Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas v. Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-09319

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2018 at 3:18 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Christine Brown , +1 212 833 1239 +1 212 373 7939 abrown@fklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 jfourmaux@fklaw.com
Space ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com
Space Hal Neier +1 212 833 1111 +2127 212 212 7911 hneier@fklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert J. Lack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Lack
No Logo Law Debenture Trust Company Of New York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 jfourmaux@fklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert J. Lack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Lack
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Landis Rath & Cobb, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Green, Jr. +1 302 467 4400 +1 302 467 4450 green@lrclaw.com
No Logo Wilmington Trust Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 jfourmaux@fklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert J. Lack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Lack
v.
No Logo 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Clyde Forbes +1 212 969 3228 +1 212 969 2900 cforbes@proskauer.com
Space Harry Frischer +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 hfrischer@proskauer.com
Space David Steve Mordkoff +1 212 969 3831 +1 212 969 2900 dmordkoff@proskauer.com
Space Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliance Capital Group Trust, Defendant
No Logo Archdiocesan Pension Plan of the Archdiocese of New York, Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp
No Logo Black Box Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya Domenica Bosi +1 212 440 4434 tanya.bosi@bipc.com
No Logo Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Steven Miller +1 212 536 3922 +1 212 536 3901 richard.miller@klgates.com
No Logo Blackrock Variable Series Funds, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Citi Canton, Ltd, Defendant
Citi Canyon Ltd. Citi Canyon Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kira Alexis Davis +1 212 373 3230 +1 212 492 0230 kdavis@paulweiss.com
Space Andrew Garry Gordon +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 373 2037 agordon@paulweiss.com
No Logo Citigroup Pension Plan Trust, Defendant
No Logo Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc., Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Limited"
No Logo Deborah L. Brice, Defendant
No Logo Deephaven Event Trading Ltd., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ubiquitel Inc.
No Logo Deephaven Growth Opportunities Trading Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Del Mar Master Fund Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Keith Momborquette +1 212 756 2268 +1 212 593 5955 david.momborquette@srz.com
No Logo Diocese of Buffalo Lay Pension Plan, Defendant
No Logo Donald Horwitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Earl & Earl, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Rubenstein +1 718 624 1084 +1 718 624 1980 rubensteinseth@yahoo.com
No Logo Doris Duke Charitable Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy Russell Shattuck, Defendant
No Logo DWS Equity 500 Index Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo DWS Investments VIT Funds, Defendant
No Logo EVOL Capital Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn Melamed & Muffly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan E. Stern +1 212 303 9544 +1 212 888 0255 jstern@beckerglynn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory W. Nye +1 860 240 2715 +1 860 240 2800 gregory.nye@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Seth Meyers +1 212 508 6100 +1 212 508 6101 daniel.meyers@bgllp.com
No Logo Fidelity Advisor Series I, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Select Portfolios, Defendant
No Logo Fiduciary Trust Company International, Defendant
No Logo First New York Securities Llc, Defendant
No Logo Gabelli Associates Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Roger Cappucci +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 vcappucci@entwistle-law.com
No Logo Gabelli Multimedia Partners, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Gabelli Performance Partnership, L.P., Defendant
Goldman Sachs Variable Insurance Trust Goldman Sachs Variable Insurance Trust, Defendant
No Logo Haidee W. Flinders, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Wickline, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donovan Lourde Wickline +1 718 858 1443 +1 718 625 6141 wickline@wicklinelaw.com
No Logo Halcyon Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo Halcyon Offshore Enchanced Master Fund LP, Defendant
ING Capital LLC ING Capital LLC, Defendant
ING Groep NV Unknown Role, ING Groep NV
Unknown Role, Cadiz Land Co Inc
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B Pension Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brady, McGuire & Steinberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Steinberg +1 914 478 4293 +1 914 478 4142 james@bradymcguiresteinberg.com
No Logo Ishares Trust, Defendant
No Logo John Maher, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
No Logo JPMorgan Case Funding Inc. , Defendant
No Logo JPMorgan Trust II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia Llosa Chang +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3792 alicia.chang@davispolk.com
Space Mathew Scott Miller +1 212 450 3983 mathew.miller@dpw.com
Space Elliot Moskowitz +1 212 450 4241 +1 212 450 3241 elliot.moskowitz@dpw.com
No Logo Langdon Street Capital, L.P, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seward & Kissel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark D. Kotwick +1 212 574 1200 +1 212 480 8421 Kotwick@sewkis.com
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristie Marie Blase +1 212 756 2466 +1 212 593 5955 kristie.blase@srz.com
Space WILLIAM HAYWARD GUSSMAN, JR. +1 212 756 2000 bill.gussman@srz.com
No Logo Loeb Arbitrage B Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo Loeb Offshore B Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Loeb Offshore Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Loeb Partners Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Lola L. Horwitz, Defendant
No Logo Madison Sqquare Investors Large-CAP Enhanced Index Collective Fund, Defendant
No Logo Madison Square Investors U.S. Large-Cap Core 130/20 Collective Fund, Defendant
No Logo Mainstay VP Funds Trust, Defendant
No Logo Master Investment Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo MB Financial Bank, NA, Defendant
No Logo Mercer Funds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilks, Lukoff & Bracegirdle, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thad J. Bracegirdle +1 302 225 0855 Tbracegirdle@wlblaw.com
No Logo Natixis Financial Products LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Gilbert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Rocco Serritella +1 212 468 4800 +1 212 468 4888 jserritella@dglaw.com
No Logo Ner York City Firefighters' Variable Supplements Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Gary Lipkin +1 212 788 0704 +1 212 788 0937 alipkin@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Normandy Hill Master Fund L.p., Defendant
No Logo Opportunity Partners, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David C. McGrail

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Charles McGrail +1 646 290 6496 +1 646 314 0064 dmcgrail@davidmcgraillaw.com
No Logo Oppurtunity Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo Pavers and Road Builders District Council Pension Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GORLICK, KRAVITZ & LISTHAUS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deke W. Bond +1 212 269 2500 +1 212 269 2540 dbond@gkllaw.com
Space Barbara Suzanne Mehlsack +1 212 269 2500 +1 212 269 2540 BMehlsack@gkllaw.com
No Logo Quantitative Master Series LLC, Defendant
No Logo RBC Captial Markets, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Reform Pension Board Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Fama +1 212 509 9400 +1 212 509 9492 rfama@cozen.com
No Logo Sanford C Bernstein Fund Inc, Defendant
No Logo Scotia Capital Inc., Defendant
No Logo State Street Bank And Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Stiching Pensioenfonds Campina, Defendant
No Logo Stichting Pensioenfonds Campina, Defendant
No Logo Tax Managed Opportunity Fund, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Te Calel Portfolio Ltd., Defendant
No Logo The Alliance Bernstein Port folios, Defendant
Bank of New York Mellon Corporation Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Bank of New York Mellon"
No Logo The Church Pension Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C. D'Agostino +1 860 240 2731 +1 860 240 2818 michael.dagostino@bingham.com
No Logo The Consolidated Edision Retirement Plan, Defendant
No Logo The Dreyfus Corporation, Defendant
No Logo The Mainstay Funds, Defendant
No Logo The Mainstay Funds Trust, Defendant
No Logo The Northern Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo The Reader's Digest Association, Inc Retirement Plan, Defendant
No Logo The Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Timothy R. Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Tompkins Financial Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Earl & Earl, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell Edgar Maines +1 607 279 1775 +1 607 273 6802 remaines@yahoo.com
No Logo United Teamsters Pension Fund A, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cary Kane LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Robert Pergue +1 212 868 6300 +1 212 868 6302 cpergue@carykanelaw.com
No Logo Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander R. Bilus +1 215 994 2608 +1 215 655 2608 sandy.bilus@dechert.com
Space Michael S. Doluisio +1 215 994 2325 +1 215 994 2222 michael.doluisio@dechert.com
Space Scott Cameron Kessenick +1 212 698 3821 +1 212 698 3599 scott.kessenick@dechert.com
No Logo Variable Insurance Products Fund, Defendant
No Logo Variable Insurance Products Fund III, Defendant
No Logo Carol E Newman, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaeckle Fleischmann & Mugel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell J. Banas, Jr. +1 716 856 0600 +1 716 856 0432 mbanas@jaeckle.com
No Logo Cassandra Trading Group LLC, ADR Provider
No Logo Cutler Group LP, ADR Provider
No Logo Ramius Securities, LLC, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett D. Jaffe +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 brett.jaffe@alston.com
Space STEVEN L. PENARO +1 212 210 9400 steve.penaro@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie Anita Grossman +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 mgrossman@cohengresser.com
No Logo Defendants' Executive Committee, All Defendants

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Charles Bohan +1 312 902 5200 +1 312 577 4734 david.bohan@kattenlaw.com
