Lent v. Signature Truck Systems, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00569-WMS-HBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 27, 2017 at 11:13 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Lent, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews Bernstein Maranto & Nicotra Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Andrews +1 716 842 2200 +1 716 847 1134 bandrews@ABM-Law.com
v.
No Logo Base Engineering, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman Law Firm LLP - Syracuse Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F. Sutter +1 716 847 2523 +1 716 847 2589 bsutter@sugarmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman Law Firm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/28/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Anthony Riehler +1 716 847 2523 mriehler@sugarmanlaw.com
No Logo Muncie Power Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey F. Basse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/31/2006 Jeffrey F. Basse +1 716 854 3400

Toggle Switch Represented by Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey F. Baase +1 716 854 3400 +1 716 332 0336 baase@ruppbaase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Samuel Bernhardt +1 716 854 3400
No Logo Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thorn Gershon Tymann And Bonanni, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew H. McNamara +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 matt.mcnamara@tglawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin P. Mead +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 erin.mead@tglawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thorn, Gershon Law Firm - Albany Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory John Rodriguez +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 greg.rodriguez@tglawyers.com
No Logo Base Engineering, Inc., Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman Law Firm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F. Sutter +1 716 847 2523 +1 716 847 2589 bsutter@sugarmanlaw.com
No Logo Muncie Power Products, Inc., Cross Claimant
No Logo Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Cross Claimant
No Logo Base Engineering, Inc., Cross Defendant
No Logo Muncie Power Products, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey F. Baase +1 716 854 3400 +1 716 332 0336 baase@ruppbaase.com
No Logo Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thorn Gershon Tymann And Bonanni, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/13/2006 Kyle N. Kordich +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 Kyle.Kordich@tglawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory John Rodriguez +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 greg.rodriguez@tglawyers.com
No Logo Base Engineering, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff
No Logo Muncie Power Products, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Samuel Bernhardt +1 716 854 3400
No Logo Signature Truck Systems, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thorn Gershon Tymann And Bonanni, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew H. McNamara +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 matt.mcnamara@tglawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin P. Mead +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 erin.mead@tglawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory John Rodriguez +1 518 464 6770 +1 518 464 6778 greg.rodriguez@tglawyers.com
No Logo ESIS, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis P. Glascott +1 716 566 5450 dglascott@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Ferrellgas Partners, LP, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis P. Glascott +1 716 566 5450 dglascott@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Jablonski +1 716 566 5469 +1 716 566 5401 jjablonski@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen J. Martin +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 kmartin@goldbergsegalla.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (364) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 363 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed Transcript. (DLC) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 362 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Sealed Document Video - Exhibit No. 104 Day in the life of Plaintiff Video. (DLC) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 361 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Sealed Document. (Attachments: #(1) Additional Note)(DLC) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 360 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Sealed Document (Document not scanned maintained in the Clerk's Office in paper form). (DLC) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 359 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Sealed Document (Document not scanned maintained in the Clerk's Office in paper form). (DLC) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 358 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Sealed Document (Not scanned maintained in the Clerk's Office in paper form). (DLC) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/29/2012. Case settled. Clerk to close case. Jurisdiction maintained. Jurors discharged from service. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Clerk to Follow up.) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/28/2012. Defense Witnesses: Nathan Dorris, Phd., Kevin Bedworth. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Defense Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Statement from Bench issued denying Plaintiff's 334 Motion for Reconsideration and Defendant's 329 Motion to Strike, all for the reasons stated on the record. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/29/2012 at 10:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/27/2012. Defense Witnesses: Diane Shaul, Nathan Dorris, Phd. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 40-Y, 102-5, 102-6, 102-8, 141, 142, 148, 149, 150, 151, 152, 153, 154, 155, 156. Defense Exhibits entered into evidence: 620-1, 623. Provisional ruling (denial) given on Plaintiff's 334 Motion for reconsideration. Plaintiff to file written response to Defendants' Rule 50 motions. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/28/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/26/2012. Juror #6 queried regarding newspaper article. Plaintiff Witnesses: Richard Wall, Phd., Matthew Damcott, by deposition, John Harper, by deposition, Drake Miller, by deposition, Martha Hammond. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Plaintiff rests. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/27/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/20/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: Nicole Maher, Richard Wall, Phd. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 102-1. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/26/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/19/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: Beverly Kubala, Clifford Slisz by deposition, Ken Faulhaber, by deposition, Alan Winship. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 16, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 15, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 13, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 6, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 5, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 21, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 2, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. Laughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 1, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 21, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 30, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 334 MOTION Reconsider Court Decision and allow Chaplin exemplar guard/shaft to be admitted into evidence for demonstrative purposes. filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the Plaintiff's 339 Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response is now due by noon on 11/30/2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/28/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 334 MOTION Reconsider Court Decision and allow Chaplin exemplar guard/shaft to be admitted into evidence for demonstrative purposes. Supplemental Memo of Law filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 329 MOTION to Strike trial testimony of Jonathan Chaplin, Ph.D. filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 334 MOTION Reconsider Court Decision and allow Chaplin exemplar guard/shaft to be admitted into evidence for demonstrative purposes. filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Jarvis v Ford, # 2 Appendix Kass v West Bend, # 3 Affidavit)(McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Directed Verdict by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: Reconsider Court Decision and allow Chaplin exemplar guard/shaft to be admitted into evidence for demonstrative purposes. by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Andrews, Benjamin)Text modified on 11/27/2012 (DZ). (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION Motion for Judgment by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law, # 3 Affidavit certificate of service, # 4 Appendix A - Case 1 - Campbell, # 5 Appendix B - Case 2 - Groome, # 6 Appendix C - Case 3 - Mathis-Kay, # 7 Appendix D - Case 4 - Mustafa, # 8 Appendix E - Case 5 - Ramroop, # 9 Appendix F - Case 6 - Saladino, # 10 Appendix G - Case 7 - Toole)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 329 MOTION to Strike trial testimony of Jonathan Chaplin, Ph.D. filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit certificate of service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric S. Bernhardt, Esq., # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bernhardt, Eric) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 329 MOTION to Strike trial testimony of Jonathan Chaplin, Ph.D. filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit certificate of service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION to Strike trial testimony of Jonathan Chaplin, Ph.D. by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey F. Baase, Esq., # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/16/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: Jonathan Chaplin, Phd., Scott Beeson, by deposition. James Hottel, by deposition. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 38, 41, 144. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/19/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/15/2012. Oral argument held on workman's compensation issue. Plaintiff Witnesses: Jonathan Chaplin, Phd. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 30,37. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/16/2012 at 9:15 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/13/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: David Lent, Jonathan Chaplin, Phd. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: 501. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/15/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/9/2012. Plaintiff Witness: David Lent. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 104 (shown to the jury). Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/13/2012 at 9:00 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Galbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on october 29, 2012, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber megan E. Pelka, Telephone number 716-853-5544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (DLC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2012: # 1 Transcript) (DLC). (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena by ESIS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Notice of Motion)(Glascott, Dennis) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis P. Glascott on behalf of ESIS, Inc. (Glascott, Dennis) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Motion, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Glascott, Dennis) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/8/2012. Plaintiff Witness: David Lent. Plaintiff/Joint Witness: Walter Neall. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 117 (117-1, 117-2, 117-3) Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Instruction given to jury re: truck viewing. Truck viewed by jury outside of courthouse. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/9/2012 at 9:00 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Megan Pelka, De Paolo Crosby.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/7/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: Richard Wallace, David Lent. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/8/2012 at 9:30 a.m.. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Megan Pelka, De Paolo Crosby.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/6/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: David Carpenter, Daniel Bonasera, Donna Taylor-Mattoon, Diane Wassell, Jason Schneider, Michael Connors, Ralph Stronner, Joseph Volk. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 85, 86. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: 573, 620. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/7/2012 at 9:30 a.m.. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/5/2012. Plaintiff Witnesses: Carl Lis, James Hahn, Jr., Dr. John Callahan, Joseph Volk. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 46 page 5 only, 116. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/6/2012 at 9:30 a.m.. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Sealed Document. (CMD) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/2/2012. Plaintiff to review Defendant exhibit 533 over the weekend. Court advises that the trial day on Thursday, 11/8/2012 will end at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff Witnesses: Dr. Cherr, Stephen Belyea. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 112. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/5/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel to work with mediator during downtime this afternoon. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 11/1/2012. Oral argument held on various issues. Plaintiff Witnesses: Philip Hordusky, Stephen Belyea. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 34, 72, 73 (admitted provisionally -- need clean copy) 75, 78, 79, 137. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: 521 pages 1411-1414, 528. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/2/2012. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 10/31/2012. Oral argument held re: jury viewing truck. Plaintiff Witnesses: Alexander Avram, Philip Hordusky. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 33, 40-T, 71, 109, 110, 111. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: none. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 11/1/2012. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 10/30/2012. Jurors to be allowed to take notes and to ask questions under the procedure discussed. Plaintiff Witnesses: Alexander Avram, John Elfman. Through stipulation of the parties, Plaintiff Exhibits 2 - 27 are admitted into evidence only once used. Plaintiff Exhibits entered into evidence: 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 28, 29, 30, 31, 32, 105, 106, 107, 108. Defendant Exhibits entered into evidence: 521 - pages 1409 and 1410 only. Jury Trial is scheduled to continue on 10/31/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Trial held on 10/29/2012. Jury sworn. Preliminary instructions given to jury. Court speaks to Jurors #5 and #7. Openings given by all parties. Jury Trial to continue on 10/30/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (MEAL) (Court Reporter Megan Pelka, DePaolo Crosby) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Selection held on 10/26/2012. Additional juror selected. Jury Trial to commence on 10/26/2012 at 9:30 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Court Reporter Megan Pelka, DePaolo Crosby) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Jury Selection held on 10/25/2012.. Preliminary oath given to jury. 8 selected. Jury Selection to continue on 10/26/2012 at 10:00 a.m. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews, Richard Gelbo. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Court Reporter Megan Pelka, DePaolo Crosby.) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 305 MOTION in Limine for Jury View filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 305 MOTION in Limine for Jury View (Declaration of Jeffrey F. Baase) filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 305 MOTION in Limine for Jury View of Walter Neall filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine for Jury View by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Proposed Joint Statment)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge : Status Conference held on 9/7/2012. Settlement offer on table. Jury selection is adjourned to 10/25/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Court denies 302 Motion to Adjourn et al. Viewing of propane truck by jury at issue. Plaintiff objects. Plaintiff to email pictures of physical evidence (truck parts) to the Court to assist the Court in the arrangement of storage space for the duration of the trial. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Adjourn Trial by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian Sutter, Esq., # 2 Affidavit of Matthew Beale, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE: Counsel are advised that, barring unforeseen circumstances, trial days will commence at 9:30am and end at 5:00pm, for the duration of the trial. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER Presently before this Court is Plaintiff's 261 Motion for an Order (1) precluding the admission of the OSHA report into evidence, (2) precluding Muncie from eliciting certain expert testimony from Donald Allison, (3) precluding Signature from eliciting certain expert testimony from Nathan Dorris; (4) precluding Muncie from offering Nathan Dorris as an expert, (5) precluding Base from using Matthew Beale as an expert, (6) precluding all counsel from stating during opening statements that a small percentage of propane trucks have a guard. Having considered the motion and responses thereto, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. First, Plaintiff moves to preclude admission of the OSHA report prepared after investigation of the incident at issue. Plaintiff argues that the report is not relevant because it does not reach a conclusion as to the cause of the incident and is allegedly based on a misunderstanding of the facts of the incident. These concerns, however, go to the proper weight to be afforded to the report, not its admissibility. The OSHA report pertains to the investigation of the incident at issue and is therefore relevant. Plaintiff is free to argue that the report is mistaken or faulty, but he has not demonstrated any reason to exclude it, nor has he demonstrated that its probative value is substantially outweighed by the danger of unfair prejudice or jury confusion. Plaintiff's request is therefore DENIED. Second, Plaintiff moves to preclude Muncie from eliciting certain statements from Donald Allison's report concerning (1) Allison's view of Plaintiff's credibility, (2) his conclusion that the cause of the incident cannot be determined without resorting to speculation, (3) his conclusion that additional or different warnings would not have altered Plaintiff's conduct, and (4) his statement that Plaintiff could have taken precautions with the remote control given his past experience with it. Plaintiff argues that it is improper for Allison to testify about his opinion of Plaintiff's credibility and that Allison cannot testify to the other statements because he is not a human factors analysis or ergonomics expert. Plaintiff also argues that permitting this testimony would invade the province of the jury as the fact finder. Under Rule 704(a) of the Federal Rules of Evidence, experts are permitted to testify concerning issues that will ultimately be embraced and decided by the jury. This is therefore not a basis to preclude Allisons testimony. In addition, it is not improper for Allison to testify concerning the inconsistencies in Plaintiff's statements, which is what his report addresses, and that some degree of speculation must be employed to determine the cause of the incident. The jury will ultimately decide credibility and liability, but it is not improper for Allison to offer this testimony. Counsel are free to argue what role, if any, speculation plays in light of all of the evidence presented to the jury. This aspect of Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. This Court is persuaded, however, by Plaintiff's argument that testimony concerning Plaintiff's familiarity with the remote control and what precautions he should have taken and what role additional or different warnings may have played falls outside of Allison's area of expertise, which is engineering. Muncie concedes as much by stating that Allison would rely on his "common sense" and "logic" rather than his scientific, technical, or other specialized knowledge. This is therefore not proper expert testimony under Rule 702. This portion of Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Third, Plaintiff moves to preclude Signature from eliciting expert testimony from Nathan Dorris regarding OSHA regulations and that Ferrellgas, rather than Signature, was responsible to decide whether to use a guarded PTO driveline. Plaintiff also seeks to confine Dorris's expert testimony concerning Unit B-901 to a human factors evaluation, which is his only area of expertise. Signature concedes that Dorris's testimony will be confined to his opinion as a human factors expert, but it opposes Plaintiff's other requests to confine his testimony. This Court has already found that the OSHA report and regulations are relevant. Plaintiff's relevancy argument is therefore unpersuasive. This Court will, however, consider a jury instruction, if requested, that addresses how non-compliance with OSHA regulations should be considered by the jury. Moreover, Plaintiff has set forth no persuasive reason why Dorris should be precluded from offering his opinion concerning which party is responsible for deciding whether to guard the PTO. Plaintiff may certainly explore that opinion on cross-examination, but there is no basis to preclude it. Similar testimony has been found admissible by the Second Circuit. See, e.g., Jiminez v. Dreis & Krupm Mfg. Co., 736 F.2d 51, 54 (2d Cir. 1984). Plaintiff's motion is therefore DENIED. Fourth, Plaintiff seeks an order precluding Muncie from calling Nathan Dorris as an expert witness since it never identified him as an expert. Muncie has clarified that it will not call Nathan Dorris as its own expert. Rather, it will rely on Dorris's testimony that Signature elicits. This request is therefore MOOT. Fifth, Plaintiff seeks to preclude Base's expert Matthew Beale on the grounds that Base has not complied with Plaintiff's discovery requests. This issue was raised in Plaintiff's 221 Motion to Compel, which this Court 294 resolved in Plaintiffs favor. This request is therefore also MOOT. Finally, Plaintiff moves to preclude all counsel from commenting in their opening statements