RULE 54(b) CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated July 13, 2011, the Court finds no just cause for delay, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), entering final judgment dismissing the defendants identified in Exhibit A. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/14/11) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(ml) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
ORDER that the Court's dismissal of the defendants identified in Exhibit A are certified as final pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)and the Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare and enter a final judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/13/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(ml) Modified on 7/14/2011 (ml). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
ORDER defendant Cherif Sedky is DISMISSED from Barrera,03-7036 and from Salvo, 03-5071. In Tremsky v Laden, 02-7300, defendant Cherif Sedky's unopposed motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant Cherif Sedky is dismissed from all of the above actions. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/20/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(cd) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: It is hereby Ordered that Frederick J. Goetz is admitted pro hac vice. (Pursuant to Chambers instructions the following attorney is admitted for the following parties). (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
NOTICE of Correction to Reference in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc (USA)'s Rule 72 Objections to October 28, 2010 Ruling (Docket Entry 2389) re: (2389 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM) Response,. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
RESPONSE re: (2384 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. (USA)'s Rule 72 Objections to October 28, 2010 Ruling. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND Re Saudi Binladin Group renewed Motion to Dismiss: Responses due by 11/18/2010. Replies due by 12/20/2010. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/8/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(cd) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Timothy McCabe dated 10/4/2010 re: I request that you direct the Clerk of the Court to remove my name and e-mail address from the list of recipients of Notices of Electronic Filings in the above-referenced cases. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/4/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(jmi) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from T. Barry Kingham dated 10/4/2010 re: Counsel request that you direct the Clerk of the Court to remove counsel's name and e-mail address from the Notices of Electronic Filings. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/4/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(jfe) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION that Clifford Chance US, LLP be substituted as attorneys of record for defendant Dubai Islamic Back in place of Zuckerman Gore Brandeis & Crossman, LLP. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(cd) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Alan Todd Dickey is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant NCB in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/7/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
ORDER. Defendant Saudi Binladin Group's application for leave to renew its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim is granted and its tendered motion to dismiss supporting memoranda are accepted for filing. Counsel is directed to file the tendered motion via the Court's ECF system as soon as practicable. Plaintiffs shall submit a consolidated response, not to exceed 45 pages, within 60 days of the electronic filing of Saudi Binladin Group's motion. Saudi Binladin Group may file a reply brief, not to exceed 25 pages, within 30 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/7/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES J. MCGUIRE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO CHANGE COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 1.4. Document filed by Daral Maal Al Islami Trust. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION: That Mishcon de Reya New York LLP of200 Park Avenue, Floor 44, New York, NY 10166, telephone (212) 612-3270, facsimile (212) 612-3297, be substituted as attorneys of record for defendant DMI Administrative Services S.A. in this consolidated action in place of Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP as of the date hereof. Attorney James Joseph McGuire for DMI Administrative Services S.A. and DMI Administrative Services, S.A. added. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/18/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Mishcon de Reya New York LLP of 200 Park Avenue, Floor 44, New York. NY 10166, telephone (212) 612-3270, facsimile (212) 612-3297, be substituted as attorneys of record for defendant Dar Al-Maal Al-Islami Trust in the above-captioned consolidated action in place of Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP as of the date hereof. Attorney James Joseph McGuire for Daral Maal Al Islami Trust added. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/18/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Other than to the limited extent indicated herein, defendant's Dubai Islamic Bank's motion to dismiss, pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6), for failure to state a claim is denied. Dubai Islamic Bank's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper service of process, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) and (5) respectively, is also denied. The remaining moving defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), are granted. Final judgment is entered as to those thirty seven defendants, as well as to the twelve additional defendants whom plaintiffs concede dismissal is warranted. As the Court indicated at the April 15, 2010 conference, the parties shall immediately meet and confer, and propose to the magistrate judge a schedule, commencing on or after July 15, 2010, to complete discovery in all cases. Terminated all motions as per instructions of chambers. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Document filed by C. O'Neill. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
MOTION for Colin Sullivan Stretch to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Document filed by Saudi Joint Relief Committee.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kellogg, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
AFFIRMATION of Robert T. Haefele (corrected) in Opposition re: (2110 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
AFFIRMATION of Robert T. Haefele in Opposition re: (2110 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority in Relation to All Pending Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit D part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Kellogg on behalf of Saudi Joint Relief Committee Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kellogg, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD) MOTION to Strike Document No. [MDL 2232].. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. granting (245) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (548) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (2208) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (336) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD; granting (272) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (460) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD; granting (428) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD; granting (363) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD; granting (349) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (233) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (367) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD; granting (245) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (358) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (6) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD; granting (610) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD; granting (274) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM; granting (268) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD; granting (351) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD; granting (747) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD; granting (264) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD; granting (230) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
ORDER TO WITHDRAW DARIN J. MCMULLEN, MARK E. GOTTLIEB AND WILLIAM H. PILLSBURY AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD. Before the Court is the Motion to Withdraw Darin J. McMullen, Mark E. Gottlieb and William H. Pillsbury as Attorneys of Record as counsel for Plaintiffs in Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. AI Baraka Investment & Development Corp., et. al. 04-CV-1923 (GBD) (FM), Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. Republic; of Iraq, et al. 04-CV-1076 (GBD) (FM), and Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, et al. 04-CV-1922 (GBD)(FM) (collectively "O'Neill Plaintiffs"). It is ORDERED that Darin J. McMullen, Mark E. Gottlieb and William H. Pillsbury be withdrawn as counsel for the O'Neill Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. It is further ORDERED that all other counsel listed in the record of the law firm of Anderson, Kill & Olick, P.C. will continue to represent the O'Neill Plaintiffs in this matter. granting (2198) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
NOTICE OF MOTION for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Faisal Islamic Bank, Faisal Islamic Bank (Sudan). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Khalid Bin Mahfouz, New Party: The Estate of Khalid Bin Mahfouz, Naylah Abd-al-Aziz Kaaki, Abdelrahman Khalid Bin Mahfouz, Sultan Khalid Bin Mahfouz, and Iman Khalid Bin Mahfouz. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Maloney, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (3 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD) MOTION to Strike Document No. (2189).. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Maloney, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
MOTION to Strike Document No. (2189). Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Maloney, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
ORDER. In accordance with the Court's directive at the July 15, 2009 conference, the Court has reviewed the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee letter submissions of July 8, 2009, copies of which are annexed hereto as Exhibits "A" and "B" respectively. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee letter submissions of July 8, 2009 be separately docketed as of record by the Clerk of the Court with the Court's ECF system. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (LETTERS ROGATORY) FOR THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS BY THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. This Court, in the spirit of comity and reciprocity, hereby requests international judicial assistance in the form of this Letter Rogatory seeking the documents and things described herein, from the ICTY and the Office of the Prosecutor. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Relation to All Pending Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Flowers, Jodi) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (2166 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Strike Document No. (2163) or, Alternatively, for Leave to Respond to New Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Declaratory Relief. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to National Commercial Bank's Motion to Strike or for Leave to Respond. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Mitchell R. Berger dated 3/27/09 re: For the foregoing reasons, and as explained further in our August 21, 2008 letter, this Court should: quash the Subpoenas; deny all of plaintiffs' pending requests for additional jurisdictional discovery as to NCB; and direct plaintiffs to respond promptly to NCB's renewed motion to dismiss, allowing NCB a period of not less than 30 days to submit its reply papers. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference on 4/9/09 at 11:30 am in Courtroom 20A to discuss this application. Opposing counsel is encouraged to respond in writing prior to then., (Conference set for 4/9/2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/30/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Colin S. Stretch for Saudi Joint Relief Committee admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/15/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (2128) Motion for Mark E. Gottlieb, William H. Pillsbury, Darin J. McMullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/15/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/8/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD(rjm) Modified on 7/29/2008 (rjm). (Entered: 07/23/2008)