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 632
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (282) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7367 in case 11-md-2296) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCES OF DAVID S. MORDKOFF AND REMOVAL FROM ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David Steve Mordkoff terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ras) Modified on 4/25/2018 (ras). (Entered: 04/25/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND ECF NOTICES. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED.(Attorney Tamar Schwartz Wise terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 1:11-cv-09598-RJS. (ras) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND ECF NOTICES. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Tamar Schwartz Wise terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS. (ras) Modified on 3/19/2018 (ras). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND ECF NOTICES. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Matthew Lawrence Elkin terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/15/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 1:11-cv-09598-RJS(jwh) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND ECF NOTICES. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Matthew Lawrence Elkin terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/15/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 1:11-cv-09598-RJS(jwh) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew Lawrence Elkin on behalf of Reform Pension Board Trust. New Address: Cozen O'Connor, 45 Broadway Atrium, Suite 1600, New York, New York, USA 10006, (212) 453-3786. (Elkin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lawrence Elkin on behalf of Reform Pension Board Trust. (Elkin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Re Group Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER in case 1:11-cv-04522-RJS; granting (6483) Letter Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ajs) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Alexander R. Bilus for Defendant Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS(mro) Modified on 12/9/2014 (mro). (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Todd Steinberg on behalf of Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS(Steinberg, Stuart) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Monica K. Hinman on June 27, 2013 . Document filed by Monika K HinmanFiled In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brendon) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Submission of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record and Proposed Order). Document filed by Ramius Securities, LLC. (Grossman, Melanie) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Lawrence Penaro on behalf of Ramius Securities, LLC. (Penaro, Steven) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        SUPPLEMENTAL CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION ANDPROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER: Named Defendants Counsel may make any or all of its eleven proposed motions to dismiss, so long as the initial briefs are limited to a combined 250 pages. These initial briefs shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014. The response briefs shall also be limited to a combined 250 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014. The reply briefs, if any, shall be limited to a combined 100 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014. Shareholder Liaison Counsel is directed to file its proposed global motion to dismiss Count 1 on behalf of all 5,200 Shareholder Defendants. The initial brief shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The response brief shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The reply brief, if any, shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014, and shall be no longer than 15 pages. ( Motions due by 5/23/2014. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 7/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER IN AID OF MEDIATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Court shall retain jurisdiction to interpret and enforce this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer Lynn Zordani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9431269. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassandra Trading Group LLC, Cutler Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zordani, Jennifer) Modified on 3/7/2014 (wb). (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland H. Chait on behalf of B H Gerald Rogers MD Ltd Employee Pension Trust U/A 07/01/84, B H Gerald Rogers, Trustee, Mary Sutliffe Loucks Trust Portfolio 835, Mary Sutliffe Loucks, Trustee, Ralph Loucks Trust, Ralph B Loucks, Trustee, Robert B Greene Jr Trust U/A 11/06/86, Robert B Greene Jr, Trustee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Chait, Leland) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Sempra Energy, Trustee, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kurt E Wilson on behalf of Warren J. Eide. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Wilson, Kurt) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of SDG&E Nuc Facilities NQ CPUC Decom Master Trust For Songs, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of Okabena US Core Equity Fund, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb). (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of David R. Coggins, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb). (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Richard J. Leamy, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9354696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Leamy, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Brian E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CATHOLIC UNITED INVESTMENT TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric David Madden on behalf of BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LTD. F/K/A BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore Ltd., Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Carlson Capital LP. New Address: Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, 1601 Elm Street, Ste. 4900, Dallas, Texas, USA 75201, 214-420-8900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Madden, Eric) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting (2924) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Bradford Kent terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Scott Cameron Kessenick is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendant in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/06/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS (ama) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting (2946) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (248) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-cv-09319-RJS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Scott Cameron Kessenick is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, as Custodian of John Maher TRA Rollover Account in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Scott Cameron Kessenick to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw of Counsel. Document filed by Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS(Doluisio, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MASTER CASE ORDER NO.4: For the purpose of facilitating the efficient administration of these cases, including the preparation of a protocol for the future consideration of additional pre-answer motions to dismiss ("Phase Two Motions"), I and the Court having received submissions from Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel and Defendants' Liaison Counsel (after consultation with their Executive Committees) previously designated herein, it is further set forth within this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(rsh) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE. by Joseph F. Kun. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(sc) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Sims dated 10/15/2013 re: Accordingly, I respectfully request that I be removed from the Court's electronic filing notifications for this action. I have been informed by the court clerk that I am required to make this application by letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Douglas J. Smillie, New Attorney: Kevin Kennedy, Address: Blake Kirchner, Symonds Larson, Kennedy and Smith, 535 Griswold, Suite 1432, Detroit, Michigan, USA 48226, 313-961-7321. Document filed by Timothy R. Kennedy. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Smillie, Douglas) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Eugene J. Geekie, Jr. of the law firm of Freeborn & Peters LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendants Charles T. Brumback, Kimberly C. Brumback and Brumback Family, LLC, replacing Jeffrey David Eaton, Susan P. Persichilli and Louis T. DeLucia, of the law firm of Schiff Hardin LLP, who hereby withdraw as counsel of record for the heretofore named Defendants and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013, the Court concludes that Section 546(e) does not preempt the Individual Creditors SLCFC claims, but that Section 362(a)(1) nonetheless deprives the Individual Creditors of standing to avoid the same transactions that the Committee is simultaneously suing to avoid; Defendants motion to dismiss is therefore granted; accordingly, the cases listed in Exhibit A of the Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013 and this judgment are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/27/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ml) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), # 2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendants Variable Insurance Products Fund, Variable Insurance Products Fund III, Fidelity Rutland Square Trust II, and Fidelity Select Portfolios, which have neither moved for summary judgment nor answered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS(ama) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (164) Motion for Susan A. Yohe, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09319-RJS; granting [] Motion for Susan A. Yohe, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Susan A. Yohe, Esq. is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Black Box Corporation in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/05/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS(ama) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund GP LLC, Other Affiliate New York Life Trust Company for Madison Sqquare Investors Large-CAP Enhanced Index Collective Fund. Document filed by Madison Sqquare Investors Large-CAP Enhanced Index Collective Fund, Mainstay VP Funds Trust, The Mainstay Funds, The Mainstay Funds Trust.