that only a small percentage of propane delivery trucks are assembled with guarded drivelines. Plaintiff argues that such a statement is irrelevant and lacks foundation. This Court finds that, assuming there is proper evidence and foundation to support it, such a fact is relevant in this litigation. All counsel are aware that representations in opening statements must be made in good faith based on the evidence expected to be introduced at trial. Plaintiff's request is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/5/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Ferrellgas's 264 Motion in Limine is GRANTED. The terms of the 87 Protective Order shall apply in the trial of this matter and to non-party witness John Elfman. Before his testimony, Ferrellgas is directed to secure John Elfman's signature on the Agreement to Comply with Stipulated Protective Order, which is attached as Exhibit A to the 87 Stipulated Protective Order. This Court offers no opinion at this time on the admissibility of the documents covered by the Stipulated Protective Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER Presently before this Court is Ferrellgas's 262 Motion in Limine for an Order precluding Plaintiff from introducing evidence of Ferrellgas's alleged negligence or liability. This Court assumes the parties' familiarity with the factual issues and legal arguments. Having considered the motion and responses thereto, Ferrellgas's motion is DENIED. Ferrellgas was Plaintiff's employer. It argues that New York workers compensation law bars Plaintiff from asserting any direct claims against it, and therefore, Plaintiff should be precluded from introducing any evidence of Ferrellgas's alleged negligence or liability. Ferrellgas argues that Plaintiff's introduction of such evidence would be irrelevant and would confuse the issues and mislead the jury. In response, Plaintiff concedes that it will not introduce evidence of Ferrellgas's negligence or liability directly against Ferrellgas. (Andrews Affirmation, Docket No. 273, 4.) But Plaintiff opposes Ferrellgas's motion to the extent it seeks to preclude him from offering evidence concerning Ferrellgas to support his claims against the other defendants. In addition, Defendants Base Engineering and Signature Truck Systems oppose Ferrellgas's motion to the extent that it seeks to preclude Plaintiff from testifying about Ferrellgas. Ferrellgas has not submitted any authority for the proposition that the workers' compensation bar precluding recovery by an employee from his employer extends to bar a plaintiff from offering evidence concerning his employer or the circumstances of his employment in a third-party action in which he asserts no direct claim against the employer. Such evidence is relevant to the claims Plaintiff asserts against the defendants and to the claims the defendants assert against third-party defendant Ferrellgas. Moreover, this Court finds that the probative value of such evidence is not substantially outweighed by the danger of unfair prejudice, confusion of issues, or misleading the jury. Consequently, Ferrellgas's 262 Motion in Limine is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER Presently before this Court is Signature Truck Systems, Inc.'s 260 Motion for an Order precluding Plaintiff's expert witness, Dr. Jonathan Chaplin, from testifying that the protruding set screws on the PTO driveline shaft constitute a design defect. Having considered the motion and response thereto, Signature's motion is DENIED. Plaintiff intends to present evidence through Dr. Chaplin that the protruding set screws constitute a design defect because they are a "wrap point" for clothing and body parts and therefore increase the risk of entanglement. Signature seeks an order precluding this testimony on the basis that there is no evidence that Plaintiff in fact became entangled on the protruding set screws and therefore no evidence that the screws were a proximate cause of his injury. Second, Signature argues that Dr. Chaplin's testimony should be precluded because he has not tested his theory. As this Court understands the record, it is unknown how Plaintiff became entangled in the PTO but it is undisputed that he did become entangled in it. Accordingly, Dr. Chaplin cannot testify that the protruding set screws were in fact the proximate cause of Plaintiff's injuries. But he can testify that in his opinion the protruding set screws constitute a design defect and could have contributed to or caused the entanglement. Such testimony is supported by evidence in the record, as detailed in Plaintiff's 270 response. In particular, there is evidence that fragments of clothing and human tissue were discovered at or near the set screws. This is proper evidence for the jury to consider. Moreover, given the non-scientific nature of his expected testimony, Dr. Chaplin's opinion concerning the role of the set screws is not rendered unreliable or speculative due to lack of testing. Accordingly, Signature's 260 Motion in Limine is DENIED.SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER Presently before this Court is Muncie Power Products, Inc.'s 259 Motion for an Order (1) precluding plaintiff from introducing Muncie's revised owners manual, (2) precluding plaintiff from introducing Chelsea's owners manual, (3) precluding the introduction of evidence regarding certain safety standards, (4) precluding the expert testimony of Gregory Cherr, M.D. regarding Plaintiff's alleged memory loss, incorrect memory, and delirium. Having considered the motion and responses thereto, Muncie's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. First, Muncie's request to preclude Plaintiff from introducing evidence of Muncie's revised owners manual is GRANTED. Plaintiff seeks to introduce evidence of Muncie's 2007 owners manual, which was published four years after the accident at issue. This Court finds that the 2007 manual, which contains additional instructions and warnings than the 2001 manual in publication at the time of the accident, constitutes a subsequent remedial measure. As such, it is precluded under Rule 407 of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Plaintiff states that he intends to offer the 2007 manual as evidence of the feasibility of precautionary measures, which is permissible under Rule 407, but Muncie concedes the feasibility point and does not intend to argue that additional precautions were not feasible. Consequently, Muncie's request to preclude this evidence is GRANTED. This Court will revisit this ruling if the feasibility of additional precautions becomes an issue. Second, Muncie's request to preclude Plaintiff from introducing evidence of Chelsea's owners manual is DENIED. Plaintiff intends to introduce the Chelsea owners manual as evidence of the known dangers in the PTO industry of using a PTO with a drive, because the manual warns against such use. This Court finds that the Chelsea owner's manual is relevant on the issue of product defect and its introduction is not unfairly prejudicial. Whether Plaintiff personally reviewed the manuals is not dispositive of their relevance. Plaintiff may therefore introduce the evidence. But the Chelsea owner's manual is not evidence of an industry standard and Plaintiff is precluded from introducing or arguing it as such. Third, Muncie's request to preclude the introduction of evidence regarding certain safety standards is GRANTED. Plaintiff seeks to introduce evidence of violations of standards of care concerning the guarding of PTO drives and the elimination of raised set screws in the agricultural industry. These standards are promulgated by Canada, Alaska, Oregon, and the American Society of Agricultural Engineering. Plaintiff maintains that these standards are relevant to his experts expected testimony concerning the availability of safer alternative designs for the PTO. The use of safer alternative designs in other industries is in fact relevant to the expert's opinion. But standards governing that use are not. Moreover, introduction of these standards could cause juror confusion and mislead the jury into thinking that these standards apply to propane trucks, which they do not. Accordingly, this evidence is precluded under Rule 403 and Muncie's request is GRANTED.Finally, Muncie's request to preclude the expert testimony of Gregory Cherr, M.D. is GRANTED. First, although this Court understands that Dr. Cherr is substituting for Dr. Jorden, Plaintiff failed to properly disclose either of them as expert witnesses in a timely fashion. Moreover, Dr. Cherr is a vascular surgeon, not a psychiatrist or other mental health professional. He is therefore not suitably qualified to render expert testimony concerning Plaintiff's alleged memory loss, incorrect memory, delirium, or amnesia following the incident. Further, Dr. Cherr's expected expert opinions are not supported by scientific standards or principles or any peer-reviewed research or publications. Dr. Cherr is therefore precluded from testifying as an expert concerning memory loss, delirium, and amnesia. Rather, Dr. Cherr will testify as a treating physician, and as such, his testimony will concern the care and treatment Plaintiff received following the incident. If Dr. Cherr has reached opinions concerning Plaintiffs mental state based solely on his treatment of Plaintiff, he may offer that opinion. See Brundidge v. City of Buffalo, 79 F.Supp.2d 219, 225 (1999) (treating physician can offer opinion concerning cause of mental problems if the opinion is based solely on the treatment of the plaintiff). SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER Presently before this Court is Base Engineering, Inc.'s 256 Motion for an Order precluding evidence of prior incidents of the radio remote control unit being inadvertently actuated. Having considered the motion and response thereto, Base's motion is DENIED. Plaintiff intends to present evidence of prior incidents in which the radio remote control unit was inadvertently activated by Plaintiff and other employees. Base seeks to preclude this evidence on the basis that the prior incidents are not substantially similar to the facts of this case and Plaintiff's theory of causation. Further, Base argues that the probative value of such evidence is substantially outweighed by the risk of misleading the jury and causing unfair prejudice. This Court has already found that inadvertent actuation of the remote control unit is a possible cause of the PTO's activation on the date of the accident. This Court therefore ruled that Plaintiff is entitled to present evidence that the design of the remote control unit made it susceptible to inadvertent activation. But because there is no evidence that Plaintiff inadvertently pressed the elevated buttons on the date of the incident, this Court has precluded such definitive testimony. Evidence of prior incidents is relevant if the prior incidents are substantially similar to the incident at issue. Here, the prior incidents involve the remote control unit being inadvertently activated when the unit was clipped to a person's pants and then pressed between the person and a hard surface, such as a fuel tank. The inadvertent activation of the unit is allegedly due to the elevated design of the remote control buttons. Plaintiff seeks to introduce evidence of the prior incidents to prove that the design of the remote control unit was such that it could be inadvertently activated through the unintentional pressing of its elevated buttons. In this regard, this Court finds that the prior incidents are sufficiently substantially similar to the theory of Plaintiff's case: both involve the inadvertent activation of the remote control due to unintentional pressing of the elevated buttons. The fact that the buttons may be inadvertently