ORDER. Defendant National Commercial Bank's application for leave to renew its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, is granted. Defendant's request, to submit a single supporting memorandum of law not to exceed 35 pages, is also granted. To the extent that plaintiffs believe that additional jurisdictional discovery is necessary prior to filing a response, a specific discovery request and a request for a stay or extension of the time in which to respond to the motion should be made to the magistrate judge. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/11/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
ORDER TO WITHDRAW MICHAEL J. GUZMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD that Michael J. Guzman be withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Prince Turki Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud in the referenced action. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/8/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
ORDER... that Ronald S. Liebman is relieved as one of the attorneys of record for NCB in the captioned actions. It is further ordered that appearance of Mitchell R. Berger for NCB in the captioned actions will remain unchanged. This document relates to 02cv7236, 03cv3859 as well as the member cases listed on this document. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (1227) Motion to Add ; granting (1228) Motion to Add in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. The Burnett plaintiffs' unopposed motions, purs. to FRCP 15(d), to add parties are granted. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(rjm) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
ORDER. The Estate of deft. Mohammad Abdullah Aljomaih moved to dismiss the claims asserted against deft., pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 25(a)(1), in all the complaints in which he was named. No opposition to the motion has been filed, and the time in which to do so has expired. If no opposition to the motion is filed within 30 days of this Order, the motion will be granted as to all the complaints in which defendant is named. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (1832 in 03md1570) Motion to Vacate in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. Plaintiffs' request to strike those portions of defendant's motion, seeking dismissal of the claims asserted against him, is denied. Plaintiffs shall respond to defendant's filed motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 1:04-cv-07280-GBD(rjm) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (1384 in 03md1570) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is hereby ordered that David P. Donovan is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Prince Mohamed al Faisal al Saud in this action. Attorney David Patrick Donovan terminated in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, DMI Administrative Services S.A., Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Ahmed Totonji, Iqbal Yunus, Mohammed Jaghlit, Aradi, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, Abdullah Bin Laden, Abdulrahman Bin Khalid Bin Mahfouz, Saleh Abdullah Kamel, Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Abdullah Omar Naseef, Saudi Dallah Al Baraka Group LLC, Tadamon Islamic Bank, Alfaisaliah Group, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation, Bakr M Bin Laden, Tarek M. Bin Laden, Omar M. Bin Laden, Mohamed Bin Laden Organization (SBG), Saudi Binladin International Company, Yeslam M. Bin Laden, Talal Mohammed Badkook, M.M. Badkook Co. for Catering & Trading, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi, Adnan Basha, Saudi Joint Relief Committee, Dallah Avco Trans Arabia Co. LTD., Mohammed Jamal Khalifa, M. Yaqub Mirza, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Safar Al-Hawali, Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini, Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company, Sheik Salman Al-Oawdah, World Assembly of Muslim Youth, Ahmed Zaki Yamani, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Islamic Assembly of North America, Saudi Red Crescent, Yassin Abdullah Kadi, Daral Maal Al Islami Trust, Dubai Islamic Bank, African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Sanabel Al-Kheer, Inc., Sana-Bell, Inc., Muhammad Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Schreiber & Zindel, Frank Zindel, Engelbert Schreiber, Engelbert Schreiber, Jr, Martin Watcher, Erwin Watcher, Banca Del Gottardo, Abdul Aziz Al-Ibrahim, Council on American-Islamic Relations (CAIR), Yousef Jameel, Asat Trust Reg., Jamal Barzini, Khaled Bin Mahfouz, National Commercial Bank, Sercor Treuhand Anstalt, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation (United States), Abdullah Bin Khalid Al Thani, M. Omar Ashraf a/k/a Muhammad Ashraf, Sulaiman Abdul Aziz Al-Rajhi, Al Aqsa Islamic Bank, Riggs Bank, N.A., Riggs National Corporation, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Perouz Seda Ghaty, Faisal Islamic Bank-Sudan, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi. (Attachments: # 1 Bell Atlantic Corp. et al. v. Twombly et al.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kellogg, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Defendant HRH Prince Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud on May 4, 2007. Document filed by Alfaisaliah GroupAssociated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(Kingham, T. Barry) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
ORDER... that plaintiffs' General Steering Committee and defendants' Executive Committee each shall submit a letter to the Court by 5/28/07 summarizing the status of the captioned case... Response letters must be submitted to the Court by 6/4/07. Status Conference set for 6/26/2007 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
MOTION for SHERYL MUSGROVE to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Sami Omar Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McKay, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF YUSUF AL-QARADAWI (This document relates to: 03 cv 5738; 03 cv 9849; 02 cv 6977; 04 cv 5970; 04 cv 6105); The Burnett Ashton, Continental Casualty co. and New York Marine and General Insurance Co. pltffs and deft Yusuf Al-Qaradawi agree to the dismissal of deft Yusuf Al-Qaradawi, without prejudice, each side to bear it's own attorney's fees, costs and expenses. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/27/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC(sn) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard.. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., World Trade Center Properties LLC, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Elsner, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard.. Document filed by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Fromm, David) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., WTC Retail LLC, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Leonardo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard. FEDERAL INSURANCE AND O'NEILL PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT KHALID BIN MAHFOUZ. Document filed by John Patrick O'Neill, Jr, Federal Insurance Company et al., Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER, agreed between Plaintiffs in the referenced cases and Defendant Yusuf Al-Qaradawi the following extensions: Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to 1877 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints.: Responses due by 10/11/2006 Replies due by 11/13/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/4/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
MEMORANDUM & ORDER regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of The Defendants' Executive Committee's application for an umbrella protective order covering all materials produced during discovery in the captioned case which is granted in part. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/3/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
ORDER... that Ugo Colella is relieved as one of the attorneys of record for National Commercial Bank of Saudi Arabia in the captioned actions. It is further ordered that appearances of Ronald S. Lieberman and Mitchell R. Berger for National Commercial Bank of Saudi Arabia in the captioned actions will remain unchanged. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/11/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC. This Document also relates to 02-7236 and 03-3859.(rjm, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF LAW FIRMS AS COUNSEL... that the law firm of Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP, shall be hereby substituted for the law firm of Hunton & Williams LLP as counsel of record for defendant Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/25/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
DECLARATION of Abdullah Bin Khalid Al-Thani in Support re: 1758 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Khalid Al-Thani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Nachman, David) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 307 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani.. Document filed by Ahmed Zaki Yamani. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Hamilton, Rayner) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1758 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Khalid Al-Thani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Nachman, David) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
STIPULATION AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570, Sheikh Yusuf Al Qardawi's answer to the complaint is due on 8/4/2006. Plaintiffs shall have 60 days from receipt of Defendants motion papers to & through 10/4/06 to file opposition papers, Deftendant shall have 30 days from receipt of Plaintiffs' opposition papers, to and through 11/4/06 to file reply papers. Deadlines set: Replies due by 11/4/2006. Responses due by 10/4/2006 (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/10/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL that through counsel, the Burnett plaintiffs and defendants Bakr Binladin, Omar Binladin, Tariq Binladin, and Hamad Al-Husaini have agreed to and hereby stipulate to the dismissal, with prejudice, of defendants Bakr Binladin, Omar Binladin, Tariq Binladin, and Hamad Al-Husaini... each side to bear its own attorney's fees, costs, and expenses. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/10/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER It is agreed by and between Ptffs. in all of the referenced cases consolidated under 03 MDL 1570 and Deft. Ahmed Zaki Yamani by and through their undersigned counsel, that Ptffs' time to respond to Defts' 1832 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani is due by 7/17/06 and that Defts' time to file reply papers shall be fourteen days after receipt of service of the ptffs' response. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 1832 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani.: Responses due by 7/17/2006 (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/10/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1838 MOTION to Strike Document No. 1789 DMI Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Further Support of Motions to Dismiss.. Document filed by Daral Maal Al Islami Trust, DMI Administrative Services S.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