(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Collective Index Fund, Mainstay VP Funds Trust, Madison Sqquare Investors Large-CAP Enhanced Index Collective Fund, Mainstay VP Funds Trust, The Mainstay Funds, The Mainstay Funds Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09319-RJS(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(sjo) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING PROTOCOL GOVERNING RETENTION AND DISCOVERY OF DOCUMENTS HELD BY COURT-APPOINTED EXAMINER, KENNETH N. KLEE, ESQ. It is ORDERED as follows: The Protocol Governing Retention and Discovery of Documents Held by Court-Appointed Examiner, Kenneth N. Klee, Esq. attached hereto as Exhibit A is APPROVED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD OMNIBUS MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINTS: granting (323) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting (765) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04900-WHP; granting (69) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-05136-WHP; granting (2166) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting (215) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09319-WHP; granting (170) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09406-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09407-WHP; granting (291) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09408-WHP; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; granting (159) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09510-WHP; granting (147) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09511-WHP; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09512-WHP; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09514-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09515-WHP; granting (232) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09568-WHP; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09569-WHP; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09570-WHP; granting (579) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; granting (196) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; granting (99) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09591-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; granting (162) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09588-WHP; granting (220) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09600-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09599-WHP; granting (222) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09598-WHP; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09596-WHP; granting (197) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09594-WHP; granting (155) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09587-WHP; granting (259) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09585-WHP; granting (108) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09581-WHP; granting (188) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09582-WHP; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09584-WHP; granting (241) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; granting (239) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09571-WHP; granting (328) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; granting (228) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00062-WHP; granting (223) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00065-WHP; granting (706) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00550-WHP; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00551-WHP; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00552-WHP; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP; granting (185) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00555-WHP; granting (755) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-02652-WHP; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-04539-WHP; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-06055-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (25) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (191) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (110) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (359) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (446) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (148) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (200) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (40) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (178) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (18) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (181) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (67) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (184) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (191) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (179) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (58) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (41) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (61) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (75) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09587-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (129) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (87) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (273) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (24) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (103) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (169) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (136) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (30) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (154) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (6) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (273) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (152) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (41) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (295) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (34) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (531) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (20) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (121) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (86) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (48) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (102) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (133) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (228) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (601) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (166) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (53) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (39) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (74) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (297) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (174) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (66) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (130) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (130) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (130) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04900-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (74) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (74) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (74) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (74) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-05136-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (140) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (176) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (115) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (176) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (92) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (176) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09406-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (58) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (93) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (96) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (113) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (59) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (9) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09407-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (51) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (187) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (211) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (193) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (98) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (297) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (77) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (96) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (7) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09408-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (86) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (117) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (96) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (116) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (136) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (3) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09510-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (152) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (145) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (113) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09511-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (124) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (73) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (133) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (133) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (79) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (133) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (78) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (92) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09512-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (173) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (148) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (169) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (92) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (161) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (168) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (115) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (93) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (7) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09514-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (84) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (86) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (85) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09515-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (136) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (188) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (130) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (182) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (212) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (99) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (116) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (220) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09568-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (140) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (140) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (103) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (140) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (92) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (140) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (119) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (102) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (104) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (5) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09569-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (206) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (160) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (178) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (97) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (207) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (175) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (103) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (207) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (119) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09570-WHP; granting (422) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (34) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (207) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (173) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (382) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (129) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (190) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (203) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (60) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (382) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (96) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (103) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (344) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (242) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (78) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (35) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (85) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (187) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (143) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (120) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (207) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (102) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (205) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (127) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (103) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (1) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (104) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (102) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (66) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (104) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (104) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (104) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09591-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (77) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (103) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (94) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (9) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (124) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (87) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (167) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting []
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for March 1, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. on the Phase One Motions to Dismiss and on the Tendering PHONES Holders' Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs is adjourned to April 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(pl) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of David C. Bohan in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Normandy Hill Master Fund LP served on 1/18/2013, answer due 2/8/2013. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having received the attached letter request of Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Camden Asset Management LP, and certain of their affiliates (collectively, the "Tendering PHONES Holders") to file a motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this multidistrict litigation, dated November 13,2012, the following briefing schedule is entered: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Langdon Street Capital, L.P.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Kotwick, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Substitution of Party, Counsel, and Liaison Counsel [Docket No.2179], Notice of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints [Docket No. 2166], Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion [Docket No.2170], Declaration of David Zensky [Docket No. 2167], Declaration of Jay Teitelbaum, Esq. [Docket No. 2168] and Declaration of James S. Green, Jr. [Docket No. 2169[ on 1/11/13. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Mike Eugene Abernethy, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rdz) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of James S. Green, Jr. in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), # 2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Variable Insurance Products Fund served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Variable Insurance Products Fund III served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. The Mainstay Funds served on 10/15/2012, answer due 11/5/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. The Mainstay Funds Trust served on 10/15/2012, answer due 11/5/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. The Alliancebernstein Portfolios served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Sanford C. Bernstein Fund, Inc. served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Ramius Securities, LLC served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Natixis Financial Products LLC served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Mainstay VP Funds Trust served on 10/15/2012, answer due 11/5/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Madison Sqquare Investors Large-CAP Enhanced Index Collective Fund served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Madison Square Investors U.S. Large-Cap Core 130/20 Collective Fund served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Loeb Arbitrage Fund on 10/15/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. JPMorgan Case Funding Inc. served on 10/15/2012, answer due 11/5/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 10/15/2012, answer due 11/5/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. John Maher served on 10/20/2012, answer due 11/13/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. ING Capital LLC served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Halcyon Offshore Enchanced Master Fund LP served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Halcyon Fund LP served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Goldman Sachs Variable Insurance Trust served on 10/15/2012, answer due 11/5/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Fidelity Select Portfolios served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Fidelity Rutland Square Trust II on 10/16/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Fidelity Advisor Series I served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. DWS Investments VIT Funds served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. DWS Equity 500 Index Portfolio served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Del Mar Master Fund Ltd. served on 11/6/2012, answer due 11/27/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Limited served on 11/1/2012, answer due 11/26/2012. Service was made by Hague Convention. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Black Box Corporation served on 10/16/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Alliancebernstein Trust on 10/16/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Northern Trust Corporation for The Northern Trust Company. Document filed by The Northern Trust Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Rosenzweig, David) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Andrew Rosenzweig on behalf of NORTHERN TRUST ENHANCED LARGE CAP FUND, NORTHERN TRUST GLOBAL INVESTMENT, NT Collective Russell 1000 Value Index Fund-Lending, NT Collective S&P 500 Index Fund, NT Collective S&P 500 Index Fund - Non Lending, NT Collective US MarketCap Equity Index Fund - Lending, NTCC Advisors Funds for Employee Benefit Trust, NTCC Channing Mid Cap Value AFEBT, NTCC Channing Mid Cap Value Sudan Free Fund AFEBT, NTCC LSV Mid Cap Value Fund AFGT, NTGI-QM Collective Daily Quant Pan S&P 500 Equity Fund - Lending, NTGI-QM Collective Daily S&P 500 Citigroup/Value Equity Index Fund - Lending, NTGI-QM Collective Daily S&P500 Special Purpose Equity Index Fund-Lending, NTGI-QM Collective Daily US MarketCap Equity Special Purpose Index Fund - Lending, NTGI-QM Common Daily Labor Select Russell 3000 Equity Index Fund-Lending, NTGI-QM Common Daily S&P 500 Equity Index Fund - Lending, NTGI-QM Common Daily S&P 500 Equity Index Fund - Non Lending, NTGI-QM Common Daily US Marketcap Equity Index Fund-Lending, NTGI-QM Common Monthly Quant Index Plus S&P 500 Equity Fund-Non Lending, NTGI-QM Labor Select Collective Daily Russell 3000 Equity Index Fund-Lending, Northern Enhanced Large Cap Fund, Northern Funds - Enhanced Large Cap Value Fund, Northern Funds - Large Cap Value Fund, Northern Funds-Enhanced Large Cap Fund, Northern Institutional Fund Equity Index Portfolio, Northern Large Cap Value Fund, Northern Multi-Manager Mid Cap Fund - LSV Asset Management, Northern Stock Index Fund, Northern Trust Bank, FSB, Northern Trust Company, Northern Trust Company, Northern Trust Company Pension Trust, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Alpheus L Elus 1993 Grandchildren's Trust FBO Christine Gagnon, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Alpheus L Elus 1993 Grandchildren's Trust FBO Helen Jo Cahalin, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Alpheus L Elus 1993 Great Grandchildren's Trust, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Alpheus L Elus 1993 Trust FBO Carol Martin, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NT Collective Russell 1000 Value Index Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NT Collective S&P 500 Index Fund, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NT Collective S&P 500 Index Fund - Non Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NT Collective US MarketCap Equity Index Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTCC Advisors Funds for Employee Benefit Trust, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTCC Channing MId Cap Value AFEBT, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTCC Channing Mid Cap Value Sudan Free Fund AFEBT, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTGI-QM Collective Daily Quant Pan S&P 500 Equity Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTGI-QM Collective Daily S&P 