pressed when the unit is between a body and a fuel tank or a body and the ground or inside or outside of apparel does not render the prior incidents dissimilar for purposes of this case and Plaintiff's theory. Further, this Court finds no merit to Base's argument that there is a substantial risk that this evidence will lead to unfair prejudice or the jury being mislead. Base will have a full opportunity to cross-examine Plaintiff and other employees on the similarities/dissimilarities between the incidents and the jury will consider the cross-examination testimony as well. Finally, this Court acknowledges that Base has withdrawn that portion of its motion seeking to preclude the testimony of Timothy Morgan on this issue. Base's alternative request for in camera review of Morgan's testimony concerning prior incidents is denied, there being insufficient cause to do so. Accordingly, Base's 256 Motion in Limine is DENIED.SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER Presently before this Court is Plaintiff's 221 Motion to Compel Defendant Base Engineering, Inc. to (1) produce information concerning its expert witness, Matthew Beale; and (2) produce the "dealer binder." This Court assumes the parties' familiarity with the factual issues and legal arguments. Having considered the motion and response thereto, this Court will grant Plaintiff's motion.First, Plaintiff seeks to compel Defendant to identify the electrical engineering company that assisted in Beale's design of a control panel for a mining vehicle, the name of the company that manufactured the mining vehicle, and the name and model number of the mining vehicle. Beale disclosed and discussed this design at his deposition in support of his qualifications as an expert. Beale's design is allegedly similar to the Base remote control system at issue in this case. Defendant argues that the information Plaintiff seeks is irrelevant and, in any case, Beale is precluded from disclosing the information by the terms of a confidentiality agreement. Information concerning Beale's design is relevant to his qualifications and opinions as an expert. Beale disclosed and discussed his design in his deposition and Plaintiff attempted to seek further information thereafter from Base's counsel. The confidentiality agreement Defendant cites does not preclude Beale from providing the information Plaintiff seeks; it governs Beale's use of "technical information" that he receives from his client. Plaintiff specifically disavows wanting Beale's clients "technical information." The confidentiality agreement therefore does not control. Defendant is directed to provide Plaintiff with the requested information, pursuant to a standard confidentiality agreement, within 10 days of the entry of this Order.Second, Plaintiff seeks to compel Defendant to produce the "dealer binder." Defendant represents that it has already produced the "dealer binder." Defendant is directed to identify to all parties the documents that it has produced that comprise the "dealer binder," within 10 days of the entry of this Order. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge : Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/7/2012. Jury selection is adjourned to 10/19/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Jury trial will now commence on 10/25/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Final Status Conference before trial is now scheduled for 10/18/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel to make arrangements to meet with courtroom deputy as to courtroom technology, courtroom procedure and jury selection. Basic trial procedures explained. Court takes motions in limine under advisement. Decision to be issued. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                IMPORTANT NOTICE. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to provide the Court with tabbed courtesy copies of their respective Motions in Limine and responding papers, marked with docket number, by noon on Tuesday, 9/4/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY/RESPONSE to re 267 Response in Opposition to Motion, 268 Response in Opposition to Motion, 275 MOTION in Limine Reply, 280 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY/RESPONSE to re 267 Response in Opposition to Motion, 268 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY/RESPONSE to re 280 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY/RESPONSE to re 266 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION in Limine filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 256 MOTION in Limine filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY/RESPONSE to re 256 MOTION in Limine filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 260 MOTION in Limine, 252 MOTION in Limine Reply to Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit certificate of service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff, Base Engineering, Inc.'s 279 Motion for Leave to File Late Opposition to 261 262 Motions in Limine, is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/29/2012. (CMD) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the 278 Motion to Adjourn the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 9/6/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny is GRANTED. The Final Pretrial Conference is now scheduled for 9/7/2012 at 9:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/28/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 262 MOTION in Limine of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 261 MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Late Opposition to Motions in Limine by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Adjourn Pretrial Conference on 9/6/12 by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIRMATION re 259 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION re 259 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) Modified on 8/24/2012 (DLC). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION re 265 Memorandum in Support, 264 MOTION in Limine Extending a Protective Order to Non-Party Witness John Elfman filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION re 263 Memorandum in Support, 262 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION re 259 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION re 259 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION re 260 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIRMATION re 256 MOTION in Limine filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 262 MOTION in Limine filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Services)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 261 MOTION in Limine filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 261 MOTION in Limine filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 264 MOTION in Limine Extending a Protective Order to Non-Party Witness John Elfman byFerrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Extending a Protective Order to Non-Party Witness John Elfman by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Jablonski, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 262 MOTION in Limine byFerrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Jablonski, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine by Signature Truck Systems, Inc..(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey F. Baase, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Memorandum in Support, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY/RESPONSE to re 248 Trial Brief,, Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Charges filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Memorandum in Support, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 254 Reply/Response, 252 MOTION in Limine, 253 Reply/Response Certificate of Service by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re 252 MOTION in Limine, 253 Reply/Response Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Requests to Charge filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY/RESPONSE to re 252 MOTION in Limine Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mediation Certification by Michael A. Brady(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Uncontested Facts, # 2 Exhibit B - Contested Facts, # 3 Exhibit C - Issues of Law, # 4 Exhibit D - Deposition Testimony, # 5 Exhibit E - Damages, # 6 Exhibit F - List of Witnesses and Summary of Testimony, # 7 Exhibit G - Medical Witnesses, # 8 Exhibit H - Expert Witnesses, # 9 Exhibit I - Exhibit List, # 10 Exhibit J - Proposed Jury Charges, # 11 Exhibit K - Proposed Verdict Form, # 12 Exhibit L - Proposed Voir Dire, # 13 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List certificate of service by Signature Truck Systems, Inc... (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF certificate of service by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Expert Witness List by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List by Muncie Power Products, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List by Base Engineering, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List by Signature Truck Systems, Inc... (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Defendant Muncie's 225 Motion to Amend the Pretrial Order is GRANTED. Signed Chief Judge William M. Skretny on 7/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Submission Schedule) (JCD) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 219 Order by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Baase, Esq., # 2 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 221 MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 221 MOTION to Compel filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew Beale, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE on Plaintiff's 221 Motion to Compel. Response due by 5/18/2012. Reply due by 5/29/2012. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge William M. Skretny on 2/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Order Attachment)(JCD) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge : Status Conference held on 2/9/2012. Mediation to continue. Jury selection and jury trial is scheduled to commence on 10/16/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Trial duration is estimated at 4 - 5 weeks. A Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 9/6/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. Trial counsel must be present. A Final Status Conference before trial is scheduled for 10/15/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews. For the defts. - Matthew McNamara, Eric Berhardt, Michael Miller for Brian Sutter, Soo-young Chang for John J. Jablonski. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the Plaintiff's 216 Motion to Adjourn Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference set for 2/2/2012 is ADJOURNED TO 2/9/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/18/2012. (CMD) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Adjourn Status Conference by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 10/28/2011. Case referred back to Mediation which is to be completed by 1/20/2012. A Status Conference is set for 2/2/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge at which time a firm trial date will be set. Trial duration is estimated to be 3 weeks or more. For the pltf. - Benjamin Andrews. For the defts. - Kathlen Martin, Jeffrey Baase, Brian Sutter, Matthew McNamara. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY/RESPONSE to re 201 MOTION to Compel plaintiff to pay expert fees filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re 204 Cross MOTION to Compel, 205 Order,,, filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen J. Martin on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. (Martin, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Hawthorne McNamara on behalf of Signature Truck Systems, Inc. (McNamara, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 204 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 201 MOTION to Compel plaintiff to pay expert fees filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the 207 Motion to Adjourn Status Conference by Muncie Power Products, Inc., is GRANTED. The Status Conference scheduled for 10/20/2011 is ADJOURNED to 10/28/2011 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/17/2011. (CMD) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Adjourn Status Conference set for October 20, 2011 by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey F. Baase, Esq., # 2 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE. A Status Conference is scheduled for 10/20/2011 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERDefendant Signature Truck Systems, Inc. ("Signature") has filed a motion to direct the plaintiff to pay certain fees and expenses associated with the deposition of Muncie's expert. (Docket No. 204). It appears that the issues raised in this motion are similar to the issues raised in the motion recently filed by defendant Muncie Power Products, Inc. Thus, the same briefing schedule shall apply. The plaintiff shall respond to the motion by October 18, 2011. A reply, if any, shall be filed by October 28, 2011. The motion will be deemed submitted without oral argument unless otherwise determined upon review of the papers.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 10/6/2011. (JRA) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cross MOTION to Compel by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERDefendant Muncie Power Products, Inc. ("Muncie") has filed a motion to direct the plaintiff to pay certain fees and expenses associated with the deposition of Muncie's expert. (Docket No. 201). The plaintiff shall respond to the motion by October 18, 2011. A reply, if any, shall be filed by October 28, 2011. The motion will be deemed submitted without oral argument unless otherwise determined upon review of the papers.. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 10/3/2011. (JRA) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Base's and Signature's 147 149 Motion to Strike Hahn's and Dr. Chaplin's Supplemental Report; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Signature's 165 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Muncie's 161 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Base's 163 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Ferrellgas' 162 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/30/2011. (MEAL) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel plaintiff to pay expert fees by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Baase, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A-D to Baase Declaration, # 3 Exhibit E-M to Baase Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Donald E. Allison, Ph.D., # 5 Memorandum in Support, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Plaintiff's 199 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Muncie Power Product, Inc.'s 198 Reply Declaration is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/16/2011. (CMD) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Leave to File by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc. , in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition, filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re 163 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 195 Reply to Response to Motion, (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Memorandum in Support)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY/RESPONSE to re 181 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, /Cross Motion to Strike and Preclude Plaintiff's Late Supplemental Expert Disclosures filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 147 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law with Supporting Exhibits, 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28, # 2 Exhibit 29, # 3 Exhibit 30, # 4 Exhibit 31, # 5 Exhibit 32, # 6 Exhibit 33, # 7 Exhibit 34, # 8 Exhibit 35, # 9 Exhibit 36, # 10 Exhibit 37, # 11 Exhibit 38, # 12 Exhibit 39, # 13 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 14 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff's 188 Motion for Leave to File a 15 page Reply Memorandum of Law pursuant to Local Rule 7(a)(2)(C) is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/19/2011. (CMD) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a, # 2 Exhibit b, # 3 Exhibit c, # 4 Exhibit d, # 5 Exhibit e, # 6 Exhibit f, # 7 Exhibit g, # 8 Exhibit h, # 9 Exhibit i, # 10 Exhibit j, # 11 Exhibit k, # 12 Exhibit l, # 13 Exhibit m, # 14 Exhibit n, # 15 Exhibit o, # 16 Exhibit p, # 17 Exhibit q, # 18 Exhibit r, # 19 Exhibit s, # 20 Exhibit t, # 21 Exhibit u, # 22 Exhibit v, # 23 Exhibit w, # 24 Exhibit x, # 25 Exhibit y, # 26 Exhibit z, # 27 Exhibit aa, # 28 Exhibit bb, # 29 Exhibit cc, # 30 Exhibit dd, # 31 Exhibit ee, # 32 Exhibit ff, # 33 Exhibit gg, # 34 Exhibit hh, # 35 Exhibit ii, # 36 Exhibit jj, # 37 Exhibit kk, # 38 Exhibit ll, # 39 Exhibit mm, # 40 Exhibit nn, # 41 Exhibit oo, # 42 Exhibit pp, # 43 Exhibit qq, # 44 Exhibit rr, # 45 Exhibit ss, # 46 Exhibit tt, # 47 Exhibit uu, # 48 Exhibit vv, # 49 Exhibit ww, # 50 Supplement xx, # 51 Exhibit yy, # 52 Exhibit zz, # 53 Exhibit 1, # 54 Exhibit 2, # 55 Exhibit 3, # 56 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 57 Memorandum in Support, # 58 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 163 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit r, # 19 Exhibit s, # 20 Exhibit t, # 21 Exhibit u, # 22 Exhibit v, # 23 Exhibit w, # 24 Exhibit x, # 25 Exhibit y, # 26 Exhibit z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit cc, # 30 Exhibit dd, # 31 Exhibit ee, # 32 Exhibit ff, # 33 Exhibit gg, # 34 Exhibit hh, # 35 Exhibit ii, # 36 Exhibit jj, # 37 Exhibit kk, # 38 Exhibit ll, # 39 Exhibit mm, # 40 Exhibit nn, # 41 Exhibit oo, # 42 Exhibit pp, # 43 Memorandum in Support, # 44 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 45 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Lent. (Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 159 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit MM, # 39 Exhibit NN, # 40 Exhibit OO, # 41 Exhibit PP, # 42 Exhibit QQ, # 43 Exhibit RR, # 44 Exhibit SS, # 45 Exhibit TT, # 46 Exhibit UU, # 47 Exhibit VV, # 48 Exhibit WW, # 49 Exhibit XX, # 50 Exhibit YY, # 51 Exhibit ZZ, # 52 Exhibit 1, # 53 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 54 Memorandum in Support, # 55 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law with Supporting Exhibits, 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Ferrellgas, # 9 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION in Opposition re 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Ferrellgas, Inc. filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits D-G, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/4/2011 (DLC). (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 182 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Erin Mead, Esq. in Opposition re 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by third-party defendant Ferrellgas Partners' filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts Response to Ferrellgas' Statement of Material Facts)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 149 MOTION to Strike 147 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure, 147 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Plaintiff's 176 request pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(f) for leave to submit a Memorandum of Law in opposition to each Motion for Summary Judgment not to exceed 50 pages is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Memorandums of Law shall not exceed 40 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/28/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Plaintiff's 178 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to 161 163 Motions for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Responses are now due 1/18/2011. Replies are now due 2/8/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/28/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 163 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 163 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff's 174 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Third-Party Defendant's 162 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Response is now due 1/3/2011. Reply is now due 1/24/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/19/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Third-Party Defendant by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bernhardt, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff's 172 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Third-Party Defendant's 162 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Response is now due 1/3/2011. Reply is now due 1/24/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/15/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Third-Party Plaintiff's 170 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Third-Party Defendant's 162 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Response is now due 1/3/2011. Reply is now due 1/24/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/14/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment of third-party defendant by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Plaintiff's 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 161 162 163 165 Motions for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Responses are now due 1/3/2011. Replies are now due 1/24/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/30/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 167 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTICE on 147 149 Motions to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure and 161 162 163 165 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/17/2010. Replies due by 1/7/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F-1, # 8 Exhibit F-2, # 9 Exhibit F-3, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K-1, # 15 Exhibit K-2 Part 1, # 16 Exhibit K-2 Part 2, # 17 Exhibit K-2Part3, # 18 Exhibit K-3, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R, # 26 Exhibit S, # 27 Exhibit T, # 28 Exhibit U, # 29 Exhibit V, # 30 Exhibit W, # 31 Exhibit X, # 32 Exhibit Y, # 33 Exhibit Z, # 34 Exhibit AA, # 35 Exhibit BB-Part1, # 36 Exhibit BB-Part2, # 37 Exhibit CC, # 38 Exhibit DD, # 39 Exhibit EE, # 40 Affidavit, # 41 Exhibit A, # 42 Exhibit B, # 43 Exhibit C, # 44 Memorandum in Support, # 45 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Law with Supporting Exhibits by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26 Part 1 of 4, # 27 Exhibit 26 Part 2 of 4, # 28 Exhibit 26 Part 3 of 4, # 29 Exhibit 26 Part 4 of 4, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) Modified on 11/15/2010 (DLC). (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L and N, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit List, # 17 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 18 Memorandum in Support, # 19 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey F. Baase, Esq., # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Statement of Undisputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1, # 4 Appendix to Local Rule 56.1 Statement, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit V - part 1 of 2, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit V - part 2 of 2, # 28 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 159 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F1, # 8 Exhibit F2, # 9 Exhibit F3, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K1, # 15 Exhibit K2 - Part 1, # 16 Exhibit K2-Part 2, # 17 Exhibit K2-Part 3, # 18 Exhibit K3, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R, # 26 Exhibit S, # 27 Exhibit T, # 28 Exhibit U, # 29 Exhibit V, # 30 Exhibit W, # 31 Exhibit X, # 32 Exhibit Y, # 33 Exhibit Z, # 34 Exhibit AA, # 35 Exhibit BB-Part1, # 36 Exhibit BB-Part2, # 37 Exhibit CC, # 38 Exhibit DD, # 39 Exhibit EE, # 40 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 41 Memorandum in Support, # 42 Affidavit, # 43 Exhibit A-Expert Affidavit, # 44 Exhibit B-Expert Affidavit, # 45 Exhibit C-Expert Affidavit)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERInasmuch as the defendants' motion to strike the plaintiffs expert has been combined in some way with the defendants' motion for summary judgment (see Docket No. 157), this Court has been advised that the motion relating to plaintiff's expert (Docket No. 147) will be determined, along with the summary judgment motions, by the District Court. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/12/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER as to Base Engineering, Inc. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant's 152 request to submit a Memorandum of Law in support of its combined Motion to exclude expert testimony and motion for summary judgment in excess of the 25 page limit, is GRANTED. Memorandum of Law not to exceed 35 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/8/2010. (CMD) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER as to Ferrellgas Partners, Inc. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant's 153 request to submit a Memorandum of Law in support of its Summary Judgment Motion in excess of 25 page limit is GRANTED. Memorandum of Law not to exceed 35 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/8/2010. (CMD)(CMD) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER as to Muncie Power Products, Inc. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendant's 151 request to submit a Memorandum of Law in support of its Summary Judgment Motion in excess of 25 page limit is GRANTED. Memorandum of Law not to exceed 35 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/8/2010. (CMD) Modified to add additional request language on 11/9/2010 (CMD). (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Patricia Mead on behalf of Signature Truck Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law (pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(f)) by Muncie Power Products, Inc..(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 149 MOTION to Strike 147 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike 147 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERDefendant Base Engineering has filed a motion to strike the plaintiff's supplemental expert disclosure. (Docket No. 147). The plaintiff shall respond to the motion by November 19, 2010. A reply, if any, shall be filed by November 30, 2010. The motion will be deemed submitted without oral argument unless otherwise determined upon review of the papers. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 10/29/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of motion to strike plaintiff's supplemental expert disclosure, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Memorandum in Support of motion to strike plaintiff's supplemental expert disclosure, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERBy letter dated October 6, 2010, the defendants request a two-week extension of the time to file dispositive motions in this case. The defendants represent that the plaintiff does not oppose the request. The request is granted. Dispositive motion shall be filed by November 12, 2010. All other dates set forth in the April 26, 2010 Scheduling Order (Docket No. 139) remain in effect.So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 10/7/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERBy letter dated September 20, 2010, the plaintiff requests a short extension of the date for the completion of expert discovery in this case due to the number of expert depositions that need to be taken. The request will not affect the other dates in the current scheduling order. The request is granted. The time to complete expert discovery in this case is extended to October 15, 2010.So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 9/21/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 143 Motion in Limine. Extending time for filing of defendants' expert disclosure to August 31, 2010. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/25/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Precluding Defendant, Muncie Power Products, Inc., From Submitting Expert Testimony At Trial by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 140 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERDefendant Base Engineering, Inc. has filed a motion seeking to re-open discovery and to modify the scheduling order in this case. (Docket No. 140). The plaintiff shall respond to the motion on or before August 23, 2010. There shall be no reply. The motion will be deemed submitted without oral argument unless otherwise determined upon review of the papers. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/16/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend Scheduling Order, # 8 Certificate of Service for Motion to Extend Scheduling Order)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part various pretrial motions 117 , 118 , 119 , 130 , 132 . Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/26/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 137 Reply to Response to Motion to preclude plaintiff's third response to Signature's 1st set of Interrogatories by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. (Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION signed by Benjamin J. Andrews, Esq. re 130 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by David Lent IN OPPOSITION filed by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Gregory J. Rodriguez in Opposition re 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERIn light of the pending discovery motions, the dates for expert disclosure set in the Fourth Amended Scheduling Order dated October 14, 2009 are stayed. The Court will issue new dates relating to expert disclosure and any further pretrial proceedings upon the resolution of the discovery motions. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 1/27/2010. (JRA) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERDefendant Signature Truck Systems, Inc. has filed a motion to preclude plaintiffs responses to Signatures First Set of Interrogatories (Docket No. 130). The plaintiff has filed a motion to modify the scheduling order (Docket No. 132). Responses to the respective motions shall be filed by February 12, 2010. Replies, if any, shall be filed by February 19, 2010. The motions will be deemed submitted without oral argument unless otherwise determined upon review of the papers. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 1/27/10. (JRA) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 130 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. Motion to Preclude Plaintiff's Third Response to Signature's First Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit of Gregory J. Rodriguez, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Memorandum in Support)(Rodriguez, Gregory) Modified on 4/26/2010 (DLC). (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY/RESPONSE to re 128 MOTION to Take Deposition from Jason Swatek, Brian Rang, Parker Hannifin Chief Legal Officer, Parker Hannifin Risk Manager, Richard Fernandez, Philip Hordusky, Lee Ostrom, Chris Schutt filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Coppola, Douglas) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION in support to Take Deposition from Jason Swatek, Brian Rang, Parker Hannifin Chief Legal Officer, Parker Hannifin Risk Manager, Richard Fernandez, Philip Hordusky, Lee Ostrom, Chris Schutt by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Andrews, Benjamin) Modified on 12/17/2009 (DLC). (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Take Deposition from Jason Swatek; Brian Rang; Chief Legal Officer, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Risk Manager, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Richard Fernandez filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits B through H, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Base Engineering, Inc. re 125 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Depositions filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Gegory J. Rodriguez in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Take Deposition from Jason Swatek; Brian Rang; Chief Legal Officer, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Risk Manager, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Richard Fernandez, 118 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Depositions, 119 MOTION to Take Deposition from Lee Ostrom, Chris Schutt, and Philip Hordusky filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of John J. Jablonski in Opposition re 119 MOTION to Take Deposition from Lee Ostrom, Chris Schutt, and Philip Hordusky filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Depositions filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Coppola, Douglas) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Take Deposition from Jason Swatek; Brian Rang; Chief Legal Officer, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Risk Manager, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Richard Fernandez filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhbits B-H, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDER The plaintiff has filed various motions to compel discovery and further depositions in this matter. (Docket Nos. 117, 118 and 119). The defendants shall respond to the motions by December 9, 2009. A reply, if any, shall be filed by December 16, 2009. The motions will be deemed submitted without oral argument unless otherwise determined upon review of the papers. The Court is aware of the fast approaching discovery deadline in this matter and will adjust the scheduling order, if necessary, depending upon the resolution of the pending motions. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/2/09. (JRA) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Take Deposition from Lee Ostrom, Chris Schutt, and Philip Hordusky by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) Modified on 4/26/2010 (DLC). (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Non-Party Depositions by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Andrews, Benjamin) Modified on 4/26/2010 (DLC). (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Take Deposition from Jason Swatek; Brian Rang; Chief Legal Officer, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Risk Manager, Parker Hannefin Chelsea Division; Richard Fernandez by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) Modified on 4/26/2010 (DLC). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing that the inspection of the truck (Unit B-901) involved in the accident underlying this case take place on November 24, 2009 unless the parties can agree to a mutually convenient date prior to November 24, 2009. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/5/09. (JRA) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 97 Motion to Compel; denying 106 Motion to Strike and FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 10/14/09.