MOTION for Johnathan Goodman Stacey Saiontz to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Leonardo, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1738 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion.. Document filed by Tadamon Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 06/24/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 307 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani.. Document filed by Ahmed Zaki Yamani. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Hamilton, Rayner) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani. Document filed by Ahmed Zaki Yamani. (Hamilton, Rayner) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
NOTICE AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Please take notice that Baker Botts LLP shall be and hereby is substituted for Bryan Cave LLP, as counsel of record for defendant Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/30/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1697 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Asat Trust Reg.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1658 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Yassin Abdullah Kadi To Dismiss Complaints.. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Arthur, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1697 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Asat Trust. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH #3 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #4: Fact Discovery shal be completed by 6/30/2007. Expert Discovery: Experts are to be designated and their expert reports exchanged by 8/15/07. Expert depositions shall commence after 8/15/07 and shall be completed by 10/15/07. All liability discovery is to be completed by 10/15/07... The Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Executive Committees shall confer and submit a proposal to the Court regarding revised discovery deadlines on or before 4/15/07. Discovery due by 6/30/2007. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/13/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
STIPULATION AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 1644 MOTION to Dismiss Ashton, Federal Insurance, World Trade Center, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, New York Marine, and Burnett (5738) Complaints.: Extension of time for plaintiffs to file an opposition to the Binladin defts' motion to dismiss, which was filed on 1/27/06, Responses due by 4/18/2006... and as further set forth in said stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/30/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 04/03/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1714 MOTION to Strike Document No. [1697-98] Cross Motion to Strike Asat Trust's Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 1697-98.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [1720 in Case No. 03md1570] MOTION to Strike Document No. [1665 in Case No. 03md1570] Declaration of Jean-Charles Brisard, Affidavit of Carmen Bin Ladin, and Statement of Guillaume Dasquie. Responses due by 4/21/2006... and as further set forth in said stipulation & order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/27/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY AL SHAMAL ISLAMIC BANK. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1500 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
DECLARATION of Omar T. Mohammedi in Support re: 1458 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion., 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1458 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion., 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER. It is hereby stipulated & agreed by & between Ptffs in all of the above-referenced cases consolidated under 03MDL1570 and Deft. Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, by & through their undersigned counsel, that Ptffs' time to respond to Deft's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss of Deft. Sami Omar Al-Hussayen Submitted Purs. to Case Mgt. Order No. 4 shall be extended to 2/10/06, and that Defts' time to file reply papers shall likewise be extended two additional days. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/9/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
REPLY AFFIRMATION of Steven K. Barentzen in Support re: 1541 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Jamal Barzinji. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1541 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Jamal Barzinji. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1714 MOTION to Strike Document No. [1697-98] Cross Motion to Strike Asat Trust's Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 1697-98.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1697 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Asat Trust Reg.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David) (Entered: 02/20/2006)
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570... It is hereby stipulated and agreed, between counsel for Federal Insurance Plaintiffs, represented by J. Scott Tarbutton on behalf of all Plaintiffs in the captioned actions, and counsel for Defendants World Assembly of MuslimYouth in Saudi Arabia and the World Assembly of Muslim Youth International, represented by the Law Firm of Omar T. Mohammedi, LLC that the parties respectfully seek this Court's approval for an extension of time for the Defendants WAMY SA and WAMY USA to Reply to the referemced Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), filed on 1/23/06; It is stipulated & agreed that Defts' Reply Briefs shall be served within fifty days of serviceof Ptffs' Opposition motions... and as further set forth in said stpiulation & order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/15/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC, 1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Jamie S. Kilberg dated 2/6/06 re: Application is granted. The Clerk of the Court is asked to note on the docket that the motions have been withdrawn. Accordingly Motion document #1515 in 03md1570 is withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC, 1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
STIPULATION WITH REGARD TO RULINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS HRH PRINCE NAIF BIN ABDULAZIZ AL-SAUD, HRH PRINCE SALMAN BIN ABDULAZIZ AL-SAUD, AND THE SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION IN RELATED CASES... subject to the approval of the Court that the parties hereto adopt as a binding order in the Actions, with regard to Prince Naif, Prince Salman, and the SHC, the Opinion and Order of this Court dated 9/21/05, deciding the consolidated motions... and as further set forth in said stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/8/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 04cv6105, 04cv7280); that plaintiffs' time to respond to defendants Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, and the Saudi High Commission's motion to dismiss shall be extended to 2/1/2006, and defendants' time to file reply papers shall be extended to 3/3/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/6/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC, 1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Raymond R. Castello on behalf of Aradi, Inc. served on All Counsel on February 1, 2006. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss served on All Counsel on February 2, 2006. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC).. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC). Plaintiffs Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Aradi, Inc.. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC).. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1453 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Iqbal Yunus, Mohammed Jaghlit, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 926 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction., 1040 MOTION to Dismiss. Specifically refers to Defendants Supplemental Memorandum of Law Docket # 1591-2. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss served on All Parties on January 23, 2006. Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations (CAIR). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1411 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations (CAIR). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 03cv9849, 03cv6978, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 04cv6105, 04cv7280); extending plaintiffs' time to respond to Yeslam Binladin's motion to dismiss to 2/3/2006; any reply by defendant shall be served on or by 3/10/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1438 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Saleh Abdullah Kamel, Dallah Al Baraka Group LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
ORDER (this document relates to all actions); the 1/10/2006 Judgment entered by the Clerk in these cases applies only to cases in which the Court has granted the named Defendants' motions to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Supplement)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1433 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1388 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance., 1385 MOTION to Dismiss NY Marine.. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1304 MOTION to Dismiss New York Marine., 1302 MOTION to Dismiss the Continental Casualty and Federal Insurance actions.. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdulaziz Al Ibrahim. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated December 16, 2005, that there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), final judgment is entered dismissing the following twelve defendants: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, HRH Crown Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Mohamed Al-Faisal Al-Saud, the Saudi High Commission, Sheikh Hamad Al-Husani, Abdulrahman bin Mahfouz, Tariq Binladen, Omar Binladen, and Bakr Binladen. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 1/10/06) (Attachments:, # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(ml, ) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to CMO No. 4. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Talal Mohammed Badkook, Adnan Basha, Safar Al-Hawali, Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini, Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Saudi Red Crescent, Salman Al-Ouda. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 04cv1923, 03cv5738); extending the time for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs to file their opposition to WAMY's motion to dismiss within 60 days of service of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Property Plaintiffs' claims; Defendants' reply briefs shall be served within 30 days of service of the Plaintiffs' oppositions... (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/29/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1411 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. CAIR. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1433 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Burnett & Ashton Plaintiffs, Continental Casualty Company, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., World Trade Center Properties LLC, et al., New York Marine and General Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Elsner, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
