3258 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission to represent Matisse Jewelry, Inc. filed by Ronald L. Daugherty on behalf of Ronald L. Daugherty. Filing fee collected, receipt #174391. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3257 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Approving the Sale of the Debtors' Real Property in Lewiston, Maine and (II) Granting Related Refief (Related Doc # 3249 ) signed on 11/29/2007. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3256 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Patricia H. Pisorski (Related Doc # 3254 ) signed on 11/28/2007. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3255 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Motion for Order granting Judgment by Default filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Trend Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Kotler, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3254 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Trend Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kotler, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3253 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Ishaq Kundawala (Related Doc # 3251 ) signed on 11/26/2007. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3252 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Presentment of Order Granting Judgment by Default filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Samet, Avery) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3251 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Ishaq Kundawala filed by Thomas R. Trowbridge, III on behalf of Nikko America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Trowbridge, III, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3250 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 363 and 1146 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2002, 6004, 9006 and 9007 (I) Approving the Sale of the Debtors' Real Property in Lewiston, Maine and (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 3249 ) filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Berger, Neil) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3249 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve (PRESENTMENT DATE & TIME: 11/27/07 @ 12:00 NOON)/ Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 363 and 1146 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2002, 6004, 9006 and 9007 (I) Approving the Sale of the Debtors' Real Property in Lewiston, Maine and (II) Granting Related Refief filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Purchase Agreement# 2 Exhibit 2: Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit 3: Exhibit 1 to Exhibit 2# 4 Pleading Notice of Presentment) (Berger, Neil) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3248 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Megan Altman (related document(s) 3241 ) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Samet, Avery) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3247 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service Letter giving notice of the November 15, 2007 hearing before Judge Gerber (related document(s) 3241 ) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Samet, Avery) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3246 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Operating Report / Monthly Operating Statement For The Period August 26, 2007 To September 29, 2007 filed by Martin J. Bienenstock on behalf of Ames Department Stores, Inc.. (Bienenstock, Martin) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3245 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to Transferor Notifying Transferor(s) and Transferee(s) Regarding Defective Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (Related docket no. 3243) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,126 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?