(JRA) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 2, 2009, before Judge Leslie G. Foschio. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christi A. Macri, Telephone number 585-613-4310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2009. (DLC) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT A status conference took place on 8/11/09. For plaintiff: B. Andrews; for defendants: G. Rodgriuez; T. Frain; J. Baase; and B. Sutter. The Court reserves decision on pending motion to compel. Parties encouraged to continue discovery expeditiously in light of age of the case. (JRA) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 111 Reply/Response to plaintiffs opposition to Signatures cross-motion to strike plaintiffs Second Response to First Set of Interrogatories (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY/RESPONSE to re 109 Reply to Response to Motion cross-motion to strike plaintiffs Second Response to First Set of Interrogatories. filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERBy letter dated July 29, 2009, counsel for defendant Signature Truck has requested an adjournment of the August 5, 2009 status conference due to a personal conflict. By letter, also dated July 29, 2009, plaintiff objects to the adjournment based upon the concern that a delay may prejudice plaintiffs ability to complete discovery by August 31, 2009. The status conference is rescheduled to take place on August 11, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. before the undersigned. The parties can address the discovery deadline with the Court at that time. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/31/09. (JRA) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 Cross MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Response to Interrogatories, 97 MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent. (Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Cross-Motion and Affidavit served on Andrews, Bernstein & Maranto, LLP; Thorn, Gershon, Tymann & Bonanni; Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola, LLC; and Goldberg Segalla on July 22, 2009, filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Base Engineering, Inc. filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Response to Interrogatories by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 97 MOTION to Compel filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A1 to attorney affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Ex A2 to attorney affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Ex B to attorney affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Ex C to attorney affidavit, # 5 Exhibit Ex D1 to attorney affidavit, # 6 Exhibit Ex D2 to attorney affidavit, # 7 Exhibit Ex E to attorney affidavit, # 8 Exhibit Ex F to attorney affidavit, # 9 Exhibit Ex G to attorney affidavit, # 10 Memo of Law, # 11 Certificate of Service, # 12 Cover Letter to Court)(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 97 MOTION to Compel filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Case Law, # 2 Affidavit of John J. Jablonski in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, # 3 Exhibit A & B, # 4 Exhibit C, D & E, # 5 Exhibit F & G, # 6 Affidavit of David L. Moore in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, # 7 Affidavit of Philip Hordusky in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, # 8 Exhibit Horduscky Exhibit A, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERBy letter dated July 14, 2009, third-party defendant Ferrallgas, Inc. has requested a modification of the briefing schedule relating to the motion to compel before the Court. The request is granted. Responses to the motion to compel shall be filed by July 22, 2009. A reply, if any, shall be filed by July 29, 2009. The matter will be discussed at the August 5, 2009 status conference. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/15/09. (JRA) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTT TEXT OF THE ORDERThis matter has been referred to the undersigned for pretrial proceedings. The Court shall conduct a status conference with counsel on August 5, 2009 at 2:15 p.m. So Ordered.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/14/09. (JRA) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NON-DISPOSITIVE REFERRAL ORDER to Magistrate Judge Hugh B. Scott. Signed by Judge William M. Skretny on 7/9/2009. (JCD) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Hon. Leslie G. Foschio recused. Oral argument scheduled for 7/28/2009 on Pltf's motion to compel [#97] is adjourned. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/8/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER re 97 MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent. Responses due by 7/15/2009. Replies due by 7/22/2009. Oral Argument set for 7/28/2009 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/29/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) Modified on 6/26/2009 (DLC). (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Affidavit Dr. Jonathan Chaplin, # 12 Exhibit A - Chaplin Affidavit)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Motions to Compel Discovery due by 8/17/2009. Discovery completed by 8/31/2009. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 10/30/2009. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 12/31/2009. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2010. Pretrial Statements due by 5/21/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2010 09:00 AM before Hon. William M. Skretny. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2010 09:30 AM before Hon. William M. Skretny. NO FURTHER AMENDMENTS WILL BE PERMITTED. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/19/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY PLAN by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order. Proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 5/12/2009;granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Appearance: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq.; Dft Signature Truck-Gregory Rodriguez, Esq.; Dft Muncie Power-Jeffrey Baase, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Brian Sutter, Esq.; 3Dft Farrellgas-Joohong Park, Esq. of counsel John Jablonski, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Drake Miller, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER re 88 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. Pursuant to request by Deft Muncie Power, Responses due by 5/5/2009. Replies due by 5/8/2009. Oral Argument set for 5/12/2009 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/23/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Letter seeking time to respond by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 88 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. Responses due by 4/28/2009. Replies due by 5/1/2009. Oral Argument set for 5/5/2009 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/20/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David Lent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Muncie's Response To Plaintiff's Document Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Muncie's Sales Brochures and Product Literature, # 3 Exhibit C - Muncie's Patent Information, # 4 Exhibit D - Muncie Product Literature Regarding CB6/8 Series, # 5 Exhibit E - Miller Deposition Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit F - Miller Deposition Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit G - Miller Deposition Transcript Page 50, # 8 Exhibit H - Miller Deposition Transcript Pages 69-71)(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/11/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2009. Appearances: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq.; Dft Signature Truck-Gregory Rodriguez, Esq.; Dft Muncie Power-Jeffrey Baase, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Brian Sutter, Esq.; 3Dft Farrellgas-John Jablonski, Esq. Toni Frain, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2009 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/19/2009. (SDW) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/23/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute and Order. Proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/23/2008. Court grants 79 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Second Amended Scheduling Order discussed, same to be filed by the court. Appearances: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq.; Dft Farrellgas-Toni Frain, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Michael Reihler, Esq.; Dft Signature Truck-Dina Thomas, Esq.; Dft Muncie-Eric Bernhardt, Esq. Motions terminated: 79 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. (SDW) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER re 79 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2008 02:30 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/17/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER re 79 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. Responses due by 10/7/2008. Replies due by 10/10/2008. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. So ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/29/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David Lent.(Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Timothy Shanley in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Third-Party Deft Ferrellgas is directed to file a supplemental affidavit from Mr. Shanley consistent with the foregoing within 10 days of this order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/4/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Timothy E. Shanley in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel Affidavit of Timothy E. Shanley in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent. (Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel Production of Statement By Plaintiff filed by David Lent. (Andrews, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel Letter Notice of In Camera Submission filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. re 70 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 69 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT John J. Jablonski, Esq. in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 7/17/2008 re: Plaintiff's motion to compel 61 . Deft Farrellgas requests additional briefing on the issue of privilege. Granted. Deft's supplemental memorandum due 7/21/2008; Pltf's Response due 7/23/2008. Court reserved decision. Appearances: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq.; Dft Farrellgas-John Jablonski, Esq. and Toni Frain, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Kelly Phillips, Esq.; Dft Signature Trucking-Gregory Rodriguez, Esq.; Dft Muncie-Jeffrey Baase, Esq. (SDW) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Lent re 66 Reply Affirmation. (DLC) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION signed by Benjamin J. Andrews re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent. (DLC) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. re 64 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 63 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of John J. Jablonski in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER re 61 MOTION to Produce MOTION to Compel filed by David Lent. Responses due by 7/9/2008. Replies due by 7/14/2008. Oral Argument set for 7/17/2008 10:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/26/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION directing Third-Party Defendant, Ferrellgas Inc to Produce for discovery and inspection a statement plaintiff allegedly made to Ferrellgas employee, John Elfman; MOTION to Compel them to organize and label its responses to plaintiff's document demands so that they correspond to the categories in the request, by David Lent. (Attachments: #(1) Memorandum of Law; #(2) Affirmation with Exhibits A-E; #(3) Certificate of Service.) (DLC) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/20/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute and Order. Proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2008 re 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. The motion is GRANTED and a first amended scheduling order to be prepared and filed. Appearances: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq.; Dft Signature Truck-Gregory Rodriguez, Esq.; Dft Muncie Power-Jeffrey Baase, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Brian Sutter, Esq.; 3Dft Farrelgas-John Jablonski, Esq. (SDW) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. Scheduling Conference re: Plaintiff's motion to amend the scheduling order set for 3/19/2008 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/10/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David Lent. Responses due by 3/5/2008. Replies due by 3/7/2008. Oral argument at discretion of the court. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/28/2008. (SDW) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David Lent. (Attachments: #(1) Affirmation in support). (DLC) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Parties request for a sixty (60) day extension of Paragraphs 8 and 9 of this Court's Order filed 4/20/2007 (Doc. No. 53). Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/26/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mediation Certification by Michael A. Brady(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/30/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. Based on the submitted comments, Mr. Baase is directed to prepare, within 10 days, a preservation order for the court's approval and filing. If there is disagreement among the parties as to the form of such order, a further hearing will be scheduled. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/20/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leslie G. Foschio : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/27/2007 regarding the order that was to be prepared for the court following oral argument conducted 2/28/2007. Plaintiff is seeking deposition of 3rd party deft representative and also add an additional 30 days after full inspection of equipment. The court directs Plaintiff to submit a revised order for approval. Request by Pltf to conduct deposition of 3rd party Deft representative is Granted over the objection of 3rd Party Deft. Appearances: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq.; Deft Signature Truck-Stephanie Henry, Esq.; Dft Muncie Power-Brian Sutter, Esq.; 3Dft FarrellGas John Jablonski, Esq., Dennis Glascott, Esq. (SDW) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER re 47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2007 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/22/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/28/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion. It is directed that there will be at least two inspections, one preliminary to be followd by a second inspection with experts pursuant to protocol to be negotiated and approved by the parties-including hand held device and receiver. To be accomplished within 45 days for initial/attorney inspection and up to 180 days from today's date for deposition of Plaintiff and final inspection by experts. Mr. Baase will draft order for court's approval and signature. Parties may apply for relief of order upon notice to court. Signed by Judge Leslie G. Foschio on 2/28/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leslie G. Foschio : Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2007, Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2007 re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc. Appearances: Pltf-Benjamin Andrews, Esq. and Andrew Fanizzi, Esq.; Dft Signature-Stephanie Henry, Esq.; Dft Muncie-Jeffrey Baase, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Brian Sutter, Esq.; 3Deft Farrellgas-Dennis Glascott, Esq. (SDW) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. identifying Ferrellgas Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Base Engineering, Inc. by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P..(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Signature Truck Systems, Inc. by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P..(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Muncie Power Products, Inc. by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P..(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets Certificate of Service filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Phillip L. Hordusky (Ferrellgas Employee) in Opposition re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2(a)# 3 Exhibit 2(b)# 4 Exhibit 2(c))(Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets filed by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. answer due 2/28/2007; re 29 Third Party Complaint filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (DLC) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc. Responses due by 2/5/2007. Replies due by 2/16/2007. Oral Argument set for 2/28/2007 10:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/12/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2007 10:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/12/2007. (SDW) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Jablonski on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. (Jablonski, John) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A. Goldberg on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. (Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Third Party Summons and Complaint served on Richard Nye as an agent of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. on December 8, 2006, filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Muncie Power Products, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc. re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets (Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 30 MOTION Preservation of Assets filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2007. Replies due by 1/10/2007. Oral Argument set for 1/17/2007 10:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/7/2006. (SDW) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Preservation of Assets by Muncie Power Products, Inc..(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., filed by Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint# 2 Exhibit B, Notice of Removal# 3 Exhibit C, Answer of Base Engineering)(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Muncie Power Products, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc. (Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 26 Third Party Complaint (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc..(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., filed by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Third Party Complaint# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Third Party Complaint# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Third Party Complaint)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leslie G. Foschio : Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2006. Case discussed. Defendants will be filing a third party complaint against the employer. Joint Oral motion for leave to implead Ferrellgas by 3rd party complaint by Defendants GRANTED. Interpleader complaint shall be served and filed within 20 days (12/6/2006). A Further Rule 16(b) hearing will be scheduled upon the filing of an answer from 3rd party Defendant. The court notes that this issues does not preclude the exchange of discovery and to proceed with Rule 26 disclosures. Appearances: Pltf- Benjamin Andrews, Esq. and Andrew Fanizzi, Esq.; Dft Signature Truck-Gregory Rodriguez, Esq. via telephone; Dft Muncie Power-Jeffrey Baase, Esq.; Dft Base Engineering-Brian Sutter, Esq. (SDW) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Crossclaim of Signature Truck System, Inc. by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 20 Crossclaim to co-defendants (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Crossclaim of Signature Truck Systems, Inc. by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSSCLAIM against Muncie Power Products, Inc., Base Engineering, Inc., filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc..(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Cross-Claim of Defendant, Signature Truck Systems, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Crossclaim of Muncie Power Products by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Muncie Power Products, Inc. identifying Interpump Group as Corporate Parent.. (Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 12 Answer to Crossclaim (to parties via us mail) (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 9 Answer to Complaint (to parties via us mail) (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Muncie Power Products, Inc. re 11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 12 Answer to Crossclaim (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Crossclaim of Muncie Power Products, Inc. by Signature Truck Systems, Inc..(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by Muncie Power Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baase, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 9 Answer to Complaint (Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Signature Truck Systems, Inc..(Rodriguez, Gregory) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2006 11:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/11/2006. (SDW) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc. re 6 Answer to Crossclaim of Defendant Base Engineering, Inc. (Kordich, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Crossclaim of Defendant, Base Engineering, Inc. by Signature Truck Systems, Inc..(Kordich, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NON-DISPOSITIVE REFERRAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/29/2006. (Dzielski, J.) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc. by Base Engineering, Inc..(Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Remark - Index of Documents filed in State Court Action. (DLC) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 220 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Municie's 201 Motion to Compel; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Signature's 204 Cross-Motion to Compel Expert Fees. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/24/2012. (MEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc., Base Engineering, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal. (DLC) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 202 Filed: 10/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Base's and Signature's 147 149 Motion to Strike Hahn's and Dr. Chaplin's Supplemental Report; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Signature's 165 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Muncie's 161 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Base's 163 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Ferrellgas' 162 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/30/2011. (MEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc., Base Engineering, Inc., from State of New York Supreme Court: County of Erie, case number 12006-6500. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 22269), filed by Signature Truck Systems, Inc., Muncie Power Products, Inc., Base Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit A) #2 (Exhibit B)(DLC) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?