STIPULATION AS TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE RELATING TO COMPLAINTS CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570... It is stipulated & agreed by and between Plaintiffs in all of the referenced cases consolidated under 03 MDL 1570 and Defendants Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, and the Saudi High Commission, by and through the undersigned counsel, that Defendants' counsel shall file Reply papers by 3/1/2006. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be due by 1/30/2006 (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC, 1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
DECLARATION of Joshua M. Ambush in Opposition re: 1526 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ambush Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1526 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. O'Neill Plaintiffs' Response to the Defendant, Taha Al' Alwani's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 11. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
ORDER... that the Court's dismissals of the Kingdom of Saidi Arabia, HRH Crown Preince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki-Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Mohamed Al- Faisal Al-Saud, the Saudi High Commission, Sheikh Hamad Al-Husani, Abdulrahman bin Mahfouz, Tariq Binladen, Omar Binladen, and Bakr Binladen in the Court's Orders of 1/18/05, 5/5/05, and 9/21/05, are certified as final purs. to the FRCP 54(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare and enter a final judgment. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING THE SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOHAMMAD BINLADIN ORGANIZATION, SAUDI BINLADIN INTERNATIONAL CO., YESLAM BINLADIN, ABDULLAH BINLADIN, BAKR BINLADIN, TARIQ BINLADIN, AND OMAR BINLADIN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS... agreed by & between counsel for Plaintiffs in the captioned cases and for named Defendants Bakr Binladin, Tariq Binladin, Omar Binladin, Mohammad Binladin Organization, and Saudi Binladin International Co., (collectively Bakr, etal."), Yeslam Binladin, and Abdullah Binladin, by and through their undersigned counsel that Bakr, et al. shall serve their consolidated motion to dismiss on or before January 27, 2006. Plaintiffs shall serve their consolidated opposition to that motion on or before 3/28/06, and the movants shall serve their consolidated reply on or before 4/27/06. Plaintiffs shall serve their consolidated opposition to Yeslam Binladin's motion to dismiss on or before 1/20/06 and Yeslam Binladin shall serve his consolidated reply on or before 2/24/06. Plaintiffs shall serve their consolidated opposition to Abdullah Binladin's motion to dismiss on or before 1/30/06 and Abdullah Binladin shall serve his consolidated reply on or before 3/1/06. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5: That the Defendants shall designate a single Executive Committee which shall have the following authority, and no other authority: To confer and agree with Ptffs' Executive Committee on scheduling matters relating to court hearings, depositions, and deadlines affecting Defts. generally, and on proposed agenda items for court hearings. To coordinate communications with counsel for any Ptff. seeking the consent of Defendants generally to a nondispositive motion. To coordinate the examination of witnesses by defense counsel at a deposition or hearing. To coordinate communications with Ptffs' Executive Committee and with the Court concerning any requested changes in this Case Mgt. & Pretrial Scheduling Order. Any deft. may, by motion filed and served upon all parties, object to any action of the Defts' Executive Committee and request the Court to modify that action. The Defts' Executive Committee shall consist of members chosen by the Defts. Those members may in turn select from among their number a chair or co-chairs and will so inform the Court. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4: This Order supplements and amends Case Management Order #2, issued by the Court on 6/15/04 and docketed by the Clerk's office on 6/16/04. Unless supplemented or amended by this or another Order of the Court, the provisions of Case Management Order #2 remain in full force and effect... The following control dates are hereby adopted with respect to the discovery process: Fact Discovery shall be completed by 6/30/2006. Expert Discovery: Experts are to be designated and their expert reports exchanged by 8/15/06. Expert depositions shall commence after 8/15/06 and shall be completed by 10/15/06. All liability discovery is to be completed by 10/15/06. The parties recognize that further developments in this complex litigation may require that the control dates set forth above be extended or otherwise amended. The Ptffs' and Defts' Executive Committees shall confer and submit a proposal to the Court regarding revised discovery deadlines on or before 4/15/06... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
CONSENT MOTION AND STIPULATION AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570... that the time provided for the Plaintiffs to file a consolidated opposition to the motions to dismiss submitted by DMI S.A. and DMI Trust shall be extended to and through 12/19/2005. DMI S.A. shall file reply papers in the Cantor Fitzgerald and O'Neill actions on 1/20/06; in the Burnett D.C., Burnett N.Y., World Trade Center Properties, and Euro Brokers actions on 1/27/06; and in the Federal Insurance and N.Y. Marine actions on 2/3/06. DMI Trust shall file reply papers in the N.Y. Marine, Continental Casualty, and Federal Insurance actions on 2/3/06; in the Ashton, Cantor Fitzgerald, and O'Neill actions on 2/10/06; and in the Burnett D.C., Burnett N.Y., World Trade Center Properties, and Euro Brokers actions on 2/17/06... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/8/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1541 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Jamal Barzinji. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Wa'el Hamza Jalaidan. Related document: 3 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,.(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by International Islamic Relief Organization. Related document: 3 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,.(McMahon, Martin) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Hisham Al-Talib, Iqbal Yunus, Jamal Barzinji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza, Saar Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Hisham Al-Talib, Iqbal Yunus, Jamal Barzinji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza, Saar Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esquire in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
DECLARATION of Gina M. Mac Neill, Esquire in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esquire in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
DECLARATION of Gina M. Mac Neill, Esquire in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 230 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints.. Document filed by Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Complaints. Document filed by Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Jeffress, William) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 228 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of the FSIA Defendants for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kellogg, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kellogg, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Notice of Motion of HRH Prince Mohamed Al Faisal Al Saud for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Document filed by Mohammed Al Faisal Al Saud. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Allen, Tracey) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
ORDER Initial Conference set for 12/2/2005 11:30 AM before Judge Richard C. Casey in Courtroom 23A for oral argument in the pending motions for consolidation, appointment of lead plaintiff, and approval of selection of lead counsel; Any attorney not admitted to practice in this District is directed to apply for admission pro hac vice purs. to Rule 1.3 of the Local Rules of the US District Court for the Southern & Eastern Districts of New York; and, all future orders shall be filed with the caption listed unless otherwise indicated. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/22/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1504 MOTION to Dismiss. Ashton, Burnett, Federal Insurance, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, New York Marine, World Trade Center Properties. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Laden. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Abdullah A. Binladin)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gauch, James) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Laden. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gauch, James) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
DECLARATION of Ally Hack in Support re: 1502 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,., DECLARATION of Ally Hack re: 1502 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
DECLARATION of Omar T. Mohammedi in Support re: 1500 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
DECLARATION of Gina M. MacNeill in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
DECLARATION of Joshua M. Ambush in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
DECLARATION of Gina M. MacNeill in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
DECLARATION of Joshua M Ambush in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1392 MOTION to Dismiss (corrected). Jerry S. Goldman. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1458 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion., 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Attachments: # 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 206 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Attachments: # 1)(Mohammedi, Omar) Modified on 11/8/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 11/02/2005)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss on November 1, 2005. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
DECLARATION of Omar T. Mohammedi in Support re: 206 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Iqbal Yunus, Mohammed Jaghlit, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, M. Yaqub Mirza, Taha Al Alwani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1449 MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Iqbal Unus (Yunus), Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (WRONG PARTY SELECTED)- MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Iqbal Unus (Yunus), Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) Modified on 11/1/2005 (gf, ). (Entered: 10/28/2005)
CONSENT MOTION AND STIPULATION AS TO SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA AND EXTENSION OF TIME that on 11/4/05, DMI S.A. and/or DMI Trust shall serve & file 3 supplemental memoranda, no to exceed 10 pages each. DMI S.A. shall respond to the O'Neill ptffs' First Consol. Complaint; DMI Trust shall respond to the Ashton ptffs' Sixth Amended Complaint; and DMI Trust shall respond to the Continental Casualty ptffs' Second Amended Complaint and DMI S.A. & DMI Trust shall respond to the NY Marine ptffs' Second Amended Complaint. The time provided in the Global Stipulation for ptffs to file a partially consolidated opposition to the motions submitted by DMI S.A. shall be extended to & through 12/5/05, and that the time provided in the Global Stipulation for ptffs, who will now be deemed to include the Continental Casualty ptffs, to file a partially consolidated opposition to the motions by DMI Trust shall be extended to 12/19/05. DMI S.A. shall file reply pprs. in the Cantor Fitzgerald & O'Neill actions on 1/13/06; in the Burnett D.C. N.Y., World Trade Center Props., and Euro Brokers actions on 1/20/06; and in the Federal Insurance action on 1/27/06. DMI Trust shall file reply pprs. in the NY Marine, Continental Casualty, and Federal Insurance action on 1/27/06; in the Ashton, Cantor Fitzgerald, and O'Neill actions on 2/3/06; and in the Burnett D.C., Burnett N.Y., WTC Props., and Euro Brokers actions on 2/10/06... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/27/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
