Speisman v. AMR Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06996
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rena G. Speisman, Plaintiff

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

Toggle Switch Represented by Warshaw Burstein Cohen Schlesinger & Kuh, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/06/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R. Lee +1 212 984 7868 +1 212 972 9150 mlee@wbcsk.com
v.
No Logo Aeroflot Russian International Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Air Canada, Defendant
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd., Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Officer/Director, AMR Corporation
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
No Logo American West Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
American Airlines, Inc. Officer/Director, American Airlines, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Coast Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Austrian Airlines Oesterreichische Luftverkehrs-Aktiengesellshaft, Defendant
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant
No Logo British Midland Airways Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Bwia West Indies Airways Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "BWIA West Indies Airways Limited"
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.
No Logo Deutsche Lufthansa Aktiengesellschaft, Defendant
No Logo Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise, Defendant
No Logo Grupo Taca, Defendant
No Logo Heimann Systems Corp., Defendant
No Logo In Vision Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jetblue Airways Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Klm Royal Dutch Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communication Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation, Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Security And Detection Systems Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quantam Magnetics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Saudi Arabian Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Scandinavian Airlines Of North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securicor PLC, Defendant
No Logo Smiths Heimann GmbH, Defendant
No Logo Societe Air France, Defendant
No Logo Swiss International Air Lines Ltd., Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "United Airlines"
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 72 MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc.. (dle, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
    DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: 72 MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc.. (dle, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
      MOTION for an order approving the agreement entered into by plaintiff Rena G. Speisman and certain dfts, dated 7/21/06, settling the claims asserted in Speisman v. AMR Corp; entering final judgment purs. to Rule 54(b) of the FRCP ; ruling that the liability limitation contained in section 408(a)(1) of the Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization act applies to the settlement amount and dismissing the complaint in Speisman v. AMR Corp. 03cv6996 with prejudice to all dfts. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security. (dle, ) Modified on 8/7/2006 (dle, ). (Entered: 08/07/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None
        Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendants United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/15/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None
          Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/14/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Atlantic Coast Airlines. (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
              NOTICE ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS SECONDED AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (laq) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines. (ps, ) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Northwest Airlines Inc.. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (gf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                          NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                            NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER OF DEFENDANT US AIRWAYS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND. Document filed by US Airways, Inc. (ae, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE of Partial Voluntary Dismissal as to listed defendants, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/1/04) (jf, ) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Securicor PLC served on 3/3/2004, answer due 3/23/2004. Service was accepted by registered mail. (sb, ) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smiths Heimann GmbH served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Air Canada served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/24/04) (sac, ) (Entered: 02/26/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the firm of Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito is substituted for the firm of Warshaw Burstein Cohen Schlesinger & Kuh, LLP as atty?s of record for plaintiff in this action. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/3/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 02/13/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. KLM Royal Dutch Airlines served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (yv, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Grupo Taca served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by certified mail. (sb, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by certified mail. (sb, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heimann Systems Corp. c/o Secretary of State served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Registered Mail #597 175 434. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (tp, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Saudi Arabian Airlines Corporation c/o Secretary of State served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Registered Mail #597 175 482. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (tp, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (yv, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. British Midland Airways, Ltd. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (yv, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by Mail. (sac, ) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (dle, ) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smiths Heimann GmbH served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (dle, ) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Security and Detection Systems Corporation served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (jco, ) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT; Plaintiff, Rena Speisman, hereby elects to activate her individual lawsuit against against defendants and proceed with litigation in this action. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (sac, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Airways, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Airlines served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Swiss International Air Lines Ltd. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Societe Air France served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Societe Air France. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Saudi Arabian Airlines Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Northwest Airlines Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communication Holdings, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jetblue Airways Corporation served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. British Airways PLC served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Boeing Company served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Austrian Airlines Oesterreichische Luftverkehrs-Aktiengesellshaft served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Atlantic Coast Airlines served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Argenbright Security, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Airtran Airways, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Aeroflot-Russian International Airlines served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Scandinavian Airlines of North America, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. BWIA West Indies Airways Limited served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. British Midland Airways, Ltd. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smiths Heimann GmbH served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Grupo Taca served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Air Canada served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Securicor PLC served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American West Airlines, Inc. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Deutsche Lufthansa Aktiengesellschaft served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Marybeth Huyck, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. (db, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons and complaint RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. American Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2003, answer due 2/27/2004. (djc, ) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Rena G. Speisman. AMR Corporation waiver sent on 12/29/2003, answer due 2/27/2004. (db, ) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Martin R. Lee . (laq) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER; Purs. to the Order issued 7/22/03 in In re 9/11 Litigation, 21 MC 97 (AKH), and applicable to this case, the pltff's motion to place this action on the suspense docket is granted. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Rena G. Speisman by Rena G. Speisman. (db) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484508. (db) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 520 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?