500 Citigroup/Value Equity Index Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTGI-QM Collective Daily US MarketCap Equity Special Purpose Index Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTGI-QM Common Daily S&P 500 Equity Index Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTGI-QM Common Daily S&P 500 Equity Index Fund - Non Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Northern Enhanced Large Cap Fund, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Northern Institutional Fund Equity Index Portfolio, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Northern Large Cap Value Fund, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Northern Multi-Manager Mid Cap Fund - LSV Asset Management, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Northern Stock Index Fund, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Terry Diamond IRA, Northern Trust Corporation, Northern Trust Global Advisors Inc., Northern Trust Global Investments (improperly named), Northern Trust Investments N.A., Northern Trust Investments, Inc., Northern Trust Large Cap Value Fund, Northern Trust N A, Northern Trust Value Investors(a division of Northern Trust Investments, Inc. f/k/a Northern Trust Investments, N.A.), Northern Trust Value Investors(A division of Northern Trust Investments, Inc. formerly known as Northern Trust Investments, N.A.), The Northern Trust Company as Trustee, General Dynamcis Corporation VEBA Trust, Northern Trust Investments, Inc., Northern Trust Value Investors(A division of Northern Trust Investments, Inc. ), Northern Funds, Northern Multi-Manager Mid-Cap Fund, Northern Trust CC AFGT, Northern Trust CC EBT, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NT Collective Russell 1000 Value Index Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for NTGI-QM Collective Daily Quant Pan S&P 500 Equity Fund - Lending, Northern Trust Company as Trustee for Northern Enhanced Large Cap Fund, Northern Funds-Large Cap Value Fund, The Northern Trust Company, The Northern Trust Company(in its capacity as trustee of the Master Trust between Pfizer Inc and the Northern Trust Company (as successor to Wyeht Master Trust)), The Northern Trust Company, The Northern Trust Company(As Trustee, General Dynamics Corporation Veba Trust), The Northern Trust Company as Trustee, General Dynamics Coropration VEBA Trust, Northern Trust, N.A., The Northern Trust in the Capacity as Trustee Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Rosenzweig, David) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Jan Banas, Jr on behalf of Carol E Newman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Banas, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ING Groep NV for ING Capital LLC. Document filed by ING Capital LLC.(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of ING Capital LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Del Mar Master Fund Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Momborquette, David) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Del Mar Master Fund Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Blase, Kristie) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Del Mar Master Fund Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Momborquette, David) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Deephaven Event Trading Ltd., Deephaven Growth Opportunities Trading Ltd. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/19/2012) (cd) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Halcyon Fund LP, Halcyon Offshore Enchanced Master Fund LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Blase, Kristie) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Halcyon Fund LP, Halcyon Offshore Enchanced Master Fund LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Gussman, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hayward Gussman, Jr on behalf of Halcyon Fund LP, Halcyon Offshore Enchanced Master Fund LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Gussman, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDIVIDUAL CREDITOR PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS SCHEDULE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3 [Docket No. 1395], Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs"), and Plaintiffs William A. Niese et al. (the "Retiree Plaintiffs" and, together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Individual Creditor Plaintiffs") hereby give notice that they have dismissed the actions listed below without prejudice solely against the corresponding defendants listed below (collectively, the "Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendants"): For the avoidance of doubt, and pursuant to paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3, such dismissals shall be without prejudice to: (i) each Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant's inclusion in the putative class of defendants; and (ii) the Individual Creditor Plaintiffs' ability to reassert claims against any Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant as a named defendant if subsequent information later reveals that any such Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant received greater than $100,000 in Shareholder Transfers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund, Alliance Capital Group Trust, Archdiocesan Pension Plan of the Archdiocese of New York, Bank of America, N.A., Black Box Corporation, Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A., Blackrock Variable Series Funds, Inc, Deborah L. Brice, Citi Canyon Ltd., Citigroup Pension Plan Trust, Deephaven Event Trading Ltd., Deephaven Growth Opportunities Trading Ltd., Defendants' Executive Committee, Diocese of Buffalo Lay Pension Plan, Doris Duke Charitable Foundation, EVOL Capital Management, LLC, Fiduciary Trust Company International, First New York Securities LLC, Gabelli Associates Fund, Gabelli Multimedia Partners, L.P., Gabelli Performance Partnership, L.P., Donald Horwitz, Lola L. Horwitz, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B Pension Fund, JPMorgan Trust II, Langdon Street Capital, L.P, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Loeb Arbitrage B Fund LP, Loeb Offshore B Fund, Ltd, Loeb Offshore Fund, Ltd, Loeb Partners Corporation, MB Financial Bank, N.A., Master Investment Portfolio, Mercer Funds, Natixis Financial Products LLC, Ner York City Firefighters' Variable Supplements Fund, Opportunity Partners, LP, Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, Pavers and Road Builders District Council Pension Fund, Quantitative Master Series LLC, RBC Captial Markets, LLC, Ramius Securities, LLC, Reform Pension Board Trust, Scotia Capital Inc., Dorothy Russell Shattuck, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stichting Pensioenfonds Campina, Tax Managed Opportunity Fund, LLC, Te Calel Portfolio, Ltd., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Church Pension Fund, The Consolidated Edision Retirement Plan, The Dreyfus Corporation, The Northern Trust Company, The Northern Trust Company, The Reader's Digest Association, Inc Retirement Plan, The Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, Tompkins Financial Corporation, United Teamsters Pension Fund A, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account, iShares Trust, Del Mar Master Fund Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Limited, DWS Equity 500 Index Portfolio, DWS Investments VIT Funds, Fidelity Advisor Series I, Fidelity Select Portfolios, Fiduciary Trust Company International, Goldman Sachs Variable Insurance Trust, Halcyon Fund LP, Halcyon Offshore Enchanced Master Fund LP, ING Capital LLC, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B Pension Fund, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Case Funding Inc., Madison Sqquare Investors Large-CAP Enhanced Index Collective Fund, Madison Square Investors U.S. Large-Cap Core 130/20 Collective Fund, John Maher, Mainstay VP Funds Trust, Normandy Hill Master Fund LP, Oppurtunity Partners LP, Sanford C. Bernstein Fund, Inc., Stiching Pensioenfonds Campina, The Alliancebernstein Portfolios, The Mainstay Funds, The Mainstay Funds Trust, Variable Insurance Products Fund, Variable Insurance Products Fund III.Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(tro) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Anita Grossman on behalf of Ramius Securities, LLC (Grossman, Melanie) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett D. Jaffe on behalf of Ramius Securities, LLC (Jaffe, Brett) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Tanya A. Bosi in Support re: 164 MOTION for Susan A. Yohe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7962745. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Black Box Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing regarding Susan A. Yohe, # 2 Exhibit Text of Propsed Order)(Bosi, Tanya) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Susan A. Yohe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7962745. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Black Box Corporation.(Bosi, Tanya) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tanya Domenica Bosi on behalf of Black Box Corporation (Bosi, Tanya) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Rocco Serritella on behalf of Natixis Financial Products LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Serritella, James) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Motion To Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6), And The Exhibit Thereto, And (ii) Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion, And The Exhibit Thereto on 11/6/2012. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Responses due by 12/21/2012 Return Date set for 3/1/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Steven R. Schoenfeld dated 10/24/2012 re: I request that the Court so order the substitution of Robinson & Cole LLP for Dorsey & Whitney LLP with respect to my role as a member of the Defendants' Executive Committees under Master Case Order No. 3. The enclosed notice of the submission of this letter requesting this change has been sent to all counsel via ECF filing in 12 MC 2296. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/26/2012). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Docket entry to be made in 12mc2296, 11md2296 and member cases as per Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Doluisio, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Kessenick, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Vanguard Fiduciary Trust, as Custodian of John Maher IRA Rollover Account Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Bilus, Alexander) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO HAIDEE W. FLINDERS:Pursuant to paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3 (11 MD 2296 Doc. 1395),plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes (collectively, "Plaintiffs"), hereby dismiss this action without prejudice against defendant Haidee W. Flinders, who, based upon information currently in the possession, custody, or control of Plaintiffs, received less than $100,000 in Shareholder Transfers (as defined in the Complaint filed in this action). Such dismissal is without prejudice to (i) such dismissed defendant's inclusion in the putative class of defendants alleged in connection with this consolidated multi district litigation; and (ii) Plaintiffs' ability to reassert claims against any dismissed defendant that subsequent information later reveals received greater than $100,000 in Shareholder Transfers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/10/2012) (ama) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service re: (1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, (1419 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pleadings Relating to Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints re: (1370 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Ruanwil LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Stanton R. Cook Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service of Pleading re: (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial case management conference having been conducted on July 10, 2012, the following schedule is entered on consent:1. Defendants in the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, et al v. FitzSimons, et al., 12 Civ 2652 (WHP) (the "Committee Action") are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multi district litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. See Manual for Complex Litig., § 10.221 (4th ed. 2004). The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by August 3, 2012. This Court appoints Grippo & Elden LLC to act as interim liaison counsel for defendants in the Committee Action.2.If defendants in the Committee Action cannot agree on a proposed organizational structure, competing applications for executive committees should be docketed on 12 MC 2296 and all related actions and submitted to chambers no later than August 3, 2012.3. Interim liaison counsel are directed to submit a proposed Master Case Order No. 3 consistent with this Court's directives by August 7, 2012. Where the parties cannot agree, they should submit alternative proposals for the Court's consideration. If necessary, the parties are permitted to submit letter memoranda in support of their respective positions. 4.Plaintiffs are directed to submit a letter memorandum outlining the limited discovery they now wish to pursue by July 26, 2012. Defendants shall submit a letter memorandum in response by August 16, 2012 5.This multi district litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(js) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL:PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the law firm of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendant Denise Meck, and G. Douglas Kilday and the law firm of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody hereby withdraw as counsel of record for Denise Meck and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. Denise Meck hereby requests that all pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers given or filed in the above-captioned matter be given and served upon the following person at the address, telephone number, and e- mail address indicated in this order., Attorney G Douglas Kilday terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EVOL Capital Management, LLC.(Stern, Jordan) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan E. Stern on behalf of EVOL Capital Management, LLC (Stern, Jordan) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MASTER CASE ORDER No. 2: The Clerk of the Court (the "Clerk") is directed to transfer docket entry ECF No. 692 (Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) from 11 MD 2296 to the master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296 and number it ECF No. 18 on 12 MC 2296. The Clerk is directed to docket this Master Case Order No. 2 as ECF No. 19 on 12 MC 2296, and docket it on 11 MD 2296 and on all of the consolidated actions. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is directed to add the following plaintiff to the master case file: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. (the "Unsecured Creditors Committee"). Accordingly, the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 should list only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees, and (v) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. Interim Liaison Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee: This Court appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP ("Zuckerman Spaeder") as interim liaison counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee and as further set forth in this order. All pending motions for substitution of counsel are granted. Notwithstanding the stay, parties may make motions to substitute counsel, and all such motions shall be docketed only on 11 MD 2296 and the relevant related actions and shall include a proposed order. Any party submitting a motion for substitution of counsel is directed to send a courtesy copy of the proposed order to chambers. No defendant has opposed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. The time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve all summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21) in all actions, and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), is enlarged through and including August 31, 2012, retroactive to March 29, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments in any action on or after March 29, 2012, including defendants within the putative defendant classes who Plaintiffs determine should be individually named, the time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve the summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21), and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), shall expire no earlier than August 31, 2012. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all interim liaison counsel on July 10, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss, inter alia, Defendants' co-interim liaison counsel's proposed organizational structure, a preliminary case management schedule, including a schedule for any motions to dismiss, the continuance of the stay, and any other issues counsel wish to raise. Notwithstanding Bankruptcy Judge Kevin J. Carey's Order Partially Lifting Stay of Adversary Proceedings and State Law Fraudulent Conveyance Actions, dated March 15, 2012, this multidistrict litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Daniel S. Meyers, New Attorney: Jordan E. Stern. Document filed by EVOL Capital Management, LLC.(Stern, Jordan) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Guillermo Sepulveda on behalf of TradeStation Securities, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Sepulveda, Jose) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Clyde Forbes on behalf of 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Forbes, Carl) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Mordkoff, David) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Frischer, Harry) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Doris Duke Charitable Foundation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Doris Duke Charitable Foundation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Stone, Alan) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund, Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund, Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensioenfonds Campina served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. Service was made by Hague Convention. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Dorothy Russell Shattuck Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deke Wayne Bond on behalf of Pavers and Road Builders District Council Pension Fund (Bond, Deke) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Church Pension Fund, The Church Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of The Church Pension Fund, The Church Pension Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Andrew N. Goldfarb in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Vincent A Badali, The Spurgeon Family Limited Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Opportunity Partners, LP.(McGrail, David) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles McGrail on behalf of Opportunity Partners, LP (McGrail, David) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Gary Lipkin on behalf of Ner York City Firefighters' Variable Supplements Fund, The Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York (Lipkin, Andrew) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,. Scotia Capital Inc. served on 2/6/2012, answer due 2/27/2012. Service was accepted by Linda Holmes, Compliance Officer. Service was made by personal service under the Hague Convention. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thad J. Bracegirdle on behalf of Mercer Funds (Bracegirdle, Thad) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barbara Suzanne Mehlsack on behalf of Pavers and Road Builders District Council Pension Fund (Mehlsack, Barbara) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alliance Capital Group Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Alliance Capital Group Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order dated February 14, 2012 on 2/15/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Master Investment Portfolio.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Quantitative Master Series LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by iShares Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blackrock Variable Series Funds, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Blackrock Variable Series Funds, Inc, Master Investment Portfolio, Quantitative Master Series LLC, iShares Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MASTER CASE ORDER No. 1: In the exercise of its informed discretion, this Court restructures this multidistrict litigation as follows: The Clerk is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The Clerk is directed to transfer the following docket entries from 11 MD 2296 to 12 MC 2296: ECF Nos. 1 (Transfer Order), 17 (Master Stay Order), 39 (Pilot Project Removal Order), 41 (Protective Order No.1), 62 (Pro Hac Order), 386 (Status Letter Order), 499 (Notice of Case Reassignment), and 559 (Temporary Stay Order). Those docket entries are to be numbered ECF Nos. 1-8, respectively, on 12 MC 2296. This Order shall be docketed as ECF No. 9 in 12 MC 2296 and docketed on all matters consolidated in 11 MD 2296. This Order and all subsequent docket entries on 12 MC 2296 are to be docketed simultaneously on 11 MD 2296. In addition, each subsequent filing by the parties on 12 MC 2296 or 11 MD 2296 shall indicate whether the filing should be docketed in all related actions or only in specified related actions. Counsel are reminded that filings are to be spread across all related actions only when necessary. Papers filed inappropriately will be stricken from the docket. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is further directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, and (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees. Plaintiffs (i)-(iii) collectively are hereafter referred to as the "Note Holders" and plaintiff (iv) is referred to as the "Retirees." Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs: This Court appoints Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") as interim liaison counsel for the Note Holders and Teitelbaum & Baskin, LLP (the "Teitelbaum Firm") as interim liaison counsel for the Retirees. All counsel for plaintiffs are directed to confer for the purpose of identifying who among them intend to submit motion papers or memoranda to this Court, appear in person for conferences, or offer oral arguments to the Court. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a list to the Court identifying such counsel by March 30, 2012. Interim Lead Defendants: Based on a preliminary review of the complaints in the related actions, this Court endeavored to select interim lead defendants with a sufficient financial interest and who represent different classes of shareholders. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following defendants: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, and Mario J. Gabelli, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders. This Court appoints Proskauer Rose LLP (for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation), Kaye Scholer, LLP (for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated), and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP (for Mario J. Gabelli) to act as interim co-liaison counsel for defendants. These firms are collectively referred to as "defendants' interim co-liaison counsel." Defendants are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multidistrict litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by April 20, 2012; as further set forth in this Master Case Order No. 1. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(mro) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Fama on behalf of Reform Pension Board Trust (Fama, Richard) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation. Document filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Gussman, William) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The stay entered in this multi district litigation on December 28, 2012 by Judge Richard J. Holwell (ECF No. 17), and modified by Order dated January 27, 2012 (ECF No. 386), is further modified as follows: No party to this action is permitted to make any motion, file any documents on the docket, or submit any papers to the Clerk's Office or this Court's chambers until further notice from this Court. It is further ordered that all pending motions for admission pro hac vice are denied without prejudice. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate all pending motions for admission pro hac vice. This Court will establish a procedure for attorneys to appear in this action by subsequent order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on all Defendants forthwith. This order relates to all pro hac vice motions filed by attorneys in 11-MD-2296 and all related cases, denying (243) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (244) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (245) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (253) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; denying (320) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (159) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (184) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (185) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (189) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (190) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (191) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (194) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (196) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (203) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (204) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (206) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (217) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (218) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (219) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (222) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (234) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (237) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (258) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (259) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (266) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (267) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (269) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (276) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (279) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (282) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (309) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (311) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (312) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (328) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (332) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (334) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (353) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (354) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (356) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (359) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (361) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (362) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (402) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (405) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (408) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (423) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (440) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (445) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (471) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (474) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (479) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (500) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (503) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (504) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (505) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (506) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (507) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (508) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (510) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (512) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (513) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (514) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (515) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (516) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (517) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (525) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (527) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (533) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (534) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (536) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (539) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (541) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (543) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (548) Motion for Leave to Appear ; denying (552) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (553) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (554) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (555) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (556) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying (167) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (193) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (201) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; denying (75) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; denying (344) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (346) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (352) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (369) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (370) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; denying (126) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; denying (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; denying (178) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (179) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (180) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; denying (55) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; denying (108) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; denying (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (101) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; denying (140) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (152) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (153) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; denying (137) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; denying (212) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; denying (160) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (161) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (162) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; denying (430) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (431) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; denying (65) Motion for Leave to Appear in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; denying (47) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(ft) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Gussman, William) Modified on 2/15/2012 (lb). (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Blase, Kristie) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hayward Gussman, Jr on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Gussman, William) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) Modified on 2/14/2012 (lb). (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Seth Meyers on behalf of EVOL Capital Management, LLC (Meyers, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory W. Nye on behalf of EVOL Capital Management, LLC (Nye, Gregory) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JPMorgan Trust II.