DECLARATION of Dr. Friedrich Wohlmacher in Support re: 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process.. Document filed by Martin Watcher, Erwin Watcher, Sercor Treuhand Anstalt, Asat Trust Reg.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process.. Document filed by Martin Watcher, Erwin Watcher, Sercor Treuhand Anstalt, Asat Trust Reg.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1433 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 892 MOTION to Dismiss., 654 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Plaintiffs (Ashton, Burnett, O'Neill, Salvo, and Tremsky)., 655 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Complaints (Ashton, Burnett, Salvo, and Tremsky)., 656 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Cantor Fitzgerald, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties)., 657 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties).. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss., 87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss., 97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss., 98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss., 83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss., 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
RESPONSE in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for an Order Adjourning Indefinately the Time For Defendant Faisal Islamic Bank - Sudan to Respond to Recent Pleadings. Document filed by Faisal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Lauro, John) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brown in Support re: 1388 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance., 1389 Memorandum of Law in Support,,. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1388 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance.. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Dismiss (filed in error on 03cv9849 as document number 241). Document filed by Khalid Bin Salim Bin Mahfouz. (Gauch, James) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Aradi, Inc. served on 7/21/2004, answer due 8/10/2004; Benevolence International Foundation-USA served on 1/13/2005, answer due 2/2/2005; American Muslim Foundation (AMF) served on 6/2/2004, answer due 6/22/2004; Aqsa Islamic Bank served on 7/28/2004, answer due 8/17/2004; Hisham Al-Talib served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004; Ahmed Idris Nasreddin served on 5/27/2004, answer due 6/16/2004; Mamoun Darkazanli served on 5/27/2004, answer due 6/16/2004; Somali Network, A.B. served on 5/27/2004, answer due 6/16/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company et al., Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. ABDULLAH NASEEF. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT ADNAN BASHA. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT HAMAD AL-HUSAINI. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS SHEIKH SAFER AL-HAWALI AND SHEIKH SALMAN AL-OADAH. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS MOHAMED ALI MUSHAYT AND THE MUSHAYT FOR TRADING ESTABLISHMENT. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss. plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum of law in opposition to motion to dismiss by defendants Talal M. Badkook and M.M. Badkook Company. Document filed by Continental Casualty Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kaplan, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS OF SHAHIR ABDULARAOUF BATTERJEE. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT SHEIKH SALEH AL-HUSSAYEN. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. ABDULLAH BIN SALEH AL-OBAID. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. ABDULLAH BIN ABDUL MOHSEN AL-TURKI. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS OF THE SAUDI RED CRESCENT SOCIETY AND DR. ABDUL RAHMAN AL SWAILEM. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process. Regarding Martin Wachter, Erwin Wachter, Asat Trust and Sercor Treuhand Anstalt. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 09/14/2005)
ORDER Brief submission from each side setting out their respective positions on topics mentioned in this order due by 9/22/2005. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2005 11:00 AM before Judge Richard C. Casey in Crtrm. 14C to address Case Management Plan, Managing Correspondence to the Court, and Motions to Dismiss... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4-9)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
ORDER TO ADMIT MARY ELLEN POWERS PRO HAC VICE (This document relates to all actions); Mary Ellen Powers is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of deft Saudi Binladin Group, Inc. in this matter. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(sn) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
STIPULATION AS TO CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFTS. DALLAH AL BARAKA, SALEH KAMEL, AND AL BARAKA INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT CORP. that effective w/the Court's endorsement or entering of this Stipulation, Dallah, ABID's and Saleh Kamel's pending motions to dismiss the Cantor ptffs' complaint will be withdrawn w/out prejudice automatically w/the Court's endorsement or entering on this Stipulation; Ptffs. must file their RICO statements if any for Dallah no later than 30 days after the Court endorses or enters this Stipulation; Dallah, ABID and Saleh Kamel must answer or otherwise move to dismiss Ptffs' complaints no later than 75 days following the Court's endorsement or entry of this Stipulation... and as further set forth in said Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 926 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction., 1040 MOTION to Dismiss. Schreiber and Zindel, Frank Zindel, Engelbert Schreiber Sr., Engelbert Schreiber Jr.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 892 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv7279, 03cv6978, 04cv6105, 04cv1923, 04cv7280); regarding service of process and extension of time as to defendants DMI Administrative Services S.A., and Dar Al-Maal Al-Islami Trust, as set forth in this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/26/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 869 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Reply to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 869 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Reply to Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Sulaiman Al Rajhi's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 865 MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Saleh Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 867 MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF MOHAMMED HUSSEIN AL AMOUDI that the Burnett, Euro Brokers and World Trade Center plaintiffs and defendant, Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi, have agreed to and hereby stipulate to the dismissal of defendant, Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi without prejudice, each side to bear its own attorney's fees, costs, and expenses.. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/1/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
ORDER that the Court hereby finds that Al Watania Poultry is not currently a defendant in the actions: 03-5738, 03-9849, 02-7300 & 04-7280. The Court further finds that Al Watania Poultry is not required to file an answer or other pleading in response to the above-named complaints unless and until such time as it is added as a party defendant. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/23/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
STIPULATION AS TO TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT AL RAJHI BANK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. It is Stipulated & Agreed by & between Plaintiffs in all actions consolidated under 03 MDL 1570, and Defendant Al Rajhi Banking & Investment Corp., by & through their undersigned counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Reply to Al Rajhi Bank's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment shall be served on or before 6/20/05. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/14/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
STIPULATION AS TO TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT SAUDI AMERICAN BANK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. It is agreed by & between plaintiffs in all actions consolidated under 03 MDL 1570, and defendant Saudi American Bank, by & through their undersigned counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Reply to Saudi American Bank's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment shall be served on or before 6/20/05. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/14/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 919 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA, PRINCE SULTAN BIN ABDUL AZIZ AL SAUD, PRINCE TURKI AL FAISAL AL SAUD, PRINCE MOHAMED AL FAISAL AL SAUD, AND AL. Document filed by Saudi American Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 919 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA, PRINCE SULTAN BIN ABDUL AZIZ AL SAUD, PRINCE TURKI AL FAISAL AL SAUD, PRINCE MOHAMED AL FAISAL AL SAUD, AND AL. Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Curran, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
RESPONSE to Motion re: 919 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA, PRINCE SULTAN BIN ABDUL AZIZ AL SAUD, PRINCE TURKI AL FAISAL AL SAUD, PRINCE MOHAMED AL FAISAL AL SAUD, AND AL by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, HRH Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki Al-Faisal Al-Saud, and HRH Prince Mohamed Al Faisal Al Saud. Document filed by Mohammed Al Faisal Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Prince Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
ORDER OF DISMISSAL (this document relates to all cases); for the reasons stated in the Court's 1/18/2005 Order, the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, HRH Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki Al-Faisal, HRH Prince Mohamed Al-Faisal, and Al Rajhi Banking & Investment Corporation are DISMISSED from all remaining cases consolidated before this Court under docket number 03 MDL 1570. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 656 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Cantor Fitzgerald, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties)., 657 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties).. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Perouz Seda Ghaty. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 654 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Plaintiffs (Ashton, Burnett, O'Neill, Salvo, and Tremsky)., 655 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Complaints (Ashton, Burnett, Salvo, and Tremsky).. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Perouz Seda Ghaty. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. that Ptffs in the referenced actions hereby voluntarily dismiss Deft. Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al-Jomaih (D203) from cases 03-5738, 03-9849, 04-7279 & 04-7280. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER. The Court hereby finds that Omar Sulaiman Al Rajhi is not a deft. in the following actions: 03-5738, 03-9849, 04-7280. The Court further finds that Omar Sulaiman Al Rajhi is not required to file an answer or other pleading in response to the above-named complaints. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of Steven P. Solow in Support re: 879 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for David F. Geneson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT ORDER ON MOTION granting 879 (Doc #879 in 03md1570, Doc. #96 in 03-5738, Doc. #222 in 03-9849, and Doc. #284 in 02-6977) Motion for David F. Geneson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for David F. Geneson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
ORDER Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice that the Motion for admission pro hac vice is granted in all respects for David F. Geneson, Esq. $25.00 fee pending. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
AFFIDAVIT of David F. Geneson in Support. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 869 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 867 MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. Document filed by Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 865 MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Saleh Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. Document filed by Saleh Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
ORDER (this document relates to all actions); regarding the scheduling of the next round of oral argument, as set forth in this Order. The Court will issue a decision on the pending motions to dismiss by the 17 defendants represented by DLA Piper Rudnick, and the pending motions to dismiss by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia (and, in the O'Neill matter, certain of its agencies), Prince Sultan, prince Turki, Prince Mohamed, and the al Rahji Banking & Investment Co., without further brieing or argument. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/27/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
ENDORSED LETTER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv7036. 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 03cv6978, 04cv6105, 04cv1923, 03cv5071, 02cv7300, 04cv7280) addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from John M. Helms dated 4/25/2005; counsel for defendant Sulaiman Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi writes to request a 10-page extension of the page limit for memoranda of law in support of a dismissal motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Court asks counsel to meet 25 page limit. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/27/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 654 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Plaintiffs (Ashton, Burnett, O'Neill, Salvo, and Tremsky). O'Neill Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pertaining to Certain RICO Issues Only. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 803 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or, in the alternative, for more definite statement. Document filed by Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC(d' Auguste, James)(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
MOTION to Dismiss the complaints or, in the alternative, for more definite statement. Document filed by Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC(d' Auguste, James) (kkc, ) Modified on 4/7/2005 (kkc, ). (Entered: 04/07/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt at the following address: Edward A. Betancourt Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State, 2100 Pennsylvania Ave., SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 on 3/23/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2649 to be forwarded by way of diplomatic channels to The Republic of the Sudan, Ministry of External Affairs, Dr. Mustafa Osman Ismail, PO Box 873, Khartoum, Sudan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt at the following address: Edward A. Betancourt Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State, 2100 Pennsylvania Ave, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20530 on 3/23/05 by Registered Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2694 to be forwarded by way of diplomatic channels to The Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Dr. Seyed Kamal Kharrazzi, Ebn e Sina Street, Tehran, Iran. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Mark J. MacDougall for Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi; Nicole H. Sprinzen for Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi; Mara Zusman for Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/23/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
(1) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Treuhand-u. Verwaltungsburo, Altenbach 1, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 781. (2) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Dr. Frank Zindel at the following address: Dr. Frank Zindel, Sonnblickstrasse 7, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 795. (3) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Kirkstrass 39, Privat, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 804.(4) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Schreiber & Zindel at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Krichstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 818.(5) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Asat Trust Reg. at the following address: Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 821. (6) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber, Jr. at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Kirchstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 835. (7) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Martin Wachter at the following address: Martin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 849. (8) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Schreiber and Zindel, Truehand-Ansalt, Kirchstr. 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 866. (9) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Secor Treuhand Anstalt at the following address: Secor Hreuhand Anstalt, Kirkstrass 39, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 866(?). (10) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 870. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
(1) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 733. (2) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Treuhand-u. Verwaltungsburo, Altenbach 1, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 720. (3) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Secor Treuhand Anstalt at the following address: Secor Hreuhand Anstalt, Kirkstrass 39, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 693. (4) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Asat Trust Reg. at the following address: Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 764. (5) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Schreiber & Zindel at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Krichstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 716. (6) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Dr. Frank Zindel at the following address: Dr. Frank Zindel, Sonnblickstrasse 7, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 680. (7) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber, Jr. at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Kirchstrasse 39, FL9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 747. (8) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Kirchstr. 39, Privat, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 702. (9) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engel Bert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Kirchstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 755. (10) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Martin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 778. (ps, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2005. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Saudi Commission for Relief and Charity Abroad at the following address: Saudi Commission for Relief and Charity Abroad c/o The Saudi Ministry of Foreign Affairs, PO Box 55937, Postal Code 11544, Riyadh, Saudi Arabia on 3/18/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 892 243 and RB 632 892 257. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Prince Saud Al Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, Nasseriya Street, PO Box 55937, Postal Code 11124 Riyadh, Saudi Arabia on 3/18/05 by Registered Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2632. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to The Syrian Arab Republic Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Farouk Al-Shara, Muhajereen Shora Avenue, Damascus, Syria on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2601. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to Republic of Iraq Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Hoshyar Zebab, Karradat Maryam, Baghdad, Iraq on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2618. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to Republic of Iran at the following address: Republic of Iran Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Dr. Seyed Kamal Kharrazi, Ebn e Sina Street, Eman Khomeini Square, Tehran Iran on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2595. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to Republic of the Sudan at the following address: Republic of the Sudan Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Dr. Mustafa Osman Ismail, PO Box 873, Khartoum, Sudan c/o on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail Receipt # 7001 2410 0002 6964 2625. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv5738, 03cv6978, 03cv9849, 04cv1923, 04cv5970, 04cv6105, 04cv7065, 04cv7279, 04cv7280); the time for defendant Dubai Islamic Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in each of the cases referenced above shall be on or before 5/27/2005; plaintiffs shall serve their respective RICO statements concerning Dubai Islamic Bank on or before 4/29/2005... (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/16/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
SERVICE BY PUBLICATION Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Last publication date 01/13/2005. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliot) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv6978, 02cv6977, 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 04cv6105, 04cv1923, 04cv7280); that plaintiffs pursuing claims for relief under the RICO Act shall serve their respective RICO Statements concerning the stipulating defendants on or before 3/31/2005. The time for defendants Sulaiman Abdulaziz Al Rajhi, Abdullah Sulaiman Al Rajhi, Omar Sulaiman Al Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al Rajhi, and Saleh Abdulaziz Al Rajhi to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in each of the cases in which they are defendants, shall be on or before 4/29/2005. All other agreements are set forth in this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/27/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