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Moskowitz, Elliot) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mathew Scott Miller on behalf of JPMorgan Trust II Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Miller, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alicia Llosa Chang on behalf of JPMorgan Trust II Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Chang, Alicia) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elliot Moskowitz on behalf of JPMorgan Trust II Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09319-WHP(Moskowitz, Elliot) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Jackson, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Richard J. Holwell is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(sjo) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Jackson, Richard) Modified on 2/10/2012 (lb). (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Anthony C. Valiulis for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Valiulis, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db). (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Shawn M. Staples for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Staples, Shawn) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db). (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Clyde Forbes on behalf of Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, The Dreyfus Corporation (Forbes, Carl) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, The Dreyfus Corporation (Mordkoff, David) (Entered: 02/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, The Dreyfus Corporation (Frischer, Harry) (Entered: 02/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Dreyfus Corporation. Document filed by The Dreyfus Corporation.(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 02/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund.(Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 02/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, The Dreyfus Corporation (Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 02/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank J Morales on behalf of Automotive Machinists Pension Trust Fund, MICHAEL HENDRICKSON, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry, Michael Parmalee Welfare and Pension Administration Inc Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Morales, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Natixis Financial Products LLC. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Reform Pension Board Trust. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Doris Duke Charitable Foundation. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Bank Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Citi Canyon Ltd. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Alliance Capital Group Trust. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Bank Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Dreyfus Corporation. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by RBC Capital Markets LLC. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Teachers' Retirement System Of The City Of New York. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Reader's Digest Association Inc. Retirement Plan. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donovan Lourde Wickline on behalf of Haidee W. Flinders (Wickline, Donovan) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Consolidated Edison Retirement Plan,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Tax Managed Opportunity Fund LLC. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by First New York Securities LLC,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Tompkins Financial Corporation f/k/a Tompkins TrustCo, Inc. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by TE Calel Portfolio Ltd. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Northern Trust Company. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by LOEB Arbitrage B Fund LP. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by LOEB Offshore B Fund Ltd. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by LOEB Offshore Fund Ltd. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by LOEB Partners Corporation. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Opportunity Partners LP. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Gabelli Multimedia Partners L.P.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Gabelli Performance Partnership L.P.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Bank Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Gabelli Associates Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Archdiocesan Pension Plan Of The Archdiocese Of New York. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B Pension Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Langdon Street Capital L.P.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, Helpers, Messengers Local 27 Pension Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Donald Horwitz. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Pavers And Road Builders District Council Pension Fund, by and through its Board Of Trustees. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Lola L. Horwitz. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by New York City Firefighters' Variable Supplements Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Haidee W. Flinders. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Bank Of New York Mellon. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Lack, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Fiduciary Trust Company International. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Deephaven Growth Opportunities Trading Ltd. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Deephaven Event Trading Ltd. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Citigroup Pension Plan Trust. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by The Church Pension Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Blackrock Institutional Trust Company N.A. f/k/a Barclays Global Investors, N.A. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Diocese Of Buffalo Lay Pension Plan. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MB Financial, Inc. for MB Financial Bank, N.A.. Document filed by MB Financial Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Dahl, James) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Robert Pergue on behalf of United Teamsters Pension Fund A (Pergue, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Bank Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citigroup Pension Plan Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Gordon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citi Canyon Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Gordon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kira Alexis Davis on behalf of Citi Canyon Ltd., Citigroup Pension Plan Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Davis, Kira) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Garry Gordon on behalf of Citi Canyon Ltd., Citigroup Pension Plan Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Gordon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Bank Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Edgar Maines on behalf of Tompkins Financial Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Maines, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09319-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,. iShares Trust served on 1/12/2012, answer due 2/2/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Hurst on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Hurst, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghan E George on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(George, Meghan) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ice Bear Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Haider, Shan) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Roger Cappucci on behalf of Gabelli Associates Fund, Gabelli Multimedia Partners, L.P., Gabelli Performance Partnership, L.P. (Cappucci, Vincent) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Donald Horwitz.(Rubenstein, Seth) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Kotwick on behalf of Langdon Street Capital, L.P (Kotwick, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Steinberg on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B Pension Fund (Steinberg, James) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 21.3 of the SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions, personal identification including home addresses must be redacted from documents filed with the Court. Accordingly, It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs' request is granted with respect to home addresses in the Complaint. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/21/2011) (js) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' application is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. Should Plaintiffs wish to renew their application, they should include a submission articulating what privacy interests are at stake and why those interests should overcome the strong presumption of public access to court records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a copy of this Order when filing their complaint. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/19/2011) (rjm) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Corporate Parent The Law Debenture Corporation plc for Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust Company. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(mro) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against 1199 SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, 1199SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund, Alliance Capital Group Trust, Archdiocesan Pension Plan of the Archdiocese of New York, Bank of America, N.A., Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A., Blackrock Variable Series Funds, Inc, Deborah L. Brice, Citi Canton, Ltd, Citigroup Pension Plan Trust, Deephaven Event Trading Ltd., Deephaven Growth Opportunities Trading Ltd., Diocese of Buffalo Lay Pension Plan, Doris Duke Charitable Foundation, EVOL Capital Management, LLC, Fiduciary Trust Company International, First New York Securities LLC, Haidee W. Flinders, Gabelli Associates Fund, Gabelli Multimedia Partners, L.P., Gabelli Performance Partnership, L.P., Donald Horwitz, Lola L. Horwitz, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B Pension Fund, JPMorgan Trust II, Langdon Street Capital, L.P, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Loeb Arbitrage B Fund LP, Loeb Offshore B Fund, Ltd, Loeb Offshore Fund, Ltd, Loeb Partners Corporation, Master Investment Portfolio, Mercer Funds, Natixis Financial Products LLC, Ner York City Firefighters' Variable Supplements Fund, Opportunity Partners, LP, Paper Products, Miscellaneous Chauffeurs, Warehousement, Helpers, Messengers, Production and Office Workers Local 27 Pension Fund, Pavers and Road Builders District Council Pension Fund, Quantitative Master Series LLC, RBC Captial Markets, LLC, Reform Pension Board Trust, Scotia Capital Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stichting Pensioenfonds Campina, Tax Managed Opportunity Fund, LLC, Te Calel Portfolio, Ltd., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Church Pension Fund, The Consolidated Edision Retirement Plan, The Dreyfus Corporation, The Northern Trust Company, The Northern Trust Company, The Reader's Digest Association, Inc Retirement Plan, The Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, Tompkins Financial Corporation, United Teamsters Pension Fund A, iShares Trust. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1024867)Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York.(mro) (ama). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 508 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?