OPINION and ORDER #91124 (this document relates to 02cv6977, 02cv7300, 03cv5071, 03cv5738, 03cv6978, 03cv7036, 03cv8591, 03cv9849); that for the reasons set forth in this Opinion and Order, Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud's motions to dismiss the Burnett, Ashton, Tremsky, Salvo, Barrera, and Federal Insurance complaints for lack of subject matter and personal jurisdiction are granted. Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud's motions to dismiss the Burnett, Ashton, Tremsky, Salvo, Barrera, and Federal insurance complaints for lack of subject matter and personal jurisdiction are granted. The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia's motion to dismiss the Federal Insurance and Vigilant Insurance complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction are granted. Prince Mohamed Al-Faisal Al-Saud's motions to dismiss the Ashton and Federal Insurance complaints for lack of personal jurisdiction are granted. Mohammad Abdullah Aljomaih's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Sheikh Hamad al Husani's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Abdulrahman bin Mahfouz's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Tariq, Omar and Bakr Binladin's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Al Rajhi Banking & Investment Corporation's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for failure to state a claim is granted. Saudi American Bank's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for failure to state a claim are granted. Arab Bank's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Federal Insurance complaints for failure to state a claim are granted. Al Baraka and Saleh Abdullah Kamel's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for failure to state a claim are granted. National Commercial Bank's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for lack of subject matter and personal jurisdiction are denied without prejudice. The Burnett and Ashton negligence claims against National Commercial Bank are dismissed for failure to state a claim. The Saudi Binladin Group's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim are denied without prejudice, but the TVPA and negligence claims against SBG are dismissed. The SAAR Network (African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Mena Corporation, Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, Sana-Bell Inc., Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Sterling Management Group, Inc., and York Foundation)'s motion to dismiss the Federal complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim is denied without prejudice. The RICO, TVPA, assault and battery, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and negligence claims against the SAAR Network are dismissed. Adel Batterjee's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/18/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
ORDER granting Motion for Donna M. Sheinbach to Withdraw as Attorney. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/14/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bonnie K. Arthur for Yassin Abdullah Kadi admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/20/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 02cv6977); that Hunton & Williams LLP is substituted for McDermott Will & Emery LLP as counsel for defendant Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/20/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bonnie K. Arthur for Yassin Abdullah Kadi admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/7/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
DECLARATION of Joseph J. Saltareill in Support re: 295 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph J. Saltarelli)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC(Saltarelli, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 295 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC(Saltarelli, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv5738, 03cv9849) addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 11/4/2004; granting counsel's application for an extension of time until 11/8/2004 for the Ashton plaintiffs to file their brief in opposition to defendant Yassin al Qadi's motion to dismiss, and that defendant al Qadi will file a consolidated reply on or before 12/3/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 11/4/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Alfaisaliah Group, Faisal Group Holding Co.. (Kingham, T. Barry) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 03cv6978) addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Andrea Bierstein dated 9/27/2004; granting counsel's application for an extension of time to 10/4/2004 to file their opposition papers on the AFG Defendants' motions to dismiss, and that the AFG Defendants would have until 10/29/2004 to file their reply papers. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/29/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 03cv9849, 03cv6978, 04cv1923); that John D. Shakow and Deborah S. Burstein of King & Spalding are relieved as two of the attorneys of record for defendant Arab Bank Plc; that defendant Arab Bank Plc shall continue to be represented in this matter by counsel of record Richard A. Cirillo, Richard T. Marooney, Jr. and Jeanette M. Viggiano of the New York office of King & Spalding LLP. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/22/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2004)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi High Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Max Huffman Decl. in Support)(Robbins, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaints.. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sara E. Kropf# 2 Attachment #1# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Attachment #2# 8 Attachment #3# 9 Attachment #4)(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
NOTICE of Filing Omitted Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss the Complaints. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaints.. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B (Part 1)# 3 Exhibit B (Part 2)# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
NOTICE of Correction Regarding Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: 51 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints.. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sara E. Kropf# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5)(Jeffress, William) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Jeffress, William) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
MEMO-ENDORSEMENT (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738) on copy of 338 Motion for Justin B. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849, 03cv5738. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted pending approval of attorney admissions office. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/28/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from James P. Kreindler dated 7/30/2004; granting the Ashton, Burnett and Federal Plaintiffs' request to submit a thirty page consolidated brief in opposition to defendant Naif bin Abdulaziz al-Saud?s motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/2/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from James P. Kreindler dated 7/29/2004; granting the Ashton, Burnett and Federal Plaintiffs' request to submit a thirty page consolidated brief in opposition to Prince Salman bin Abdul Aziz al-Saud's motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/29/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Faisal Group Holding Co., Alfaisaliah Group, Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kingham, T. Barry) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Faisal Group Holding Co., Alfaisaliah Group, Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kingham, T. Barry) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Justin B. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
MEMO-ENDORSEMENT (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738) on Motion for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted pending approval of attorney admissions office. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/20/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yousef Jameel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit)(Steindler, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2004)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738); that the time for defendants HRH Prince Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud and Alfaisaliah Group to answer, move or otherwise respond to the extant complaint in this action is extended to 7/30/2004. In the event defendants file motions to dismiss, as anticipated, plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed on or before 9/15/2004, and defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 10/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/8/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
ORDER (this document relates to all actions); the Court shall hold a status conference in the multi-district cases on 7/20/2004 at 2:00 p.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom at 500 Pearl Street. The topic of the conference will be whether the Supreme Court's 6/28/2004 decisions in Hamdi v. Rumsfeld and Rasul v. Bush relate to pending motions to serve by publication certain defendants who are allegedly in U.S. custody. Specifically, the Court would like to hear the government's position on these cases. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/1/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
ORDER granting Motion for Matthew H. Kirtland to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Nimir Petroleum Limited. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/10/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
ORDER (this document relates to all actions); in an effort to prevent this Court from ruling on letter applications before the involved parties have been fully heard and to encourage all counsel to work out their differences before seeking Court intervention, it is Ordered that letter applications to the Court must not be submitted until they are fully briefed, i.e., the parties are to work out a schedule amongst themselves and, if during the exchange of correspondence they are still unable to reach an agreement, the applying party must only submit the letters as a package to the Court after the agreed upon deadline. Such letter applications must not exceed 3 pages in length. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/17/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 03cv9849); that defendant Yousef Jameel's time to answer or move with respect to the third amended complaint is extended to and including 7/16/2004; in the event Yousef Jameel moves to dismiss the third amended complaint, then (a) plaintiffs shall serve papers in opposition to such motion on or before 10/15/2004; and (b) Jameel shall serve reply papers in further support of such motion on or before 12/17/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/17/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 (this document relates to all actions); regarding Organization of Counsel and Document Depository as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/15/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 06/17/2004)
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 (this document relates to all actions); service of the summons and complaint on a defendant not located in a foreign country shall be made in accordance with F.R.C.P. 4(m). Service of the summons and complaint upon a defendant located in a foreign country who has been named as of the date of this order shall be made by 10/15/2004, or, if a motion to effect service through alternative means has been filed with respect to that defendant, service shall be made within 90 days of a decision by this Court on the motion. Joinder of additional parties must be accomplished by 12/31/2004. Amended pleadings may be filed until 7/31/2005, after which any amendments must be approved by the Court, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a). All liability discovery is to be completed by 4/15/2006. The next Case Management Conference shall take place on 9/13/2004. All other deadlines and procedures are set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/15/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Lawrence S. Robbins dated 6/11/2004; counsel for the Saudi High Commission writes to request that the Court waive its requirement of a pre-motion conference and to grant permission to file a single motion to dismiss all of the claims against it in each of the consolidated complaints. ENDORSEMENT: Upon application of counsel for the Saudi High Commission, it is Ordered that the Sauid High Commission will file, on or before 7/7/2004, a single motion to dismiss all of the claims against it in the complaints consolidated in this multi-district litigation; and it is further Ordered that the plaintiffs will file one consolidated opposition to the motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/15/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney David P. Gersch for defendants Mohammed Salim bin Mahfouz, International Development Foundation, and Saudi Economic and Development Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/26/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Paul J. Hanly Jr. dated 4/12/2004; counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849 writes to request that the Court waive its requirement of a pre-motion conference in connection with a motion counsel intends to file asking this Court to reconsider the ruling of the district court in Washington, D.C., dismissing defendants Sultan bin Abdulaziz al-Saud and Turki al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz al-Saud. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The motion shall be filed by 6/18/2004; the response shall be filed by 8/13/2004; and the reply shall be filed by 8/27/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/28/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Quash Service of Process of His Royal Highness Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud.. Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Sara E. Kropf dated 5/5/2004; granting counsel for defendant Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz's application to file a single motion to dismiss all of the consolidated cases in which Prince Salman is named, including Federal Insurance, on 5/10/2004, and that plaintiffs' oppositions to that motion be combined into one consolidated brief. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/7/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-07036-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Substitution of Counsel; that Chadbourne & Parke LLP is substituted for McDermott, Will & Emery as counsel for defendant Yousef Jameel. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/26/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
ORDER; that within 2 weeks of the date of entry of this Order counsel for plaintiffs shall meet with counsel for defendants, either in person or by telephone conference, to negotiate a revised Proposed Case Management & Pretrial Scheduling Order #2 upon which all parties can agree, which will then be submitted to the Court for approval. If no agreement can be reached among all parties on all issues, the Proposed Case Management Order shall include, for each issue of disagreement, a brief recitation of the parties' differing positions. In any case, a Proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted to this Court no later than 4/30/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/5/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
Letter addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Peter J. Kahn dated 3/18/2004; counsel writes to report to the Court regarding gathering email addresses from most of the attorneys who represents clients in these matters. Document filed by Abdulrahman Bin Mahfouz. Filed in Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Matthew H. Kirtland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Nimir Petroleum Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Lynne Bernabei dated 3/16/2004 counsel for defendant Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. writes to request an extension of time, up to and including 4/26/2004 to respond to plaintiffs' discovery requests. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/22/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; that Elizabeth Smith and Robert T. Haefele are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849, 03cv5738. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/26/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Motion for Ronald L. Motley, Jodi Westbrook Flowers, Donald A. Migliori, and Jeffrey S. Thompson to appear pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849, 03cv5738. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/22/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Quash Service of Process of His Royal Highness Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. Responses due by 5/14/2004 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5)(Frederick, David) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. Responses due by 5/14/2004 (Jeffress, William) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
MOTION to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. Responses due by 5/14/2004 (Jeffress, William) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
AMENDED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' More Definite Statement as to Defendant Yousef Abdul Latif Jameel. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Elsner, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. John J. Walsh hereby withdraws its appearance as co-counsel for defendants African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jar Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Sara Trust, York Foundation, which was noticed on 1/27/04. (jco, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 03/16/2004)
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Michael K. Kellogg, Mark C. Hansen, David C. Frederick, Michael J. Guzman, and J.C. Rozendaal to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/10/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Michael K. Kellogg, Mark C. Hansen, David C. Frederick, Michael J. Guzman, and J.C. Rozendaal to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael K. Kellogg# 2 Affidavit of Mark C. Hansen# 3 Affidavit of David C. Frederick# 4 Affidavit of Michael J. Guzman# 5 Affidavit of John C. Rozendaal)Filed in Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
Case Management Order No. 1 (this document relates to all actions); all attorneys who have been admitted to this Court shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by 3/5/2004. All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at U.S.D.C. ? S.D.N.Y., 500 Pearl Street, Room 249. In addition to the documentation required by Local Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include with their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court and a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form. Pro hac vice motions should be submitted by 3/15/2004. Peter Kahn, Esq., from the law firm of Williams & Connolly, has offered to compile for the Court a list of all participating attorneys? email address. All attorneys who wish to receive a correspondence regarding this case are directed to submit their email address to Mr. Kahn via email or fax. Mr. Kahn?s fax number is (202) 434-5245 and his email address is pkahn@wc.com. If you have questions about this process, you can reach Mr. Kahn by phone at (202) 434-5045. In order to facilitate the electronic filing of motions to dismiss, the motion schedule set forth at the 3/1/2004 conference is amended as follows: moving papers shall be filed on 3/19/2004; responses shall be filed by 5/14/2004; and reply papers shall be submitted no later than 5/28/2004. Motions shall be filed electronically and need not be fully briefed when filed; however, as per Judge Casey?s individual practice rules, courtesy copies of fully briefed motions shall be filed with chambers, along with a diskette containing an electronic version of the documents. Plaintiffs may, without further leave of court, add or remove parties by supplemental pleadings as further set forth in this Order. A named defendant as to whom the complaint contains no allegations may move for a more definite statement and the motion will be granted. The following cases shall be consolidated into 03 MDL 1570: Federal Ins. Co. v. Al Qaida, 03 Civ. 6978 (RCC); Burnett v. Al Baraka Inv. And Dev. Corp., 03 Civ. 5738 (RCC); and Barrera v. Al Queda Islamic Army, 03 Civ. 7036 (RCC). The parties may move to sever these actions at the completion of discovery. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/3/2004) Filed in Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Walsh on behalf of African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust (NDB) (pa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 02/02/2004)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT that the defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi's time to answer the third amended complaint is extended to 3/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2004) (jsa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 01/30/2004)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT Defendant Yousef Jameel's time to answer the third amended complaint is extended to 3/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2004) (jsa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 01/30/2004)
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al Jomaith, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Youssef Abdaoui, Salahuddin Abduljawad, Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah, Ibrahim S. Abdullah, Hussein Mahmud Abdullkadir, Mohammed Iqbal Abdurrahman, Abu Hafs The Mauritanian, Additional Defendants 1-1000, Abdirasik Aden, Ibrahim Muhammed Afandi, African Muslim Agency, Haji Abdul Manan Agha, Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad, Syed Suleman Ahmer, Akida Bank Private Limited, Akida Investment Co. LTD., Mohammed Amine Akli, Ghasoub Al Abrash, Wadi Al Aqiq, Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Al Barakaat Exchange LLC, Al Farooq Mosque, Al Haramain Foundation, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Ahmad Al Harbi, Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi, Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa, Mohammed Al Massari, Mohammed Ali Hasan Al Moayad, Al Qaeda, Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Al Rajhi Banking and Investment, Essam Al Ridi, Mohammad Khair Al Saqqa, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Abu Rida Al Suri, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Al Taqwa Trade Property and Industry Company Limited, Hassan Al Turabi, Sayf Al-Adl, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Mohammed Hussein Al-Amoudi, Asbat Al-Ansar, Aqueel Al-Aqueel, Al-Baraka Bankcorp, Inc., Al-Barakat Bank of Somalia (BSS), Al-Barakat Finance Group, Al-Barakat Financial Holding Co., Al-Barakat Global Telecommunications, Al-Barakat Group of Companies Somalia Limited, Al-Barakat International, Al-Barakat Investments, Al-Barakat Wiring Service, Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Khalid Al-Fawwaz, Abu Qatada Al-Filistini, Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi, Muhammad Al-Hamati, Al-Hamati Sweets Bakeries, Amin Al-Haq, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Safar Al-Hawali, Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Lujain Al-Iman, Ansar Al-Islam (AI), Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya, Al Gama'a Al-Islamiyya, Mohammed Al-Issai, Mansour Al-Kadi, Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr, Makhtab Al-Khidamat, Ibn Al-Shaykh Al-Libi, Anas Al-Liby, Abdullah M. Al-Mahdi, Abu Hamza Al-Masri, Abu Ibrahim Al-Masri, Abdul Al-Moslah, Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil, Abdelkarim Hussein Mohamed Al-Nasser, Al-Nur Honey Press Shops, Salman Al-Ouda, Abdullah Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Al-Rashid Trust, Saqar Al-Sadawi, Sa'd Al-Sharif, Al-Shifa' Honey Press for Industry and Commerce, Yassir Al-Sirri, Tareq M. Al-Swaidan, Hisham Al-Talib, Ibrahim Salih Mohammed Al-Yacoub, Abu Musab Al-Zarqawi, Ayman Al-Zawahiri, Abdurahman Alamoudi. Related document: 1 Complaint.(ae, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 12/30/2003)
Notice of Case to Judge Richard C. Casey . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Paul J. Hanly Jr., Jayne Conroy . (gf) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 10/20/2003)